UNITED STATES OF AMERICA et al v. MICROSOFT CORPORATION Featured Case
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Defendant: MICROSOFT CORPORATION
Movant: ROY A. DAY, CARL LUNDGREN, DAVID L. WHITEHEAD, GEORGE E. MCDERMOTT, LONNIE G. SCHMIDT, USA TODAY, THE WASHINGTON POST, LOS ANGELES TIMES, DOW JONES & COMPANY, INC., CABLE NEWS NETWORK, LP, LLP, ASSOCIATED PRESS, SAN JOSE MERCURY NEWS, INC., RELPROMAX ANTITRUST INC., CALIFORNIA PLAINTIFFS, SBC COMMUNICATIONS INC., PROCOMP, THE COMPUTER & COMMUNICATIONS INDUSTRY ASSOCIATION, SOFTWARE & INFORMATION INDUSTRY ASSOCIATION, DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, STATE OF UTAH, STATE OF MINNESOTA, STATE OF MASSACHUSETTS, STATE OF KANSAS, STATE OF IOWA, STATE OF FLORIDA, STATE OF CONNECTICUT, STATE OF CALIFORNIA, THE AMERICAN ANTITRUST INSTITUTE, INC., STATE OF WEST VIRGINIA, NETACTION AND COMPUTER PROFESSIONALS FOR SOCIAL RESPONSIBILITY, THE ASSOCIATION FOR COMPETITIVE TECHNOLOGY, NOVELL, INC., REBECCA A. HENDERSON, FREE SOFTWARE FOUNDATION, MASON THOMAS, JOHN CARROLL, DAN KEGEL, ANDREAS POUR, CONSUMERS FOR COMPUTING CHOICE AND OPEN PLATFORM WORKING GROUP, EINER ELHAUGE and GOOGLE INC.
Amicus: PROJECT TO PROMOTE COMPETITION & INNOVATION IN THE DIGITAL AGE
Intervenor: ROBERT E. LITAN
Case Number: 1:1998cv01232
Filed: May 18, 1998
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Office: Washington, DC Office
County: 11001
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1 Antitrust Litigation
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 4, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 27, 2011 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly: Final Compliance Hearing held on 4/27/2011. (Court Reporter Lisa M. Foradori.) (dot )
April 22, 2011 Filing 927 STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report on Microsoft's Compliance with the Final Judgments by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Hoag, Aaron)
April 22, 2011 Filing 926 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS before Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly held on 3-23-11; Page Numbers: 1-17. Date of Issuance:4-22-11. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lisa Foradori, Telephone number 202-354-3269, Court Reporter Email Address : L4dori@yahoo.com.For the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at ww.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 5/13/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/23/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/21/2011.(Hand, Lisa)
April 22, 2011 Filing 925 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS before Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly held on 10-13-10; Page Numbers: 1-23. Date of Issuance:4-22-11. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lisa Foradori, Telephone number 202-354-3269, Court Reporter Email Address : L4dori@yahoo.com.For the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at ww.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 5/13/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/23/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/21/2011.(Hand, Lisa)
April 22, 2011 Filing 924 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS before Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly held on 1-19-11; Page Numbers: 1-33. Date of Issuance:4-22-11. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lisa Foradori, Telephone number 202-354-3269, Court Reporter Email Address : L4dori@yahoo.com.For the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at ww.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 5/13/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/23/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/21/2011.(Hand, Lisa)
March 23, 2011 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly: Status Conference held on 3/23/2011. Joint Status Report due by 4/22/2011. Status Conference set for 4/27/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom 28A before Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. (Court Reporter Lisa M. Foradori.) (dot )
March 23, 2011 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER (paperless). The Court held an Interim Compliance Status Conference in this action today, March 23, 2011. As set forth in the Court's June 23, 2010 Minute Order, the next status conference shall be held at 10:00 a.m. on April 27, 2011 in Courtroom 28A before Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly, and the parties are reminded to file their joint status report in advance of that status conference on April 22, 2011. Microsoft need not file a separate, supplemental status report outlining its compliance with the Final Judgments. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on March 23, 2011. (lcckk3)
March 17, 2011 Filing 923 STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report on Microsoft's Compliance with the Final Judgments by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Hoag, Aaron)
February 15, 2011 Filing 922 STATUS REPORT Supplemental by MICROSOFT CORPORATION. (Rule, Charles)
January 19, 2011 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly: Full Compliance Status Conference held on 1/19/2011. Joint Status Report due by 3/18/2011. Status Conference set for 3/23/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom 28A before Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. (Court Reporter Lisa Hand.) (dot )
January 19, 2011 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER (paperless). The Court held a Full Compliance Status Conference in this action on January 19, 2011. As set forth in the Court's June 23, 2010 Minute Order, the next status conference shall be held at 10:00 a.m. on March 23, 2011 in Courtroom 28A before Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly, and the parties are reminded to file their joint status report in advance of that status conference on March 18, 2011. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on January 19, 2011. (lcckk3)
January 14, 2011 Filing 921 STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report on Microsoft's Compliance with the Final Judgments by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Hoag, Aaron)
December 15, 2010 Filing 920 STATUS REPORT Supplemental by MICROSOFT CORPORATION. (Rule, Charles)
November 15, 2010 Filing 919 STATUS REPORT Supplemental by MICROSOFT CORPORATION. (Rule, Charles)
October 13, 2010 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly:Interim Compliance Status Conference held on 10/13/2010. Joint Status Report due by 1/14/2011. Status Conference set for 1/19/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom 28A before Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. (Court Reporter Lisa Hand.) (dot, )
October 13, 2010 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER (paperless). The Court held an Interim Compliance Status Conference in this case on October 13, 2010. As set forth in the Court's June 23, 2010 Minute Order, the next status conference shall be held at 10:00 a.m. on January 19, 2011 in Courtroom 28A before Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. The parties are reminded to file their joint status report in advance of that status conference, on January 14, 2011. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on October 13, 2010. (lcckk3)
October 4, 2010 Filing 918 STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report on Microsoft's Compliance with the Final Judgments by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Hoag, Aaron)
September 20, 2010 Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 10/4/2010. (dot, )
September 18, 2010 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER (paperless). Upon review of Microsoft's 916 Supplemental Status Report, the Court reminds counsel that the parties' Joint Status Report is due on October 4, 2010, not October 8, 2010, as noted in the recent filing. This change was reflected in the Court's June 23, 2010 Minute Order, to which the parties are directed. See 6/23/10 Min Order ("The parties shall file their Joint Status Report in advance of that Interim Compliance Status Conference on or before MONDAY, OCTOBER 4, 2010."). Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on September 18, 2010. (lcckk2 )
September 16, 2010 Filing 917 ERRATA by MICROSOFT CORPORATION 916 Status Report filed by MICROSOFT CORPORATION. (Attachments: # 1 Errata Corrected pages of status report)(Rule, Charles)
September 15, 2010 Filing 916 STATUS REPORT Supplemental by MICROSOFT CORPORATION. (Rule, Charles)
August 23, 2010 Filing 915 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS before Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly held on 3-10-10; Page Numbers: 1-24. Date of Issuance:8-23-10. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lisa Hand, Telephone number 202-354-3269, Court Reporter Email Address : lisa_hand@dcd.uscourts.gov.For the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at ww.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 9/13/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/23/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/22/2010.(Hand, Lisa)
August 23, 2010 Filing 914 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS before Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly held on 12-16-09; Page Numbers: 1-16. Date of Issuance:8-23-10. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lisa Hand, Telephone number 202-354-3269, Court Reporter Email Address : lisa_hand@dcd.uscourts.gov.For the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at ww.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 9/13/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/23/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/22/2010.(Hand, Lisa)
August 16, 2010 Filing 913 STATUS REPORT Supplemental by MICROSOFT CORPORATION. (Rule, Charles)
July 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 912 STATUS REPORT Supplemental by MICROSOFT CORPORATION. (Rule, Charles)
June 23, 2010 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER (paperless). The Court held a Full Compliance Status Conference in this case on June 23, 2010. The next Interim Compliance Status Conference shall be held at 10:00 A.M. on Wednesday, October 13, 2010. The parties shall file their Joint Status Report in advance of that Interim Compliance Status Conference on or before MONDAY, OCTOBER 4, 2010. (The Court directs the parties' attention to this latter deadline and notes that the deadline for filing the Joint Status Report has been changed from the date originally stated at the Status Conference in order to accommodate the Court's schedule.) In addition, the Court set the following schedule for additional status conferences: (1) a status conference shall be held at 10:00 AM on Wednesday, January 19, 2011, and the parties shall file their joint status report in advance of that hearing on January 14, 2011; (2) a status conference shall be held at 10:00 AM on Wednesday, March 23, 2011, and the parties shall file their joint status report in advance of that hearing on March 18, 2011; and (3) a status conference shall be held at 10:00 AM on Wednesday, April 27, 2011, and the parties shall file their joint status report in advance of that hearing on April 22, 2011. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on June 23, 2010. (lcckk2)
June 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly: Full Compliance Hearing held on 6/23/2010. Interim Compliance Hearing set for 10/13/2010 10:00 AM in Courtroom 28A before Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. The parties shall filed Joint Status Report by 10/4/2010. Status hearings set for 1/19/2011 10:00 AM, with Joint Status Report due 1/14/2011; Status hearing set for 3/23/2011 10:00 AM, with Joint Status Report due 3/18/2011; Status Report set for April 27 10:00 AM with Joint Status Report due 4/22/2011. (Court Reporter Lisa Hand.) (dot, ) Modified on 6/23/2010 (dot, ).
June 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Joint Status Report due by 10/4/2010. Status Conference set for 10/13/2010 10:00 AM in Courtroom 28A before Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. Joint Status Report due 1/14/2011. Status Conference set for 1/19/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom 28A before Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. Joint Status Report due 3/18/2011. Status Conference set for 3/23/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom 28A before Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. Joint Status Report due 4/22/2011. Status Conference set for 4/27/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom 28A before Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. (dot, )
June 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 911 STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report on Microsoft's Compliance with the Final Judgments by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Hoag, Aaron)
May 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 910 STATUS REPORT Supplemental by MICROSOFT CORPORATION. (Rule, Charles)
April 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 909 STATUS REPORT Supplemental by MICROSOFT CORPORATION. (Rule, Charles)
March 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly: Full compliance hearing held on 3/10/2010. Status Report due by 6/16/2010. Full Compliance Status Conference set for 6/23/2010 10:00 AM in Courtroom 28A before Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. (Court Reporter Lisa Hand.) (dot, )
March 10, 2010 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER (paperless). The Court held an Interim Compliance Status Conference in this case on March 10, 2010. The next Full Compliance Status Conference shall be held at 10:00 A.M. on Wednesday, June 23, 2010. The parties shall file their Joint Status Report in advance of that Full Compliance Status Conference on or before Wednesday, June 16, 2010. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on March 10, 2010. (lcckk2 )
March 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 908 STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report on Microsoft's Compliance with the Final Judgments by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Hoag, Aaron)
February 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 907 ORDER that the Clerk of Court shall not accept any future submissions from Tyrone Hurt for filing in the above-captioned action. The Clerk of the Court shall return Mr. Hurt's recent submission, along with a copy of this Order, to Mr. Hurt at the following address: 801 Pennsylvania Avenue, S.E., Washington, DC 20003. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 2/17/10. (dot, )
February 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 906 STATUS REPORT Supplemental by MICROSOFT CORPORATION. (Rule, Charles)
January 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 905 STATUS REPORT Supplemental by MICROSOFT CORPORATION. (Rule, Charles)
December 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly: Full Compliance Status Conference held on 12/16/2009.Joint Status Report due by 3/5/2010. Interim Compliance Status Conference set for 3/10/2010 10:00 AM in Courtroom 28A before Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. (Court Reporter Lisa Hand.) (dot, )
December 16, 2009 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER (paperless). The Court held a Full Compliance Status Conference in this case on December 16, 2009. The next Interim Compliance Status Conference shall be held at 10:00 A.M. on Wednesday, March 10, 2010. The parties shall file their Joint Status Report in advance of that Interim Compliance Status Conference on or before Friday, March 5, 2010. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on December 16, 2009. (lcckk2 )
December 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 904 STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report on Microsoft's Compliance with the Final Judgments by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Hoag, Aaron)
November 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Leave to File Denied. Plaintiff's Motion for Declaratory Judgment "Leave to file Denied" by Judge C Kollar-Kotelly (td, )
November 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 903 STATUS REPORT Supplemental by MICROSOFT CORPORATION. (Rule, Charles)
October 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 902 STATUS REPORT Supplemental by MICROSOFT CORPORATION. (Rule, Charles)
September 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 901 STATUS REPORT Supplemental by MICROSOFT CORPORATION. (Rule, Charles)
September 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 900 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS before Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly held on 8/13/09; Page Numbers: 1 - 27. Date of Issuance:9/12/09. Court Reporter/Transcriber Bryan A. Wayne, Telephone number 202-354-3186, Court Reporter Email Address : bryanawayne@yahoo.com.For the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at ww.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 10/5/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/13/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/11/2009.(Wayne, Bryan)
August 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Joint Status Report due by 12/9/2009. Full Compliance Conference set for 12/16/2009 11:00 AM in Courtroom 28A before Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. (dot, )
August 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly: Interim Compliance Status Hearing held on 8/13/2009. Joint Report due 12/9/2009. Full Compliance Status Hearing set for 12/16/2009. (Court Reporter Bryan Wayne.) (dot, )
