Thomas v. Taylor et al
Petitioner: Damian Thomas
Respondent: Commissioner Terra Taylor, Warden Robert May and Attorney General of the State of Delaware
Case Number: 1:2023cv01069
Filed: September 28, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Gregory B Williams
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 7, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER re #7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to the Petition filed by Delaware DOJ (530), Attorney General of the State of Delaware, Robert May. Signed by Judge Gregory B. Williams on 11/7/23. (ntl)
November 6, 2023 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to the Petition - filed by Attorney General of the State of Delaware, Delaware DOJ (530), Robert May. (McFarlan, Elizabeth)
November 1, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth Roberts McFarlan on behalf of Attorney General of the State of Delaware, Delaware DOJ (530), Robert May, Terra Taylor (McFarlan, Elizabeth)
October 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TO RESPOND/ANSWER. NOTICE OF SERVICE: The Court has determined that the respondents should respond to the petition. Pursuant to the Memorandum of Understanding on Acceptance of Service between this Court, The Clerk of Court, and the Delaware Department of Justice, this Notice constitutes service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4, Rules Governing Section 2254 Cases, 28 U.S.C. foll. Section 2254. Petitioner's Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (D.I. #1 ) is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Gregory B. Williams on 10/30/2023. (Attachments: #1 D.I. #3 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, #2 Exhibit A to Petition, #3 Exhibit B to Petition, #4 Appendix Volume 1 to Petition, #5 Appendix Volume 2 to Petition, #6 Appendix Volume 3 to Petition, #7 Appendix Volume 4 to Petition, #8 Appendix Volume 5 to Petition, #9 Civil Cover Sheet) (apk)
October 4, 2023 Case Assigned to Judge Gregory B. Williams. Please include the initials of the Judge (GBW) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
September 28, 2023 Filing 4 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (mpb)
September 28, 2023 Filing 3 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus - filed by Damian Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Appendix Volume 1, #4 Appendix Volume 2, #5 Appendix Volume 3, #6 Appendix Volume 4, #7 Appendix Volume 5, #8 Civil Cover Sheet)(mpb)
September 28, 2023 Filing 2 Trust Fund Account Statement - filed by Damian Thomas (mpb)
September 28, 2023 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis - filed by Damian Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(mpb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thomas v. Taylor et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Damian Thomas
Represented By: Christopher S. Koyste
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Commissioner Terra Taylor
Represented By: Elizabeth Roberts McFarlan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden Robert May
Represented By: Elizabeth Roberts McFarlan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Attorney General of the State of Delaware
Represented By: Elizabeth Roberts McFarlan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?