HDI Global SE et al v. FMC Corporation
Plaintiff: Vienna Insurance Group, Swiss Re International SE, QBE Europe SA/NV, HDI Global SE and Starr Europe Insurance Limited
Defendant: FMC Corporation
Case Number: 1:2024cv00878
Filed: July 26, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Richard G Andrews
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-Property Damage
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 26, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 26, 2024 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Dane H. Butswinkas, Nicholas A. Maricic, Richmond T. Moore for FMC Corporation added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (cdd)
August 23, 2024 Filing 15 Pro Hac Vice Fee - Credit Card Payment received for Richmond T. Moore, Dane H. Butswinkas, and Nicholas A. Maricic. ( re #14 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Richmond T. Moore, Dane H. Butswinkas, and Nicholas A. Maricic )( Payment of $ 150, receipt number ADEDC-4483349).(Silver, Daniel)
August 23, 2024 Filing 14 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Richmond T. Moore, Dane H. Butswinkas, and Nicholas A. Maricic - filed by FMC Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Certifications for Richmond T. Moore, Dane H. Butswinkas, and Nicholas A. Maricic)(Silver, Daniel)
August 23, 2024 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #14 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Richmond T. Moore, Dane H. Butswinkas, and Nicholas A. Maricic, filed by FMC Corporation. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 8/23/2024. (nms)
August 13, 2024 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel M. Silver on behalf of FMC Corporation (Silver, Daniel)
August 13, 2024 Filing 12 STIPULATION and Proposed Order Extending Deadline to Respond to Complaint - filed by HDI Global SE, QBE Europe SA/NV, Starr Europe Insurance Limited, Swiss Re International SE, Vienna Insurance Group. (Taylor, Daniel) Modified on 8/13/2024 (nms).
August 13, 2024 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #12 STIPULATION and Proposed Order Extending Deadline to Respond to Complaint (*Reset Answer Deadlines: FMC Corporation answer due 9/27/2024). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 8/13/2024. (nms)
July 31, 2024 Filing 11 Pro Hac Vice Fee - Credit Card Payment received for Jarett M. Smith and Christopher R. Schaedig. ( re #10 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Jarett M. Smith and Christopher R. Schaedig )( Payment of $ 100, receipt number ADEDC-4465355).(Taylor, Daniel)
July 31, 2024 Filing 10 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Jarett M. Smith and Christopher R. Schaedig - filed by HDI Global SE, QBE Europe SA/NV, Starr Europe Insurance Limited, Swiss Re International SE, Vienna Insurance Group. (Taylor, Daniel)
July 31, 2024 Case Assigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
July 31, 2024 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #10 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Jarett M. Smith and Christopher R. Schaedig, filed by Starr Europe Insurance Limited, Swiss Re International SE, HDI Global SE, QBE Europe SA/NV, Vienna Insurance Group. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 7/31/2024. (nms)
July 31, 2024 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Christopher R. Schaedig, Jarrett M. Smith for HDI Global SE, QBE Europe SA/NV, Starr Europe Insurance Limited, Swiss Re International SE, Vienna Insurance Group added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (cdd)
July 29, 2024 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Swiss Re International SE, HDI Global SE, Starr Europe Insurance Limited, Vienna Insurance Group, QBE Europe SA/NV.FMC Corporation served on 7/29/2024, answer due 8/19/2024. (Taylor, Daniel)
July 26, 2024 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to FMC Corporation on 7/26/2024. (oam)
July 26, 2024 Filing 7 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Wiener Stdtische Wechselseitiger Versicherungsverein Vermgensverwaltung Vienna Insurance Group for Vienna Insurance Group filed by Vienna Insurance Group. (oam)
July 26, 2024 Filing 6 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Swiss Re Corporate Solutions Holding, Other Affiliate Swiss Reinsurance Company Ltd., Other Affiliate Swiss Re Ltd. for Swiss Re International SE filed by Swiss Re International SE. (oam)
July 26, 2024 Filing 5 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Starr Holdings Limited for Starr Europe Insurance Limited filed by Starr Europe Insurance Limited. (oam)
July 26, 2024 Filing 4 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent QBE Holdings (EO) Ltd., Other Affiliate QBE European Operations plc., Other Affiliate QBE Insurance Holdings Pty Limited., Other Affiliate QBE Insurance Group Limited. for QBE Europe SA/NV filed by QBE Europe SA/NV. (oam)
July 26, 2024 Filing 3 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Talanx, Other Affiliate Talanx AG, Other Affiliate HDI V.a.G for HDI Global SE filed by HDI Global SE. (oam)
July 26, 2024 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (oam)
July 26, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against FMC Corporation ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ADEDC-4461646.) - filed by Swiss Re International SE, HDI Global SE, Starr Europe Insurance Limited, Vienna Insurance Group, QBE Europe SA/NV. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Civil Cover Sheet) (oam).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HDI Global SE et al v. FMC Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vienna Insurance Group
Represented By: Daniel Taylor
Represented By: Robert Karl Beste, III
Represented By: Jarrett M. Smith
Represented By: Christopher R. Schaedig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Swiss Re International SE
Represented By: Daniel Taylor
Represented By: Robert Karl Beste, III
Represented By: Jarrett M. Smith
Represented By: Christopher R. Schaedig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: QBE Europe SA/NV
Represented By: Daniel Taylor
Represented By: Robert Karl Beste, III
Represented By: Jarrett M. Smith
Represented By: Christopher R. Schaedig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HDI Global SE
Represented By: Daniel Taylor
Represented By: Robert Karl Beste, III
Represented By: Jarrett M. Smith
Represented By: Christopher R. Schaedig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Starr Europe Insurance Limited
Represented By: Daniel Taylor
Represented By: Robert Karl Beste, III
Represented By: Jarrett M. Smith
Represented By: Christopher R. Schaedig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FMC Corporation
Represented By: Richmond T. Moore
Represented By: Nicholas A. Maricic
Represented By: Dane H. Butswinkas
Represented By: Daniel M. Silver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?