August 13, 2009 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER (paperless). The Court held an Interim Compliance Status Conference in this case on August 13, 2009. The next Full Compliance Status Conference shall be held at 11:00 A.M. on Wednesday, December 16, 2009. The parties shall file their Joint Status Report in advance of that Full Compliance Status Conference on or before Wednesday, December 9, 2009. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on August 13, 2009. (lcckk2)
August 7, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 899 STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Hoag, Aaron)
July 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 898 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS before Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly held on 4-22-09; Page Numbers: 1-36. Date of Issuance:7-29-09. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lisa Hand, Telephone number 202-354-3269, Court Reporter Email Address : lisa_hand@uscourts.gov.For the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at ww.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 8/19/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/31/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/27/2009.(Courtrep, )
July 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 897 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS before Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly held on 1-28-09; Page Numbers: 1-29. Date of Issuance:7-29-09. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lisa Hand, Telephone number 202-354-3269, Court Reporter Email Address : lisa_hand@uscourts.gov.For the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at ww.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 8/19/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/31/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/27/2009.(Courtrep, )
July 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 896 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS before Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly held on 9-25-08; Page Numbers: 1-43. Date of Issuance:7-29-09. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lisa Hand, Telephone number 202-354-3269, Court Reporter Email Address : lisa_hand@dcd.uscourts.gov.For the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at ww.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 8/19/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/31/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/27/2009.(Courtrep, )
July 20, 2009 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER (paperless). The Interim Compliance Status Conference currently set for August 12, 2009 is hereby CONTINUED until 11:00 A.M. on Thursday, August 13, 2009. The parties shall file their Joint Status Report in advance of that Interim Compliance Status Conference on or before August 7, 2009. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on July 20, 2009. (lcckk2 )
July 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Joint Status Report due by 8/7/2009. Interim Compliance Status Conference reset for 8/13/2009 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 28A before Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. (tth)
July 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 895 NOTICE Joint Notice Regarding the Next Joint Status Conference by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Hoag, Aaron)
July 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 894 STATUS REPORT Supplemental by MICROSOFT CORPORATION. (Rule, Charles)
July 7, 2009 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER (paperless). Due to a scheduling conflict with the Court's calendar involving merits hearings in pending Guantanamo Bay habeas litigation, the Court must reschedule the next Interim Compliance Status Conference currently set for August 12, 2009. The Court proposes that the Conference be rescheduled EITHER to 11:00 A.M. on Thursday, August 13, 2009, or to 10:30 A.M. on Wednesday, August 19, 2009. The Court requests the parties file a joint notice with the Court indicating whether the proposed dates are convenient for all parties. If not, the Court requests the parties suggest mutually agreeable alternative dates for the next Interim Compliance Status Conference. The parties shall file their joint notice on or before Friday, July 17, 2009. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on July 7, 2009. (lcckk2 )
June 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 893 STATUS REPORT Supplemental by MICROSOFT CORPORATION. (Rule, Charles)
June 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 892 NOTICE of Change of Address by Aaron D. Hoag (Hoag, Aaron)
May 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 891 STATUS REPORT Supplemental by MICROSOFT CORPORATION. (Rule, Charles)
May 11, 2009 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER (paperless). The Interim Compliance Status Conference currently set for August 5, 2009 is hereby CONTINUED until 10:30 A.M. on Wednesday, August 12, 2009. The parties shall file their Joint Status Report in advance of that Interim Compliance Status Conference on or before August 7, 2009. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on May 11, 2009. (lcckk2 )
May 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 890 NOTICE by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Hoag, Aaron)
May 4, 2009 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER (paperless). Due to a scheduling conflict with the Court's calendar, the Court must reschedule the next Interim Compliance Status Conference currently set for August 5, 2009. The Court proposes that the Conference be rescheduled to 10:30 A.M. on Wednesday, August 12, 2009, and requests the parties file a joint notice with the Court indicating whether that date is convenient for all parties. If not, the Court requests the parties suggest mutually agreeable alternative dates for the next Interim Compliance Status Conference. The parties shall file their joint notice on or before Friday, May 8, 2009. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on May 4, 2009. (lcckk2 )
April 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 889 ORDER granting 888 Motion to Alter Judgment. Second Modified Final Judgment (Originally Entered November 12, 2002; Modified September 7, 2006; Further Modified April 22, 2009). Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 4/22/09. (dot, )
April 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly: Compliance Hearing held on 4/22/2009. Joint Status Report due by 7/31/2009. Status Conference set for 8/5/2009 10:30 AM in Courtroom 28A before Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. (Court Reporter Lisa Hand.) (dot, )
April 22, 2009 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER (paperless). The Court held a Full Compliance Status Conference in this case on April 22, 2009. At that time, the Court GRANTED the parties' joint motion to modify the final judgment, see Docket No. 888 , based on the reasons set forth on the record and on the Court's finding that the proposed modifications are in the public interest. The next Interim Compliance Status Conference shall be held at 10:30 a.m. on Wednesday, August 5, 2009. The parties shall file their Joint Status Report in advance of that Interim Compliance Status Conference on or before July 31, 2009. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on April 22, 2009. (lcckk2 )
April 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 888 Joint MOTION to Alter Judgment Joint Motion to Modify Final Judgment and Supporting Memorandum of Points and Authorities by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1: [Proposed] Second Modified Final Judgment Redline Version, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2: [Proposed] Second Modified Final Judgment)(Hoag, Aaron)
April 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 887 STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report on Microsoft's Compliance with the Final Judgments by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Hoag, Aaron)
April 7, 2009 Opinion or Order Leave to File Denied. Non Party Amendment to Complaint, Non Party Amendment to Motion for Declaratory Judgment. " Leave to file Denied. Not a Party in these cases" Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 4/2/2009. (tr)
March 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 886 STATUS REPORT Supplemental by MICROSOFT CORPORATION. (Rule, Charles)
February 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 885 STATUS REPORT Supplemental by MICROSOFT CORPORATION. (Rule, Charles)
January 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly: Interim Compliance Status Conference held on 1/28/2009. Joint Status Report due by 4/16/2009. Full Compliance Status Conference set for 1/22/2009 10:30 AM in Courtroom 28A before Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. (Court Reporter Lisa Hand.) (dot, )
January 28, 2009 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER (paperless). The Court held an Interim Compliance Status Conference in this case on January 28, 2009. The next Full Compliance Status Conference shall be held at 10:30 a.m. on Wednesday, April 22, 2009. The parties shall file their Joint Status Report in advance of that Full Compliance Status Conference on or before April 16, 2009. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on January 28, 2009. (lcckk2)
January 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 884 STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report on Microsoft's Compliance with the Final Judgments by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Hoag, Aaron)
December 15, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 883 STATUS REPORT Supplemental by MICROSOFT CORPORATION. (Rule, Charles)
November 17, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 882 STATUS REPORT Supplemental by MICROSOFT CORPORATION. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Rule, Charles)
October 15, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 881 STATUS REPORT Supplemental by MICROSOFT CORPORATION. (Rule, Charles)
September 25, 2008 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for Compliance Status Hearing held before Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 9/25/08 : Next Compliance Status Hearing set for 1/28/09 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 28A before Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. Joint Status Report due by 1/21/09. (Court Reporter: Lisa Hand) (kk)
September 25, 2008 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER (paperless). The Court held a Full Compliance Status Conference in this case on September 25, 2008. The next Interim Compliance Status Conference shall be held at 10:30 a.m. on Wednesday, January 28, 2009. The parties shall file their Joint Status Report in advance of that Interim Compliance Status Conference on or before January 21, 2009. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on September 25, 2008. (lcckk2)
September 18, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 880 STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report on Microsoft's Compliance with the Final Judgments by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Hoag, Aaron)
August 15, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 879 STATUS REPORT Supplemental by MICROSOFT CORPORATION. (Rule, Charles)
July 15, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 878 STATUS REPORT Supplemental by MICROSOFT CORPORATION. (Rule, Charles)
June 25, 2008 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER (paperless). The Court held an Interim Compliance Status Conference in this case on June 24, 2008. The next Full Compliance Status Conference shall be held at 10:30 a.m. on Thursday, September 25, 2008. The parties shall file their Joint Status Report in advance of that Full Compliance Status Conference on or before September 18, 2008. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on June 25, 2008. (lcckk2)
June 24, 2008 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Hearings:(Status Conference set for 6/24/2008 10:30 AM in Courtroom 28A before Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly.) (jeb, )
June 24, 2008 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly: Status Conference held on 6/24/2008. Status Report due by 9/18/2008. Status Conference set for 9/25/2008 10:30 AM in Courtroom 28A before Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. (Court Reporter Jackie Sullivan.) (dot, )
June 17, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 877 STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report on Microsoft's Compliance with the Final Judgments by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Hoag, Aaron)
May 16, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 876 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS before Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly of proceedings held on March 7, 2008; Court Reporter/Transcriber Lisa M. Hand, Court Reporter Email Address : (202) 354-3269 For the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at ww.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 6/6/2008. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/16/2008. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/14/2008.(td, )
May 15, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 875 STATUS REPORT Supplemental by MICROSOFT CORPORATION. (Rule, Charles)
April 17, 2008 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. At the request of the parties, the Interim Compliance Status Conference previously scheduled for June 25, 2008 shall instead be held at 10:30 a.m. on Tuesday, June 24, 2008. The parties' Joint Status Report in advance of that Interim Compliance Status Conference shall be filed on or before June 17, 2008. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on April 17, 2008. (lcckk2)
April 15, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 874 STATUS REPORT Supplemental by MICROSOFT CORPORATION. (Rule, Charles)
March 7, 2008 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly: Compliance Status Conference held on 3/7/2008. Joint Status Report due by 6/18/2008. Compliance Status Conference set for 6/25/2008 10:30 AM in Courtroom 28A before Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. (Court Reporter Lisa Hand.) (dot, )
March 7, 2008 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. The Court held a Full Compliance Status Conference in this case on March 7, 2008. The next Interim Compliance Status Conference shall be held at 10:30 a.m. on Wednesday, June 25, 2008. The parties shall file their Joint Status Report in advance of that Interim Compliance Status Conference on or before June 18, 2008. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on March 7, 2008. (lcckk2)
February 29, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 873 STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report on Microsoft's Compliance with the Final Judgments by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Hoag, Aaron)
February 12, 2008 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines:, Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings:( Status Conference set for 3/7/2008 11:00 AM in Courtroom 28A before Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly.) Joint Status Report due by 2/29/2008. (dot, )
February 12, 2008 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. The next Status Hearing in this case shall be held at 11:00 a.m. on Friday, March 7, 2008 in Courtroom 28A. The parties' Joint Status Report shall be filed on or before February 29, 2008. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on February 12, 2008. (lcckk2)
February 12, 2008 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. In light of the fact that the parties will be filing a Joint Status Report on February 29, 2008, Microsoft shall not be required to file a Supplemental Status Report for the month of February 2008. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on February 12, 2008. (lcckk2)
January 15, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 872 STATUS REPORT Supplemental by MICROSOFT CORPORATION. (Rule, Charles)
December 17, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 871 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 9/11/07 before Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. Court Reporter: Lisa M. Hand. The public may view the document in the Clerk's Office between the hours of 9:00 a.m. and 4:00 p.m, Monday through Friday. (td, )
December 17, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 870 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 10/16/07 before Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. Court Reporter: Lisa M. Hand. The public may view the document in the Clerk's Office between the hours of 9:00 a.m. and 4:00 p.m, Monday through Friday. (td, )
December 17, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 869 STATUS REPORT Supplemental by MICROSOFT CORPORATION. (Rule, Charles)
December 4, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 868 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on October 23, 2007 Telephone Conference Call before Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. Court Reporter: Patty A. Gels. The public may view the document in the Clerk's Office between the hours of 9:00 a.m. and 4:00 p.m, Monday through Friday. (tg, )
November 15, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 867 STATUS REPORT Supplemental by MICROSOFT CORPORATION. (Rule, Charles)
