Chiesi Farmaceutici S.p.A. et al v. Teva Pharmaceuticals Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Chiesi Farmaceutici S.p.A. and Amryt Endo, Inc.
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals Inc. and Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
Case Number: 1:2024cv00441
Filed: April 8, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Colm F Connolly
Nature of Suit: Patent - Abbreviated New Drug Application(ANDA)
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 30, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 30, 2024 Filing 10 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Other Affiliate Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd. for Teva Pharmaceuticals Inc. filed by Teva Pharmaceuticals Inc.. (Keller, Karen)
May 30, 2024 Filing 9 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to move, plead, or otherwise respond to the Complaint to July 12, 2024 - filed by Teva Pharmaceuticals Inc.. (Keller, Karen)
May 30, 2024 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #9 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to move, plead, or otherwise respond to the Complaint to July 12, 2024, filed by Teva Pharmaceuticals Inc. Reset Answer Deadlines: Teva Pharmaceuticals Inc. answer due 7/12/2024. Ordered by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 5/30/2024. (kmd)
May 13, 2024 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Chiesi Farmaceutici S.p.A., Amryt Endo, Inc..Teva Pharmaceuticals Inc. served on 5/13/2024, answer due 6/3/2024. (Farnan, Kelly)
May 2, 2024 CORRECTING ENTRY: The Amended Complaint at D.I. #7 has been replaced per counsel's request. (kmd)
May 1, 2024 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants - filed by Chiesi Farmaceutici S.p.A., Amryt Endo, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Patent/Trademark Report, #2 ANDA Form, #3 Exhibit A - 198 Patent, #4 Exhibit B - 695 Patent, #5 Exhibit C - 812 Patent, #6 Exhibit D - 246 Patent, #7 Exhibit E - 709 Patent, #8 Exhibit F - 397 Patent, #9 Exhibit G - 126 Patent, #10 Exhibit H - 457 Patent, #11 Exhibit I - 011 Patent, #12 Exhibit J - 963 Patent, #13 Exhibit K - 595 Patent, #14 Exhibit L - 316 Patent, #15 Exhibit M - 471 Patent)(Farnan, Kelly) (Main Document 7 replaced on 5/2/2024) (kmd).
April 11, 2024 Filing 6 STANDING ORDER REGARDING BRIEFING IN ALL CASES (nmf)
April 10, 2024 Case Assigned to Judge Colm F. Connolly. Please include the initials of the Judge (CFC) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
April 8, 2024 Filing 5 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Valline S.r.l. for Chiesi Farmaceutici S.p.A.; Corporate Parent Chiesi Farmaceutici S.p.A., Corporate Parent Amryt Pharmaceuticals Inc., Corporate Parent Amryt Pharma Holdings Limited, Corporate Parent Amryt Pharma Limited for Amryt Endo, Inc. filed by Amryt Endo, Inc., Chiesi Farmaceutici S.p.A. (apk)
April 8, 2024 Filing 4 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s)(SEE PATENT REPORT) (apk)
April 8, 2024 Filing 3 Supplemental information for patent cases involving an Abbreviated New Drug Application (ANDA) - Date Patentee(s) Received Notice: 2/27/2024. Date of Expiration of Patent: SEE ANDA FORM.Thirty Month Stay Deadline: 8/27/2026. (apk)
April 8, 2024 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (apk)
April 8, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT filed against Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd., Teva Pharmaceuticals Inc. ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ADEDC-4380063.) - filed by Chiesi Farmaceutici S.p.A., Amryt Endo, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-L, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(apk)
April 8, 2024 No Summons Issued. (apk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chiesi Farmaceutici S.p.A. et al v. Teva Pharmaceuticals Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chiesi Farmaceutici S.p.A.
Represented By: Kelly E. Farnan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amryt Endo, Inc.
Represented By: Kelly E. Farnan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Represented By: Karen Elizabeth Keller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?