Arigna Technology Limited v. Longford Capital Fund, III, LP
Plaintiff: Arigna Technology Limited
Defendant: Longford Capital Fund, III, LP
Intervenor: Bayerische Motoren Werke AG
Case Number: 1:2023cv01441
Filed: December 18, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Gregory B Williams
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201 Declaratory Judgment
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 5, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 14, 2024 Filing 37 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Bayerische Motoren Werke AG. (Russell, Andrew)
February 14, 2024 Filing 36 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #35 MOTION to Intervene or in the Alternative MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to Join a Party Under Rule 12(b)(7) filed by Bayerische Motoren Werke AG.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 2/28/2024. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Proposed Complaint with Exhibits A - C, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Russell, Andrew)
February 14, 2024 Filing 35 MOTION to Intervene or in the Alternative, MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to Join a Party Under Rule 12(b)(7) - filed by Bayerische Motoren Werke AG. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Russell, Andrew)
February 13, 2024 Filing 34 REDACTED VERSION of #30 Answering Brief in Opposition, by Longford Capital Fund, III, LP. (Cannataro, Christopher)
February 13, 2024 Filing 33 [SEALED] DECLARATION re #32 Reply Brief / Declaration of Gerald Padian by Arigna Technology Limited. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Brauerman, Stephen)
February 13, 2024 Filing 32 [SEALED] REPLY BRIEF re #21 MOTION to Enjoin Arbitration filed by Arigna Technology Limited. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Brauerman, Stephen)
February 6, 2024 Filing 31 REQUEST for Oral Argument by Arigna Technology Limited re #21 MOTION to Enjoin Arbitration, #17 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Dismiss or, in the Alternative, to Stay Pending Arbitration. (Brauerman, Stephen)
February 6, 2024 Filing 30 [SEALED] ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re #21 MOTION to Enjoin Arbitration Defendant Longford Capital Fund III, LP's Answering Brief in Opposition to Plaintiff Arigna Technology Limited's Motion to Enjoin Arbitration filed by Longford Capital Fund, III, LP.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 2/13/2024. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Cannataro, Christopher)
February 6, 2024 Filing 29 REDACTED VERSION of #27 Declaration of Michael A. Nicolas by Longford Capital Fund, III, LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Cannataro, Christopher)
February 6, 2024 Filing 28 REDACTED VERSION of #26 Reply Brief, in support of its motion to compel arbitration and dismiss or, in the, alternative, to stay pending arbitration by Longford Capital Fund, III, LP. (Cannataro, Christopher)
January 30, 2024 Filing 27 [SEALED] DECLARATION re #26 Reply Brief, /[SEALED] Declaration of Michael A. Nicolas by Longford Capital Fund, III, LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Certificate of Service)(Cannataro, Christopher)
January 30, 2024 Filing 26 [SEALED] REPLY BRIEF re #17 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Dismiss or, in the Alternative, to Stay Pending Arbitration /[SEALED] Defendant Longford Capital Fund III, LP's Reply Brief in Support of its Motion to Compel Arbitration and Dismiss or, in the Alternative, to Stay Pending Arbitration filed by Longford Capital Fund, III, LP. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Cannataro, Christopher)
January 30, 2024 Filing 25 REDACTED VERSION of #23 Declaration by Arigna Technology Limited. (Golden, Ronald)
January 30, 2024 Filing 24 REDACTED VERSION of #22 Brief (Combined Opening and Answering), by Arigna Technology Limited. (Golden, Ronald)
January 23, 2024 Filing 23 [SEALED] DECLARATION re #22 Brief (Combined Opening and Answering), / Declaration of Gerald Padian by Arigna Technology Limited. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Brauerman, Stephen)
January 23, 2024 Filing 22 [SEALED] BRIEF (Combined Opening and Answering) re #21 MOTION to Enjoin Arbitration, #17 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Dismiss or, in the Alternative, to Stay Pending Arbitration filed by Arigna Technology Limited.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 2/6/2024. Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 1/30/2024. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Brauerman, Stephen)
January 23, 2024 Filing 21 MOTION to Enjoin Arbitration - filed by Arigna Technology Limited. (Attachments: #1 [Proposed] Order)(Brauerman, Stephen)
January 18, 2024 Pro Hac Vice Attorneys John N. Gallo, Jeffrey S. Eberhard, and Blake Edwards for Longford Capital Fund, III, LP added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (mpb)
January 15, 2024 Filing 20 REDACTED VERSION of #18 Opening Brief in Support, /Public Version of Defendant Longford Capital Fund III, LP's Opening Brief in Support of its Motion to Compel Arbitration and Dismiss or, in the Alternative, to Stay Pending Arbitration by Longford Capital Fund, III, LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Cannataro, Christopher)