October 30, 2007 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. The status hearing previously scheduled in this matter for 10:30 a.m. on Tuesday, November 6, 2007 is hereby VACATED. Another status hearing shall be scheduled following the resolution of the Motions currently pending in State of New York v. Microsoft Corporation, Civil Action No. 98-1233. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on October 30, 2007. (lcckk2)
October 29, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 866 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on October 23, 2007 before Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. Court Reporter: Patty Artrip Gels. The public may view the document in the Clerk's Office between the hours of 9:00 a.m. and 4:00 p.m, Monday through Friday. (td, )
October 23, 2007 Opinion or Order Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly : Telephone Conference held on 10/23/2007. (Court Reporter Patty Gels.) (dot, )
October 19, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 865 STATUS REPORT Report Stating the Position of the United States on the Recently-Filed Motions to Extend the States' Final Judgments by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Hoag, Aaron)
October 16, 2007 Opinion or Order Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly : Telephone Conference held on 10/16/2007 on the record.Telephone Conference set for 10/23/2007 01:30 PM in Chambers before Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. (Court Reporter Lisa Hand.) (dot, )
October 16, 2007 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. The Court held a conference call on the record on Tuesday, October 16, 2007, with counsel for all parties participating. Another conference call was scheduled for Tuesday, October 23 at 1:30 p.m. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on October 16, 2007. (lcckk2)
October 15, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 864 STATUS REPORT Supplemental by MICROSOFT CORPORATION. (Rule, Charles)
September 11, 2007 Opinion or Order Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly : Interim Compliance Status Conference held on 9/11/2007.Status Conference set for 11/6/2007 10:30 AM in Courtroom 28A before Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. (Court Reporter Lisa Hand.) (dot, )
September 11, 2007 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. An Interim Compliance Status Conference was held on September 11, 2007. As discussed during that Status Conference, on or before October 15, 2007, the California Group shall file its proposed request for extension of the provisions of the Final Judgments that are set to expire on November 12, 2007. Also by October 15, 2007, Microsoft shall file its interim report on compliance with the Final Judgments. In response to the California Group's filing, on or before October 19, 2007, the remaining parties shall file their proposed schedules and process. The Court hereby vacates the requirement for a filing of a Final Report on compliance on October 30, 2007. The previously scheduled status conference at 10:30 a.m. on November 6, 2007 will occur as planned.Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on September 11, 2007. (lcckk2)
September 4, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 863 ORDER granting 852 Google Inc.'s Motion for Leave to Participate as Amicus Curiae, to the extent that the contents of Googles amicus brief were discussed during the June 26, 2007 Full Compliance Status Conference in this matter. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on September 4, 2007. (lcckk2)
August 31, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 862 STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report on Microsoft's Compliance with the Final Judgments by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Hoag, Aaron)
August 30, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 861 STATUS REPORT Microsoft's Report Concerning the Final Judgments by MICROSOFT CORPORATION. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B)(Rule, Charles)
August 30, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 860 STATUS REPORT Review of the Final Judgments by the United States and New York Group by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Hoag, Aaron)
July 16, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 859 STATUS REPORT SUPPLEMENTAL by MICROSOFT CORPORATION. (Rule, Charles)
July 11, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 858 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on June 26, 2007 before Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. Court Reporter: Jacqueline M. Sullivan. The public may view the document in the Clerk's Office between the hours of 9:00 a.m. and 4:00 p.m, Monday through Friday. (td, )
July 2, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 857 REPLY to opposition to motion re 852 MOTION for Leave to File Brief as Amicus Curiae filed by GOOGLE INC.. (Gelfand, David)
June 28, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 856 NOTICE of Certifying Declaration by GOOGLE INC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit - Certifying Declaration of Leah Brannon)(Gelfand, David)
June 27, 2007 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting 853 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Leah Brannon, subject to ceftification that Ms. Brannon is familiar with the Local Rules of this Court. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on June 27, 2007. (SM)
June 26, 2007 Opinion or Order Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly : Status Conference held on 6/26/2007.Joint Status Report due by 8/31/2007, relating to the Status/Compliance Conference set for 9/11/2007 10:30 AM in Courtroom 28A before Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. Joint Status Report due by 10/30/2007, relating to the Status/Compliance Conference set for 11/6/2007 10:30 AM in Courtroom 28A before Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. (Court Reporter Jacqueline Sullivan.) (dot, )
June 26, 2007 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. A Full Compliance Status Conference was held in this matter at 10:30 a.m. on Tuesday, June 26, 2007 with counsel for all parties in attendance. During the Status Conference, the following dates were set: the next Status Conference in this matter shall be held at 10:30 a.m. on Tuesday, September 11, 2007 in Courtroom 28A of the Courthouse Annex. The Joint Status Report relating to the September 11, 2007 Status Conference shall be filed on or before August 31, 2007. The subsequent Status Conference in this matter shall be held at 10:30 a.m. on Tuesday, November 6, 2007 in Courtroom 28A of the Courthouse annex. The Joint Status Report relating to the November 6, 2007 Status Conference shall be filed on or before October 30, 2007. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on June 26, 2007. (lcckk2)
June 25, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 855 AFFIDAVIT re 854 Memorandum in Opposition / Amended Certificate of Service by MICROSOFT CORPORATION. (Rule, Charles)
June 25, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 854 Memorandum in opposition to re 852 MOTION for Leave to File and Paritcipate as Amicus Curiae filed by MICROSOFT CORPORATION. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Rule, Charles)
June 25, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 853 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Leah Brannon, :Firm- Cleary Gottlieb Steen & Hamilton LLP, :Address- 2000 Pennsylvania Ave. NW, Suite 9000, Washington, DC 20006. Phone No. - (202) 974-1690. Fax No. - (202) 974-1999 by GOOGLE INC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Leah Brannon)(nmw, )
June 25, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 852 MOTION for Leave to File Brief as Amicus Curiae by GOOGLE INC. (Attachments: # 1 Amicus Brief)(nmw, )
June 19, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 851 STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report on Microsoft's Compliance with the Final Judgments by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Hoag, Aaron)
May 15, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 850 STATUS REPORT SUPPLEMENTAL by MICROSOFT CORPORATION. (Rule, Charles)
May 11, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 849 NOTICE of Change of Address by Charles F Rule (Rule, Charles)
April 18, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 848 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on March 13, 2007 before Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. Court Reporter: Edward N. Hawkins. The public may view the document in the Clerk's Office between the hours of 9:00 a.m. and 4:00 p.m, Monday through Friday. (td, )
April 16, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 847 STATUS REPORT Supplemental on Compliance with the Final Judgment by MICROSOFT CORPORATION. (Rule, Charles)
March 13, 2007 Opinion or Order MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly : Status Conference held on 3/13/2007. Joint Status Report due by 6/19/2007.Status Conference set for 6/26/2007 10:30 AM in Courtroom 28A before Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. (Court Reporter Edward Hawkins.) (dot, )
March 13, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 846 MINUTE ENTRY ORDER (paperless). An Interim Compliance Hearing was held on March 13, 2007, during which a discussion was held on the record regarding issues raised by the latest Interim Joint Status Report. The next Full Compliance Hearing shall occur at 10:30 a.m. on June 26, 2007, and the parties shall submit a Joint Status Report on or before June 19, 2007. Signed by Judge Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on March 13, 2007. (lcckk2)
March 6, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 845 STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report on Microsoft's Compliance With The Final Judgments by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Hoag, Aaron)
February 15, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 844 STATUS REPORT Supplemental on Microsoft's Compliance with the Final Judgments by MICROSOFT CORPORATION. (Rule, Charles)
January 16, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 843 STATUS REPORT Supplemental on Microsoft's Compliance with the Final Judgments by MICROSOFT CORPORATION. (Rule, Charles)
December 8, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 842 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 12/5/06 before Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. Court Reporter: Scott L. Wallace. The public may view the document in the Clerk's Office between the hours of 9:00 a.m. and 4:00 p.m, Monday through Friday. (td, )
December 8, 2006 Opinion or Order MINUTE ENTRY ORDER (paperless): The next Interim Compliance Hearing in this case shall occur on March 13, 2007 at 10:30 a.m. in Courtroom 28A on the Sixth Floor of the Courthouse Annex. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on December 8, 2006. (lcckk2)
December 8, 2006 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 3/13/2007 10:30 AM in Courtroom 28A before Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. (dot, )
December 5, 2006 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly : Compliance Hearing held on 12/5/2006. Parties shall contact the Court regarding the next hearing date. (Court Reporter Scott Wallace.) (dot, )
November 28, 2006 Opinion or Order MINUTE ENTRY ORDER (paperless): Due to a scheduling conflict on the Court's calendar, and with the consent of all involved parties, the Full Compliance Hearing previously scheduled for December 1, 2006 has been rescheduled for Tuesday, December 5, 2006 at 10:30 a.m. in Courtroom 28A on the Sixth Floor of the Courthouse Annex. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on November 28, 2006. (lcckk2)
November 28, 2006 Opinion or Order Reset Hearings: Full Compliance Hearing reset for 12/5/2006 10:30 AM in Courtroom 28A before Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. (dot, )
November 21, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 841 STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report on Microsoft's Compliance with the Final Judgments by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Hoag, Aaron)
November 1, 2006 Opinion or Order MINUTE ENTRY ORDER (paperless). As discussed during the conference call on the record held on October 31, 2006, the Court is requesting that the parties make a presentation in connection with the Full Compliance Hearing scheduled for December 1, 2006. Specifically, the Court wishes the parties to present examples of the new templates and of the protocol documents as they relate to the RESET plan. In addition, the Court would appreciate a comparison of the protocol documents related to the RESET plan and the protocol documents that were previously determined not to be effective. The Court notes that it would prefer to conduct the entire Hearing in open court, to the extent that the presentation described can be made in open court without raising issues regarding trade secrets. Finally, the Court requests that, on or before November 17, 2006, the parties let the Court know how long they anticipate the presentation described would take, including the presentation of any evidence or testimony as well as demonstrative aids, so that the Court can ensure enough time is allotted to the Full Compliance Hearing on the Court's calendar. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on November 1, 2006. (lcckk2)
October 31, 2006 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly : Telephone Conference held on 10/31/2006. (Court Reporter Edward Hawkins.) (dot, )
October 31, 2006 Opinion or Order MINUTE ENTRY ORDER (paperless). A conference call was held on the record on October 31, 2006 regarding what will be presented as a demonstration at the next Court hearing. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on October 31, 2006. (lcckk2)
October 24, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 840 TRANSCRIPT of Compliance Hearing held on September 7, 2006 before Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. Court Reporter: Edward N. Hawkins. The public may view the document in the Clerk's Office between the hours of 9:00 a.m. and 4:00 p.m, Monday through Friday. (jf, )
October 16, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 839 STATUS REPORT Supplemental on Microsoft's Compliance with the Final Judgments and Report by Plaintiffs Regarding the Microsoft Communications Protocol Program Documentation by MICROSOFT CORPORATION. (Rule, Charles)
September 7, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 838 MODIFIED FINAL JUDGMENT (Originally Entered 11/12/2002). Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 9/7/06. (dot, )
September 7, 2006 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly : Compliance Hearing held on 9/7/2006. Parties to file report on or before 11/22/2006. Compliance Hearing set for 12/1/2006 11:15 AM in Courtroom 28A before Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. (Court Reporter Edward Hawkins.) (dot, )
September 7, 2006 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER (paperless): As discussed at the Interim Compliance Hearing held before the Court on September 7, 2006, the Court shall GRANT the parties' 835 Joint Motion to Modify the Final Judgment. Moreover, (1) Microsoft's next Supplemental Status Report shall be due on October 15, 2006, and with further supplemental reports due every month thereafter; (2) the parties' Joint Status Report shall be due on or before Wednesday, November 22, 2006; and (3) a Full Compliance Hearing shall be set before this Court for Friday, December 1, 2006 in Courtroom 28A on the Sixth Floor of the Courthouse Annex. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on September 7, 2006. (lcckk2)
September 7, 2006 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER (paperless): The Full Compliance Hearing on December 1, 2006 shall occur at 11:15 a.m. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on September 7, 2006. (lcckk2)
September 5, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 837 STATUS REPORT Supplemental on Microsoft's Compliance with the Final Judgments by MICROSOFT CORPORATION. (Rule, Charles)
August 30, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 836 STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report on Microsoft's Compliance with the Final Judgments by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Hoag, Aaron)
August 30, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 835 Joint MOTION to Alter Judgment Joint Motion to Modify Final Judgment and Supporting Memorandum of Points and Authorities by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2)(Hoag, Aaron)
July 20, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 834 ERRATA Amended Supplemental Status Report on Microsoft's Compliance with the Final Judgments by MICROSOFT CORPORATION. (Rule, Charles)
July 20, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 833 NOTICE of Correction Regarding Supplemental Status Report on Microsoft's Compliance with the Final Judgments by MICROSOFT CORPORATION re 832 Status Report (Rule, Charles)
July 17, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 832 STATUS REPORT Supplemental by MICROSOFT CORPORATION. (Rule, Charles)
June 15, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 831 ERRATA Corrected Supplemental Status Report on Microsoft's Compliance with the Final Judgments by MICROSOFT CORPORATION. (Rule, Charles)
June 15, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 830 STATUS REPORT Supplemental on Compliance with the Final Judgment by MICROSOFT CORPORATION. (Rule, Charles)
