Crump v. May
Petitioner: JaQuan X. Crump
Respondent: Warden Robert May and Kathleen Jennings
Case Number: 1:2023cv01354
Filed: November 28, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Maryellen Noreika
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 8, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 8, 2024 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth Roberts McFarlan on behalf of Delaware DOJ (530), Kathleen Jennings, Robert May (McFarlan, Elizabeth)
January 3, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER TO RESPOND/ANSWER. NOTICE OF SERVICE: The Court has determined that the respondents should respond to the petition. Pursuant to the Memorandum of Understanding on Acceptance of Service between this Court, The Clerk of Court, and the Delaware Department of Justice, this Notice constitutes service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4, Rules Governing Section 2254 Cases, 28 U.S.C. foll. Section 2254. Signed by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 1/3/2024. (Attachments: #1 D.I. #3 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, #2 D.I. #5 AEDPA Order, #3 D.I. #6 AEDPA Election Form) (apk)
December 26, 2023 Filing 6 AEDPA Election Form filed by petitioner and requesting to rule on 2254 as currently pending. (apk)
December 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER, Petitioner's Motion for Leave to Proceed In Fomra Pauperis (D.I. #1 ) is GRANTED. Petitioner must file the attached election form with the Court on or before January 3, 2024. Failure to timely return the completed election form will result in the Court ruling on the pending Petition as filed. (Copy to pet. with AEDPA Form) Signed by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 12/5/2023. (Attachments: #1 AEDPA Election Form) (mpb)
November 29, 2023 Case Assigned to Judge Maryellen Noreika. Please include the initials of the Judge (MN) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
November 27, 2023 Filing 4 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (vfm)
November 27, 2023 Filing 3 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus - filed by JaQuan X. Crump. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Envelope) (vfm)
November 27, 2023 Filing 2 Trust Fund Account Statement - filed by JaQuan X. Crump. (vfm)
November 27, 2023 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis - filed by JaQuan X. Crump. (vfm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Crump v. May
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: JaQuan X. Crump
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden Robert May
Represented By: Elizabeth Roberts McFarlan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Kathleen Jennings
Represented By: Elizabeth Roberts McFarlan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?