Patent Armory Inc. v. VOXX Electronics Corp.
Plaintiff: Patent Armory Inc.
Defendant: VOXX Electronics Corp. and Premium Audio Company LLC
Case Number: 1:2023cv01021
Filed: September 19, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Christopher J Burke
Referring Judge: Gregory B Williams
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 7, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 7, 2023 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED D.I. #10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #9 Amended Complaint or Otherwise Plead filed by Patent Armory Inc., Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: Premium Audio Company LLC answer due 12/11/2023. Ordered by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 11/7/2023. (dlb)
November 6, 2023 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #9 Amended Complaint or Otherwise Plead - filed by Patent Armory Inc.. Motions referred to Christopher J. Burke.(Phillips, John)
October 24, 2023 Filing 9 First AMENDED COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against Premium Audio Company LLC- filed by Patent Armory Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Phillips, John)
October 17, 2023 REMARK: The parties should be aware that the Court encourages the participation of newer attorneys in courtroom proceedings and at oral argument. Please see the Court's Standing Order Regarding Courtroom Opportunities for Newer Attorneys, a link to which is provided here for the parties' convenience:#http://www.ded.uscourts.gov/sites/ded/files/forms/StandingOrder2017.pdf (dlb)
October 17, 2023 Remark: The parties should follow the Court's Standing Order Regarding Courtesy Copies, a copy of which is found on Judge Burke's portion of the District Court's webpage: #https://www.ded.uscourts.gov/sites/ded/files/CJBCC2022.pdf (dlb)
October 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORAL ORDER REFERRING CASE TO Magistrate Judge Christopher J. Burke: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the above-captioned case is referred to Magistrate Judge Christopher J. Burke to hear and resolve all pre-trial matters up to and including expert discovery matters (but not including summary judgment motions, Daubert motions, pre-trial motions in limine, or the pre-trial conference), subject to 28 U.S.C. 636(b) and any further Order of the Court. ORDERED by Judge Gregory B. Williams on 10/13/23. (ntl)
October 10, 2023 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #7 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Plead filed by Patent Armory Inc. Signed by Judge Gregory B. Williams on 10/10/23. (ntl)
October 6, 2023 Filing 7 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, or Otherwise Plead - filed by Patent Armory Inc.. (Phillips, John)
September 27, 2023 Case Assigned to Judge Gregory B. Williams. Please include the initials of the Judge (GBW) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
September 20, 2023 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Patent Armory Inc..VOXX Electronics Corp. served on 9/19/2023, answer due 10/10/2023. (Phillips, John)
September 19, 2023 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to VOXX Electronics Corp. on 9/19/2023. (jfm)
September 19, 2023 Filing 4 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Patent Armory Inc. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(jfm)
September 19, 2023 Filing 3 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 7,130,430. (jfm)
September 19, 2023 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (jfm)
September 19, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT filed with Jury Demand against VOXX Electronics Corp. (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ADEDC-4227534.) - filed by Patent Armory Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(jfm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Patent Armory Inc. v. VOXX Electronics Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patent Armory Inc.
Represented By: John C. Phillips, Jr.
Represented By: Megan C. Haney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VOXX Electronics Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Premium Audio Company LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?