June 7, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 829 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 5/17/06 before Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. Court Reporter: Edward N. Hawkins. The public may view the document in the Clerk's Office between the hours of 9:00 a.m. and 4:00 p.m, Monday through Friday. (td, )
June 7, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 828 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 5/12/06 before Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. Court Reporter: Edward N. Hawkins. The public may view the document in the Clerk's Office between the hours of 9:00 a.m. and 4:00 p.m, Monday through Friday. (td, )
May 17, 2006 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly : Compliance Hearing held on 5/17/2006. Report due 8/30/2006.Compliance Hearing set for 9/7/2006 10:00 AM in Courtroom 28A before Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. (Court Reporter Edward Hawkins.) (dot, )
May 17, 2006 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER (paperless): As outlined at the status conference held on Wednesday, May 17, 2006, the next status conference before this Court shall take place on Thursday, September 7, 2006 in Courtroom 28A on the 6th Floor of the Courthouse Annex. The parties are to file a Joint Status Report with the Court on or before Wednesday, August 30, 2006 in order to inform the Court of any relevant developments. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on May 17, 2006. (lcckk2)
May 12, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 827 STATUS REPORT on Microsoft's Compliance with the Final Judgments by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Hesse, Renata)
April 18, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 826 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 2/14/06 before Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. Court Reporter: Edward N. Hawkins. The public may view the document in the Clerk's Office between the hours of 9:00 a.m. and 4:00 p.m, Monday through Friday. (td, )
April 17, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 825 STATUS REPORT Supplemental by MICROSOFT CORPORATION. (Rule, Charles)
March 16, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 824 STATUS REPORT Amended Supplemental Status Report On Microsoft's Compliance With The Final Judgments by MICROSOFT CORPORATION. (Rule, Charles)
March 15, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 823 STATUS REPORT on Compliance with Final Judgments by MICROSOFT CORPORATION. (Rule, Charles)
February 15, 2006 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER (paperless): As discussed in the status conference held before this Court on Tuesday, February, 14, 2006, the next status conference regarding Microsoft's compliance in the above-captioned action shall be set for Wednesday, May 17, 2006 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom #28 on the Sixth Floor of the Annex. The parties are to submit a Joint Status Report covering all relevant issues by Friday, May 12, 2006. As agreed, Microsoft shall continue to submit monthly reports in the interim. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on February 15, 2006. (lcckk2)
February 14, 2006 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly : Compliance hearing held on 2/14/2006. Joint Status Report due by 5/12/2006. Compliance Hearing set for 5/17/2006 10:00 AM in Courtroom 28A before Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. (Court Reporter Edward Hawkins.) (dot, )
February 8, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 822 STATUS REPORT on Microsoft's Compliance with the Final Judgments by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Hesse, Renata)
January 23, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 821 STATUS REPORT Plaintiffs' Response to Microsoft's Supplemental Status Report by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Hesse, Renata)
January 17, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 820 Supplemental STATUS REPORT by MICROSOFT CORPORATION. (nmw, )
December 15, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 819 TRANSCRIPT of Compliance Hearing held on November 30, 2005 before Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. Court Reporter: Edward N. Hawkins. The public may view the document in the Clerk's Office between the hours of 9:00 a.m. and 4:00 p.m, Monday through Friday. (jf, )
November 30, 2005 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER (paperless): As discussed in the status conference held before this Court on Wednesday, November 30, 2005, the next status conference regarding Microsoft's compliance in the above-captioned action shall be set for Tuesday, February 14, 2006 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom #28 on the Sixth Floor of the Annex. The parties are to submit a Joint Status Report covering all relevant issues by Wednesday, February 8, 2006. As agreed, Microsoft's first monthly update regarding the progress of Project Troika shall be due by Monday, January 16, 2006. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on November 30, 2005. (lcckk2)
November 30, 2005 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER (paperless): As discovered after the fact, Monday, January 16, 2006 -- the day the Court originally scheduled for Microsoft's first monthly update regarding the progress of Project Troika -- is the holiday for Martin Luther King, Jr. Day. According, Microsoft's first monthly update detailing Project Troika's progress shall instead be due by Tuesday, January 17, 2006. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on November 30, 2005. (lcckk2)
November 30, 2005 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly : Status Conference held on 11/30/2005. Joint Status Report due by 2/8/2006. Miscrosoft's monthly report due 1/17/2006. Status Conference set for 2/14/2006 10:00 AM in Courtroom 28A before Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. (Court Reporter Edward Hawkins.) (dot, )
November 18, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 818 STATUS REPORT on Microsoft's Compliance with the Final Judgments by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Hesse, Renata)
November 4, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 817 TRANSCRIPT of Compliance Hearing held on October 26, 2005 before Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. Court Reporter: Edward N. Hawkins. The public may view the document in the Clerk's Office between the hours of 9:00 a.m. and 4:00 p.m, Monday through Friday. (jf, )
October 26, 2005 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly : Compliance Conference held on 10/26/2005. Report due 11/18/2005 Compliance Hearing set for 11/30/2005 10:30 AM in Courtroom 11 before Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. (Court Reporter Edward Hawkins.) (dot, )
October 26, 2005 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER (paperless): As discussed in the status conference held before this Court on Wednesday, October 26, 2005, given the Court's concerns regarding the progress (or lack thereof) of the Troika project and the parties' planned November 8, 2005 meeting to resolve issues surrounding Troika, the next status conference in the above-captioned action shall be set for Wednesday, November 30, 2005 at 10:30 a.m. in Courtoom 11. The parties are to submit a Joint Status Report regarding Troika and other pertinent issues by Friday, November 18, 2005. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on October 26, 2005. (lcckk2)
October 19, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 816 STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Hesse, Renata)
June 13, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 815 TRANSCRIPT of Status Conference held on Monday, June 6, 2005 before Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. Court Reporter: Bryan A. Wayne. The public may view the document in the Clerk's Office between the hours of 9:00 a.m. and 4:00 p.m, Monday through Friday. (lc, )
June 6, 2005 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly : Compliance hearing held on 6/6/2006. Report due 10/19/2005. Compliance hearing set for 10/26/2005 10:30 AM in Courtroom 11 before Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. (Court Reporter Bryan Wayne.) (dot )
June 1, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 814 STATUS REPORT on Microsoft's Compliance with the Final Judgments by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Hesse, Renata)
May 23, 2005 Opinion or Order SCHEDULING ORDER (paperless): Due to the scheduling needs of the Court, and with the consent of the parties in the above-captioned action, the status conference previously scheduled for Friday, June 10, 2005, at 10:00 A.M. is RESCHEDULED for Monday, June 6, 2005, at 10:30 A.M. in Courtroom 10. Pursuant to this change, the interim status report, covering those areas of the Final Judgment that have raised concerns among the parties, shall be due by Wednesday, June 1, 2005, rather than Friday June 3, 2005. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on May 23, 2005. (lcckk2)
May 5, 2005 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER (paperless): It is hereby ORDERED that 812 Plaintiffs' Consent Motion for Re-Appointment of Dr. Harry J. Saal, Franklin Fite, Jr., and Edward P. Stritter as Members of the Technical Committee is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on May 5, 2005. (lcckk2)
May 4, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 813 MEMORANDUM by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Hesse, Renata)
May 4, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 812 Consent MOTION Re-appointment Technical Committee Members by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Hesse, Renata)
February 9, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 811 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on February 9, 2005 before Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. Court Reporter: Bryan A. Wayne. The public may view the document in the Clerk's Office between the hours of 9:00 a.m. and 4:00 p.m, Monday through Friday. (cp, )
February 9, 2005 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly : Compliance Hearing held on 2/9/2005. Compliance Hearing set for 6/10/2005 10:00 AM in Courtroom 11 before Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. (Court Reporter Bryan Wayne.) (dot, )
February 9, 2005 Opinion or Order MINUTE ENTRY (paperless): It is hereby ORDERED that an interim compliance status conference in this case will be held on Friday, June 10, 2005, in Courtroom 11 of the United States District Court for the District of Columbia. The parties shall submit interim status reports on June 3, 2005, covering those areas of the Final Judgment that have raised concerns among the parties. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on February 9, 2005. (lcckk2)
February 8, 2005 Opinion or Order NOTICE of Hearing:Compliance Hearing set for 2/9/2005 10:00 AM in Courtroom 11 before Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. (dot, )
January 30, 2005 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER (paperless): Due to the scheduling needs of the Court, and upon the consent of the parties in the above-captioned case, the status conference previously set for Tuesday, February 1, 2005, at 10:30 A.M. is hereby CONTINUED to Wednesday, February 9, 2005, at 10:00 A.M. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on January 30, 2005. (lcckk2)
January 25, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 810 STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report on Microsoft's Compliance with the Final Judgments by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Hesse, Renata)
November 11, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 809 MINUTE ORDER (paperless): The Court hereby GRANTS 808 Plaintiff's Corrected Motion to Reschedule Status Conference and Report and Memorandum of Points and Authorities. Plaintiff's previous, erroneous 807 Motion for Rescheduling is hereby DISMISSED as MOOT. The next Status Conference Report in the above-captioned action shall be due on January 25, 2005. The status conference, previously scheduled for January 21, 2005, is hereby CONTINUED to Tuesday, February 1, 2005, at 10:15 A.M. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on November 11, 2004. (lcckk2)
November 10, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 808 Consent MOTION for Hearing and Report Rescheduling (Corrected Date) by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hesse, Renata)
November 10, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 807 Consent MOTION for Hearing and Report Rescheduling by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hesse, Renata)
October 19, 2004 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly : Compliance Status Conference held on 10/19/2004. Status Report due 1/14/05Compliance Status Conference set for 1/21/2005 09:30 AM in Courtroom 11 before Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. (Court Reporter Cathryn Jones.) (dot)
October 19, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 805 MINUTE ENTRY (paperless): It is hereby ORDERED that a compliance status conference in this case will be held on Friday, January 21, 2005, at 9:30 am in Courtroom 11 of the United States District Court for the District of Columbia. The parties shall submit status reports on January 14, 2005, covering implementation of the Final Judgment. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on October 19, 2004. (lcckk2)
October 18, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 806 AMENDED FINAL JUDGMENT IMPLEMENTATION ORDER NO. 1 ("Amended I.O. No. 1" . Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 10/18/04. (dot)
October 8, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 804 STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report on Microsoft's Compliance with the Final Judgments by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B)(Hesse, Renata)
August 30, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 803 USCA JUDGMENT (certified copy) as to 772 Notice of Appeal filed by THE COMPUTER & COMMUNICATIONS INDUSTRY ASSOCIATION, SOFTWARE & INFORMATION INDUSTRY ASSOCIATION; It is hereby ordered and adjudged that the order denying intervention is reversed and the order approving the consent decree in public interest is hereby affirmed; USCA#03-5030 (jsc)
August 6, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 802 NOTICE OF TRANSCRIPT FILED for dates 7/19/07; Court Reporter: Edward N. Hawkins. (td, )
July 19, 2004 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly : Compliance Hearing held on 7/19/2004. Compliance Hearing set for 10/19/2004 10:00 AM in Courtroom 11 before Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. (Court Reporter Edward Hawkins.) (dot)
July 19, 2004 Opinion or Order MINUTE ENTRY: It is hereby ORDERED that an interim compliance status conference in this case will be held on Tuesday, October 19, 2004, at 10:00 am in Courtroom 11 of the United States District Court for the District of Columbia. The parties shall submit status reports on October 8, 2004, covering those areas of the Final Judgment that have raised concerns among the parties. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 7/19/2004. (lcckk2)
July 9, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 801 STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report on Microsoft's Compliance with the Final Judgments by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Hesse, Renata)
May 12, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 800 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on April 21, 2004 before Judge Kollar-Kotelly. Court Reporter: Edward N. Hawkins. (cp, )
April 21, 2004 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly : Compliance Hearing held on 4/21/2004. Status Report due by 7/9/2004. Compliance Hearing set for 7/19/2004 10:00 AM in Courtroom 11 before Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. (Court Reporter Edward Hawkins.) (dot)
April 21, 2004 Opinion or Order MINUTE ENTRY: It is hereby ORDERED that a compliance status conference in this case will be held on Monday, July 19, 2004, at 10:00 am in Courtroom 11 of the United States District Court for the District of Columbia. The parties shall submit status reports on July 9, 2004, covering those areas of the Final Judgment that have raised concerns among the parties and updating the Court as to the status of compliance with the Final Judgment in general. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 4/21/2004. (lcckk2)
April 14, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 799 STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report on Microsoft's Compliance with the Final Judgments by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Hesse, Renata)
April 2, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 798 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on January 23, 2004 before Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. Court Reporter: Edward N. Hawkins. (cp, )
March 10, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 797 NOTICE by MICROSOFT CORPORATION Notice of Change of Firm Name (by Fried, Frank, Harris, Shriver & Jacobson LLP) (Warden, John)
January 23, 2004 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly : Compliance Hearing held on 1/23/2004. Parties to submit joint status report by 4/14/04. Phone conference set for 2/24/04. Status Conference set for 4/21/2004 10:00 AM in Courtroom 11 before Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. (Court Reporter Edward Hawkins.) (dot)
