PIGFORD, et al v. VENEMAN, et al
Plaintiff: TIMOTHY C. PIGFORD, LLOYD SHAFER, GEORGE HALL, MCARTHUR NESBIT, EDDIE SLAUGHTER, LEO JACKSON, J. B. BLACK, LUCIOUS ABRAMS, JR., GRIFFIN TOOD, SR., GREGORY ERVES, CECIL BREWINGTON, HERBERT L. SKINNER, JR., OBIE L. BEAL, CLIFFORD LOVETT, LEONARD COOPER, ABRAHAM CARPENTER, BEN HILLMAN, JR., ZELMA J. HILLMAN, LEONARD HUNTER and ALL PLAINTIFFS
Defendant: ANN M. VENEMAN
Petitioner: HOUSTON BLAKENEY, REATHA BLAKENEY, LEROY ROBINSON, BOBBI NEWTON, PEARLIE PETERSON, NAOMI KNOCKETT, ILENTHE PORTER and JAMES DAVIS
Movant: ANTONIO SANTOS, SARAH DAVIS, CLINTON R. MARTIN, JAMES WALKER, SALLIE WALKER, BANKS LAW FIRM, JAMES TANNER, HAROLD B. DIXON, LARRY GARRETT, BETTY GARRETT, CAROLYN SMITH, COLIE DIXON, SR., GROVER MILLER, CARRIE MCNAIR, CURTIS DIXON, MARILYNN STEWART, ROBERT E. COLLINS, FERNANDO BURKETTE, WILLIAM H. MILLER, GARY GRANT, LAW OFFICE OF DAVID A. BRANCH, J.L. CHESTNUT, ROSE M. SANDERS, OTHELLO C. CROSS, CLARENCE HARDY, CONLON FRANTZ PHELAN & PIRES, LEOLA LOGAN, THEODIE LOGAN, ELMORE HICKS, LUDEAN HICKS and SHUTTS & BOWEN LLP
Claimant: THOMAS BURRELL, SANDY MCKINNON, BEN HILLSMAN, JR., ZELMA J. HILLSMAN, GEORGE BARR GRIFFIN, LEON MATHEWS, ROBERT HOLMES, SR. and ESTATE OF CHARLIE KNOTT
Special_master: RANDI ILYSE ROTH
Arbitrator: MICHAEL K. LEWIS
Case Number: 1:1997cv01978
Filed: August 28, 1997
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Office: Washington, DC Office
County: 88888
Presiding Judge: Paul L. Friedman
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1343
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2081 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying the Conservator's Renewed Motion for Reconsideration 2077 . Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on January 2, 2019. (lcplf2)
August 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2069 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying without prejudice 2067 motion for reconsideration pertaining to Maurice McGinnis' Track B arbitration claim in this case. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on August 6, 2018. Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF (MA)
May 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2066 OPINION granting the government's motion 2057 to dismiss the petition for monitor review of Maurice McGinnis's claim. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 5/31/18. (lcplf2)
September 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 2050 OPINION denying all pending motions. An Order consistent with this Opinion shall issue this same day. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on September 15, 2016. Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF (MA)
May 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 2043 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part the Motion for Attorney's Fees, Costs, and Expenses, Incurred by Faya Rose Toure f/k/a Rose M. Sanders, for Implementation Work During the Period from January 1, 2015 - January 28, 2016 2023 . Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on May 20, 2016. Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF (MA)
November 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2014 OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 1966 motion of Faya Rose Toure f/k/a Rose M. Sanders for attorney's fees, costs and expenses. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on November 23, 2015. Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF (MA)
September 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2001 MEMORANDUM AND OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 1961 Motion of Cross & Kearney PLLC for Attorneys' Fees and Expenses. The parties shall have thirty days up to and including October 30, 2015 to submit a stipulation agreei ng to this determination as a final decision with no right of appeal by any party, or, alternatively, a motion to reopen or reconsider. Further ordered that, within thirty days of the approval of the stipulation, the United States Department of Agriculture shall pay Cross & Kearney PLLC $120,000.00 in attorneys' fees, costs, and expenses, and Stein, Mitchell, Cipollone & Beato, LLP $10,000.00 in attorneys' fees. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 9/30/2015. (zmm)
March 31, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1988 OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 1931 motion of Cross & Kearney PLLC for attorneys' fees and expenses. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on March 31, 2015. Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF (MA)
January 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1970 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER that the motion to vacate and set aside the arbitrator's order filed by Lucious Abrams and Sons and Lucious Abrams, Jr. 1943 is denied; Mr. Abrams' motion to amend his previously filed motion 1947 is granted ; Mr. Abrams' amended motion 1948 to vacate and set aside the arbitrator's order is denied; and the motion to vacate and set aside the arbitrator's order filed by Cecil Brewington 1949 is denied. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on January 21, 2015. Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF (MA)
December 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1963 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting 1930 defendant's motion to dismiss Boone Law Firm's motion for award of attorney fees and costs; and denying 1927 Boone Law Firm's motion for award of attorney fees and costs. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on December 17, 2014. Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF (MA)
December 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1960 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying motions and objections filed by Mr. Bates [1956, 1957, 1959] in Civil Action No. 97-1978. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on December 8, 2014. Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF (MA)
August 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1908 OPINION granting Mr. McGinnis' motion to enforce the Consent Decree. An order consistent with this opinion will issue this same day. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on August 8, 2013. Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF (MA)
May 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1899 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER that on or before May 31, 2013, Phillip L. Fraas and David J. Frantz are directed to file with the Court affidavits or declarations that describe what representations were made to the Facilitator or Monitor regarding Mr. McGinnis' choice between Track A adjudication and Track B arbitration before the issuance of the Monitor's decision, who made those representations, and on what basis those representations were made. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on May 7, 2013. Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF (MA)
