PETERSON, et al v. ISLAMIC REPUBLIC, et al
Plaintiff: DEBORAH D. PETERSON, ALICE GORDON, JOHN R. BLOCKER, LUDDIE BELMER, NATHALIE C. JENKINS, JAMES J. LANGON, SR., RICHARD HASKELL, EARLINE MILLER, PATRICIA LEE HOLBERTON, JULIA HAIRSTON, ALL PLAINTIFFS, LISA HUDSON, MARY ANN TUREK, MARILOU C. FLUEGEL, JUDY A. GORCHINSKI, MARY M. MASON, DEBRA HORNER, BILLIE JEAN BOLINGER, AVENELL CALLAHAN, THOMAS FLUEGEL, BETTY LEWIS, JOSEPH BOCCIA, SR., EDNA BOHANNON, MARY L. BUCKNER, THOMASINE BAYNARD, ALICE W. BLOCKER, MARY A. COBBLE, HENRY HUKILL, JR., ROBBIE CEASAR, JULIANA RUDKOWSKI, PATRICIA A. WRIGHT, PATRICIA WRIGHT, ILA WALLACE, LEROY GHUMM, CLARE CAMPUS, CHARLES S. COOK, CYNTHIA D. HILDRETH, LEE HOLBERTON, VALERIE GIBLIN, RUBY A. FULCHER, JAMES J. LANGON, CHARLES F. COOK, WILLIAM LAISE, ANNETTE LIVINGSTON, JOSEPH BOCCIA, JAMES N. CONLEY, JOHN J. JACKOWSKI, SR., SHIRLEY MARTIN, JESS GARCIA, BETTY COPELAND, ELAINE M. JAMES, CYNTHIA D. LAKE, LORRAINE MARY COULMAN, PATRICIA CALLOWAY, MARLYS LEMNAH, JOYCE HOUSTON, HAROLD L. COSNER, THOMAS C. BATES, SR., MICHAEL ROBERT DUNNIGAN, OLLIE JONES, HUDSON, B. CHRISTINE DEVLIN, ELIZABETH IACOVINO, DEBBIE HORACE, DORIS P. HESTER, HEIDI LEGAULT, JEFFREY HASKELL, CATHERINE BONK, LEONA MAE VARGAS, JAMES ABBOTT, BARBARA ESTES, BARBARA GALLAGHER, ROBERT B. ALLMAN, CHERYL A. COSSABOOM and FREAS KREISCHER, JR.
Defendant: ISLAMIC REPUBLIC OF IRAN and IRANIAN MINISTRY OF INFORMATION AND SECURITY
Garnishee: WORLD BANK, BANK OF JAPAN, STATE BANK OF INDIA, CATERPILLAR, INC., HSBC, BANK OF TOKYO-MITSUBISHI UFJ, INTERNATIONAL TELECOMMUNICATIONS SATELLITE ORGANIZATION, EXPORT-IMPORT BANK OF INDIA, BANK OF TOKYO, OCCIDENTAL INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION, INTELSAT, S.A., DEUTSCHE BANK, INTERNATIONAL FINANCE CORPORATION, ASIAN DEVELOPMENT BANK, HSBC Bank USA, N.A., EXPORT-IMPORT BANK OF KOREA, SIEMENS CORPORATION, JAPAN BANK FOR INTERNATIONAL COOPERATION, MITSUBISHI INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION, INTERNATIONAL MONETARY FUND, OCCIDENTAL PETROLEUM CORPORATION and ABU DHABI INTERNATIONAL BANK
Interested Party: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY, OFFICE OF FOREIGN ASSETS CONTROL, JAY GLENN, PERLES LAW FIRM, P.C., CLEARSTREAM BANKING, S.A. and STEVEN R. PERLES
Claimant: COOK COLLECTION ATTORNEYS, PLC and DAVID J. COOK, ESQ.
Special Master: KAREN KRUGER, ANNIE PENNOK KAPLAN, ALAN LEE BALARAN and Loraine Ray
Case Number: 1:2001cv02094
Filed: October 3, 2001
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Office: Washington, DC Office
Presiding Judge: Royce C Lamberth
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question: Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 589 ORDER granting #588 Motion for to Revive Plaintiffs' September 7, 2007 Judgment. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 6/4/2019. (lcrcl1)
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 588 MOTION for Order by ALL PLAINTIFFS (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3)(Perles, Steven)
February 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 587 MEMORANDUM OPINION granting #585 Motion for Bill of Costs. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 2/21/2019. (lcrcl1)
February 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 586 ORDER granting #585 Motion for Bill of Costs. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 2/21/2019. (lcrcl1)
August 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 585 MOTION for Bill of Costs by ALL PLAINTIFFS (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit EXH 1, #3 Exhibit EXH 2, #4 Exhibit EXH 3, #5 Exhibit EXH 4, #6 Exhibit EXH 5, #7 Exhibit EXH 5A, #8 Exhibit EXH 6, #9 Exhibit EXH 6A, #10 Exhibit EXH 7, #11 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Fay, Caragh)
June 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 584 MEMORANDUM and ORDER granting Motion #577 and denying as Moot Motion #575 for Order of Sequestration. SEE FULL DOCUMENT FOR DETAILS. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 6/22/18. (lsj)
June 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 583 NOTICE of Supplemental Authority and Thomas Fortune Fay's Suggestion of Mootness by ALL PLAINTIFFS re #579 Reply to opposition to Motion, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Vail, John)
June 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 582 SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM to re #575 MOTION for Order of Sequestration filed by COOK COLLECTION ATTORNEYS, PLC and DAVID J. COOK, ESQ.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Jerry R. Hauser, #2 Exhibit Exhibits 19 - 20)(Hauser, Jerry)
May 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 581 REPLY re #577 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and to Stay Proceedings filed by ALL PLAINTIFFS. (Vail, John)
April 27, 2018 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF ERROR re #579 Reply to opposition to Motion; emailed to emiller@millerhauser.com, cc'd 62 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Two-part docket entry, 2. DO NOT REFILE. Pleading required two events.; (ztth) Modified on 4/27/2018 to replace "reliefs" with "events".(ztth)
April 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 580 RESPONSE re #577 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and to Stay Proceedings filed by COOK COLLECTION ATTORNEYS, PLC and DAVID J. COOK, ESQ. (See Docket Entry #579 to view document). (tth)
April 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 579 REPLY to opposition to motion re #575 MOTION for Order of Sequestration filed by COOK COLLECTION ATTORNEYS, PLC and DAVID J. COOK, ESQ.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Eric Miller, #2 Exhibit Exhibits 11 - 18)(Miller, Eric)
April 20, 2018 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF ERROR re #577 Motion to Compel; emailed to john@johnvaillaw.com, cc'd 62 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Two-part docket entry, 2. Please remember to use two reliefs for two-part document. (ztth, )
April 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 577 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and to Stay Proceedings by ALL PLAINTIFFS (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit Exh. 1, #3 Exhibit Exh. 2, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Vail, John). Added MOTION to Stay on 4/20/2018 (tth).
April 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 576 Memorandum in opposition to re #575 MOTION for Order of Sequestration filed by STEVEN R. PERLES, PERLES LAW FIRM, P.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Perles, Steven)
April 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 575 MOTION for Order of Sequestration by COOK COLLECTION ATTORNEYS, PLC and DAVID J. COOK, ESQ. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Declaration Declaration of David Cook, #3 Exhibit Exhibits 1 and 2, #4 Declaration Declaration of Eric Miller, #5 Exhibit Exhibits 1 to 10, #6 Text of Proposed Order)(Miller, Eric)
March 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 578 MANDATE of USCA as to #570 Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit Court, filed by COOK COLLECTION ATTORNEYS, PLC and DAVID J. COOK, ESQ., #572 Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit Court filed by JAY GLENN ; USCA Case Number 17-7012 Consolidated with 17-7013. (Attachments: #1 judgment filed February 16, 2018)(zrdj)
November 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 574 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance as Counsel by ANNIE PENNOK KAPLAN (Kaplan, Annie)
January 30, 2017 Opinion or Order USCA Case Number 17-7013 for #572 Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit Court filed by JAY GLENN. (zrdj)
January 27, 2017 Opinion or Order USCA Case Number 17-7012 for #570 Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit Court filed by COOK COLLECTION ATTORNEYS, PLC and DAVID J. COOK, ESQ.. . (zrdj) Modified on 1/31/2017 (zrdj).
January 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 573 Transmission of the Notice of Appeal, Order Appealed, and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals. The Court of Appeals fee was paid this date re #572 Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit Court. (znmw)
January 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 572 NOTICE OF APPEAL TO DC CIRCUIT COURT by JAY GLENN. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number 0090-4796483. Fee Status: Fee Paid. Parties have been notified. (Amini, Bijan)
January 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 571 Transmission of the Notice of Appeal, Order Appealed, and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals. The Court of Appeals fee was paid this date re #570 Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit Court. (znmw)
January 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 570 NOTICE OF APPEAL TO DC CIRCUIT COURT as to #565 Memorandum & Opinion, #564 Order on Motion to Quash,, Order on Motion to Compel by COOK COLLECTION ATTORNEYS, PLC and DAVID J. COOK, ESQ.. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number 0090-4794690. Fee Status: Fee Paid. Parties have been notified. (Miller, Eric)
December 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 569 ORDER granting #562 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 12/28/2016. (lcrcl1, )
December 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 568 ORDER granting #556 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 12/28/2016. (lcrcl1, )
December 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 567 ORDER denying #534 Motion Payment of Special Masters. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 12/15/16. (lcrcl1, )
December 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 566 MEMORANDUM AND OPINION. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 12/15/16. (lcrcl1, )
December 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 565 MEMORANDUM AND OPINION. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 12/6/2016. (lcrcl1, )
December 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 564 ORDER granting #539 Motion to Quash; granting #542 Motion to Quash; denying #544 Motion to Compel. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 12/6/2016. (lcrcl1, )
November 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 563 RESPONSE re #561 NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY filed by COOK COLLECTION ATTORNEYS, PLC and DAVID J. COOK, ESQ.. (Miller, Eric)
November 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 562 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Wayne F. Cyron, :Firm- Cyron & Miller, LLP, :Address- wcyron@cyronmiller.com. Phone No. - 7032990600. Fax No. - 7032990603 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-4731974. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by COOK COLLECTION ATTORNEYS, PLC and DAVID J. COOK, ESQ. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Cyron, Wayne)
November 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 561 NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY by ALL PLAINTIFFS (Vail, John)
October 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 560 ORDER finding as moot #548 Motion for Order; granting #549 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 10/28/2016. (hs)
October 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 559 ORDER; for Motion for Qualified Protective Order, Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 10/28/2016. (hs)
September 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 558 REPLY to opposition to motion re #534 MOTION Payment To Masters filed by ALL PLAINTIFFS. (Perles, Steven)
September 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 557 RESPONSE re #534 MOTION Payment To Masters filed by Karen Kruger, Loraine Ray. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rillotta, Joseph)
September 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 556 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Rachel M. Share, :Firm- Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP, :Address- One Logan Square, Suite 2000, Philadelphia, PA 19103-6996. Phone No. - (215) 988-2767. Fax No. - (215) 988-2700 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-4682659. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by Karen Kruger, Loraine Ray (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Rillotta, Joseph)
September 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 555 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph A. Rillotta on behalf of Karen Kruger, Loraine Ray (Rillotta, Joseph)
September 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 554 NOTICE by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA re #552 Order, #549 MOTION for Order (Buckingham, Stephen)
August 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 553 NOTICE by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA re #552 Order, #549 MOTION for Order (Buckingham, Stephen)
July 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 552 ORDER soliciting the views of the United States. (lcrcl1, )
July 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 551 REPLY to opposition to motion re #542 Emergency MOTION to Quash Atty Glenn's Atty's Charging Lien filed by ALL PLAINTIFFS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration Murphrey Knox)(Norman, Jane)
June 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 550 REPLY to opposition to motion re #544 Counter MOTION to Compel Arbitration and for an Interim Order Staying Distribution of 10% of the QSF Trust Funds from the Attorneys' Share Only filed by COOK COLLECTION ATTORNEYS, PLC and DAVID J. COOK, ESQ.. (Miller, Eric)
June 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 549 MOTION for Order by ALL PLAINTIFFS (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Fay, Thomas)
June 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 548 MOTION for Order by ALL PLAINTIFFS (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Fay, Thomas)
June 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 547 RESPONSE re #544 Counter MOTION to Compel Arbitration and for an Interim Order Staying Distribution of 10% of the QSF Trust Funds from the Attorneys' Share Only, #542 Emergency MOTION to Quash Atty Glenn's Atty's Charging Lien filed by ALL PLAINTIFFS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Vail, John)
June 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 546 DECLARATION re #542 Emergency MOTION to Quash Atty Glenn's Atty's Charging Lien / Declaration of Jay Glenn in Opposition to Fay & Perles' "Emergency" Motion to Quash his Amended Notice of Charging Lien by JAY GLENN. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Associate Counsel Agreement, #2 Exhibit 2A - Contingent Retainer Agreements (Belmer Plaintiffs), #3 Exhibit 2B - Contingent Retainer Agreements (Livingston Plaintiffs), #4 Exhibit 2C - Contingent Retainer Agreements (Moore Plaintiffs), #5 Exhibit 2D - Contingent Retainer Agreements (Phillips Plaintiffs), #6 Exhibit 2E - Contingent Retainer Agreements (Swinson Plaintiffs), #7 Exhibit 2F - Contingent Retainer Agreements (Thorstad Plaintiffs), #8 Exhibit 2G - Contingent Retainer Agreements (Young Plaintiffs), #9 Exhibit 3 - Post-Execution Transmittal Letters, #10 Exhibit 4 - Family Information Sheet Transmittal Letter, #11 Exhibit 5 - Report & Recommendation Transmittal Letters, #12 Exhibit 6 - Glenn v. Fay (S.D.N.Y.) Rule 26(f) Report (Excerpt), #13 Exhibit 7 - Glenn v. Fay (S.D.N.Y.) Hearing Tr. (Excerpt), #14 Exhibit 8 - Letter from Glenn to Judge Forrest, Dated May 26, 2016, #15 Exhibit 9 - Letter from Salon Marrow to Judge Forrest, Dated June 1, 2016, #16 Exhibit 10 - Memorandum of Law in Support of Glenn's Motion to Intervene in Turnover Action)(Amini, Bijan) Modified on 6/22/2016 (jf).