January 23, 2004 Opinion or Order MINUTE ENTRY: It is hereby ORDERED that an interim compliance status conference in this case will be held on Wednesday, April 21, 2004, at 10:00 am in Courtroom 11 of the United States District Court for the District of Columbia. The parties shall submit interim status reports on April 14, 2004, covering those areas of the Final Judgment that have raised concerns among the parties. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on January 23, 2004. (lcckk2)
January 16, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 796 STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report on Microsoft's Compliance with the Final Judgments by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Hesse, Renata)
January 15, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 795 NOTICE by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA of Issuance of Microsoft Consent Decree Compliance Advisory (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Hesse, Renata)
November 26, 2003 Opinion or Order Filing 794 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on October 24, 2003 before Judge Kollar-Kotelly. Court Reporter: Edward N. Hawkins. (cp, )
October 27, 2003 Opinion or Order MINUTE ENTRY: It is hereby ORDERED that an interim compliance status conference in this case will be held on Friday, January 23, 2004, at 10:00 am in Courtroom 11 of the United States District Court for the District of Columbia. The parties shall submit interim status reports on January 16, 2004, covering those areas of the Final Judgment that have raised concerns among the parties. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on October 27, 2003. (lcckk2)
October 24, 2003 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly : Compliance Hearing held on 10/24/2003. Joint report due 1/16/04. Compliance hearing set for 1/23/04 at 10:00 a.m. (Court Reporter Edward Hawkins.) (dot)
October 17, 2003 Opinion or Order Filing 793 STATUS REPORT Interim Joint Status Report on Microsoft's Compliance with the Final Judgments by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment A)(Hesse, Renata)
August 19, 2003 Opinion or Order Filing 792 NOTICE OF TRANSCRIPT of status conference FILED for dates 7/24/03 before Judge Kollar-Kotelly. Court Reporter: Edward N. Hawkins (rje, )
August 1, 2003 Opinion or Order Filing 791 NOTICE by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA of Issuance of Microsoft Consent Decree Compliance Advisory (Attachments: # 1)(Hesse, Renata)
July 24, 2003 Opinion or Order MINUTE ENTRY: It is hereby ORDERED that an interim compliance status conference in this case will be held on Friday, October 24, 2003, in Courtroom 11 of the United States District Court for the District of Columbia. The parties shall submit interim status reports on October 17, 2003, covering those areas of the Final Judgment that have raised concerns among the parties. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on July 24, 2003. (lcckk2)
July 3, 2003 Opinion or Order Filing 790 STATUS REPORT (Joint Status Report on Microsoft's Compliance with the Final Judgments) by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment A# 2 Attachment B# 3 Attachment C# 4 Attachment D)(Hesse, Renata)
June 12, 2003 Opinion or Order Filing 789 NOTICE of transcript of telephone conference for the dates of 5/2/03 and 5/13/03 (aet, )
May 14, 2003 Opinion or Order Filing 788 ORDER detailing requirements for status reports.Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on May 14, 2003. (lcckk2)
April 23, 2003 Opinion or Order Filing 787 ORDER: Pursuant to a Joint Status Report on Coordinating Enforcement of the Final Judgments, and a meeting with counsel for the Plaintiffs Department of Justice, the "New York Group," the "California Group," and Defendant Microsoft, which was held on April 22, 2003 to discuss progress in implementation of the Final Judgments in 98cv1232 and 98cv1233, the Court sets the following schedule:1. Oral Progress Report on compliance with Section III (I), license provisions, of the Final Judgment shall be held via telephonic conference call, on the record, on May 2, 2003, at 11:00 a.m. Conference Call shall be initiated by the parties;2. Status Report shall be filed by no later than July 3, 2003. By separate order, the Court will set out the required areas of reporting.3. Status Conference shall be held on July 24, 2003, at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 11.SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on April 23, 2003. (lcckk2)
April 23, 2003 Opinion or Order Filing 786 FINAL JUDGMENT IMPLEMENTATION ORDER NO. 1.Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on April 23, 2003. (lcckk2)
April 21, 2003 Opinion or Order Filing 785 NOTICE by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA of Issuance of Microsoft Consent Decree Compliance Advisory (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Hesse, Renata)
April 17, 2003 Opinion or Order Filing 784 STATUS REPORT (Joint Status Report on Coordinating Enforcement of the Final Judgments) by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C)(Hesse, Renata)
March 18, 2003 Opinion or Order Filing 783 NOTICE by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA of Attorney Substitution and Change of Address (Attachments: # 1 A# 2 B# 3 C)(Hesse, Renata)
February 14, 2003 Opinion or Order Filing 782 MINUTE ENTRY: Having reviewed the qualifications of Plaintiff's proposed experts, and having not been informed of objections or conflicts, it is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion to Appoint Dr. Saal and Franklin Fite, Jr. as Members of the Technical Committee 747 is GRANTED; and it is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion to Appoint Edward Stritter as the Third Member of the Technical Committee 773 is GRANTED. SO ORDERED.Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on February 14, 2003.(lcckk2)
February 12, 2003 Opinion or Order Filing 781 AMENDED MEMORANDUM OPINION re: Litan Motion for Leave to Intervene for the Purposes of Appeal. This Amended Memorandum Opinion corrects the second-to-last sentence in the second paragraph on page 4 of the Court's February 7, 2003 Memorandum Opinion.Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 2/12/03, nunc pro tunc.(lcckk2)
February 7, 2003 Opinion or Order Filing 780 MEMORANDUM OPINION re: Consumers for Computing Choice's Motion for Leave to Intervene for Purposes of Appeal.Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 2/7/03. (lcckk2)
February 7, 2003 Opinion or Order Filing 779 ORDERED that Motion by Amicus Curiae Consumers for Computing Choice for Leave to Intervene for Purposes of Appeal [# 756] is DENIED. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 2/7/03.(lcckk2)
February 7, 2003 Opinion or Order Filing 778 MEMORANDUM AND OPINION re: Robert E. Litan's Motion for Leave to Intervene for Purposes of Appeal 760 .Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 2/7/03. (lcckk2)
February 7, 2003 Opinion or Order Filing 777 ORDERED that Robert E. Litan's Motion For Leave to Intervene for Purposes of Appeal [# 760] is DENIED. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 2/7/03.(lcckk2)
January 27, 2003 Opinion or Order Filing 774 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion for Appointment of Edward P. Stritter as the Third Member of the Technical Committee from United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Hesse, Renata)
January 27, 2003 Opinion or Order Filing 773 MOTION to Appoint Expert Edward P. Stritter as the Third Member of the Technical Committee by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Hesse, Renata)
January 23, 2003 Opinion or Order USCA Case Number 03-5030 for 772 Notice of Appeal filed by THE COMPUTER & COMMUNICATIONS INDUSTRY ASSOCIATION, SOFTWARE & INFORMATION INDUSTRY ASSOCIATION. (aet, )
January 23, 2003 Opinion or Order USCA Case Number 2-8012 for 761 Notice of Appeal filed by DAVID L. WHITEHEAD. (aet, )
January 22, 2003 Opinion or Order Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re 772 Notice of Appeal (aet, )
January 17, 2003 Opinion or Order Filing 775 REPLY to opposition to motion for leave to intervene re 756 filed by CONSUMERS FOR COMPUTING CHOICE AND OPEN PLATFORM WORKING GROUP. (aet, )
January 11, 2003 Opinion or Order Filing 771 ORDER denying Joint Motion by Amici Curiae CCIA and SIIA For Leave to Intervene for Purposes of Appeal [# 764] and denying as moot Joint Motion by Amici Curiae CCIA and SIIA For Enlargement of Time for Appeal [# 765].Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on January 11, 2003. (lcckk2)
January 11, 2003 Opinion or Order Filing 770 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on January 11, 2003. (lcckk2)
January 10, 2003 Opinion or Order Filing 769 Memorandum in opposition to motion re 765 of Amici Curiae CCIA and SIIA for Enlargement of Time for Appeal filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Hesse, Renata)
January 10, 2003 Opinion or Order Filing 768 Memorandum in opposition to motion re 760 of Robert E. Litan for Leave to Intervene for Purposes of Appeal filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Hesse, Renata)
January 10, 2003 Opinion or Order Filing 767 Memorandum in opposition to motion re 756 of Amicus Curiae Consumers for Computing Choice for Leave to Intervene for Purposes of Appeal filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Hesse, Renata)
January 10, 2003 Opinion or Order Filing 763 NOTICE by MICROSOFT CORPORATION Defendant Microsoft Corporation's Memorandum in Opposition to CCIA and SIIA's Joint Motion for Enlargement of Time for Appeal (Warden, John)
January 10, 2003 Opinion or Order Filing 762 Memorandum in opposition to motion re 756 Defendant Microsoft Corporation's Consolidated Memorandum in Opposition to the Motions of Consumers for Computing Choice and Robert E. Litan for Leave To Intervene for Purposes of Appeal filed by MICROSOFT CORPORATION. (Warden, John)
January 9, 2003 Opinion or Order Filing 776 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 12/11/02 before Judge Kollar-Kotelly. Court Reporter: Edward Hawkins. (aet, )
January 9, 2003 Opinion or Order Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re 761 Notice of Appeal (aet, )
January 8, 2003 Opinion or Order Filing 766 REPLY in support of motion re 764 to intervene for the purposes of appeal filed by SOFTWARE & INFORMATION INDUSTRY ASSOCIATION , THE COMPUTER & COMMUNICATIONS INDUSTRY ASSOCIATION . (aet, )
January 8, 2003 Opinion or Order Filing 765 JOINT MOTION for Extension of Time to Appeal by SOFTWARE & INFORMATION INDUSTRY ASSOCIATION , THE COMPUTER & COMMUNICATIONS INDUSTRY ASSOCIATION . (aet, )
January 6, 2003 Opinion or Order Filing 759 NOTICE by MICROSOFT CORPORATION Defendant Microsoft Corporation's Memorandum in Opposition to CCIA and SIIA's Joint Motion for Leave To Intervene for Purposes of Appeal (Warden, John)
January 6, 2003 Opinion or Order Filing 758 MEMORANDUM OF THE UNITED STATES IN OPPOSITION TO THE JOINT MOTION OF AMICI CURIAE CCIA AND SIIA FOR LEAVE TO INTERVENE FOR PURPOSES OF APPEAL. (Hesse, Renata)
January 3, 2003 Opinion or Order Filing 757 NOTICE by MICROSOFT CORPORATION Notice Of Registration And Firm Name Change (Warden, John)
January 2, 2003 Opinion or Order Filing 760 MOTION for leave to Intervene for purposes of appeal by ROBERT E. LITAN . (cdw, )
December 31, 2002 Opinion or Order Filing 756 MOTION for leave to intervene for purposes of appeal by CONSUMERS FOR COMPUTING CHOICE AND OPEN PLATFORM WORKING GROUP . (aet, )
December 31, 2002 Opinion or Order WRIT OF MANDAMUS pursuant to Motion for Reconsideration (Amicus Curiae Petition) for the recusal of the presiding judge by DAVID L. WHITEHEAD;Exhibits; (filed 2/8/02) (tth, )
December 31, 2002 Opinion or Order SUPPLEMENATAL ADDENDUM to Motion for Reconsideration for Recusal and Disqualification, pursuant to Rule 455 A, as amended; Exhibits; (filed 1/10/02) (tth, ) Modified on 12/31/2002 (tth, ).
December 31, 2002 Opinion or Order NOTICE of Appeal or Writ of Mandamus by DAVID L. WHITEHEAD; Exhibits; (filed 2/25/02) (tth, )
December 24, 2002 Opinion or Order Filing 754 MINUTE ENTRY: ORDERED that Plaintiff's unopposed Motion to Modify Briefing Schedule on the Joint Motion of CCIA and SIIA for Leave to Intervene for Purposes of Appeal 753 is GRANTED. Plaintiff and Microsoft will file their respective oppositions to the Joint Motion, if any, no later than 12:00 noon on January 6, 2003; Joint Movants' reply will be filed no later than January 8, 2003.Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on December 24, 2002.(lcckk2)
December 23, 2002 Opinion or Order Filing 753 MOTION to Modify the Briefing Schedule on the Joint Motion of CCIA and SIIA for Leave to Intervene for Purposes of Appeal (Unopposed) by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Hesse, Renata)
December 20, 2002 Opinion or Order Filing 764 MOTION to Intervene for the purposes of appeal by SOFTWARE & INFORMATION INDUSTRY ASSOCIATION , THE COMPUTER & COMMUNICATIONS INDUSTRY ASSOCIATION . (aet, )
December 19, 2002 Opinion or Order Filing 761 NOTICE OF APPEAL by DAVID L. WHITEHEAD . (FIAT by Judge Kessler) (aet, ) Modified on 1/9/2003 (aet, ).
December 19, 2002 Opinion or Order Filing 755 ORDER denying the Writ of Mandamus for the Recusal of the Presiding Judge. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 12/19/02. (tth, )
December 16, 2002 Opinion or Order Filing 752 MINUTE ENTRY: ORDERED that Plaintiff's Consent Motion for Extension of Time to File Nomination of the Third Technical Committee Member 751 is GRANTED. Plaintiff United States of America has until January 27, 2003 to file its nomination of the third technical committee member with the Court.Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on December 16, 2002.(lcckk2)
December 12, 2002 Opinion or Order Filing 751 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Nomination of the Third Technical Committee Member by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hesse, Renata)
December 9, 2002 Opinion or Order Filing 750 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael D. McNeely on behalf of SAN JOSE MERCURY NEWS, INC. (aet, )
November 21, 2002 Opinion or Order Filing 749 CORRECTED FILING.....MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion for Appointment of Technical Committee Members (CORRECTED). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C)(Hesse, Renata) Modified on 11/22/2002 (aet, ).
November 21, 2002 Opinion or Order Filing 748 ENTERED IN ERROR.....MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion for Appointment of Technical Committee Members. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C)(Hesse, Renata) Modified on 11/22/2002 (aet, ).
November 21, 2002 Opinion or Order Filing 747 MOTION to Appoint Expert Dr. Henry J. Saal and Franklin Fite, Jr. as Members of the Technical Committee by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Hesse, Renata)
November 12, 2002 Opinion or Order Filing 746 FINAL JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on November 12, 2002. (lcckk2)
November 12, 2002 Opinion or Order Filing 745 ORDERED that as the Court has accepted the Third Revised Proposed Final Judgment submitted on November 8, 2002, a separate judgment shall be issued this same day adopting it as the final judgment in this case.Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on November 12, 2002. (lcckk2)
November 8, 2002 Opinion or Order Filing 744 NOTICE THIRD REVISED PROPOSED FINAL JUDGMENT RED-LINED VERSION by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Hesse, Renata)
November 8, 2002 Opinion or Order Filing 743 NOTICE UNITED STATES' SUBMISSION OF THIRD REVISED PROPOSED FINAL JUDGMENT by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Hesse, Renata)
November 8, 2002 Opinion or Order Filing 742 STIPULATION by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: # 1 Third Revised Proposed Final Judgment)(Hesse, Renata)
November 1, 2002 Opinion or Order Filing 741 ORDER conditionally approving the SRPFJ as the final judgment in this case; directing that in order to obtain final approval of the SRPFJ, plaintiff and Microsoft shall submit to the Court a proposed amendment addressing the concerns described in the Court's Memorandum Opinion; directing that such proposed amendment be submitted to the Court no later than 11/8/02. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 11/1/02. (jeb, )
November 1, 2002 Opinion or Order Filing 740 MEMORANDUM AND OPINION. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 11/1/02. (jeb, )
August 28, 2002 Opinion or Order Filing 739 NOTICE Notice of Microsoft Corporation's Compliance with Milestones of the Second Revised Proposed Final Judgment Pursuant to Stipulation Entered February 7, 2002 by MICROSOFT CORPORATION (Warden, John)
August 5, 2002 Opinion or Order Filing 738 NOTICE of Issuance of Microsoft Consent Decree Compliance Advisory by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Attachments: # 1)(Hesse, Renata)
July 2, 2002 Opinion or Order Filing 737 NOTICE of Change of Address by Renata B. Hesse (Hesse, Renata)
July 2, 2002 Opinion or Order Filing 736 MEMORANDUM OPINION regarding Tunney Act compliance. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on July 1, 2002. (lcckk1)
May 9, 2002 Opinion or Order Filing 735 NOTICE United States' Certificate of Compliance with Tunney Act by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Hesse, Renata)
May 9, 2002 Opinion or Order Filing 734 MOTION for Entry of Final Judgment by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Hesse, Renata)
April 8, 2002 Opinion or Order (DUPLICATE ENTRY on ICMS) ORDER by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly: denying SEC's motion to preclude MICROSOFT from introducing defendant's Exhibit 1351 into evidence and for immediate return, denying as moot SVC's motions with regard to defendant's Exhibits 1352 and 1353.
