Dennis et al v. Royal Air Maroc
Plaintiff: Damion Weir and Vivian M. Dennis
Defendant: Royal Air Maroc
Case Number: 1:2024cv00842
Filed: July 19, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Jennifer L Hall
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Notice of Removal-Tort/Non-Motor Vehicle
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 28, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 28, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 12/30/2024. Dispositive Motions due by 4/30/2025. The pretrial conference and trial dates will be set for a date to be determined. Signed by Judge Jennifer L. Hall on 8/28/2024. ***Copy mailed to Pro Se Plaintiffs on 8/28/2024*** (ceg)
August 28, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORAL ORDER: Having reviewed Plaintiffs' Motion to Oppose Removal of Case from Small Claims Court (D.I. #3 ) and the accompanying briefs (D.I. #3 , #5 , #7 ), and having considered the applicable law, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs' Motion (D.I. #3 ) is DENIED. Ordered by Judge Jennifer L. Hall on 8/28/2024. ***Copy mailed to Pro Se Plaintiffs on 8/28/2024*** (ceg)
August 21, 2024 Filing 9 Return of Undeliverable Mail sent to Damion Weir. Return to Sender -Insufficient address - Unable to Forward (mrr)
August 19, 2024 Filing 8 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Royal Air Maroc. (Rawnsley, Jason)
August 19, 2024 DEFICIENCY NOTICE issued by the Court to Defendant: Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 (b)(1), A party must: (1) file the disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. Counsel is requested to supplement the docket with an appropriate Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement. (ceg)
August 16, 2024 Filing 7 REPLY to Response to D.I. #3 MOTION Motion to Oppose Removal of Case from Small Claims Court - filed by Vivian M. Dennis. (mpb)
August 9, 2024 Filing 6 STATEMENT Pursuant to Rule 81.2 by Royal Air Maroc. (Ra, Rae)
August 6, 2024 Filing 5 RESPONSE to Motion re #3 MOTION Motion to Oppose Removal of Case from Small Claims Court filed by Royal Air Maroc. (Rawnsley, Jason)
July 25, 2024 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Royal Air Maroc. (Rawnsley, Jason)
July 24, 2024 Filing 3 MOTION to Oppose Removal of Case from Small Claims Court - filed by Vivian M. Dennis. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Motion for Judgement on the Pleadings in New Castle CCP Court)(oam)
July 24, 2024 Case Assigned to Judge Jennifer L. Hall. Please include the initials of the Judge (JLH) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
July 19, 2024 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (mws)
July 19, 2024 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL and copies of documents from Court of Common Pleas of the State of Delaware, Case Number CPU4-24-001934 (Filing fee $405, receipt number ADEDC-4455583)- filed by Royal Air Maroc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(mws)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dennis et al v. Royal Air Maroc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Damion Weir
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vivian M. Dennis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Royal Air Maroc
Represented By: Rae Ra
Represented By: Jason James Rawnsley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?