June 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 545 Memorandum in opposition to re #542 Emergency MOTION to Quash Atty Glenn's Atty's Charging Lien / Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition to Fay & Perles' "Emergency" Motion to Quash Jay Glenn's Amended Notice of Charging Lien filed by JAY GLENN. (Attachments: #1 ADDENDUM Decision & Order in Perles v. Kagy, Case No. 01-cv-105 (D. D.C. April 10, 2003))(Amini, Bijan) Modified on 6/22/2016 (jf).
June 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 544 Counter MOTION to Compel Arbitration and for an Interim Order Staying Distribution of 10% of the QSF Trust Funds from the Attorneys' Share Only by COOK COLLECTION ATTORNEYS, PLC and DAVID J. COOK, ESQ. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Declaration of Eric D. Miller, #3 Exhibit A-C, #4 Declaration of David J. Cook, #5 Exhibit D-F, #6 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Miller, Eric)
June 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 543 Memorandum in opposition to re #539 Emergency MOTION to Quash COOKS NOTICE OF ATTORNEYS CHARGING LIEN FOR FEES filed by COOK COLLECTION ATTORNEYS, PLC and DAVID J. COOK, ESQ.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Eric D. Miller, #2 Exhibit Exhibits A - C, #3 Declaration Declaration of David J. Cook, #4 Exhibit Exhibits D - F, #5 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Miller, Eric)
June 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 542 Emergency MOTION to Quash Atty Glenn's Atty's Charging Lien by ALL PLAINTIFFS (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit Memo decision & Order SDNY, #3 Exhibit order authorizing distribution of funds SDNY, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Bond, Ferris)
June 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 541 NOTICE of Appearance by John Vail on behalf of ALL PLAINTIFFS (Vail, John)
June 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 540 SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM to re #539 Emergency MOTION to Quash COOKS NOTICE OF ATTORNEYS CHARGING LIEN FOR FEES filed by ALL PLAINTIFFS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Perles, Steven)
June 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 539 Emergency MOTION to Quash COOKS NOTICE OF ATTORNEYS CHARGING LIEN FOR FEES by ALL PLAINTIFFS (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Text of Proposed Order)(Perles, Steven)
June 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 538 NOTICE / Amended Notice of Charging Lien by JAY GLENN re #533 Notice (Other) (Amini, Bijan)
June 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 537 NOTICE of Appearance by Bijan Amini on behalf of JAY GLENN (Amini, Bijan)
May 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 536 ORDER granting #532 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Eric D. Miller, Esquire to appear before this Court in this action, and subject to the Local Rules of this Court. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 5/27/2016. (tg)
May 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 535 ORDER granting #530 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Jerry R. Hauser, Esquire to appear before this Court in this action, and subject to the Local Rules of this Court. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 5/27/2016. (tg)
May 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 534 MOTION Payment To Masters by ALL PLAINTIFFS (Attachments: #1 Order Authorizing Payment)(Fay, Thomas)
May 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 533 NOTICE / Notice of Charging Lien by JAY GLENN (Amini, Bijan)
May 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 532 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Eric D. Miller, :Firm- MillerHauser Law Group, LLP, :Address- 790 Mission Avenue, San Rafael, CA 94901. Phone No. - 415 485 2200. Fax No. - 415 485 9345 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-4541227. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by COOK COLLECTION ATTORNEYS, PLC and DAVID J. COOK, ESQ. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Cyron, Wayne)
May 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 531 NOTICE of Appearance by Wayne Frank Cyron on behalf of COOK COLLECTION ATTORNEYS, PLC and DAVID J. COOK, ESQ. (Cyron, Wayne)
May 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 530 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Jerry R. Hauser, :Firm- MillerHauser Law Group LLP, :Address- 790 Mission Ave, San Rafael, CA 94901. Phone No. - 415-485-2200. Fax No. - 703-299-0603 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-4538229. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by COOK COLLECTION ATTORNEYS, PLC and DAVID J. COOK, ESQ. (Cyron, Wayne)
May 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 529 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Eric D. Miller, :Firm- MillerHauser Law Group LLP, :Address- 790 Mission Ave., San Rafael, CA 94901. Phone No. - 415-485-2200. Fax No. - 703-299-0603 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-4538226. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by COOK COLLECTION ATTORNEYS, PLC and DAVID J. COOK, ESQ. (Cyron, Wayne)
May 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 528 NOTICE of attorney's charging lien for fees by COOK COLLECTION ATTORNEYS, PLC and DAVID J. COOK, ESQ. re #527 Notice of Appearance (Cook, David)
May 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 527 NOTICE of Appearance by David J. Cook on behalf of COOK COLLECTION ATTORNEYS, PLC and DAVID J. COOK, ESQ. (Cook, David)
May 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 526 NOTICE of Appearance by David J. Cook on behalf of COOK COLLECTION ATTORNEYS, PLC and DAVID J. COOK, ESQ. (Cook, David)
May 20, 2016 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: re #524 Notice (Other) was entered in error and counsel is instructed to use their assigned password/login to refile said pleading using the Notice of Appearance event. (zrdj)
May 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 525 NOTICE of attorney's charging lien for fees by COOK COLLECTION ATTORNEYS, PLC and DAVID J. COOK, ESQ. re #524 Notice (Other) (Cook, David)
May 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 524 ENTERED IN ERROR.....NOTICE of appearance of counsel by COOK COLLECTION ATTORNEYS, PLC and DAVID J. COOK, ESQ. (Cook, David) Modified on 5/20/2016 (zrdj).
December 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 523 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to ALL PLAINTIFFS. Attorney Jamie Elizabeth Knight terminated. (Hoffman, Molly)
December 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 522 NOTICE of Firm Name Change by ALL PLAINTIFFS (Hoffman, Molly)
August 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 521 MANDATE of USCA (certified copy) as to #513 Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit Court, filed by ALL PLAINTIFFS ; USCA Case Number 13-7086. ORDERED and ADJUDGED that the denial of the appellants' motion for sanctions and motion to schedule discovery be affirmed. (kb, )
May 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 520 NOTICE of Appearance by Molly Patricia Hoffman on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Hoffman, Molly)
April 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 519 NOTICE Of Grand Jury Subpoena USDC SDNY by ALL PLAINTIFFS (Fay, Thomas)
December 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 518 PROTECTIVE ORDER setting forth procedures for handling confidential material; allowing designated material to be filed under seal (See Image for Details). Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 12/20/13. (mpt)
December 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 517 Unopposed MOTION for Protective Order by OFFICE OF FOREIGN ASSETS CONTROL (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Coleman Snead, Jacqueline)
November 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 516 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to OFFICE OF FOREIGN ASSETS CONTROL, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. Attorney Jacqueline E. Coleman Snead; Lynn Yuhee Lee; Heather R. Phillips; Scott Risner; Eric R. Womack; Rupa Bhattacharyya and Varu Chilakamarri terminated. (Risner, Scott)
September 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 515 NOTICE of Appearance by Molly Patricia Hoffman on behalf of DEBORAH D. PETERSON (Hoffman, Molly)
May 28, 2013 Opinion or Order USCA Case Number 13-7086 for #513 Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit Court, filed by ALL PLAINTIFFS. (rdj)
May 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 514 Transmission of the Notice of Appeal, Order Appealed, and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals. The Court of Appeals fee was paid this date re #513 Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit Court. (rdj)
May 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 513 NOTICE OF APPEAL TO DC CIRCUIT COURT as to #500 Order on Motion for Sanctions, Order on Motion for Scheduling Order, #501 Memorandum & Opinion, #512 Memorandum & Opinion, #511 Order on Motion for Reconsideration by ALL PLAINTIFFS. Filing fee $ 455, receipt number 0090-3336277. Fee Status: Fee Paid. Parties have been notified. (Fay, Thomas)
May 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 512 MEMORANDUM OPINION denying plaintiffs' motion for reconsideration #503 . Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on May 22, 2013. (lcrcl5)
May 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 511 ORDER denying #503 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on May 22, 2013. (lcrcl5)
May 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 510 ORDER granting #506 Motion for Order for Leave to File Under Seal. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 5/15/13. (rje, )
May 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 509 REPLY to opposition to motion re #503 MOTION for Reconsideration Pursuant to Fed. Civ. Pro. 60(b) filed by ALL PLAINTIFFS. (Fay, Thomas)
May 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 508 Memorandum in opposition to re #503 MOTION for Reconsideration Pursuant to Fed. Civ. Pro. 60(b) (redacted) filed by HSBC Bank USA, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Alexander J. Willscher, #2 Exhibit A)(Clark, Bruce) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/10/2013: #3 SEALED Memorandum in opposition to MOTION for Reconsideration(This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)) (zrdj).
May 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 507 NOTICE of Filing Under Seal by HSBC Bank USA, N.A. (Clark, Bruce)
May 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 506 Consent MOTION for Order for Leave to File Under Seal by HSBC Bank USA, N.A. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Clark, Bruce)
April 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 505 SEALED Exhibit "C" filed by DEBORAH D. PETERSON. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(zrdj)
April 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 504 ORDER granting leave to file under seal Exhibit "C" to the Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration of Order entered 4/11/2013. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 4/26/13. (rje, )
April 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 503 MOTION for Reconsideration Pursuant to Fed. Civ. Pro. 60(b) by DEBORAH D. PETERSON (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(Fay, Thomas)
April 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 502 MINUTE ORDER denying #498 Motion for Protective Order as moot. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on April 11, 2013. (lcrcl5)
April 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 501 MEMORANDUM OPINION denying #485 motion for sanctions and denying #494 motion to schedule discovery and oral argument. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on April 11, 2013. (lcrcl5)
April 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 500 ORDER denying #485 Motion for Sanctions; denying #494 Motion for Scheduling Order. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on April 11, 2013. (lcrcl5)
April 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 499 ENTERED IN ERROR.....MOTION to Enforce Judgment Pursuant To 28 U.S.C. Section 1610(c) by ALL PLAINTIFFS (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1610(c))(Fay, Thomas) Modified on 4/8/2013 (rdj).