March 26, 2002 Opinion or Order Filing 733 ORDER denying Rebecca Henderson's Motion to participate, denying initial Motion and Supplemental Motion to participate by Free Software Foundation, et al., denying Einer Elhague's Motion to Participate, and granting motion of Consumers for Computing Choice and Open Platform Working Group to participate by filing an amicus brief. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on March 25, 2002. (lcckk1)
March 20, 2002 Opinion or Order Filing 732 NOTICE Microsoft Corporation's Supplemental Memorandum Concerning Section 16(g) of the Tunney Act by MICROSOFT CORPORATION (Warden, John)
March 15, 2002 Opinion or Order Filing 731 TRANSCRIPT for dates 3/6/02 of Tunney Act hearing. (cdw, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 3/19/2002 (cdw, ).
March 12, 2002 Opinion or Order Filing 730 NOTICE of Filing of Corrected CD-ROMS Containing Public Comments Relating to the Proposed Final Judgment by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Hesse, Renata)
March 11, 2002 Opinion or Order AMICUS BRIEF by THE AMERICAN ANTITRUST INSTITUTE, INC.. (cdw, ) Modified on 3/18/2002 (cdw, ).
March 11, 2002 Opinion or Order AMICUS BRIEF in opposition to the second revised proposed final judgment by NOVELL, INC.. (cdw, ) Modified on 3/18/2002 (cdw, ).
March 11, 2002 Opinion or Order TRIAL BRIEF (AMENDED AMICUS) in opposition to the second revised proposed final judgment by NOVELL, INC.. (cdw, )
March 11, 2002 Opinion or Order REPLY memorandum of amici curiae by NETACTION AND COMPUTER PROFESSIONALS FOR SOCIAL RESPONSIBILITY. (cdw, )
March 11, 2002 Opinion or Order REPLY brief of amicus curiae by PROJECT TO PROMOTE COMPETITION & INNOVATION IN THE DIGITAL AGE. (cdw, )
March 11, 2002 Opinion or Order REPLY brief by SOFTWARE & INFORMATION INDUSTRY ASSOCIATION. (cdw, )
March 11, 2002 Opinion or Order REPLY brief of amicus curiae by THE COMPUTER & COMMUNICATIONS INDUSTRY ASSOCIATION. (cdw, )
March 11, 2002 Opinion or Order MOTION for limited participation in Tunney Act proceedings by filing a brief amicus curiae by CONSUMERS FOR COMPUTING CHOICE AND OPEN PLATFORM WORKING GROUP; PENDING EXHIBIT (AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF) (cdw, ) Modified on 3/14/2002 (cdw, ).
March 11, 2002 Opinion or Order REPLY memorandum in opposition to the proposed final judgment by SBC COMMUNICATIONS INC.. (cdw, )
March 7, 2002 Opinion or Order MOTION for Reconsideration of intervention of right by pro se LONNIE G. SCHMIDT. (cdw, )
March 7, 2002 Opinion or Order MOTION to testify at the 3/4/02 States trial date for the Microsoft action pertaing to the States actions ("LET THIS BE FILED" J. Kollar-Kotelly) by pro se ROY A. DAY. (cdw, )
March 7, 2002 Opinion or Order Filing 729 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying Lonnie G. Schmidt's Motion to Reconsider. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on March 7, 2002. (lcckk1)
March 5, 2002 Opinion or Order Filing 728 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance for Bradford L. Smith by MICROSOFT CORPORATION (Warden, John)
March 4, 2002 Opinion or Order NOTICE of filing identification of counsel to participate at the Tunney Act Hearing by PROCOMP (cdw, )
March 4, 2002 Opinion or Order Supplemental MOTION for limited participation in Tunney Act proceedings and request for amicus status by JOHN CARROLL, CONSUMERS FOR COMPUTING CHOICE AND OPEN PLATFORM WORKING GROUP, FREE SOFTWARE FOUNDATION, DAN KEGEL, ANDREAS POUR, MASON THOMAS. (cdw, )
March 4, 2002 Opinion or Order NOTICE of filing joint identification of counsel by SOFTWARE & INFORMATION INDUSTRY ASSOCIATION, THE COMPUTER & COMMUNICATIONS INDUSTRY ASSOCIATION (cdw, )
March 4, 2002 Opinion or Order MOTION for oral argument by pro se EINER ELHAUGE. (cdw, )
March 4, 2002 Opinion or Order Filing 727 RESPONSE to -- Defendant Microsoft Corporation's Memorandum in Opposition to Red Hat Inc. and the Free Software Foundation's Motion for Tunney Act Participation filed by MICROSOFT CORPORATION. (Warden, John)
March 4, 2002 Opinion or Order Filing 726 RESPONSE to -- Defendant Microsoft Corporation's Memorandum in Opposition to Novell Inc.'s Motion for Leave To File an Amicus Brief filed by MICROSOFT CORPORATION. (Warden, John)
March 4, 2002 Opinion or Order Filing 725 RESPONSE to -- Defendant Microsoft Corporation's Memorandum in Opposition to Dr. Rebecca A. Henderson's Motion to Participate as Amicus Curiae in the Tunney Act Proceedings filed by MICROSOFT CORPORATION. (Warden, John)
March 4, 2002 Opinion or Order Filing 724 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying NetAction and CPSR's joint motion to participate in the March 6, 2002, hearing. NetAction and CPSR, acting as amici curiae, may submit a joint reply memorandum not exceeding 25 pages. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on March 4, 2002. (lcckk1)
March 4, 2002 Opinion or Order Filing 723 RESPONSE to -- Defendant Microsoft Corporation's Memorandum in Opposition to Einer Elhauge's Motion for Leave to Participate in the Tunney Act Proceedings filed by MICROSOFT CORPORATION. (Warden, John)
March 4, 2002 Opinion or Order Filing 722 ORDER granting Novell's motion for limited participation as amicus curiae. Novell shall be permitted to file a reply memorandum not exceeding 25 pages. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on March 4, 2002. (lcckk1)
March 4, 2002 Opinion or Order Filing 721 RESPONSE to the Motions for Tunney Act Participation of Dr. Rebecca Henderson, Novell, Inc., Professor Einer Elhauge, the Association for Competitive Technology, and NetAction and Computer Professionals for Social Responsibility filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Hesse, Renata)
March 4, 2002 Opinion or Order Filing 720 MEMORANDUM OPINION and ORDER granting in part ACT's motion to participate as amicus curiae and denying ACT's motion to intervene. ACT may present not more than 10 minutes of argument at the March 6, 2002, hearing. No other participation shall be permitted. [] Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on March 4, 2002. (lcckk1)
March 1, 2002 Opinion or Order NOTICE of Appearance by Donald L. Flexner on behalf of SBC COMMUNICATIONS INC. (cdw, )
March 1, 2002 Opinion or Order Emergency MOTION for expedited decision on its conditional motion to participate in the Court's upcoming Tunney Act Hearing by THE ASSOCIATION FOR COMPETITIVE TECHNOLOGY. (cdw, )
March 1, 2002 Opinion or Order MOTION to participate as amicus curiae in Tunney Act proceedings by NOVELL, INC.. (cdw, )
March 1, 2002 Opinion or Order MOTION for limited participation in Tunney Act proceedings by FREE SOFTWARE FOUNDATION, MASON THOMAS, JOHN CARROLL, DAN KEGEL, ANDREAS POUR, CONSUMERS FOR COMPUTING CHOICE AND OPEN PLATFORM WORKING GROUP. (cdw, )
March 1, 2002 Opinion or Order MOTION to participate as amicus curiae in Tunney Act proceedings by pro se REBECCA A. HENDERSON. (cdw, )
March 1, 2002 Opinion or Order Filing 719 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion re [] DEFENDANT MICROSOFT CORPORATIONS MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION TO NETACTION AND THE COMPUTER PROFESSIONALS FOR SOCIAL RESPONSIBILITY'S MOTION FOR TUNNEY ACT PARTICIPATION filed by MICROSOFT CORPORATION. (Warden, John)
March 1, 2002 Opinion or Order Filing 718 REPLY in Support of Motion re [] Defendant Microsoft Corporation's Memorandum in Support of the Association for Competitive Technology's Conditional Motion to Participate in the Tunney Acr Hearing filed by MICROSOFT CORPORATION. (Warden, John)
March 1, 2002 Opinion or Order Filing 717 REPLY in Support of Motion re 702 Defendant Microsoft Corporation's Supplemental Memorandum in Support of the Second Revised Proposed Final Judgment filed by MICROSOFT CORPORATION. (Warden, John) Modified on 6/12/2002 (jeb, ).
March 1, 2002 Opinion or Order Minute Entry: Status Conference held on 2/8/2002 before Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly : further status hearing set for 2/15/02 at 10:00 a.m.(Court Reporter Edward Hawkins.) (dot, )
February 28, 2002 Opinion or Order Filing 716 NOTICE of Filing of Memorandum of Law of the Settling States in Support of the Proposed Final Judgment by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum of Law of the Settling States in Support of the Proposed Final Judgment)(Hesse, Renata)
February 28, 2002 Opinion or Order Filing 715 (ENTERED IN ERROR) MEMORANDUM of Law from the Settling States in support of the Proposed Final Judgment. (jeb, ) Modified on 2/28/2002 (jeb, ).
February 28, 2002 Opinion or Order Filing 714 ORDER denying California Plaintiffs Motion to Intervene, [] denying Motion for Leave to File as Amicus Curiae. [] Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on February 28, 2002. (lcckk1)
February 28, 2002 Opinion or Order Filing 713 MEMORANDUM OPINION re: California Plaintiffs Motion to Intervene. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on February 28, 2002. (lcckk1)
February 28, 2002 Opinion or Order Filing 712 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying Relpromax Motion for Extension of Time to File, [] denying Motion to Participate as Amicus Curiae, [] denying Motion for Extension of Time to File, [] denying Motion for Leave to File as Amicus Curiae. [] Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on February 28, 2002. (lcckk1)
February 28, 2002 Opinion or Order Filing 711 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting Litigating States Motion for Limited Participation. [] Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on February 28, 2002. (lcckk1)
February 28, 2002 Opinion or Order Filing 710 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying AAI Motion for Limited Admission, [] but permitting limited participation as amicus curiae. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on February 28, 2002. (lcckk1)
February 28, 2002 Opinion or Order Filing 709 Tunney Act Public Comments regarding the revised proposed final judgment have been filed with the Clerk's Office, submitted on CD-ROM by the plaintiff, United States of America. (cdw, )
February 28, 2002 Opinion or Order Filing 708 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part CCIA Motion for Leave to Appear as Amicus Curiae, [] denying Motion to Intervene. [] Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on February 28, 2002. (lcckk1) Modified on 2/28/2002 (jeb, ).
February 28, 2002 Opinion or Order Filing 707 MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER granting in part SIIA Motion for Limited Participation. [] Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on February 28, 2002. (lcckk1) Modified on 2/28/2002 (jeb, ).
February 28, 2002 Opinion or Order Filing 706 ORDER denying ProComp Motion to Intervene [], but permitting limited participation as amicus curiae. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on February 28, 2002. (lcckk1)
February 28, 2002 Opinion or Order Filing 705 MEMORANDUM OPINION re: ProComp Motion to Intervene []. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on February 28, 2002. (lcckk1)
February 28, 2002 Opinion or Order Filing 704 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting in part SBC Motion for Leave to Appear as Amicus Curiae [], denying Motion to Intervene []. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on February 28, 2002. (lcckk1)
February 27, 2002 Opinion or Order MOTION (CONDITIONAL) for Limited Admission to participate in the Court's upcoming Tunney Act hearing by THE ASSOCIATION FOR COMPETITIVE TECHNOLOGY;exhibits (2) (cdw, ) Modified on 2/28/2002 (cdw, ).
February 27, 2002 Opinion or Order MOTION for Limited Admission to participate in the 3/6/02 Tunney Act hearing by NETACTION AND COMPUTER PROFESSIONALS FOR SOCIAL RESPONSIBILITY. (cdw, )
February 27, 2002 Opinion or Order Filing 703 RESPONSE to Defendant Microsoft Corporation's Memorandum in Support of the Second Revised Proposed Final Judgment filed by MICROSOFT CORPORATION. (Warden, John)
February 27, 2002 Opinion or Order Filing 702 Amended MOTION for Settlement United States' Memorandum Regarding Modifications Contained in Second Revised Proposed Final Judgment by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Second Revised Proposed Final Judgment Red-Lined Version)(Hesse, Renata)
February 27, 2002 Opinion or Order Filing 701 STIPULATION by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: # 1 Second Revised Proposed Final Judgment)(Hesse, Renata)
February 27, 2002 Opinion or Order Filing 700 Proposed MOTION for Settlement Memorandum of the United States in Support of Entry of the Proposed Final Judgment by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix A - Comparison of Court of Appeals' Findings on Liability to Provisions of the Revised Proposed Final Judgment# 2 Appendix B - U.S. v. Microsoft Newspaper Notice# 3 Appendix C - Declaration of David S. Sibley)(Hesse, Renata)
February 27, 2002 Opinion or Order Filing 699 RESPONSE of the United States to Public Comments on the Revised Proposed Final Judgment by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix A - Comments Cited in the Response)(Hesse, Renata)
February 26, 2002 Opinion or Order REPLY in Support of Motion re [] for limited participation in light of the deposition of Mr. Richard Fade filed by STATE OF WEST VIRGINIA, DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, STATE OF CALIFORNIA, STATE OF CONNECTICUT, STATE OF FLORIDA, STATE OF IOWA, STATE OF KANSAS, STATE OF MASSACHUSETTS, STATE OF MINNESOTA, STATE OF UTAH. (cdw, )
February 25, 2002 Opinion or Order REPLY in Support of Motion re [] to intervene for limited porposes or in the alternative to appear as amicus curiae filed by SBC COMMUNICATIONS INC.. (cdw, )
February 22, 2002 Opinion or Order Filing 698 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion re [] of The American Antitrust Institute, Inc, for Tunney Act participation as amicus curiae or otherwise filed by MICROSOFT CORPORATION. (cdw, )
February 22, 2002 Opinion or Order Filing 697 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion re [] of the Software & Information Industry Association for Tunney Act participation filed by MICROSOFT CORPORATION. (cdw, )
February 22, 2002 Opinion or Order MOTION for Tunney Act participation pursuant to 15 U.S.C. 16(f) by SOFTWARE & INFORMATION INDUSTRY ASSOCIATION. (cdw, )
February 22, 2002 Opinion or Order MOTION to Intervene for limited participation in light of the deposition of Mr. Richard Fade by DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, STATE OF UTAH, STATE OF MINNESOTA, STATE OF MASSACHUSETTS, STATE OF KANSAS, STATE OF IOWA, STATE OF FLORIDA, STATE OF CONNECTICUT, STATE OF CALIFORNIA. (cdw, )
February 22, 2002 Opinion or Order Filing 696 RESPONSE to Motion of The American Antitrust Institute, Inc. for Limited Participation as Amicus Curiae or Otherwise Pursuant to 15 U.S.C. Section 16(f)(3) and Memorandum in Support Thereof by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Hesse, Renata)
February 22, 2002 Opinion or Order Filing 695 RESPONSE to the Software & Information Industry Association's Motion for Tunney Act Participation Pursuant to 15 U.S.C. Section 16(f) by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Hesse, Renata)
February 22, 2002 Opinion or Order Filing 694 RESPONSE to the Litigating States' Motion for Limited Participation in Light of the Deposition of Mr. Richard Fade by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Hesse, Renata)
February 22, 2002 Opinion or Order Filing 693 ORDER denying motion for leave of court to adopt an alternative procedure for comment publication 678 , 690 . Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on February 22, 2002. (lcckk1) Modified on 6/12/2002 (jeb, ).
