DAVIS v. DOL, et al
Plaintiff: EARL C. DAVIS
Defendant: GEORGE HYMAN CONSTRUCTION COMPANY and LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY
Case Number: 1:1979cv02561
Filed: November 1, 1999
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Office: Washington, DC Office
County: 88888
Presiding Judge: Royce C. Lamberth
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question: Review Agency Decision
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 306 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 2/26/2018. (jth)
June 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 294 MEMORANDUM AND OPINION. Signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah A. Robinson on 6/16/2017. (lcdar1)
November 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 204 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 11/30/2012. (kc )
April 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 193 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 4/12/12. (rje)
February 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 190 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on February 24, 2012. (lcrcl4)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DAVIS v. DOL, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EARL C. DAVIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GEORGE HYMAN CONSTRUCTION COMPANY
Represented By: Robert A. Rapaport
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Robert A. Rapaport
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?