AstraZeneca AB v. Apotex Inc. et al
Plaintiff: AstraZeneca AB
Defendant: Apotex Inc. and Apotex Corp.
Case Number: 1:2024cv00551
Filed: May 6, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Richard G Andrews
Nature of Suit: Patent - Abbreviated New Drug Application(ANDA)
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 1 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 2, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2024 Filing 10 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Aposherm Delaware Holdings Corporation for Apotex Corp.; Corporate Parent Apotex Pharmaceutical Holdings, Inc. for Apotex Inc. filed by Apotex Corp., Apotex Inc.. (Phillips, John)
July 2, 2024 Filing 9 STIPULATION and Proposed Order to Extend Time - filed by Apotex Corp., Apotex Inc.. (Haney, Megan) Modified on 7/2/2024 (nms).
July 2, 2024 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #9 STIPULATION and Proposed Order to Extend Time (*Reset Answer Deadlines: Apotex Corp. answer due 9/3/2024; Apotex Inc. answer due 9/3/2024). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 7/2/2024. (nms)
May 8, 2024 Case Assigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. (nms)
May 7, 2024 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by AstraZeneca AB: For Apotex Corp. waiver sent on 5/6/2024, answer due 7/5/2024. (Silver, Daniel)
May 7, 2024 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by AstraZeneca AB: For Apotex Inc. waiver sent on 5/6/2024, answer due 7/5/2024. (Silver, Daniel)
May 6, 2024 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Apotex Corp. on 5/6/2024; Apotex Inc. on 5/6/2024. (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued)(mpb)
May 6, 2024 Filing 5 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent AstraZeneca PLC for AstraZeneca AB filed by AstraZeneca AB. (mpb)
May 6, 2024 Filing 4 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 7,919,598; 8,501,698; 8,685,934; 9,616,028. (mpb)
May 6, 2024 Filing 3 Supplemental information for patent cases involving an Abbreviated New Drug Application (ANDA) - Date Patentee(s) Received Notice: 3/22/2024. Date of Expiration of Patent: See Attached.Thirty Month Stay Deadline: 9/22/2026. (mpb)
May 6, 2024 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (mpb)
May 6, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed against Apotex Corp., Apotex Inc. ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ADEDC-4400758.) - filed by AstraZeneca AB. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-D, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(mpb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: AstraZeneca AB v. Apotex Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AstraZeneca AB
Represented By: Daniel M. Silver
Represented By: Alexandra M. Joyce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apotex Inc.
Represented By: Megan C. Haney
Represented By: John C. Phillips, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apotex Corp.
Represented By: John C. Phillips, Jr.
Represented By: Megan C. Haney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?