February 22, 2002 Opinion or Order Filing 692 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion re [] Defendant Microsoft Corporation's Memorandum in Opposition to the Computer and Communications Industry Association's Motion for Leave to Intervene in the Tunney Act Proceedings or Participate as Amicus Curiae filed by MICROSOFT CORPORATION. (Warden, John)
February 21, 2002 Opinion or Order Filing 691 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion re [] Memorandum of Plaintiff United States in Response to Motion of the Computer & Communications Industry Association for Leave to Intervene, or in the Alternative to Appear as Amicus Curiae, in Order to Participate in the March 6, 2002, Tunney Act Hearing and in All Future Proceedings to Evaluate Whether the Revised Proposed Final Judgment is in the Public Interest filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Hesse, Renata)
February 21, 2002 Opinion or Order Filing 690 Supplemental MOTION for Leave of Court to Adopt an Alternative Procedure for Comment Publication by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Hesse, Renata)
February 21, 2002 Opinion or Order Filing 689 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion re [] Memorandum of Plaintiff United States in Response to ProComp's Motion for Limited Intervention or Tunney Act Participation filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Hesse, Renata)
February 21, 2002 Opinion or Order Filing 688 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion re [] Defendant Microsoft Corporation's Memorandum in Opposition to ProComp's Motion for Limited Intervention or Tunney Act Participation filed by MICROSOFT CORPORATION. (Warden, John)
February 19, 2002 Opinion or Order MOTION for Limited Participation as amicus curiae or otherwise pursuant to 15 U.S.C. 16(f)(3) by THE AMERICAN ANTITRUST INSTITUTE, INC; exhibits (1) (cdw, ) Modified on 2/28/2002 (cdw, ).
February 19, 2002 Opinion or Order Filing 687 TRANSCRIPT for dates 2/15/02 of telephone status conference. (cdw, )
February 19, 2002 Opinion or Order Filing 686 TRANSCRIPT for dates 2/8/02 of status conference. (cdw, )
February 19, 2002 Opinion or Order MOTION for leave to intervene, or in the alternative to appear as amicus curiae, in order to participate in the 3/6/02 Tunney Act hearing and in all future proceedings to evaluate whether the revised proposed final judgment is in the public interest by THE COMPUTER & COMMUNICATIONS INDUSTRY ASSOCIATION. (cdw, ) Modified on 2/21/2002 (cdw, ).
February 19, 2002 Opinion or Order REPLY to USA and Microsoft's responses to the motion to intervene filed by CALIFORNIA PLAINTIFFS. (cdw, ) Modified on 2/21/2002 (cdw, ).
February 19, 2002 Opinion or Order Filing 685 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion re [] Memorandum of Plaintiff United States in Response to the Motion of the Computer & Communications Industry Association for Leave to Intervene, or in the Alternative to Participate as Amicus Curiae filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Hesse, Renata)
February 19, 2002 Opinion or Order Filing 684 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion re [] Memorandum of Plaintiff United States in Response to the Motion of SBC Communications Inc. to Intervene or, In the Alternative, to Appear as Amicus Curiae filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Hesse, Renata)
February 19, 2002 Opinion or Order Filing 683 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion re [] Defendant Microsoft Corporation's Memorandum in Opposition to SBC Communications Inc.'s Motion To Intervene for Limited Purposes, or in the Alternative, for Leave To File a Brief Amicus Curiae filed by MICROSOFT CORPORATION. (Warden, John)
February 15, 2002 Opinion or Order ERRATA to reply to Microsoft's opposition to the motion for limited participation as an amicus curiae and for extensiom of time; and USA's opposition to Relpromax's two motions for amicus participation and for extension of time by RELPROMAX ANTITRUST INC.. (cdw, )
February 15, 2002 Opinion or Order Filing 682 ORDER scheduling Tunney Act hearing for March 6, 2002, at 9 a.m. in Courtroom 9.Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on February 15, 2002. (lcckk1)
February 13, 2002 Opinion or Order Filing 681 ORDER requiring that the parties file memoranda regarding the proposed final judgment not later than February 27, 2002. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on February 13, 2002. (lcckk1)
February 12, 2002 Opinion or Order Filing 680 AFFIDAVIT Declaration of Renata B. Hesse by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Hesse, Renata)
February 12, 2002 Opinion or Order Filing 679 AFFIDAVIT Declaration of Jacqueline S. Kelley by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Hesse, Renata)
February 12, 2002 Opinion or Order Filing 678 MOTION Leave of Court to Adopt an Alternative Procedure for Comment Publication by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Hesse, Renata)
February 11, 2002 Opinion or Order REPLY to Opposition to Motion (1) for limited participation as an amicus curiae and for extention of time; (2) two motions for amicus participation and for extension of time filed by RELPROMAX ANTITRUST INC.; declarations (1), exhibits; ORAL HEARING REQUESTED (cdw, ) Modified on 2/13/2002 (cdw, ).
February 11, 2002 Opinion or Order Filing 677 Memorandum in Opposition to the California Plaintiffs' Motion for Intervention, or in the Alternative, for Leave to File a Brief Amicus Curiae in the Tunney Act Settlement Proceedings Currently Pending in this Court filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Hesse, Renata) Modified on 2/13/2002 (cdw, ).
February 11, 2002 Opinion or Order Filing 676 Memorandum in Opposition to the California Plaintiffs' Motion for Intervention, or in the Alternative, for Leave To File a Brief Amicus Curiae filed by MICROSOFT CORPORATION. (Warden, John) Modified on 2/13/2002 (cdw, ).
February 8, 2002 Opinion or Order MOTION for Leave to intervene, or in the alternative to participate as amicus curiae for the limited purpose of responding to certain procedural proposals in the joint status report, MOTION to Intervene by THE COMPUTER & COMMUNICATIONS INDUSTRY ASSOCIATION; PENDING EXHIBIT (RESPONSE TO PROCEDURAL PROPOSALS IN THE JOINT STATUS REPORT) (cdw, ) Modified on 2/11/2002 (cdw, ).
February 7, 2002 Opinion or Order NOTICE of withdrawal of motion to request clarification and reconsideration of order denying filing of amicus brief by pro se CARL LUNDGREN (cdw, )
February 7, 2002 Opinion or Order MOTION for limited intervention or Tunney Act participation; exhibits (1); PENDING EXHIBITS (COMPLAINT IN INTERVENTION, RULE 26.1 CERTIFICATE) by PROCOMP. (cdw, ) Modified on 2/11/2002 (cdw, ). (cdw, ).
February 7, 2002 Opinion or Order Filing 675 STATUS REPORT (Joint Status Report) by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Hesse, Renata)
February 5, 2002 Opinion or Order MOTION of SBC COMMUNICATIONS INC. to intervene for limited purposed or, in the alternative to appear as amicus curiae; exhibits (1); PENDING EXHIBIT (COMPLAINT IN INTERVENTION) (cdw, ) Modified on 2/8/2002 (cdw, ).
February 5, 2002 Opinion or Order DOCUMENT NUMBERS were deleted from the docket sheet and replaced by a "O". These document numbers have been removed because the documents were not scanned into the system and when the user clicked on the hyperlinks they could not see documents. These numbers represented the following documents:SUPPLEMENTAL ADDENDUM to motion for reconsideration by pro se David L. Whitehead filed on 1/10/02; MOTION to intervene filed by USA Today, The Washington Post, Los Angeles Times, Dow Jones & Company, Inc., Cable News Network, LP,LLP, the Associated Press filed on 1/22/02; MOTION for joinder in the Assciated Press; Cable News Network, et al. motion to intervene, complaint for intervention and their opposition to defendant's motion to vacate orders requiring public depositions filed by San Jose Mercury on 1/23/02. (jeb, ) Modified on 6/11/2002 (jeb, ).
February 4, 2002 Opinion or Order Filing 674 AFFIDAVIT Declaration of Renata B. Hesse by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Hesse, Renata)
February 4, 2002 Opinion or Order Filing 673 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion re [], [] Defendant Microsoft Corporation's Memorandum in Opposition to the Motion of Relpromax Antitrust Inc. for Limited Participation as an Amicus Curiae and for an Extension of Time filed by MICROSOFT CORPORATION. (Warden, John)
February 4, 2002 Opinion or Order Filing 672 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion re [], [] Opposition of Plaintiff United States to Two Motions of Relpromax Antitrust Inc. for Amicus Participation and for an Extension of Time filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B)(Hesse, Renata)
February 1, 2002 Opinion or Order Filing 671 ORDER deconsolidating Civil Action No. 98-1232 and Civil Action No. 98-1233. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on February 1, 2002. (lcckk1)
February 1, 2002 Opinion or Order Filing 670 ORDER granting Motion for Leave to Appear 665 , granting Motion for Leave to Appear 668 , granting Motion for Leave to Appear 669 . Signed by Judge Collen Kollar-Kotelly on February 1, 2002. (lcckk1) Modified on 6/11/2002 (jeb, ).
February 1, 2002 Opinion or Order Filing 669 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Kate Usdrowski by MICROSOFT CORPORATION. (Warden, John)
February 1, 2002 Opinion or Order Filing 668 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for James H. Carter, Jr. by MICROSOFT CORPORATION. (Warden, John)
January 31, 2002 Opinion or Order Filing 667 TRANSCRIPT for dates 1/25/02 of teleconference. Gordon A. Slodysko, Court Reporter. (cdw, )
January 30, 2002 Opinion or Order Filing 666 ORDER requiring the parties to file a Joint Status Report not later than 10 a.m. on February 7, 2002, and to appear for a Status Conference at 10 a.m. on February 8, 2002. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on January 30, 2002.
January 29, 2002 Opinion or Order Filing 665 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for D. Stuart Meiklejohn by MICROSOFT CORPORATION. (Warden, John)
January 29, 2002 Opinion or Order Filing 664 ORDER granting Motion for Leave to Appear 659 , granting Motion for Leave to Appear 660 , and granting Motion for Leave to Appear 661 . Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on January 29, 2002. Modified on 6/11/2002 (jeb, ).
January 28, 2002 Opinion or Order MOTION for limited participation as an amicus curiae; and for extension of time by RELPROMAX ANTITRUST INC.. (cdw, ) Modified on 1/31/2002 (cdw, ).
January 28, 2002 Opinion or Order ERRATA and supplement to memorandum of points and authorities in support of motion for limited participation as an amicus curiae and for extension of time by RELPROMAX ANTITRUST INC.. (cdw, )
January 28, 2002 Opinion or Order MOTION to Intervene or in the alternative, for Leave to File a brief amicus curiae in the Tunney Act settlement proceedings currently pending in this Court by CALIFORNIA PLAINTIFFS; exhibits (4); PENDING EXHIBIT (COMPLAINT IN INTERVENTION) (cdw, ) Modified on 1/30/2002 (cdw, ).
January 28, 2002 Opinion or Order Filing 663 ORDER denying press motion to intervene in Civil Action No. 98-1232. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on January 28, 2002.
January 28, 2002 Opinion or Order Filing 662 Memorandum Opinion concerning press motion to intervene. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on January 28, 2002.
January 25, 2002 Opinion or Order Filing 661 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Robert A. Rosenfeld by MICROSOFT CORPORATION. (Warden, John)
January 25, 2002 Opinion or Order Filing 660 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Jessica S. Pers by MICROSOFT CORPORATION. (Warden, John)
January 25, 2002 Opinion or Order Filing 659 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Bruce R. Braun by MICROSOFT CORPORATION. (Warden, John)
January 24, 2002 Opinion or Order MOTION of Relpormax Antitrust Inc for limited participation as an amicus curiae; and for an extension of time to file comments on revised proposed final judgment in 98CV1232(cdw, ) Modified on 1/29/2002 (cdw, ).