April 8, 2013 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: #499 was entered in error and counsel will file document in the correct case.(td, )
March 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 498 MOTION for Protective Order by HSBC Bank USA, N.A. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion for Protective Order, #2 Declaration of Bruce E. Clark, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G, #10 Exhibit H, #11 Exhibit I, #12 Exhibit J, #13 Exhibit K, #14 Exhibit L, #15 Exhibit M, #16 Exhibit N, #17 Text of Proposed Order)(Clark, Bruce)
March 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 497 REPLY to opposition to motion re #494 MOTION for Scheduling Order filed by ALL PLAINTIFFS. (Fay, Thomas)
March 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 496 Memorandum in opposition to re #494 MOTION for Scheduling Order filed by HSBC Bank USA, N.A.. (Willscher, Alexander)
March 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 495 NOTICE of Appearance by William Coleman Dowden, III on behalf of DEBORAH D. PETERSON (Dowden, William)
March 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 494 MOTION for Scheduling Order by ALL PLAINTIFFS (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order To Set Scheduling Conference)(Fay, Thomas)
March 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 493 REPLY IN SUPPORT OF #485 MOTION FOR SANCTIONS PURSUANT TO TITLE 16 SECTION 526(b) D.C. CODE filed by DEBORAH D. PETERSON. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit EXH. A, #2 Exhibit EXH. B, #3 Exhibit EXH. C)(Fay, Thomas) Modified on 3/11/2013 to add linkage (rdj).
March 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 492 ORDER granting re #491 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply filed by ALL PLAINTIFFS Plaintiff's Responses due by 3/11/2013. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 3/1/13. (rje, )
February 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 491 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by ALL PLAINTIFFS (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order Extend Time)(Fay, Thomas)
February 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 490 Memorandum in opposition to re #485 MOTION for Sanctions Pursuant to Title 16, Section 526(b) D.C. Code filed by HSBC Bank USA, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Lynn Hughes, #2 Declaration Declaration of Michael Zytnick with Exhibit A)(Clark, Bruce)
February 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 489 ORDER denying #474 Motion to Deposit Funds; granting #476 Motion for Leave to File under seal. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on February 21, 2013. (lcrcl5)
January 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 487 ORDER granting #486 Motion for Extension of Time to File Opposition. HBUS shall file its memorandum in opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Sanctions on or before February 25, 2013. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on January 29, 2013. (lcrcl5)
January 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: HSBC Bank USA, N.A. Opposition due by 2/25/2013. (rje)
January 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 488 ORDER granting #484 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 1/28/13. (rje)
January 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 486 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #485 MOTION for Sanctions Pursuant to Title 16, Section 526(b) D.C. Code by HSBC Bank USA, N.A. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Clark, Bruce)
January 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 485 MOTION for Sanctions Pursuant to Title 16, Section 526(b) D.C. Code by DEBORAH D. PETERSON (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit Exhibit D Part 1, #6 Exhibit Exhibit D Part 2, #7 Exhibit Exhibit D Part 3, #8 Exhibit Exhibit D Part 4, #9 Exhibit Exhibit D Part 5, #10 Exhibit Exhibit D Part 6, #11 Exhibit Exhibit D Part 7, #12 Exhibit Exhibit D Part 8, #13 Exhibit Exhibit D Part 9, #14 Exhibit Exhibit D Part 10, #15 Exhibit Exhibit D Part 11, #16 Exhibit Exhibit D Part 12, #17 Exhibit Exhibit D Part 13, #18 Exhibit Exhibit D Part 14, #19 Exhibit Exhibit D Part 15, #20 Exhibit Exhibit D Part 16, #21 Exhibit Exhibit D Part 17, #22 Exhibit Exhibit D Part 18, #23 Exhibit Exhibit D Part 19, #24 Exhibit Exhibit D Part 20, #25 Exhibit Exhibit D Part 21, #26 Exhibit Exhibit D Part 22, #27 Exhibit Exhibit D Part 23, #28 Exhibit Exhibit D Part 24, #29 Exhibit Exhibit D Part 25, #30 Exhibit Exhibit D Part 26, #31 Exhibit Exhibit D Part 27, #32 Exhibit Exhibit D Part 28, #33 Exhibit Exhibit D Part 29, #34 Exhibit Exhibit D Part 30, #35 Exhibit Exhibit D Part 31, #36 Exhibit Exhibit D Part 32, #37 Exhibit Exhibit D Part 33, #38 Exhibit Exhibit D Part 34, #39 Exhibit Exhibit E, #40 Exhibit Exhibit F, #41 Exhibit Exhibit G)(Fay, Thomas)
January 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 484 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Jamie Knight, :Firm- FAY KAPLAN LAW, PA, :Address- 777 Sixth Street, NW, Suiye 410, Washington, DC 20001. Phone No. - 202-589-1300. Fax No. - 202-589-1721 by ALL PLAINTIFFS (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Admit Jamie Knight Pro Vice)(Fay, Thomas)
January 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 483 ANSWER to Writ of Garnishment by INTERNATIONAL TELECOMMUNICATIONS SATELLITE ORGANIZATION. Objections to Writ Answer due by 1/21/2013. (Bledsoe, David)
January 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 482 ANSWER to Writ of Garnishment by INTELSAT, S.A.. Objections to Writ Answer due by 1/21/2013. (Bledsoe, David)
January 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 481 ORDER granting #480 and entering Protective Order. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on January 7, 2013. (lcrcl5)
January 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 480 Unopposed MOTION for Protective Order by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Risner, Scott)
December 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 479 WRIT OF Attachment on Judgment issued as to Intelsat, SA, International Telecommunications Satellite Organization,Garnishee ; Writ (2) issued. (rdj) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/3/2013: #1 Process Receipt and Return from the U.S. Marshal Service) (zrdj). Modified on 1/11/2013 (rdj).
December 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 478 NOTICE to Take Deposition of HSBC Bank USA by DEBORAH D. PETERSON. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Subpoena & Proof of Service)(Fay, Thomas)
September 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 477 MEMORANDUM re #475 Order by ALL PLAINTIFFS. (Fay, Thomas)
September 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 476 MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal by ALL PLAINTIFFS (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Leave To File Under Seal)(Fay, Thomas) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/15/2013: #2 Exhibit (SEALED)) (zrdj, ).
August 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 475 ORDER to file Supplemental Memoranda. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 8/9/2012. (lcrcl5) ( Modified on 8/9/2012 (rje, ).
July 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 474 MOTION to Deposit Funds by ALL PLAINTIFFS (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Deposit of Funds and Payment to Special Masters)(Fay, Thomas)
July 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 473 AFFIDAVIT Voucher for Payment Susan Meek by ALL PLAINTIFFS. (Fay, Thomas)
July 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 472 AFFIDAVIT Voucher for Payment Christopher Byrne by ALL PLAINTIFFS. (Fay, Thomas)
March 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 471 ORDER granting Motion for Protective Order #470 . Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 3/22/2012. (lcrcl5)
March 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 470 Unopposed MOTION for Protective Order by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Subpoena, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Lee, Lynn)
September 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 469 SEALED ORDER (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(jeb, ) Modified on 9/14/2010 to reflect correct type of document (jeb, )
September 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 468 SEALED MEMORANDUM OPINION (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(jeb, ) Modified on 9/14/2010 to reflect correct type of document (jeb)
September 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 467 SEALED DOCUMENT (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(jeb, ).
September 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 466 SEALED DOCUMENT (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 9/13/10.(jeb, ) Modified on 9/14/2010 to correct type of document(jeb, ).
September 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 465 SEALED DOCUMENT (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 9/13/10.(jeb, )(Modified to correct the type of document)
September 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 464 SEALED ORDER (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 9/13/10.(jeb, )
September 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 463 SEALED MEMORANDUM OPINION (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 9/13/10.(jeb, )
June 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 462 SEALED DOCUMENT filed by ALL PLAINTIFFS. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(rdj)
June 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 461 ORDER granting #460 Motion for Leave to File under Seal. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 6/7/10. (zrje, )
May 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 460 MOTION for Leave to File under Seal by ALL PLAINTIFFS (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Perles, Steven)
May 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 459 SEALED DOCUMENT filed by ALL PLAINTIFFS. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(zrdj)
May 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 458 ORDER granting #457 Motion for Leave to File. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 5/14/2010. (lcrcl6, )
May 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 457 MOTION for Leave to File Document under Seal by ALL PLAINTIFFS (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Perles, Steven)
April 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 456 ORDER GRANTING #455 MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 4/9/10. (Attachments: #1 Appendix) (lcrcl6, )
April 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 455 Unopposed MOTION for Protective Order by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Lee, Lynn)
March 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 454 (SEALED) TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS before Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth held on February 24, 2010; Court Reporter/Transcriber Rebecca Stonestreet, RPR, CRR, Telephone number (202) 354-3249, For the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at ww.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 4/2/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/12/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/10/2010.(rdj)
February 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 453 SEALED DOCUMENT filed by ALL PLAINTIFFS. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(zrdj)
February 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 452 ORDER granting #451 Motion for Leave to File Under Seal. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 02/24/10. (lcrcl6, )
February 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth: Motion Hearing held on 2/24/2010. Motion hearing and held in abeyance. (Court Reporter Rebecca Stonestreet.) (rje, )
February 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 451 MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal by ALL PLAINTIFFS (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Fay, Thomas)
February 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 450 Memorandum in opposition to re #447 SEALED MOTION filed by ALL PLAINTIFFS. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) Objection to Motion filed by CLEARSTREAM BANKING, S.A.. (Panopoulos, Frank)
February 4, 2010 Opinion or Order NOTICE of Hearing: Hearing on Motion to Amend Protective Order set for 2/24/2010 05:00 PM in Courtroom 22A before Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth. (lin, )
December 31, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 449 SEALED DOCUMENT re #447 filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(zrdj)
December 31, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 448 NOTICE of Filing by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA re #447 SEALED MOTION filed by ALL PLAINTIFFS. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Coleman Snead, Jacqueline)
December 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 447 SEALED MOTION filed by ALL PLAINTIFFS. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(zrdj)
December 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 446 ORDER granting #445 Motion File Under Seal by ALL PLAINTIFFS. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 12/15/09. (rje)
December 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 445 MOTION File Under Seal by ALL PLAINTIFFS (Fay, Thomas)
November 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 444 RESPONSE re (21 in 1:06-cv-00750-RCL, 17 in 1:07-cv-01302-RCL, 6 in 1:08-cv-01807-RCL, 3 in 1:08-cv-00520-RCL, 38 in 1:06-cv-00596-RCL, 10 in 1:08-cv-00531-RCL, 35 in 1:02-cv-01811-RCL, 35 in 1:06-cv-00473-RCL, 6 in 1:08-cv-01273-RCL, 9 in 1:08-cv-01615-RCL, 6 in 1:08-cv-01814-RCL, 15 in 1:06-cv-00690-RCL, 15 in 1:06-cv-00516-RCL, 27 in 1:06-cv-01116-RCL) Memorandum & Opinion filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (znmw, )
October 26, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 443 SEALED Memorandum pursuant to Order of the Court of 9/30/2009 filed by DEBORAH D. PETERSON. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(zrdj)
October 26, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 442 ORDER granting #441 Motion for Order for Leave to File Under Seal. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 10/26/2009. (lcrcl6, )
October 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 441 MOTION for Order for Leave to File Under Seal (Plaintiffs Sixth Motion) by DEBORAH D. PETERSON (Kaplan, Annie)
September 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 440 ORDER denying #435 MOTION Authorize Payment To Special Masters by ALL PLAINTIFFS; denying #30 MOTION for Reconsideration of Judgment by ESTELLE CARROLL, HARRY BEER, ANNA BEER, PHYLLIS MAISEL;denying MOTION #31 for Hearing on Issues Presented in Motion to Reconsider and Leave to File a 1083(c)(2) Motion Nunc Pro Tunc by ESTELLE CARROLL, HARRY BEER, ANNA BEER, PHYLLIS MAISEL; denying #32 MOTION for Reconsideration of Judgment and Leave to file motion nunc pro tunc by ALL PLAINTIFFS; denying MOTION #33 for Hearing on Issues Presented in Plaintiff's Motion to Reconsider and Leave to File 1083(c)(2) Motion Nunc Pro Tunc by ALL PLAINTIFFS. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 09/30/2009. (lcrcl6, )
September 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 439 MEMORANDUM AND OPINION. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 09/30/2009. (lcrcl6, )
April 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 438 NOTICE of Exhibits Filed by ALL PLAINTIFFS pursuant to Order #437 . (See Docket Entry #436 to view document) (rdj)
April 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 437 ORDER granting #436 Motion for Leave to File Exhibits to Motion for Payment of Special Masters.. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 23 April 2008. (lcrcl5, )
April 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 436 MOTION for Leave to File exhibits re #435 Motion Authorize Payment to Special Masters by ALL PLAINTIFFS (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit List, #2 Exhibit David Broom - Voucher, #3 Exhibit Colin Dunham - Voucher, #4 Exhibit Francis B. Fennessey - Voucher, #5 Exhibit Karen Kruger - Voucher, #6 Exhibit Jeffrey Manheimer - Voucher, #7 Exhibit Howard Rives - Voucher, #8 Exhibit Phillip Saeta - Voucher, #9 Exhibit John Swanson - Voucher, #10 Exhibit Kenneth Trombly - Voucher, #11 Text of Proposed Order Order Granting Leave to File)(Fay, Thomas) Modified on 4/13/2009 to add linkage(rdj).
