Hapag-Lloyd (America), LLC v. Indorama Ventures Alphapet Holdings, Inc.
Plaintiff: Hapag-Lloyd (America), LLC
Defendant: Indorama Ventures Alphapet Holdings, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2023cv01016
Filed: September 18, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Colm F Connolly
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1333 Admiralty
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 16, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 16, 2023 Filing 11 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Indorama Ventures USA Holdings LP for Indorama Ventures Alphapet Holdings, Inc. filed by Indorama Ventures Alphapet Holdings, Inc.. (Gattuso, Dominick)
November 16, 2023 Filing 10 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Over the Subject Matter filed by Indorama Ventures Alphapet Holdings, Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 11/30/2023. (Gattuso, Dominick)
November 16, 2023 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Over the Subject Matter - filed by Indorama Ventures Alphapet Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gattuso, Dominick)
October 11, 2023 Filing 8 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Robert I. Steiner and Malavika (Molly) Rao of Kelley Drye & Warren LLP - filed by Indorama Ventures Alphapet Holdings, Inc.. (Gattuso, Dominick)
October 11, 2023 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #7 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to answer, move or otherwise respond to the Complaint to November 16, 2023, filed by Indorama Ventures Alphapet Holdings, Inc. Reset Answer Deadlines: Indorama Ventures Alphapet Holdings, Inc. answer due 11/16/2023. Ordered by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 10/11/2023. (kmd)
October 11, 2023 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #8 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Robert I. Steiner and Malavika (Molly) Rao of Kelley Drye & Warren LLP, filed by Indorama Ventures Alphapet Holdings, Inc. Ordered by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 10/11/2023. (kmd)
October 11, 2023 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Robert I. Steiner for Indorama Ventures Alphapet Holdings, Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (mpb)
October 10, 2023 Filing 7 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to answer, move or otherwise respond to the Complaint to November 16, 2023 - filed by Indorama Ventures Alphapet Holdings, Inc.. (Gattuso, Dominick)
September 28, 2023 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Rick A. Steinberg for Hapag-Lloyd (America), LLC added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (mpb)
September 20, 2023 Filing 6 STANDING ORDER REGARDING BRIEFING IN ALL CASES (nmf)
September 20, 2023 Case Assigned to Judge Colm F. Connolly. Please include the initials of the Judge (CFC) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
September 20, 2023 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #5 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Rick A. Steinberg filed by Hapag-Lloyd (America), LLC. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 9/20/2023. (nmf)
September 19, 2023 Filing 5 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Rick A. Steinberg - filed by Hapag-Lloyd (America), LLC. (Kerrick, Daniel)
September 18, 2023 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Indorama Ventures Alphapet Holdings, Inc. on 9/18/2023. (mpb)
September 18, 2023 Filing 3 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Hapag-Lloyd Aktiengesellschaft, Hamburg for Hapag-Lloyd (America), LLC filed by Hapag-Lloyd (America), LLC. (mpb)
September 18, 2023 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (mpb)
September 18, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed against Indorama Ventures Alphapet Holdings, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ADEDC-4226231.) - filed by Hapag-Lloyd (America), LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(mpb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hapag-Lloyd (America), LLC v. Indorama Ventures Alphapet Holdings, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hapag-Lloyd (America), LLC
Represented By: Daniel Christopher Kerrick
Represented By: Rick A. Steinberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Indorama Ventures Alphapet Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: Dominick T. Gattuso
Represented By: Robert I. Steiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?