Gamble et al v. Exactech, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Marianne Gamble and James Gamble
Defendant: Exactech, U.S., Inc. and Exactech, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2024cv00586
Filed: May 16, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Gregory B Williams
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Notice of Removal-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 31, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 31, 2024 Remark: has been opened in Eastern District of New York as case 1:24-cv-03871, filed 05/30/2024. (jfm)
May 30, 2024 Filing 5 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-55) RE: MDL No. 3044 In Re: Exactech Polyethylene Orthopedic Products Liability Litigationdated 5/30/2024. (lnb)
May 30, 2024 Case electronically transferred to Eastern District of New York. (lnb)
May 23, 2024 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand Defendants Exactech, Inc. and Exactech, U.S. Inc.'s Answer to Plaintiffs' Complaint by Exactech, Inc., Exactech, U.S., Inc..(Marasco, Jaclyn)
May 22, 2024 Case Assigned to Judge Gregory B. Williams. Please include the initials of the Judge (GBW) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
May 16, 2024 Filing 3 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Other Affiliate Exactech, Inc. for Exactech, U.S., Inc.; Other Affiliate Osteon Holdings, Inc., Other Affiliate TPG, Inc. for Exactech, Inc. filed by Exactech, Inc., Exactech, U.S., Inc. (jfm)
May 16, 2024 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (jfm)
May 16, 2024 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL and copies of documents from DE Superior Court, Case Number N24C-04-184 PAW (Filing fee $405, receipt number ADEDC-4408746)- filed by Exactech, U.S., Inc., Exactech, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(jfm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gamble et al v. Exactech, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marianne Gamble
Represented By: Andrew C Dalton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Gamble
Represented By: Andrew C Dalton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Exactech, U.S., Inc.
Represented By: Jaclyn C. Marasco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Exactech, Inc.
Represented By: Jaclyn C. Marasco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?