April 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 435 MOTION Authorize Payment To Special Masters by ALL PLAINTIFFS (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Authorize Payment Special Masters)(Fay, Thomas)
March 31, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 434 ORDER denying #251 Motion to Appoint Receiver. ; denying #259 Motion to Appoint Receiver. ; denying 404 Motion to Appoint Receiver.. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on March 31, 2009. (lcrcl5, )
March 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 433 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION by DEBORAH D. PETERSON re #260 MOTION to Appoint Receiver (All Claims, Interim, Partial and Final Awards) MOTION to Appoint Receiver (All Claims, Interim, Partial and Final Awards) MOTION to Appoint Receiver (All Claims, Interim, Partial and Final Awards) MOTION to Appoint Receiver (All Claims, Interim, Partial and Final Awards) MOTION to Appoint Receiver (All Claims, Interim, Partial and Final Awards) MOTION to Appoint Receiver (All Claims, Interim, Partial and Final Awards) MOTION to Appoint Receiver (All Claims, Interim, Partial and Final Awards) MOTION to Appoint Receiver (All Claims, Interim, Partial and Final Awards), #432 Notice (Other), Notice (Other), Notice (Other) (Cook, David)
March 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 432 NOTICE of Statement of Interest by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA re #260 MOTION to Appoint Receiver (All Claims, Interim, Partial and Final Awards) MOTION to Appoint Receiver (All Claims, Interim, Partial and Final Awards) MOTION to Appoint Receiver (All Claims, Interim, Partial and Final Awards) MOTION to Appoint Receiver (All Claims, Interim, Partial and Final Awards) MOTION to Appoint Receiver (All Claims, Interim, Partial and Final Awards) MOTION to Appoint Receiver (All Claims, Interim, Partial and Final Awards) MOTION to Appoint Receiver (All Claims, Interim, Partial and Final Awards) MOTION to Appoint Receiver (All Claims, Interim, Partial and Final Awards) (Womack, Eric)
March 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 431 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric R. Womack on behalf of UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Womack, Eric)
January 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 430 ORDER denying all motions seeking payment of special masters -- #242 #243 and #253 .. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 13 January 2008. (lcrcl5, )
December 8, 2008 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Hearings: Motion Hearing set for 12/15/2008 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 22A before Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth. (rje)
December 3, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 429 REPLY to opposition to motion re 403 MOTION for Order Enforcing Subpoena filed by ALL PLAINTIFFS. (tg, ) (FILED UNDER SEAL)
December 3, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 428 ORDER granting #426 Unopposed Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on December 3, 2008. (lcrcl5, )
December 3, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 427 ORDER granting #425 Motion for Leave to File Plaintiffs' Reply Under Seal. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 3 December 2008. (lcrcl5, )
December 3, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 426 Unopposed MOTION for Protective Order by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Attachments: #1 Peterson Subpoenas, #2 Proposed Protective Order)(Coleman Snead, Jacqueline) Modified on 12/3/2008 per request of filer to enhance docket text (tr).
December 1, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 425 MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal by ALL PLAINTIFFS (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order Granting Leave To File Under Seal)(Fay, Thomas) (Reply in Support of Motion for Order Enforcing Subpoena LODGED UNDER SEAL) (Modified on 12/1/2008 (tg, )
November 20, 2008 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiffs' Reply due by 11/26/2008. (rje)
November 19, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 424 ORDER granting #422 Motion for Extension of Time to. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on November 19, 2008. (lcrcl5, )
November 18, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 422 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply Memorandum by ALL PLAINTIFFS (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Fay, Thomas)
November 18, 2008 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: re #421 Affidavit was entered in error pursuant to LCvR 5.2(tg, )
November 17, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 423 NOTICE of Registration of Judgment in the Office of the Clerk, U.S. District Court located in Omaha, Nebraska on November 13, 2008 under case number 8:08MC90. (tg, )
November 17, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 421 ENTERED IN ERROR.....AFFIDAVIT of Process Server of Subpoena in a Civil Case; Attachment; upon Office of Foreign Asset Control, Dept. of Treasury by DEBORAH D. PETERSON. (Cook, David) Modified on 11/18/2008 (tg, ).
November 6, 2008 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRIES: re #418 Affidavit, and #419 Affidavit were entered in error pursuant to LCvR 5.2. (tg, )
November 5, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 420 Memorandum in opposition to 403 MOTION for Order filed by OFFICE OF FOREIGN ASSETS CONTROL. (tg, ) (FILED UNDER SEAL)
November 5, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 419 ENTERED IN ERROR.....AFFIDAVIT of Process Server upon Dept. of Agriculture by ALL PLAINTIFFS. (Cook, David) Modified on 11/6/2008 (tg, ).
November 5, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 418 ENTERED IN ERROR.....AFFIDAVIT of Process Server upon Office of Foreign Asset Control by ALL PLAINTIFFS. (Cook, David) Modified on 11/6/2008 (tg, ).
October 28, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 417 ORDER granting #416 Consent Motion for Order RE: Revised Briefing Schedule. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on October 28, 2008. (lcrcl5, )
October 27, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 416 Consent MOTION for Order Establishing Revised Briefing Schedule by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Coleman Snead, Jacqueline)
October 22, 2008 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: OFAC Response due by 10/28/2008. Plaintiffs' Reply due by 11/7/2008. (rje)
October 20, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 415 REPLY to CLEARSTREAM BANKING, S.A. Opposition to 397 MOTION for Order Permitting Limited Public Disclosure filed by ALL PLAINTIFFS. (tg, ) (FILED UNDER SEAL)
October 20, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 414 AFFIDAVIT of Thomas Fortune Fay. (tg, ) (FILED UNDER SEAL)
October 20, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 413 RESPONSE to 397 MOTION for Order Permitting Limited Public Disclosure filed by CLEARSTREAM BANKING, S.A. (tg, ) (FILED UNDER SEAL)
October 20, 2008 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #407 Motion for Leave to File. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 10/17/08. (rje)
October 20, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 412 ORDER granting #408 Motion for Order. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on October 20, 2008. (lcrcl5, )
October 20, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 411 ORDER re 397 MOTION for Order filed by ALL PLAINTIFFS. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 10/17/08. (rje)
October 20, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 410 ORDER granting #406 Motion for Leave to File. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 10/16/08. (rje)
October 20, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 409 ORDER granting #405 Motion for Leave to File. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 10/16/08. (rje)
October 20, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 408 Consent MOTION for Order Establishing Briefing Schedule by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Coleman Snead, Jacqueline)
October 17, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 407 MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Fourth by ALL PLAINTIFFS (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order leave to file under seal)(Fay, Thomas)
October 17, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 406 Third MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal by ALL PLAINTIFFS (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order leave to file under seal)(Fay, Thomas)
October 14, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 405 MOTION to Seal Response to Plaintiffs' Motion for Entry of Order Permitting Limited Public Disclosure by CLEARSTREAM BANKING, S.A. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(tg, ) (Response to Plaintiffs' Motion for Entry of Order Permitting Limited Public Disclosure - LODGED UNDER SEAL)
October 8, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 404 MOTION to Appoint Receivers by ALL PLAINTIFFS (tg, ) (FILED UNDER SEAL)
October 8, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 403 MOTION for Order Enforcing Subpoena by ALL PLAINTIFFS (tg, ) (FILED UNDER SEAL)
October 8, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 402 ORDER granting motions to be file under seal. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 10/8/08. (rje)
October 8, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 401 ORDER granting #400 Motion for Leave to File Response. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on October 8, 2008. (lcrcl5, )
October 7, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 400 MOTION for Leave to File Response by CLEARSTREAM BANKING, S.A. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(nmw, )
October 6, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 398 SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM to re 397 MOTION for Order Permitting Limited Public Disclosure filed by ALL PLAINTIFFS. (Fay, Thomas)
October 3, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 399 RESPONSE re 397 MOTION for Order filed by OFFICE OF FOREIGN ASSETS CONTROL. (tg, ) (FILED UNDER SEAL)
September 22, 2008 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: ORDER Entry #396 was entered in error as this order is a duplicate of ORDER Entry # 395. (rje)
September 19, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 397 MOTION for Entry of Order by ALL PLAINTIFFS (tg, ) (FILED UNDER SEAL)
September 19, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 396 ENTERED ERROR.....ORDER granting #391 Motion for Leave to File under Seal. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 19 September 2008. (lcrcl5, ) Modified on 9/22/2008 (zrje, ).
September 19, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 395 ORDER granting #391 Motion for Leave to File. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 9/19/08. (rje)
September 8, 2008 Opinion or Order NOTICE re #394 Response to Document; emailed to varudhini.chilakamarri@usdoj.gov, cc'd 33 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Atty. Chilakamarri is reminded that pleadings re motions must be linked to the related motion. (tg, )
September 5, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 394 RESPONSE to Plaintiffs' #391 Motion for Leave to File Under Seal filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Chilakamarri, Varudhini) Modified to add linkage on 9/8/2008 (tg, ).
August 29, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 393 ANSWER to Writ of Garnishment and Objections to Writ and Interrogatories in Attachment by CATERPILLAR, INC.. (Berenson, Bradford)
August 26, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 392 ORDER denying #231 Motion to Alter Judgment; denying #388 Motion for Extension of Time to File a Supplemental Memorandum. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 8/26/08. (lcrcl2, )
August 22, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 391 MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal(Corrected Order) by ALL PLAINTIFFS (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order File Under Seal(Corrected Order))(Fay, Thomas)
August 22, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 390 ENTERED IN ERROR.....MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal by ALL PLAINTIFFS (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order File Under Seal)(Fay, Thomas) Modified on 8/22/2008 (tg, ).
