UroGen Pharma Ltd. et al v. Teva Pharmaceuticals, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: UroGen Pharma Ltd. and UroGen Pharma Inc.
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. and Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
Case Number: 1:2024cv00417
Filed: April 2, 2024
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Colm F Connolly
Nature of Suit: Patent - Abbreviated New Drug Application(ANDA)
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 11, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 11, 2024 Filing 6 STANDING ORDER REGARDING BRIEFING IN ALL CASES (nmf)
April 10, 2024 Case Assigned to Judge Colm F. Connolly. Please include the initials of the Judge (CFC) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
April 2, 2024 Filing 5 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent UroGen Pharma Ltd. for UroGen Pharma Inc. (mrr)
April 2, 2024 Filing 4 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 9,040,074; 9,950,069. (mrr)
April 2, 2024 Filing 3 Supplemental information for patent cases involving an Abbreviated New Drug Application (ANDA) - Date Patentee(s) Received Notice: February 25, 2024. Date of Expiration of Patent: January 20, 2031.Thirty Month Stay Deadline: 4/15/2027. (mrr)
April 2, 2024 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (mrr)
April 2, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for PATENT INFRINGEMENT filed against Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ADEDC-4375613.) - filed by UroGen Pharma Ltd., UroGen Pharma Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-C, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(mrr)
April 2, 2024 No Summons Issued. (mrr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: UroGen Pharma Ltd. et al v. Teva Pharmaceuticals, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UroGen Pharma Ltd.
Represented By: Daniel M. Silver
Represented By: Alexandra M. Joyce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UroGen Pharma Inc.
Represented By: Daniel M. Silver
Represented By: Alexandra M. Joyce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?