Canyons Aviation Group, LLC et al v. Atlantic Aviation FBO, Inc.
Plaintiff: Canyons Aviation Group, LLC and The HeliTeam, LLC a Florida limited liability company doing business as Speedbird
Defendant: Atlantic Aviation FBO, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2024cv01007
Filed: September 3, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Sherry R Fallon
Referring Judge: Jennifer L Hall
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-Property Damage
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 25, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 25, 2024 Pro Hac Vice Attorney David A. Frank, John P. Loringer for Atlantic Aviation FBO, Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (scs)
October 25, 2024 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED- re #19 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney John P. Loringer, #18 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney David A. Frank II. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 10/25/2024. (lih)
October 24, 2024 Filing 19 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney John P. Loringer - filed by Atlantic Aviation FBO, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certification by John P. Loringer)Motions referred to Sherry R. Fallon.(Reale, Krista)
October 24, 2024 Filing 18 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney David A. Frank II - filed by Atlantic Aviation FBO, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certification by David A. Frank II)Motions referred to Sherry R. Fallon.(Reale, Krista)
October 24, 2024 Filing 17 Pro Hac Vice Fee - Credit Card Payment received for David A. Frank II and John P. Loringer. ( Payment of $ 100, receipt number ADEDC-4531925).(Reale, Krista)
October 23, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORAL ORDER SETTING RULE 16(b) CONFERENCE: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: (1) A scheduling teleconference pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) will be held on November 14, 2024 at 11:00 A.M. (2) The parties are required to prepare for the teleconference by conferring on all matters under Rule 16 and D. Del. LR 16 and shall submit a proposed Scheduling Order to the Court no later than November 8, 2024. The Court's form of scheduling order is posted at https://www.ded.uscourts.gov/judge/magistrate-judge-sherry-r-fallon. Portions of the proposed scheduling order falling outside the scope of the referral to the Magistrate Judge (such as pre-trial motions in limine, the pre-trial conference, and trial) shall conform with Judge Hall's form of scheduling order found at https://www.ded.uscourts.gov/judge/district-judge-jennifer-l-hall. If the parties have any suggestions or modifications to the standard Scheduling Order, they may be included in the proposed order for consideration by the Court. (3) If any disputed issue exists regarding the proposed Scheduling Order, it shall be noted therein, along with the parties' proposed language on the issue for consideration by the Court. Ordered by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 10/23/2024. (lih)
October 23, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORAL ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Sherry R. Fallon: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this case is referred to Magistrate Judge Sherry R. Fallon to hear and resolve all pre-trial matters up to and including summary judgment, subject to 28 U.S.C. 636(b) and any further order of the Court. All subsequent filings in this action shall be captioned as follows: Civil Action No. 24-1007-JLH-SRF. Ordered by Judge Jennifer L. Hall on 10/23/2024. (ceg)
October 21, 2024 Filing 14 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Atlantic Aviation FBO, Inc..(Reale, Krista)
October 11, 2024 Filing 13 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Atlantic Aviation FBO Holdings, LLC for Atlantic Aviation FBO, Inc. filed by Atlantic Aviation FBO, Inc.. (Reale, Krista)
October 9, 2024 Filing 12 STIPULATION Defendant has until October 24, 2024 to respond to the Complaint by Atlantic Aviation FBO, Inc.. (Reale, Krista)
October 9, 2024 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Krista M. Reale on behalf of Atlantic Aviation FBO, Inc. (Reale, Krista)
October 9, 2024 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #12 Stipulation and Order to Extend Time to Respond to the Complaint. (*Reset Answer Deadlines: Atlantic Aviation FBO, Inc. answer due 10/24/2024). Ordered by Judge Jennifer L. Hall on 10/9/2024. (ceg)
October 9, 2024 DEFICIENCY NOTICE issued by the Court to Defendant: Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 (b)(1), A party must: (1) file the disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. Counsel is requested to supplement the docket with an appropriate Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement. (ceg)
October 4, 2024 Filing 10 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Docket No. 9 (Request to Enter Default Judgment Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 55(a)) by Canyons Aviation Group, LLC, The HeliTeam, LLC re #9 REQUEST for Default as to Atlantic Aviation FBO, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Falgowski, J.)
October 3, 2024 Filing 9 REQUEST for Default as to Atlantic Aviation FBO, Inc. - filed by Canyons Aviation Group, LLC, The HeliTeam, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of J. Cory Falgowski, Esquire, #2 Certificate of Service)(Falgowski, J.)
September 12, 2024 Filing 8 Pro Hac Vice Fee - Credit Card Payment received for Christopher R. Thompson and Howard S. Marks. ( re #7 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Howard S. Marks, #6 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Christopher R. Thompson )( Payment of $ 100, receipt number ADEDC-4496599).(Falgowski, J.)
September 12, 2024 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #6 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Christopher R. Thompson, #7 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Howard S. Marks filed by Canyons Aviation Group, LLC, The HeliTeam, LLC. Ordered by Judge Jennifer L. Hall on 9/12/2024. (ceg)
September 11, 2024 Filing 7 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Howard S. Marks - filed by Canyons Aviation Group, LLC, The HeliTeam, LLC. (Falgowski, J.)
September 11, 2024 Filing 6 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Christopher R. Thompson - filed by Canyons Aviation Group, LLC, The HeliTeam, LLC. (Falgowski, J.)
September 11, 2024 DEFICIENCY NOTICE by the Court issued to Plaintiffs re #7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #6 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Per the December 21, 2023 Standing Order, the fee of $50.00 shall be paid upon the filing of a motion. For Pro Hac Vice payments via CM/ECF, local counsel can pay by credit card using the appropriate event code from the Pro Hac Vice Fee Menu in the case the motion is being filed in. (ceg)
September 11, 2024 Case Assigned to Judge Jennifer L. Hall. Please include the initials of the Judge (JLH) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
September 4, 2024 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Canyons Aviation Group, LLC, The HeliTeam, LLC.Atlantic Aviation FBO, Inc. served on 9/4/2024, answer due 9/25/2024. (Falgowski, J.)
September 3, 2024 Filing 4 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent SpeedJet Holdings, LLC for Canyons Aviation Group, LLC, The HeliTeam, LLC filed by Canyons Aviation Group, LLC, The HeliTeam, LLC. (Falgowski, J.)
September 3, 2024 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Atlantic Aviation FBO, Inc. on 9/3/2024. (mrr)
September 3, 2024 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (mrr)
September 3, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against Atlantic Aviation FBO, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ADEDC-4489615.) - filed by Canyons Aviation Group, LLC, The HeliTeam, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(mrr)
September 3, 2024 DEFICIENCY NOTICE issued by the Court to Plaintiff: Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 (b)(1), A party must: (1) file the disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. Counsel is requested to supplement the docket with an appropriate Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement. (mrr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Canyons Aviation Group, LLC et al v. Atlantic Aviation FBO, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Canyons Aviation Group, LLC
Represented By: J. Cory Falgowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The HeliTeam, LLC a Florida limited liability company doing business as Speedbird
Represented By: J. Cory Falgowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Atlantic Aviation FBO, Inc.
Represented By: John P. Loringer
Represented By: David A. Frank
Represented By: Krista M. Reale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?