August 22, 2008 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: re #390 MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal was entered in error at the request of counsel. Counsel refile said pleading under docket entry number #391 . (tg, )
July 28, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 388 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Memorandum by CATHERINE BONK (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order To Extend Time to File Memorandum)(Fay, Thomas)
July 28, 2008 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: re #387 MOTION for Extension of Time to File was entered in error. The pleading in addition to the caption of this case lists the caption of a non related case. Counsel was instructed to refile his motion with the correct caption of the case. (tg, )
July 25, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 389 RESPONSE re #243 MOTION for Disbursement of Funds To Special Master Swanson(Corrected), #253 MOTION for Order For Payment of Special Master Kruger, #242 MOTION for Disbursement of Funds To Special Master Ray filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(nmw, )
July 25, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 387 ENTERED IN ERROR.....MOTION for Extension of Time to File by ALL PLAINTIFFS (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Perles, Steven) Modified on 7/28/2008 (tg, ).
July 18, 2008 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Caterpillar Response due by 9/1/2008. (rje)
July 17, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 386 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Interrogatories in Attachment by CATERPILLAR, INC. (Berenson, Bradford)
July 17, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 385 LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by CATERPILLAR, INC. (Berenson, Bradford)
July 17, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 384 NOTICE of Appearance by Bradford A. Berenson on behalf of CATERPILLAR, INC. (Berenson, Bradford)
July 17, 2008 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #386 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Interrogatories in Attachment. Caterpillar Inc. shall file its response to the interrogatories on or before September 1, 2008. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 07/17/2008. (lcrcl2, )
July 14, 2008 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiffs' Supplemental Memorandum due by 7/27/2008. (rje)
July 10, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 383 ANSWER to Writ of Garnishment as modified by stipulation by SIEMENS CORPORATION. (Littleton, Robert)
July 9, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 382 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to SIEMENS CORPORATION. Attorney Laura Nachowitz Steel terminated. (Steel, Laura)
July 9, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 381 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to SIEMENS CORPORATION. Attorney A. Daniel Ullman, II terminated. (Ullman, A.)
July 7, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 380 ORDER directing plaintiffs to file supplemental memorandum to their motion #231 to alter judgment. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 07/07/2008. (lcrcl2, )
July 7, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 379 MEMORANDUM & ORDER denying #338 Motion for Sanctions. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 07/07/2008. (lcrcl2, )
July 7, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 378 ORDER finding as moot #341 Motion to Continue; finding as moot #345 Motion to Expedite. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 07/07/2008. (lcrcl2, )
July 7, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 377 MEMORANDUM & ORDER denying #295 Motion for Discovery; denying 296 Motion for Hearing. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 07/07/2008. (lcrcl2, )
July 7, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 376 MEMORANDUM & ORDER denying #281 Motion to Strike Objections. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 07/07/2008. (lcrcl2, )
July 7, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 375 ORDER granting #273 Motion to Quash; granting #297 Motion to Quash; granting #306 Motion to Quash; denying #286 Motion to Appoint Receiver. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 07/07/2008. (lcrcl2, )
July 7, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 374 MEMORANDUM AND OPINION. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 07/07/2008. (lcrcl2, )
July 7, 2008 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER denying #271 Motion for Hearing. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 07/07/2008. (lcrcl2, )
July 7, 2008 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER finding as moot #274 Emergency MOTION to Shorten Time to Respond to JBIC's Motion to Quash. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 07/07/2008. (lcrcl2, )
July 1, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 373 REPLY to opposition to motion re #338 MOTION for Sanctions filed by JAPAN BANK FOR INTERNATIONAL COOPERATION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Hulme, James)
June 30, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 372 REPLY to opposition to motion re #341 MOTION to Continue All Pending Motions To Quash filed by KEXIM filed by ALL PLAINTIFFS. (Cook, David)
June 30, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 371 REPLY to opposition to motion re #341 MOTION to Continue All Pending Motions To Quash, #345 MOTION to Expedite Hearin on Motion for Appointment of Receiver for Levied Bank accounts and Motion to Defer and Continue Hearing on Motions to Quash, #286 MOTION to Appoint Receiver (Levied Bank Accounts) filed by Bank of Japan filed by ALL PLAINTIFFS. (Cook, David)
June 30, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 370 REPLY to opposition to motion re #341 MOTION to Continue All Pending Motions To Quash, #345 MOTION to Expedite Hearin on Motion for Appointment of Receiver for Levied Bank accounts and Motion to Defer and Continue Hearing on Motions to Quash filed by IBRD filed by ALL PLAINTIFFS. (Cook, David)
June 30, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 369 STIPULATION re #332 MOTION to Quash Writ of Attachment on Judgment RESOLVING AND WITHDRAWING MOTION by SIEMENS CORPORATION. (Littleton, Robert)
June 26, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 368 ANSWER to Writ of Attachment on Judgment by DEUTSCHE BANK, Garnishee. (tg, )
June 25, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 367 ANSWER to Writ of Attachment on Judgment by BANK OF TOKYO-MITSUBISHI UFJ, Garnishee. (tg, )
June 25, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 366 ANSWER to Writ of Attachment on Judgment by BANK OF TOKYO, Garnishee. (tg, )
June 25, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 365 ORDER directing the United States to file a memorandum in response to plaintiffs' motions #242 , #243 and #253 , for an order for payment of Special Masters. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 06/25/2008. (lcrcl2, )
June 25, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 364 MEMORANDUM & ORDER granting #355 Motion to Enforce Judgment. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 06/25/2008. (lcrcl2, )
June 25, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 362 Memorandum in opposition to re #345 MOTION to Expedite Hearin on Motion for Appointment of Receiver for Levied Bank accounts and Motion to Defer and Continue Hearing on Motions to Quash, #286 MOTION to Appoint Receiver (Levied Bank Accounts) filed by BANK OF JAPAN. (Lambert, Paul)
June 24, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 363 ORDER granting #239 Motion to Appoint Terrance Williams and B. Snesko as Special Process Servers. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 6/24/08. (rje)
June 24, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 361 Memorandum in opposition to re #338 MOTION for Sanctions Filed by JBIC filed by ALL PLAINTIFFS. (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Cook, David)
June 24, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 360 Memorandum in opposition to re #341 MOTION to Continue All Pending Motions To Quash, #345 MOTION to Expedite Hearin on Motion for Appointment of Receiver for Levied Bank accounts and Motion to Defer and Continue Hearing on Motions to Quash filed by WORLD BANK. (Green, Griffith)
June 24, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 359 AFFIDAVIT re #358 Memorandum in Opposition by EXPORT-IMPORT BANK OF KOREA. (Kim, Hwan)
June 24, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 358 Memorandum in opposition to re 346 MOTION to Continue filed by EXPORT-IMPORT BANK OF KOREA. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kim, Hwan)
June 24, 2008 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #322 Motion for Joshua Dorchak and Jared R. Clark to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 06/24/2008. (lcrcl2, )
June 24, 2008 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #301 nunc pro tunc Motion for Extension of Time for Export Import Bank of Korea to File Response to Plaintiffs' Motion to Appoint Receiver. The time in which to file is extended to June 10, 2008. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 06/24/2008. (lcrcl2, )
June 24, 2008 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #328 Motion for Jay R. Henneberry, Alan I. Raylesberg, and Karl H. Buch to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 06/24/2008. (lcrcl2, )
June 24, 2008 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #292 Motion for Leave to File Late Response to JBIC's Motion to Quash Writ of Attachment. The response filed on May 30, 2008, shall be deemed timely. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 06/24/2008. (lcrcl2, )
June 23, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 357 REPLY to opposition to motion re #341 MOTION to Continue All Pending Motions To Quash, #345 MOTION to Expedite Hearin on Motion for Appointment of Receiver for Levied Bank accounts and Motion to Defer and Continue Hearing on Motions to Quash filed by ALL PLAINTIFFS. (Cook, David)
June 23, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 356 Memorandum in opposition to re #332 MOTION to Quash Writ of Attachment on Judgment filed by ALL PLAINTIFFS. (Cook, David)
June 23, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 355 MOTION to Enforce Judgment For An OrderPursuant To 28 U.S.C. Section 1610(c) by ALL PLAINTIFFS (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Entry Of An Order Pursuant to 28 U.S.C, Section1610(c))(Fay, Thomas)
June 23, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 354 REPLY to opposition to motion re #297 MOTION to Quash filed by BANK OF JAPAN. (nmw, )
June 23, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 353 NOTICE of Appearance by A. Daniel Ullman, II on behalf of SIEMENS CORPORATION (Ullman, A.)
June 23, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 352 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Judgment Upon Defendant Iran by ALL PLAINTIFFS. (Fay, Thomas)
June 23, 2008 Opinion or Order NOTICE re #351 Notice (Other); emailed to thomasfay@aol.com, cc'd 29 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Document title does not match docketed event, 2. Please refile document, 3. Counsel is directed to refile the document as an Affidavit of Service. (tg, )
June 22, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 351 ENTERED IN ERROR.....NOTICE of Judgment 28 U.S.C. Section 1608(e) by ALL PLAINTIFFS re #228 Judgment (Fay, Thomas) Modified on 6/23/2008 (tg, ).
June 20, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 350 AFFIDAVIT re #349 Reply to opposition to Motion by EXPORT-IMPORT BANK OF KOREA. (Kim, Hwan)
June 20, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 349 REPLY to opposition to motion re #306 MOTION to Quash Writ of Attachment on Judgment and To Be Excused From Further Proceedings filed by EXPORT-IMPORT BANK OF KOREA. (Kim, Hwan)
June 20, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 348 AFFIDAVIT of Service by EXPORT-IMPORT BANK OF KOREA. (Kim, Hwan)
June 19, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 347 Memorandum in opposition to re #341 MOTION to Continue All Pending Motions To Quash, #345 MOTION to Expedite Hearin on Motion for Appointment of Receiver for Levied Bank accounts and Motion to Defer and Continue Hearing on Motions to Quash filed by JAPAN BANK FOR INTERNATIONAL COOPERATION. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hulme, James)
June 18, 2008 Opinion or Order NOTICE re #345 Motion to Expedite; emailed to cook@squeezebloodfromturnip.com, cc'd 29 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Plaintiffs' pleading lists 2 motions but only 1 was filed. The clerk docketed the second motion. (tg, )
June 17, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 346 MOTION to Continue Hearing on Motions to Quash by ALL PLAINTIFFS (tg, ) (See Docket Entry Number #345 to view document)
June 17, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 345 MOTION to Expedite Hearin on Motion for Appointment of Receiver for Levied Bank accounts and Motion to Defer and Continue Hearing on Motions to Quash by ALL PLAINTIFFS (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(Cook, David)
June 16, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 344 Memorandum in opposition to re #295 MOTION for Discovery and Holding Evidentiary Hearing to Determine the Interest of Iran in Certain Funds filed by WORLD BANK. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Green, Griffith)
June 16, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 343 REPLY to opposition to motion re #286 MOTION to Appoint Receiver (Levied Bank Accounts) Amended, by International Bank for Reconstruction and Development filed by ALL PLAINTIFFS. (Cook, David)
June 16, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 342 REPLY to opposition to motion re #286 MOTION to Appoint Receiver (Levied Bank Accounts) Amended, By International Finance Corporation filed by ALL PLAINTIFFS. (Cook, David)
June 13, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 341 MOTION to Continue All Pending Motions To Quash by ALL PLAINTIFFS (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Certificate of Service)(Cook, David)
June 13, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 340 Memorandum in opposition to re #306 MOTION to Quash Writ of Attachment on Judgment and To Be Excused From Further Proceedings by Export Import Bank of Korea filed by ALL PLAINTIFFS. (Cook, David)
June 13, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 339 Memorandum in opposition to re #297 MOTION to Quash Writ of Attachment on Judgment by Bank of Japan filed by ALL PLAINTIFFS. (Cook, David)
June 13, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 338 MOTION for Sanctions by JAPAN BANK FOR INTERNATIONAL COOPERATION (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Hulme, James)
June 13, 2008 Opinion or Order NOTICE re #329 Affidavit; emailed to hkim@chadbourne.com, cc'd 29 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Please refile document, 2. The document is missing the caption of the case. (tg, )
June 13, 2008 Opinion or Order NOTICE re #337 Reply to opposition to Motion; emailed to cook@squeezebloodfromturnip.com, cc'd 29 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Please refile document, 2. Counsel is directed to refile the corrected proof of service attached to an Errata pleading (tg, )
June 12, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 337 ENTERED IN ERROR.....REPLY to opposition to motion re #286 MOTION to Appoint Receiver (Levied Bank Accounts) BY IBRD (with corrected proof of service) filed by ALL PLAINTIFFS. (Cook, David) Modified on 6/13/2008 (tg, ).