January 10, 2024 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #15 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney John N. Gallo, Jeffrey S. Eberhard, and Blake Edwards filed by Longford Capital Fund, III, LP. Signed by Judge Gregory B. Williams on 1/10/24. (ntl)
January 9, 2024 Filing 19 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Other Affiliate Longford Investment Group III, LLC for Longford Capital Fund, III, LP filed by Longford Capital Fund, III, LP. (Cannataro, Christopher)
January 9, 2024 Filing 18 [SEALED] OPENING BRIEF in Support re #17 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Dismiss or, in the Alternative, to Stay Pending Arbitration filed by Longford Capital Fund, III, LP.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 1/23/2024. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Certificate of Service)(Cannataro, Christopher)
January 9, 2024 Filing 17 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Dismiss or, in the Alternative, to Stay Pending Arbitration - filed by Longford Capital Fund, III, LP. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cannataro, Christopher)
January 9, 2024 Filing 16 Pro Hac Vice Fee - Credit Card Payment received for John N. Gallo, Jeffrey S. Eberhard, and Blake Edwards. ( re #15 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney John N. Gallo, Jeffrey S. Eberhard, and Blake Edwards )( Payment of $ 150, receipt number ADEDC-4310067).(Seaman, John)
January 9, 2024 Filing 15 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney John N. Gallo, Jeffrey S. Eberhard, and Blake Edwards - filed by Longford Capital Fund, III, LP. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Certification of John N. Gallo, #3 Certification of Jeffrey S. Eberhard, #4 Certification of Blake Edwards)(Seaman, John)
January 9, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER re #13 MOTION for Leave to File Briefing on Defendant's Motion to Compel Arbitration and Dismiss Or, In the Alternative, To Stay Pending Arbitration Under Seal filed by Longford Capital Fund, III, LP. Signed by Judge Gregory B. Williams on 1/9/24. (ntl)
January 8, 2024 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to File Briefing on Defendant's Motion to Compel Arbitration and Dismiss Or, In the Alternative, To Stay Pending Arbitration Under Seal - filed by Longford Capital Fund, III, LP. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cannataro, Christopher)
January 8, 2024 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Fitzpatrick Cannataro on behalf of Longford Capital Fund, III, LP (Cannataro, Christopher)
January 8, 2024 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by John M. Seaman on behalf of Longford Capital Fund, III, LP (Seaman, John)
December 28, 2023 Filing 10 REDACTED VERSION of #4 Exhibit to a Document, #2 Complaint by Arigna Technology Limited. (Golden, Ronald)
December 28, 2023 Filing 9 Letter to Honorable Gregory B. Williams from Stephen B. Brauerman regarding redactions. (Golden, Ronald)
December 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER re #1 MOTION to File Complaint under Seal filed by Arigna Technology Limited. Signed by Judge Gregory B. Williams on 12/21/23. (ntl)
December 20, 2023 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Arigna Technology Limited.Longford Capital Fund, III, LP served on 12/20/2023, answer due 1/10/2024. (Golden, Ronald)
December 20, 2023 Case Assigned to Judge Gregory B. Williams. Please include the initials of the Judge (GBW) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
December 19, 2023 Remark: Exit electronic copies to Duty Judge (CFC). (twk)
December 18, 2023 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Longford Capital Fund, III, LP on 12/19/2023. (twk)
December 18, 2023 Filing 5 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed - filed by Arigna Technology Limited. (twk)
December 18, 2023 Filing 4 EXHIBIT to D.I. #2 COMPLAINT - filed by Arigna Technology Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B, #2 Exhibit C, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(twk)
December 18, 2023 Filing 3 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (twk)
December 18, 2023 Filing 2 [SEALED] COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against Longford Capital Fund, III, LP (Filing fee $405, receipt number ADEDC-4297378.) - filed by Arigna Technology Limited.(twk)
December 18, 2023 Filing 1 MOTION to File Complaint Under Seal - filed by Arigna Technology Limited. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(twk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Arigna Technology Limited v. Longford Capital Fund, III, LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arigna Technology Limited
Represented By: Stephen B. Brauerman
Represented By: Ronald P. Golden, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Longford Capital Fund, III, LP
Represented By: John M. Seaman
Represented By: Blake Edwards
Represented By: Christopher Fitzpatrick Cannataro
Represented By: Jeffrey S. Eberhard
Represented By: John N. Gallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Bayerische Motoren Werke AG
Represented By: Andrew Russell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?