April 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1895 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER that the Clerk of Court shall transfer whatever monies remain in the Court Registry to the US Department of Agriculture. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on April 16, 2013. Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF (MA)
May 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 1558 OPINION AND ORDER that the parties shall attempt to settle Covington & Burling's motion for an award of attorneys' fees. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on May 12, 2009. Associated Cases: 1:97-cv-01978-PLF, 1:98-cv-01693-PLF(MA)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PIGFORD, et al v. VENEMAN, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TIMOTHY C. PIGFORD
Represented By: David A. Branch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LLOYD SHAFER
Represented By: David A. Branch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GEORGE HALL
Represented By: David A. Branch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MCARTHUR NESBIT
Represented By: David A. Branch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EDDIE SLAUGHTER
Represented By: David A. Branch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LEO JACKSON
Represented By: David A. Branch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J. B. BLACK
Represented By: David A. Branch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LUCIOUS ABRAMS, JR.
Represented By: David A. Branch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GRIFFIN TOOD, SR.
Represented By: David A. Branch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GREGORY ERVES
Represented By: David A. Branch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CECIL BREWINGTON
Represented By: David A. Branch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HERBERT L. SKINNER, JR.
Represented By: David A. Branch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: OBIE L. BEAL
Represented By: David A. Branch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CLIFFORD LOVETT
Represented By: David A. Branch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LEONARD COOPER
Represented By: Stephon J. Bowens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ABRAHAM CARPENTER
Represented By: David A. Branch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BEN HILLMAN, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ZELMA J. HILLMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LEONARD HUNTER
Represented By: Charles J. Ogletree, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALL PLAINTIFFS
Represented By: David A. Branch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: ANTONIO SANTOS
Represented By: Gerard Robert Lear
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: SARAH DAVIS
Represented By: Dennis Charles Sweet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: CLINTON R. MARTIN
Represented By: Gerard Robert Lear
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: JAMES WALKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: SALLIE WALKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: BANKS LAW FIRM
Represented By: Wyndell Oliver Banks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: JAMES TANNER
Represented By: Ford C Ladd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: HAROLD B. DIXON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: LARRY GARRETT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: BETTY GARRETT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: CAROLYN SMITH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: COLIE DIXON, SR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: GROVER MILLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: CARRIE MCNAIR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: CURTIS DIXON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: MARILYNN STEWART
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: ROBERT E. COLLINS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: FERNANDO BURKETTE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: WILLIAM H. MILLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: GARY GRANT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: LAW OFFICE OF DAVID A. BRANCH
Represented By: David A. Branch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: J.L. CHESTNUT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: ROSE M. SANDERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: OTHELLO C. CROSS
Represented By: Othello C. Cross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: CLARENCE HARDY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: CONLON FRANTZ PHELAN & PIRES
Represented By: David Joseph Frantz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: LEOLA LOGAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: THEODIE LOGAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: ELMORE HICKS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: LUDEAN HICKS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: SHUTTS & BOWEN LLP
Represented By: Joshua A Doan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: HOUSTON BLAKENEY
Represented By: Stephon J. Bowens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: REATHA BLAKENEY
Represented By: Stephon J. Bowens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: LEROY ROBINSON
Represented By: Stephon J. Bowens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: BOBBI NEWTON
Represented By: Stephon J. Bowens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: PEARLIE PETERSON
Represented By: Stephon J. Bowens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: NAOMI KNOCKETT
Represented By: Stephon J. Bowens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: ILENTHE PORTER
Represented By: Stephon J. Bowens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: JAMES DAVIS
Represented By: Stephon J. Bowens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: THOMAS BURRELL
Represented By: John W. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: SANDY MCKINNON
Represented By: Stephon J. Bowens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: BEN HILLSMAN, JR.
Represented By: Gerard Robert Lear
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: ZELMA J. HILLSMAN
Represented By: Gerard Robert Lear
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: GEORGE BARR GRIFFIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: LEON MATHEWS
Represented By: Joshua A Doan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: ROBERT HOLMES, SR.
Represented By: Joshua A Doan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: ESTATE OF CHARLIE KNOTT
Represented By: David N. Fagan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Special_master: RANDI ILYSE ROTH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANN M. VENEMAN
Represented By: Daniel Edward Bensing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Arbitrator: MICHAEL K. LEWIS
Represented By: Jay Marshall Wolman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?