June 12, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 336 REPLY to opposition to motion re #286 MOTION to Appoint Receiver (Levied Bank Accounts) BY IBRD filed by ALL PLAINTIFFS. (Cook, David)
June 12, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 335 REPLY to opposition to motion re #286 MOTION to Appoint Receiver (Levied Bank Accounts) BY IFC filed by ALL PLAINTIFFS. (Cook, David)
June 12, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 334 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert W. Littleton on behalf of SIEMENS CORPORATION (Littleton, Robert)
June 12, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 333 Corporate Disclosure Statement by SIEMENS CORPORATION. (Steel, Laura)
June 12, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 332 MOTION to Quash Writ of Attachment on Judgment by SIEMENS CORPORATION (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Steel, Laura)
June 12, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 331 NOTICE of Appearance by Laura Nachowitz Steel on behalf of SIEMENS CORPORATION (Steel, Laura)
June 12, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 330 NOTICE Certificate of Service by INTERNATIONAL FINANCE CORPORATION re #309 Memorandum in Opposition,, (Vasquez, Francis)
June 12, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 329 ENTERED IN ERROR.....AFFIDAVIT of Service by EXPORT-IMPORT BANK OF KOREA. (Kim, Hwan) Modified on 6/13/2008 (tg, ).
June 12, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 328 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Jay R. Henneberry, Alan I. Raylesberg, and Karl H. Buch, :Firm- Chadbourne & Parke LLP, :Address- 1200 New Hampshire Avenue, N.W. Washington, DC 20036. Phone No. - (202) 974-5600. Fax No. - (202) 974-5602 by EXPORT-IMPORT BANK OF KOREA (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jay R. Henneberry, #2 Declaration of Alan I. Raylesberg, #3 Declaration of Karl H. Buch, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Kim, Hwan)
June 12, 2008 Opinion or Order NOTICE re #323 Notice (Other); emailed to fvasquez@whitecase.com, cc'd 27 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Please refile document, 2. The document is missing the caption of the case. (tg, )
June 11, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 326 ORDER granting #325 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 06/11/2008. (lcrcl2, )
June 11, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 325 Unopposed MOTION for Protective Order (Emergency Relief Sought) by OFFICE OF FOREIGN ASSETS CONTROL (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Peterson Subpoena, #2 Exhibit B Greenbaum Subpoena, #3 Exhibit Peterson Objection Letter, #4 Exhibit D Greenbaum Objection Letter, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(Bhattacharyya, Rupa)
June 11, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 324 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF SPECIFIC AUTHORITY by ALL PLAINTIFFS re #259 MOTION to Appoint Receiver, #286 MOTION to Appoint Receiver (Levied Bank Accounts) (Cook, David)
June 11, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 323 ENTERED IN ERROR.....NOTICE Certificate of Service by INTERNATIONAL FINANCE CORPORATION re #309 Memorandum in Opposition,, (Vasquez, Francis) Modified on 6/12/2008 (tg, ).
June 11, 2008 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: Docket Entry #321 Affidavit was entered in error as a separate docket entry and has been added to Docket Entry #320 Memorandum in Opposition. (nmw, )
June 10, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 322 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Joshua Dorchak and Jared R. Clark, :Firm- BINGHAM MCCUTCHEN LLP, :Address- 399 Park Avenue, NY, NY10022-4689. Phone No. - (212) 705-7770. Fax No. - (212) 752-5378 by BANK OF JAPAN (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Jared R. Clark, #2 Affidavit of Joshua Dorchak, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(nmw, )
June 10, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 321 ENTERED IN ERROR.....AFFIDAVIT re #320 Memorandum in Opposition, by EXPORT-IMPORT BANK OF KOREA. (Kim, Hwan) Modified on 6/11/2008 (nmw, ).
June 10, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 320 Memorandum in opposition to re #286 MOTION to Appoint Receiver (Levied Bank Accounts) filed by EXPORT-IMPORT BANK OF KOREA. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Hwan Kim, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Kim, Hwan) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/11/2008: #5 Certificate of Service) (nmw, ).
June 9, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 327 RESPONSE to #258 MOTION to Appoint Receiver (All Claims, Interim, Partial or Final Awards) MOTION to Appoint Receiver (All Claims, Interim, Partial or Final Awards) MOTION to Appoint Receiver (All Claims, Interim, Partial or Final Awards) MOTION to Appoint Receiver (All Claims, Interim, Partial or Final Awards) MOTION to Appoint Receiver (All Claims, Interim, Partial or Final Awards) MOTION to Appoint Receiver (All Claims, Interim, Partial or Final Awards) filed by INTERNATIONAL MONETARY FUND. (tg, ) "Let this be filed" by Judge Royce C. Lamberth.
June 9, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 319 ANSWER to Writ of Attachment on Judgment by STATE BANK OF INDIA, Garnishee. (tg, )
June 9, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 318 ANSWER to Writ of Attachment on Judgment by EXPORT-IMPORT BANK OF INDIA, Garnishee. (tg, )
June 9, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 317 ANSWER to Writ of Attachment on Judgment by OCCIDENTAL PETROLEUM CORPORATION, Garnishee. (tg, )
June 9, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 316 ANSWER to Writ of Attachment on Judgment by OCCIDENTAL INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION, Garnishee. (tg, )
June 6, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 315 REPLY to opposition to motion re #286 MOTION to Appoint Receiver (Levied Bank Accounts) By JBIC filed by ALL PLAINTIFFS. (Cook, David)
June 6, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 314 ANSWER to Writ of Garnishment by MITSUBISHI INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION, Garnishee. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Diane Knox, #2 Affidavit of Service)(Oh, Alex) Modified to correct text on 6/9/2008 (tg, ).
June 6, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 313 Corporate Disclosure Statement by MITSUBISHI INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION. (Oh, Alex)
June 6, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 312 NOTICE of Appearance by Alex Young K. Oh on behalf of MITSUBISHI INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION (Oh, Alex)
June 6, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 311 REPLY to opposition to motion re #273 MOTION to Quash Writ of Attachment and Memorandum in Support filed by JAPAN BANK FOR INTERNATIONAL COOPERATION. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hulme, James)
June 5, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 310 Memorandum in opposition to re #286 MOTION to Appoint Receiver (Levied Bank Accounts) filed by WORLD BANK. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C)(Green, Griffith)
June 5, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 309 Memorandum in opposition to re #286 MOTION to Appoint Receiver (Levied Bank Accounts) filed by INTERNATIONAL FINANCE CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Francis A. Vasquez, Jr., #2 Exhibit Vasquez Decl. Ex. 1, #3 Exhibit Vasquez Decl. Ex. 2, #4 Exhibit Vasquez Decl. Ex. 3, #5 Exhibit Vasquez Decl. Ex. 4, #6 Exhibit Vasquez Decl. Ex. 5, #7 Exhibit Vasquez Decl. Ex. 6, #8 Exhibit Vasquez Decl. Ex. 7, #9 Exhibit Vasquez Decl. Ex. 8, #10 Exhibit Vasquez Decl. Ex. 9, #11 Exhibit Vasquez Decl. Ex. 10, #12 Text of Proposed Order)(Vasquez, Francis)
June 5, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 308 Corporate Disclosure Statement by WORLD BANK. (Green, Griffith)
June 5, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 307 NOTICE of Appearance by Griffith L. Green on behalf of WORLD BANK (Green, Griffith)
June 5, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 306 MOTION to Quash Writ of Attachment on Judgment and To Be Excused From Further Proceedings by EXPORT-IMPORT BANK OF KOREA (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Hwan Kim, #2 Exhibit A Part 1, #3 Exhibit A Part 2, #4 Exhibit A Part 3, #5 Exhibit A Part 4, #6 Exhibit B, #7 Text of Proposed Order, #8 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Quash)(Kim, Hwan)
June 5, 2008 Opinion or Order NOTICE re #304 Notice (Other); emailed to hkim@chadbourne.com, cc'd 20 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Document title does not match docketed event, 2. Please refile document, 3. Counsel directed to refile the Motion and supporting documents under one entry. (tg, )
June 4, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 305 ENTERED IN ERROR.....MOTION to Quash Writ of Attachment by EXPORT-IMPORT BANK OF KOREA (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Hwan Kim, #2 Exhibit A - Part 1, #3 Exhibit A - Part 2, #4 Exhibit A Part 3, #5 Exhibit A Part 4, #6 Exhibit B, #7 Text of Proposed Order)(Kim, Hwan) Modified on 6/5/2008 (tg, ).
June 4, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 304 ENTERED IN ERROR.....NOTICE of Motion to Quash by EXPORT-IMPORT BANK OF KOREA re Writ Issued (Kim, Hwan) Modified on 6/5/2008 (tg, ).
June 4, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 303 ANSWER to Writ of Garnishment by EXPORT-IMPORT BANK OF KOREA. Objections to Writ Answer due by 6/3/2008. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Kim, Hwan)
June 4, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 302 LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by EXPORT-IMPORT BANK OF KOREA (Kim, Hwan)
June 4, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 301 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Reply, Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #286 MOTION to Appoint Receiver (Levied Bank Accounts) by EXPORT-IMPORT BANK OF KOREA (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kim, Hwan)
June 4, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 300 NOTICE of Appearance by Hwan Kim on behalf of EXPORT-IMPORT BANK OF KOREA (Kim, Hwan)
June 2, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 299 OBJECTIONS to Interrogatories in Attachment filed by BANK OF JAPAN. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(nmw, )
June 2, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 298 LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by BANK OF JAPAN (nmw, )
June 2, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 297 MOTION to Quash Writ of Attachment on Judgment by BANK OF JAPAN (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Motion, #2 Memorandum in Support, #3 Exhibit A to Memorandum, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(nmw, )
June 2, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 296 MOTION for Evidentiary Hearing by ALL PLAINTIFFS (tg, ) (See Docket Entry Number #295 to view document).
June 2, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 295 MOTION for Discovery and Holding Evidentiary Hearing to Determine the Interest of Iran in Certain Funds by ALL PLAINTIFFS (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Proof of Service)(Cook, David)
June 2, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 294 Memorandum in opposition to re #286 MOTION to Appoint Receiver (Levied Bank Accounts) filed by JAPAN BANK FOR INTERNATIONAL COOPERATION. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hulme, James)
June 1, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 293 REPLY to opposition to motion re #281 MOTION to Strike #277 Objection to Answer to Writ of JBIC filed by ALL PLAINTIFFS. (Cook, David)
May 30, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 292 MOTION for Leave to File Late Response to JBIC's Motion to Quash Writ of Attachment by ALL PLAINTIFFS (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Declaration, #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Proof of Service)(Cook, David)
May 30, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 291 Memorandum in opposition to re #273 MOTION to Quash Writ of Attachment and Memorandum in Support filed by ALL PLAINTIFFS. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of David J. Cook, #2 Proof of Service)(Cook, David)
May 30, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 290 ANSWER to Writ of Garnishment by ASIAN DEVELOPMENT BANK, Garnishee. (tg, )
May 27, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 289 Memorandum in opposition to re #281 MOTION to Strike #277 Objection to Answer to Writ of JBIC filed by JAPAN BANK FOR INTERNATIONAL COOPERATION. (Hulme, James)
May 23, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 288 ERRATA TO DECLARATION OF DAVID J. COOK, ESQ. IN SUPPORT OF SUR REPLY ETC. by ALL PLAINTIFFS #285 Surreply, filed by ALL PLAINTIFFS. (Cook, David)
May 20, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 286 MOTION to Appoint Receiver (Levied Bank Accounts) by ALL PLAINTIFFS (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Proof of Service)(Cook, David)
May 16, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 287 ANSWER to Writ of Garnishment by WORLD BANK. (tg, )
May 16, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 285 SURREPLY to re #273 MOTION to Quash Writ of Attachment and Memorandum in Support, #274 Emergency MOTION Shorten Time to Respond to JBIC's Motion to Quash re #273 MOTION to Quash Writ of Attachment and Memorandum in Support filed by ALL PLAINTIFFS. (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Cook, David)
May 16, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 284 NOTICE by JAPAN BANK FOR INTERNATIONAL COOPERATION (Hulme, James)
May 16, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 283 Memorandum in opposition to re #273 MOTION to Quash Writ of Attachment and Memorandum in Support, #274 Emergency MOTION Shorten Time to Respond to JBIC's Motion to Quash re #273 MOTION to Quash Writ of Attachment and Memorandum in Support Supplemental filed by ALL PLAINTIFFS. (Cook, David)
May 16, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 282 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION by ALL PLAINTIFFS (Fay, Thomas)
May 16, 2008 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: re Filing Fee Received was entered in error in this case. Please disregard the entry. (tg, )
May 16, 2008 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: re #280 Reply to Document, was entered in error and counsel was instructed to refile said pleading using the proper ECF event to docket a Surreply. (tg, )
May 16, 2008 Opinion or Order ENTERED IN ERROR.....Appeal Filing fee in the amount of $ 455.00 paid on 5/16/2008, receipt number 4616012406 (tg, ) Modified on 5/16/2008 (tg, ).
