ARIAS et al v. DYNCORP et al
Plaintiff: VENANCIO AGUASANTA ARIAS, ROSA TANGUILA ANDI, ESTER INEZ ANDI, SANTIAGO DOMINGO TANGUILA ANDI, LAURA SARITAMA, VIDAL CAMACHO, DEICY LALANGUI, JOSE CASTILLO, BETHY SAN MARTIN, JOFRE JIJON ALVARADO, ENMA PENA and ALL PLAINTIFFS
Defendant: DYNCORP, DYNCORP AEROSPACE TECHNOLOGY, DYNCORP TECHNICAL SERVICES, LLC and DYNCORP INTERNATIONAL, LLC
Amicus: FRIENDS OF THE EARTH US, EARTHRIGHTS INTERNATIONAL and AMAZON ALLIANCE
Movant: EAGLE AVIATION SERVICES & TECHNOLOGY, INC.
Case Number: 1:2001cv01908
Filed: September 11, 2001
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Office: Washington, DC Office
Presiding Judge: Richard W. Roberts
Presiding Judge: Deborah A. Robinson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1346 Tort Claim
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 437 MEMORANDUM OPINION: Redacted Version of 431 The Court's September 23, 2016 Memorandum Opinion. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on November 2, 2016. (lcesh1)
April 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 329 REDACTED MEMORANDUM AND OPINION. Signed by Judge Richard W. Roberts on 03/28/2012. (Sealed Version #324 filed originally on 03/28/2012) (jf, ) .
December 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 241 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by Magistrate Judge Deborah A. Robinson on 12/10/10: ORDERED that Defendants' Motion for Sanctions Against the Arias/Quinteros Plaintiffs for Violations of Discovery Orders (Document No. 176) be DENIED. (EW)
September 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 218 MEMORANDUM OPINION treating the defendants' motion as one to dismiss under Rule 12(b)(1) and dismissing the provincial plaintiffs' claims. Signed by Judge Richard W. Roberts on 9/15/10. (lcrwr2)
January 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 173 MEMORANDUM OPINION granting in part the parties' joint motion 136 to dismiss and granting the defendants' motion 150 to dismiss as revised. Signed by Judge Richard W. Roberts on 1/12/2010. (lcrwr2)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ARIAS et al v. DYNCORP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VENANCIO AGUASANTA ARIAS
Represented By: Terry Collingsworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROSA TANGUILA ANDI
Represented By: Terry Collingsworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ESTER INEZ ANDI
Represented By: Terry Collingsworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SANTIAGO DOMINGO TANGUILA ANDI
Represented By: Terry Collingsworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LAURA SARITAMA
Represented By: Terry Collingsworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VIDAL CAMACHO
Represented By: Terry Collingsworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DEICY LALANGUI
Represented By: Terry Collingsworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOSE CASTILLO
Represented By: Terry Collingsworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BETHY SAN MARTIN
Represented By: Terry Collingsworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOFRE JIJON ALVARADO
Represented By: Terry Collingsworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ENMA PENA
Represented By: Terry Collingsworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALL PLAINTIFFS
Represented By: Terry Collingsworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DYNCORP
Represented By: Joe Gregory Hollingsworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DYNCORP AEROSPACE TECHNOLOGY
Represented By: Joe Gregory Hollingsworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DYNCORP TECHNICAL SERVICES, LLC
Represented By: Joe Gregory Hollingsworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DYNCORP INTERNATIONAL, LLC
Represented By: Joe Gregory Hollingsworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: FRIENDS OF THE EARTH US
Represented By: Richard J. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: EARTHRIGHTS INTERNATIONAL
Represented By: Richard J. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: AMAZON ALLIANCE
Represented By: Richard J. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: EAGLE AVIATION SERVICES & TECHNOLOGY, INC.
Represented By: Mark E. Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?