KIFAFI v. HILTON HOTEL RETIRE, et al
Plaintiff: JAMAL J. KIFAFI
Defendant: HILTON HOTEL RETIREMENT PLAN, HILTON HOTELS CORPORATION, JAMES M. ANDERSON, MATTHEW J. HART, BARRON HILTON, DIETER HUCKESTEIN and SAM D. YOUNG, JR.
Movant: EDNA OGBONNA, FANNY CANAR and MARC TOUSSAINT
Case Number: 1:1998cv01517
Filed: June 17, 1998
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Office: Washington, DC Office
County: 11001
Presiding Judge: Colleen Kollar-Kotelly
Nature of Suit: Employee Retirement Income Security Act of 1974
Cause of Action: 28:1001
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 434 MEMORANDUM OPINION re: 433 Order. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 12/7/2015. (lcckk2)
June 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 414 MEMORANDUM AND OPINION. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 6/4/2015.(lcckk3)
February 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 400 MEMORANDUM AND OPINION. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 2/4/2015.(lcckk3)
November 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 376 MEMORANDUM AND OPINION. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 11/18/2013.(lcckk3)
August 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 331 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 8/15/12. (lcckk2)
December 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 293 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 12/2/11. (lcckk2)
November 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 281 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 11/23/11. (lcckk2)
November 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 277 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 11/21/11. (lcckk2)
August 31, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 257 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on August 31, 2011. (lcckk1)
September 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 233 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on September 7, 2010. (lcckk1)
May 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 202 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on May 15, 2009. (lcckk1)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: KIFAFI v. HILTON HOTEL RETIRE, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMAL J. KIFAFI
Represented By: Stephen Robert Bruce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HILTON HOTEL RETIREMENT PLAN
Represented By: Amiad Kushner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HILTON HOTELS CORPORATION
Represented By: Amiad Kushner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JAMES M. ANDERSON
Represented By: Amiad Kushner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MATTHEW J. HART
Represented By: Amiad Kushner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BARRON HILTON
Represented By: Amiad Kushner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DIETER HUCKESTEIN
Represented By: Amiad Kushner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SAM D. YOUNG, JR.
Represented By: Amiad Kushner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: EDNA OGBONNA
Represented By: Stephen Robert Bruce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: FANNY CANAR
Represented By: Stephen Robert Bruce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: MARC TOUSSAINT
Represented By: Stephen Robert Bruce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?