January 23, 2002 Opinion or Order MOTION for Joinder in the Associated Press; Cable News Network, LP, LLP; Dow Jones & Company, Inc; Los Angeles Times; The Washington Post; and USA Today's motion to intervene, complaint for intervention, and their opposition to defendant's motion to vacate orders requiring public depositions; exhibits (3) by SAN JOSE MERCURY NEWS, INC.. (cdw, )
January 22, 2002 Opinion or Order MOTION to Intervene with PENDING EXHIBITS (COMPLAINT IN INTERVENTION, CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT, OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO VACATE) by USA TODAY, THE WASHINGTON POST, LOS ANGELES TIMES, DOW JONES & COMPANY, INC., CABLE NEWS NETWORK, LP, LLP, THE ASSOCIATED PRESS. (cdw, )
January 13, 2002 Opinion or Order Filing 772 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to 771 Order dated 1/11/03, by SOFTWARE & INFORMATION INDUSTRY ASSOCIATION, THE COMPUTER & COMMUNICATIONS INDUSTRY ASSOCIATION. Filing fee $ 105, receipt number 109232. (aet, )
January 10, 2002 Opinion or Order Supplemental addendum to motion for reconsideration by pro se DAVID L. WHITEHEAD (cdw, ) Modified on 1/14/2002 (cdw, ).
December 31, 2001 Opinion or Order Filing 658 REPLY to Opposition to Motion re 657 filed by MICROSOFT CORPORATION. (Warden, John) Modified on 6/11/2002 (jeb, ).
December 21, 2001 Opinion or Order Filing 657 MOTION Amend Scheduling Order Defendant Microsoft Corporation's Motion To Amend the Scheduling Order by MICROSOFT CORPORATION. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibits to Defendant Microsoft Corporation's Motion To Amend the Scheduling Order)(Warden, John)
December 13, 2001 Opinion or Order Filing 656 RESPONSE to 9/28/01 Scheduling Order - Defendant Microsoft Corporation's Remedial Proposal (refiled) filed by MICROSOFT CORPORATION. (Warden, John)
December 12, 2001 Opinion or Order Filing 655 ENTERED IN ERROR-------------------------------------------MOTION Defendant Microsoft Corporation's Remedial Proposal by MICROSOFT CORPORATION. (Warden, John) Modified on 12/13/2001 (cdw, ).
December 10, 2001 Opinion or Order Filing 654 TRANSCRIPT for dates 11/6/01 status conference. (cdw, )
December 10, 2001 Opinion or Order Filing 653 TRANSCRIPT for dates 11/2/01 status conference. (cdw, )
December 10, 2001 Opinion or Order Filing 652 STATUS REPORT Defendant Microsoft Corporation's Description of Written or Oral Communications Concerning the Revised Proposed Final Judgment and Certification of Compliance under 15 U.S.C. s 16(g) by MICROSOFT CORPORATION. (Warden, John)
November 28, 2001 Opinion or Order Filing 651 NOTICE of Federal Register Filing by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Hesse, Renata)
November 15, 2001 Opinion or Order Filing 650 MOTION for Settlement Competitive Impact Statement by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Hesse, Renata)
November 15, 2001 Opinion or Order Filing 649 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE. (Smith, Bradley)
November 8, 2001 Opinion or Order Filing 648 ORDER setting schedules for Tracks I and II. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on November 8, 2001.
November 6, 2001 Opinion or Order Filing 647 STIPULATION by MICROSOFT CORPORATION, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix Revised Proposed Final Judgment)(Warden, John)
November 6, 2001 Opinion or Order Filing 646 STATUS REPORT Defendant Microsoft Corporation's Submission Regarding Further Proceedings in Civil Action No. 98-1233 by MICROSOFT CORPORATION. (Warden, John)
November 2, 2001 Opinion or Order Filing 645 ORDER requiring the parties to appear for a status conference on November 6, 2001, at 9 a.m., vacating discovery and litigation schedule previously entered in Civ. A. No. 98-1232, and staying discovery in Civ. A. No. 98-1233 until November 6, 2001. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on November 2, 2001.
November 2, 2001 Opinion or Order Filing 644 STIPULATION and Proposed Final Judgment by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Hesse, Renata)
October 31, 2001 Opinion or Order Filing 643 TRANSCRIPT for dates 9/28/01 of scheduling conference. (cdw, )
October 31, 2001 Opinion or Order Filing 642 TRANSCRIPT for dates 10/2/01 of telephone status conference. (cdw, )
October 29, 2001 Opinion or Order MOTION for clarification and, MOTION for Reconsideration of order denying filing of amicus brief by pro se CARL LUNDGREN. (jeb, )
October 12, 2001 Opinion or Order Filing 641 ORDER appointing Eric D. Green of Boston University School of Law to serve as facilitator/mediator. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on October 12, 2001.
October 10, 2001 Opinion or Order Filing 640 ORDER denying motion by David L. Whitehead to reconsider the denial of his motion to file as amicus curiae. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on October 9, 2001.
October 10, 2001 Opinion or Order Filing 639 ORDER denying Motion by Lonnie G. Schmidt to Intervene. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on October 8, 2001.
October 9, 2001 Opinion or Order Filing 638 (ENTERED IN ERROR) ORDER denying motion by David L. Whitehead to reconsider the denial of his motion to file as amicus curiae. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on October 9, 2001. Modified on 10/11/2001 (jeb, ).
October 3, 2001 Opinion or Order ORDER that Calvin R. Braunstein's letter to the Court is stricken. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 10/3/01. (dot, )
October 3, 2001 Opinion or Order Letter with attachments to the Court from Calvin R. Braunstein. (dot, )
October 2, 2001 Opinion or Order MOTION for Reconsideration by pro se DAVID L. WHITEHEAD. (jeb, )
October 2, 2001 Opinion or Order Filing 637 ORDER vacating November 5, 2001, status conference, rescheduling status conference for November 2, 2001, at 9 a.m. in Courtroom 11, and setting date for commencement of the evidentiary hearing regarding the appropriate relief in this case for March 11, 2002, at 9 a.m. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on October 2, 2001.
October 1, 2001 Opinion or Order MOTION to Intervene by LONNIE G. SCHMIDT. (jeb, )
October 1, 2001 Opinion or Order Filing 636 ORDER denying Motion by George E. McDermott to Intervene and denying Motion by George E. McDermott "to correct the record." Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on October 1, 2001.
September 28, 2001 Opinion or Order Filing 635 SCHEDULING ORDER setting forth discovery guidelines and schedule. Status Conference set for November 5, 2001, at 9 a.m. before Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly in Courtroom 11. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on September 28, 2001.
September 28, 2001 Opinion or Order Filing 634 ORDER requiring the parties to engage in intensive settlement discussions commencing on September 27, 2001, and concluding on November 2, 2001. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on September 27, 2001.
September 27, 2001 Opinion or Order MOTION to Intervene and, MOTION to correct the record by GEORGE E. MCDERMOTT. (jeb, )
September 27, 2001 Opinion or Order Filing 633 ORDER denying Motion of David L. Whitehead for Leave to File Amicus Brief. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on September 27, 2001.
September 27, 2001 Opinion or Order Filing 632 ORDER granting Motion for Leave for Dan K. Webb to Appear as an Attorney for Microsoft. 630 Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on September 27, 2001. Modified on 6/11/2002 (jeb, ).
September 26, 2001 Opinion or Order Filing 631 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by MICROSOFT CORPORATION. (Warden, John)
September 24, 2001 Opinion or Order MOTION for Leave to File an amicus brief by pro se DAVID L. WHITEHEAD. (adc, )
September 24, 2001 Opinion or Order Filing 630 ORDER denying Carl Lundgren's Motion for Leave to File as amicus curiae. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on September 21, 2001.
September 24, 2001 Opinion or Order Filing 629 ORDER denying Motion to Intervene.Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on September 21, 2001.
September 20, 2001 Opinion or Order Filing 628 STATUS REPORT (Joint Status Report) by MICROSOFT CORPORATION, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Warden, John)
September 17, 2001 Opinion or Order Filing 627 ORDERED that the date for filing the Joint Status Report shall be extended from 12 noon on September 18, 2001, to 10 a.m. on September 20, 2001. Further ORDERED that the Status Conference scheduled for September 21, 2001, is vacated and rescheduled for September 28, 2001, at 9:30 a.m. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 9-17-01.
September 13, 2001 Opinion or Order Filing 626 ORDER granting Motion for Extension of Time to File Joint Status Report 625 . Joint Status Report orignally due September 14, 2001, shall be filed not later than 12 noon on September 18, 2001. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 9-13-01.(lcckk1) Modified on 6/11/2002 (jeb, ).
September 12, 2001 Opinion or Order Filing 625 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Status Report by MICROSOFT CORPORATION, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Smith, Bradley)
September 6, 2001 Opinion or Order Filing 624 ORDER establishing procedures for electronic filing.Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kottelly on September 6, 2001. (jeb, )
September 5, 2001 Opinion or Order ALL DOCKET ENTRIES PRIOR TO 9/5/01 ARE LOCATED ON THE ICMS SYSTEM with the exception of the two orders docketed herein on 8/28/01 and 8/29/01. (jeb, ) Modified on 9/5/2001 (jeb, ).
September 4, 2001 Opinion or Order Filing 623 NOTICE of Appearance by Jacqueline S. Kelley, Philip Beck, Renata B. Hesse and Mary Jean Moltenbrey on behalf of UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (jeb, ) Modified on 9/6/2001 (jeb, ). Modified on 9/10/2001 (jeb, ).
August 31, 2001 Opinion or Order MOTION for Leave to File an amicus brief by pro se CARL LUNDGREN. (adc, )
August 31, 2001 Opinion or Order MOTION to Intervene and present additional evidence at the September 21, 2001 status report conference by pro se ROY A. DAY. (adc, )
August 29, 2001 Opinion or Order Filing 622 ORDER by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly: denying as moot plaintiff's motion for an expedited status conference. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on August 29, 2001. (jeb, )
August 28, 2001 Opinion or Order Filing 621 ORDER directing the parties to confer and file a Joint Status Report with the Court (in the style of LCvR 16.3 to the extent appropriate). That such Joint Status Report shall: identify with specificity the issues on remand that remain for the Court's resolution; resolution of such issues (ie., the potential for testimony, motions, etc.); identify with specificity the nature of any additional evidentiary hearings, and propose an appropriate schedule for the described matters. The parties shall submit their Joint Status Report due by 9/14/2001. A courtesy copy of such Joint Status Report shall be delivered to chambers not later than 5 p.m. on the same date. Status Conference set for 9/21/2001 09:30 AM before Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly in Courtroom 11.. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on August 28, 2001. (jeb, )
August 27, 2001 Opinion or Order Filing 620 DOCKET ENTRIES from the ICMS Docketing System. (jeb, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 6/11/2002 (jeb, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA et al v. MICROSOFT CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Mary Jean Moltenbrey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICROSOFT CORPORATION
Represented By: John L. Warden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: ROY A. DAY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: CARL LUNDGREN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: DAVID L. WHITEHEAD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: GEORGE E. MCDERMOTT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: LONNIE G. SCHMIDT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: USA TODAY
Represented By: Jay Ward Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: THE WASHINGTON POST
Represented By: Jay Ward Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: LOS ANGELES TIMES
Represented By: Jay Ward Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: DOW JONES & COMPANY, INC.
Represented By: Jay Ward Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: CABLE NEWS NETWORK, LP, LLP
Represented By: Jay Ward Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: ASSOCIATED PRESS
Represented By: Jay Ward Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: SAN JOSE MERCURY NEWS, INC.
Represented By: Aileen Meyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: RELPROMAX ANTITRUST INC.
Represented By: Peter Peckarsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: CALIFORNIA PLAINTIFFS
Represented By: Steven F. Benz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: SBC COMMUNICATIONS INC.
Represented By: Donald L. Flexner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: PROCOMP
Represented By: Kenneth W. Starr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: THE COMPUTER & COMMUNICATIONS INDUSTRY ASSOCIATION
Represented By: Jason M. Mahler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: SOFTWARE & INFORMATION INDUSTRY ASSOCIATION
Represented By: Glenn B. Manishin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA
Represented By: Brendan V. Sullivan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: STATE OF UTAH
Represented By: Brendan V. Sullivan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: STATE OF MINNESOTA
Represented By: Brendan V. Sullivan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: STATE OF MASSACHUSETTS
Represented By: Brendan V. Sullivan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: STATE OF KANSAS
Represented By: Brendan V. Sullivan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: STATE OF IOWA
Represented By: Brendan V. Sullivan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: STATE OF FLORIDA
Represented By: Brendan V. Sullivan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: STATE OF CONNECTICUT
Represented By: Brendan V. Sullivan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: STATE OF CALIFORNIA
Represented By: Brendan V. Sullivan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: THE AMERICAN ANTITRUST INSTITUTE, INC.
Represented By: Michael Lenett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: STATE OF WEST VIRGINIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: NETACTION AND COMPUTER PROFESSIONALS FOR SOCIAL RESPONSIBILITY
Represented By: Jeffrey Blumenfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: THE ASSOCIATION FOR COMPETITIVE TECHNOLOGY
Represented By: Gene C. Schaerr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: NOVELL, INC.
Represented By: Judith L. Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: REBECCA A. HENDERSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: FREE SOFTWARE FOUNDATION
Represented By: James S. Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: MASON THOMAS
Represented By: James S. Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: JOHN CARROLL
Represented By: James S. Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: DAN KEGEL
Represented By: James S. Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: ANDREAS POUR
Represented By: James S. Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: CONSUMERS FOR COMPUTING CHOICE AND OPEN PLATFORM WORKING GROUP
Represented By: James S. Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: EINER ELHAUGE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: GOOGLE INC.
Represented By: David Irving Gelfand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: PROJECT TO PROMOTE COMPETITION & INNOVATION IN THE DIGITAL AGE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: ROBERT E. LITAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?