May 15, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 281 MOTION to Strike #277 Objection to Answer to Writ of JBIC by ALL PLAINTIFFS (Cook, David)
May 15, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 280 ENTERED IN ERROR.....REPLY re #274 Emergency MOTION Shorten Time to Respond to JBIC's Motion to Quash re #273 MOTION to Quash Writ of Attachment and Memorandum in Support Sur Reply filed by ALL PLAINTIFFS. (Cook, David) Modified on 5/16/2008 (tg, ).
May 15, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 279 REPLY to opposition to motion re #274 Emergency MOTION Shorten Time to Respond to JBIC's Motion to Quash re #273 MOTION to Quash Writ of Attachment and Memorandum in Support filed by JAPAN BANK FOR INTERNATIONAL COOPERATION. (Hulme, James)
May 15, 2008 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: re #278 Supplemental Memorandum, was entered in error and counsel was instructed to refile said pleading using the proper ECF event to docket a Memorandum in Opposition to Motion. (tg, )
May 14, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 278 ENTERED IN ERROR.....SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM to re #273 MOTION to Quash Writ of Attachment and Memorandum in Support, #274 Emergency MOTION Shorten Time to Respond to JBIC's Motion to Quash re #273 MOTION to Quash Writ of Attachment and Memorandum in Support filed by ALL PLAINTIFFS. (Cook, David) Modified on 5/15/2008 (tg, ).
May 14, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 277 OBJECTIONS to Answer to Writ by JAPAN BANK FOR INTERNATIONAL COOPERATION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (U.S. Marshal's Proof of Return of Service))(Hulme, James)
May 14, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 276 WITHDRAWN.....MOTION for Entry of Final Judgment Against Garnishee Japan Bank for International Cooperation by ALL PLAINTIFFS (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Entry of Judgment Against Garnishee Japan Bank For International Cooperation)(Fay, Thomas) Modified on 5/19/2008 (tg, ).
May 13, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 275 Memorandum in opposition to re #274 Emergency MOTION Shorten Time to Respond to JBIC's Motion to Quash re #273 MOTION to Quash Writ of Attachment and Memorandum in Support filed by ALL PLAINTIFFS. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proof of Service)(Cook, David)
May 13, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 274 Emergency MOTION Shorten Time to Respond to JBIC's Motion to Quash re #273 MOTION to Quash Writ of Attachment and Memorandum in Support by JAPAN BANK FOR INTERNATIONAL COOPERATION (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hulme, James)
May 13, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 273 MOTION to Quash Writ of Attachment and Memorandum in Support by JAPAN BANK FOR INTERNATIONAL COOPERATION (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit 1, Part 1, #3 Exhibit 1, Part 2, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4)(Hulme, James)
May 13, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 272 NOTICE of Appearance by James H. Hulme on behalf of JAPAN BANK FOR INTERNATIONAL COOPERATION (Hulme, James)
May 12, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 271 MOTION for Hearing For Status Call by ALL PLAINTIFFS (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order For Status Call)(Fay, Thomas)
May 9, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 269 ANSWER to Writ of Garnishment by INTERNATIONAL MONETARY FUND. (tg, )
May 7, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 267 Writ Returned Executed on 4-30-2008. (Attachments: #1 Supplement List of Controlled Entities)(Fay, Thomas)
May 7, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 266 Writ Returned Executed on 4-30-2008. (Attachments: #1 Supplement List of Controlled Entities)(Fay, Thomas)
May 7, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 265 Writ Returned Executed on 4-30-2008. (Attachments: #1 Supplement List of Controlled Entities)(Fay, Thomas)
May 7, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 264 Writ Returned Executed on 4-30-2008. (Attachments: #1 Supplement List of Controlled Entities)(Fay, Thomas)
May 7, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 263 Writ Returned Executed on 4-30-2008. (Attachments: #1 Supplement List of Controlled Entities)(Fay, Thomas)
May 7, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 262 Writ Returned Executed on 4-30-2008. (Attachments: #1 Supplement List of Controlled Entities)(Fay, Thomas)
May 7, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 261 Writ Returned Executed on 4-30-2008. (Attachments: #1 Supplement List of Controlled Entities)(Fay, Thomas)
May 6, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 270 ANSWER to Writ of Garnishment by HSBC. (tg, )
May 6, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 260 WITHDRAWN PURSUANT TO NOTICE FILED 03/27/09..... MOTION to Appoint Receiver (All Claims, Interim, Partial and Final Awards) by JOSEPH BOCCIA, EDNA BOHANNON, CATHERINE BONK, AVENELL CALLAHAN, BILLIE JEAN BOLINGER, CLARE CAMPUS, ROBBIE CEASAR, JAMES N. CONLEY, CHARLES S. COOK, BETTY COPELAND, DEBORAH D. PETERSON, LORRAINE MARY COULMAN, HAROLD L. COSNER, HEIDI LEGAULT, MARY M. MASON, B. CHRISTINE DEVLIN, EARLINE MILLER, MICHAEL ROBERT DUNNIGAN, DEBRA HORNER, JOHN R. BLOCKER, JOSEPH BOCCIA, SR, THOMAS FLUEGEL, PATRICIA WRIGHT, JEFFREY HASKELL, CYNTHIA D. LAKE, PATRICIA LEE HOLBERTON, LISA HUDSON, JAMES J. LANGON, SR, CHARLES F. COOK, ILA WALLACE, LEONA MAE VARGAS, BARBARA ESTES, MARILOU C. FLUEGEL, JAMES ABBOTT, RUBY A. FULCHER, BARBARA GALLAGHER, JULIANA RUDKOWSKI, JESS GARCIA, LEROY GHUMM, VALERIE GIBLIN, JUDY A. GORCHINSKI, ALICE GORDON, ROBERT B. ALLMAN, PATRICIA A. WRIGHT, JULIA HAIRSTON, RICHARD HASKELL, MARY ANN TUREK, DORIS P. HESTER, CYNTHIA D. HILDRETH, LEE HOLBERTON, HUDSON, HENRY HUKILL, JR, ELIZABETH IACOVINO, THOMAS C. BATES, SR, JOHN J. JACKOWSKI, SR, ELAINE M. JAMES, NATHALIE C. JENKINS, MARY L. BUCKNER, OLLIE JONES, MARY A. COBBLE, SHIRLEY MARTIN, FREAS KREISCHER, JR, WILLIAM LAISE, JAMES J. LANGON, THOMASINE BAYNARD, JOYCE HOUSTON, CHERYL A. COSSABOOM, MARLYS LEMNAH, BETTY LEWIS, ANNETTE LIVINGSTON, ALL PLAINTIFFS, PATRICIA CALLOWAY, LUDDIE BELMER, DEBBIE HORACE, ALICE W. BLOCKER (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Declaration, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B - Part 1 of 2, #5 Exhibit B - Part 2 of 2, #6 Exhibit C, #7 Exhibit D, #8 Exhibit E, #9 Exhibit F, #10 Exhibit G, #11 Exhibit H, #12 Exhibit I - Part 1 of 2, #13 Exhibit I - Part 2 of 2, #14 Exhibit J, #15 Exhibit K - Part 1 of 2, #16 Exhibit K - Part 2 of 2, #17 Exhibit L, #18 Exhibit M & N, #19 Exhibit O, #20 Exhibit P - Part 1 of 3, #21 Exhibit P - Part 2 of 3, #22 Exhibit P - Part 3 of 3, #23 Exhibit Q, #24 Text of Proposed Order, #25 Proof of Service)(Cook, David) Modified on 3/30/2009 (rdj, ).
May 6, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 259 MOTION to Appoint Receiver by JOSEPH BOCCIA, EDNA BOHANNON, CATHERINE BONK, AVENELL CALLAHAN, BILLIE JEAN BOLINGER, CLARE CAMPUS, ROBBIE CEASAR, JAMES N. CONLEY, CHARLES S. COOK, BETTY COPELAND, DEBORAH D. PETERSON, LORRAINE MARY COULMAN, HAROLD L. COSNER, HEIDI LEGAULT, MARY M. MASON, B. CHRISTINE DEVLIN, EARLINE MILLER, MICHAEL ROBERT DUNNIGAN, DEBRA HORNER, JOHN R. BLOCKER, JOSEPH BOCCIA, SR, THOMAS FLUEGEL, PATRICIA WRIGHT, JEFFREY HASKELL, CYNTHIA D. LAKE, PATRICIA LEE HOLBERTON, LISA HUDSON, JAMES J. LANGON, SR, CHARLES F. COOK, ILA WALLACE, LEONA MAE VARGAS, BARBARA ESTES, MARILOU C. FLUEGEL, JAMES ABBOTT, RUBY A. FULCHER, BARBARA GALLAGHER, JULIANA RUDKOWSKI, JESS GARCIA, LEROY GHUMM, VALERIE GIBLIN, JUDY A. GORCHINSKI, ALICE GORDON, ROBERT B. ALLMAN, PATRICIA A. WRIGHT, JULIA HAIRSTON, RICHARD HASKELL, MARY ANN TUREK, DORIS P. HESTER, CYNTHIA D. HILDRETH, LEE HOLBERTON, HUDSON, HENRY HUKILL, JR, ELIZABETH IACOVINO, THOMAS C. BATES, SR, JOHN J. JACKOWSKI, SR, ELAINE M. JAMES, NATHALIE C. JENKINS, MARY L. BUCKNER, OLLIE JONES, MARY A. COBBLE, SHIRLEY MARTIN, FREAS KREISCHER, JR, WILLIAM LAISE, JAMES J. LANGON, THOMASINE BAYNARD, JOYCE HOUSTON, CHERYL A. COSSABOOM, MARLYS LEMNAH, BETTY LEWIS, ANNETTE LIVINGSTON, ALL PLAINTIFFS, PATRICIA CALLOWAY, LUDDIE BELMER, DEBBIE HORACE, ALICE W. BLOCKER (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Declaration, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C & D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F - H, #8 Exhibit I, #9 Exhibit J, K, #10 Exhibit L, #11 Exhibit M - T, #12 Exhibit U - AA, #13 Text of Proposed Order, #14 Proof of Service)(Cook, David)
May 6, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 258 MOTION to Appoint Receiver (All Claims, Interim, Partial or Final Awards) by JOSEPH BOCCIA, EDNA BOHANNON, CATHERINE BONK, AVENELL CALLAHAN, BILLIE JEAN BOLINGER, CLARE CAMPUS, ROBBIE CEASAR, JAMES N. CONLEY, CHARLES S. COOK, BETTY COPELAND, DEBORAH D. PETERSON, LORRAINE MARY COULMAN, HAROLD L. COSNER, HEIDI LEGAULT, MARY M. MASON, B. CHRISTINE DEVLIN, EARLINE MILLER, MICHAEL ROBERT DUNNIGAN, DEBRA HORNER, JOHN R. BLOCKER, JOSEPH BOCCIA, SR, THOMAS FLUEGEL, PATRICIA WRIGHT, JEFFREY HASKELL, CYNTHIA D. LAKE, PATRICIA LEE HOLBERTON, LISA HUDSON, JAMES J. LANGON, SR, CHARLES F. COOK, ILA WALLACE, LEONA MAE VARGAS, BARBARA ESTES, MARILOU C. FLUEGEL, JAMES ABBOTT, RUBY A. FULCHER, BARBARA GALLAGHER, JULIANA RUDKOWSKI, JESS GARCIA, LEROY GHUMM, VALERIE GIBLIN, JUDY A. GORCHINSKI, ALICE GORDON, ROBERT B. ALLMAN, PATRICIA A. WRIGHT, JULIA HAIRSTON, RICHARD HASKELL, MARY ANN TUREK, DORIS P. HESTER, CYNTHIA D. HILDRETH, LEE HOLBERTON, HUDSON, HENRY HUKILL, JR, ELIZABETH IACOVINO, THOMAS C. BATES, SR, JOHN J. JACKOWSKI, SR, ELAINE M. JAMES, NATHALIE C. JENKINS, MARY L. BUCKNER, OLLIE JONES, MARY A. COBBLE, SHIRLEY MARTIN, FREAS KREISCHER, JR, WILLIAM LAISE, JAMES J. LANGON, THOMASINE BAYNARD, JOYCE HOUSTON, CHERYL A. COSSABOOM, MARLYS LEMNAH, BETTY LEWIS, ANNETTE LIVINGSTON, ALL PLAINTIFFS, PATRICIA CALLOWAY, LUDDIE BELMER, DEBBIE HORACE, ALICE W. BLOCKER (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Proof of Service)(Cook, David)
May 6, 2008 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRIES: re #255 MOTION to Appoint Receiver, #257 MOTION to Appoint Receiver, #254 MOTION to Appoint Receiver and #256 MOTION to Appoint Receiver were entered in error and counsel was reminded to review this Court's Local Rules re filings of bulky exhibits, he was also reminded and instructed once again to refile his Motion and its attachments under one entry. (tg, )
May 5, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 268 ANSWER to Writ of Garnishment by ABU DHABI INTERNATIONAL BANK. (tg, )
May 5, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 257 ENTERED IN ERROR.....MOTION to Appoint Receiver Exhibits to Declaration of David J. Cook; Exhibit K - Part 1 of 2; by JOSEPH BOCCIA, EDNA BOHANNON, CATHERINE BONK, AVENELL CALLAHAN, BILLIE JEAN BOLINGER, CLARE CAMPUS, ROBBIE CEASAR, JAMES N. CONLEY, CHARLES S. COOK, BETTY COPELAND, DEBORAH D. PETERSON, LORRAINE MARY COULMAN, HAROLD L. COSNER, HEIDI LEGAULT, MARY M. MASON, B. CHRISTINE DEVLIN, EARLINE MILLER, MICHAEL ROBERT DUNNIGAN, DEBRA HORNER, JOHN R. BLOCKER, JOSEPH BOCCIA, SR, THOMAS FLUEGEL, PATRICIA WRIGHT, JEFFREY HASKELL, CYNTHIA D. LAKE, PATRICIA LEE HOLBERTON, LISA HUDSON, JAMES J. LANGON, SR, CHARLES F. COOK, ILA WALLACE, LEONA MAE VARGAS, BARBARA ESTES, MARILOU C. FLUEGEL, JAMES ABBOTT, RUBY A. FULCHER, BARBARA GALLAGHER, JULIANA RUDKOWSKI, JESS GARCIA, LEROY GHUMM, VALERIE GIBLIN, JUDY A. GORCHINSKI, ALICE GORDON, ROBERT B. ALLMAN, PATRICIA A. WRIGHT, JULIA HAIRSTON, RICHARD HASKELL, MARY ANN TUREK, DORIS P. HESTER, CYNTHIA D. HILDRETH, LEE HOLBERTON, HUDSON, HENRY HUKILL, JR, ELIZABETH IACOVINO, THOMAS C. BATES, SR, JOHN J. JACKOWSKI, SR, ELAINE M. JAMES, NATHALIE C. JENKINS, MARY L. BUCKNER, OLLIE JONES, MARY A. COBBLE, SHIRLEY MARTIN, FREAS KREISCHER, JR, WILLIAM LAISE, JAMES J. LANGON, THOMASINE BAYNARD, JOYCE HOUSTON, CHERYL A. COSSABOOM, MARLYS LEMNAH, BETTY LEWIS, ANNETTE LIVINGSTON, ALL PLAINTIFFS, PATRICIA CALLOWAY, LUDDIE BELMER, DEBBIE HORACE, ALICE W. BLOCKER (Attachments: #1 Exhibit K - Part 2 of 2, #2 Exhibit L - N, #3 Exhibit O, #4 Exhibit P - Part 1 of 3, #5 Exhibit P - Part 2 of 3, #6 Exhibit P - Part 3 of 3, #7 Exhibit Q)(Cook, David) Modified on 5/6/2008 (tg, ).
May 5, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 256 ENTERED IN ERROR.....MOTION to Appoint Receiver Exhibits to Declaration of David J. Cook; Exhibit E; by JOSEPH BOCCIA, EDNA BOHANNON, CATHERINE BONK, AVENELL CALLAHAN, BILLIE JEAN BOLINGER, CLARE CAMPUS, ROBBIE CEASAR, JAMES N. CONLEY, CHARLES S. COOK, BETTY COPELAND, DEBORAH D. PETERSON, LORRAINE MARY COULMAN, HAROLD L. COSNER, HEIDI LEGAULT, MARY M. MASON, B. CHRISTINE DEVLIN, EARLINE MILLER, MICHAEL ROBERT DUNNIGAN, DEBRA HORNER, JOHN R. BLOCKER, JOSEPH BOCCIA, SR, THOMAS FLUEGEL, PATRICIA WRIGHT, JEFFREY HASKELL, CYNTHIA D. LAKE, PATRICIA LEE HOLBERTON, LISA HUDSON, JAMES J. LANGON, SR, CHARLES F. COOK, ILA WALLACE, LEONA MAE VARGAS, BARBARA ESTES, MARILOU C. FLUEGEL, JAMES ABBOTT, RUBY A. FULCHER, BARBARA GALLAGHER, JULIANA RUDKOWSKI, JESS GARCIA, LEROY GHUMM, VALERIE GIBLIN, JUDY A. GORCHINSKI, ALICE GORDON, ROBERT B. ALLMAN, PATRICIA A. WRIGHT, JULIA HAIRSTON, RICHARD HASKELL, MARY ANN TUREK, DORIS P. HESTER, CYNTHIA D. HILDRETH, LEE HOLBERTON, HUDSON, HENRY HUKILL, JR, ELIZABETH IACOVINO, THOMAS C. BATES, SR, JOHN J. JACKOWSKI, SR, ELAINE M. JAMES, NATHALIE C. JENKINS, MARY L. BUCKNER, OLLIE JONES, MARY A. COBBLE, SHIRLEY MARTIN, FREAS KREISCHER, JR, WILLIAM LAISE, JAMES J. LANGON, THOMASINE BAYNARD, JOYCE HOUSTON, CHERYL A. COSSABOOM, MARLYS LEMNAH, BETTY LEWIS, ANNETTE LIVINGSTON, ALL PLAINTIFFS, PATRICIA CALLOWAY, LUDDIE BELMER, DEBBIE HORACE, ALICE W. BLOCKER (Attachments: #1 Exhibit F, #2 Exhibit G, #3 Exhibit H, #4 Exhibit I - Part 1 of 2, #5 Exhibit I - Part 2 of 2, #6 Exhibit J)(Cook, David) Modified on 5/6/2008 (tg, ).
May 5, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 255 ENTERED IN ERROR.....MOTION to Appoint Receiver Declaration of David J. Cook, Esq. in Support of (All Claims, Interim, Partial or Final Awards) by JOSEPH BOCCIA, EDNA BOHANNON, CATHERINE BONK, AVENELL CALLAHAN, BILLIE JEAN BOLINGER, CLARE CAMPUS, ROBBIE CEASAR, JAMES N. CONLEY, CHARLES S. COOK, BETTY COPELAND, DEBORAH D. PETERSON, LORRAINE MARY COULMAN, HAROLD L. COSNER, HEIDI LEGAULT, MARY M. MASON, B. CHRISTINE DEVLIN, EARLINE MILLER, MICHAEL ROBERT DUNNIGAN, DEBRA HORNER, JOHN R. BLOCKER, JOSEPH BOCCIA, SR, THOMAS FLUEGEL, PATRICIA WRIGHT, JEFFREY HASKELL, CYNTHIA D. LAKE, PATRICIA LEE HOLBERTON, LISA HUDSON, JAMES J. LANGON, SR, CHARLES F. COOK, ILA WALLACE, LEONA MAE VARGAS, BARBARA ESTES, MARILOU C. FLUEGEL, JAMES ABBOTT, RUBY A. FULCHER, BARBARA GALLAGHER, JULIANA RUDKOWSKI, JESS GARCIA, LEROY GHUMM, VALERIE GIBLIN, JUDY A. GORCHINSKI, ALICE GORDON, ROBERT B. ALLMAN, PATRICIA A. WRIGHT, JULIA HAIRSTON, RICHARD HASKELL, MARY ANN TUREK, DORIS P. HESTER, CYNTHIA D. HILDRETH, LEE HOLBERTON, HUDSON, HENRY HUKILL, JR, ELIZABETH IACOVINO, THOMAS C. BATES, SR, JOHN J. JACKOWSKI, SR, ELAINE M. JAMES, NATHALIE C. JENKINS, MARY L. BUCKNER, OLLIE JONES, MARY A. COBBLE, SHIRLEY MARTIN, FREAS KREISCHER, JR, WILLIAM LAISE, JAMES J. LANGON, THOMASINE BAYNARD, JOYCE HOUSTON, CHERYL A. COSSABOOM, MARLYS LEMNAH, BETTY LEWIS, ANNETTE LIVINGSTON, ALL PLAINTIFFS, PATRICIA CALLOWAY, LUDDIE BELMER, DEBBIE HORACE, ALICE W. BLOCKER (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B - Part 1 of 2, #3 Exhibit B - Part 2 of 2, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D)(Cook, David) Modified on 5/6/2008 (tg, ).
May 5, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 254 ENTERED IN ERROR.....MOTION to Appoint Receiver (All Claims, Interim, Partial, or Final Awards) by JOSEPH BOCCIA, EDNA BOHANNON, CATHERINE BONK, AVENELL CALLAHAN, BILLIE JEAN BOLINGER, CLARE CAMPUS, ROBBIE CEASAR, JAMES N. CONLEY, CHARLES S. COOK, BETTY COPELAND, DEBORAH D. PETERSON, LORRAINE MARY COULMAN, HAROLD L. COSNER, HEIDI LEGAULT, MARY M. MASON, B. CHRISTINE DEVLIN, EARLINE MILLER, MICHAEL ROBERT DUNNIGAN, DEBRA HORNER, JOHN R. BLOCKER, JOSEPH BOCCIA, SR, THOMAS FLUEGEL, PATRICIA WRIGHT, JEFFREY HASKELL, CYNTHIA D. LAKE, PATRICIA LEE HOLBERTON, LISA HUDSON, JAMES J. LANGON, SR, CHARLES F. COOK, ILA WALLACE, LEONA MAE VARGAS, BARBARA ESTES, MARILOU C. FLUEGEL, JAMES ABBOTT, RUBY A. FULCHER, BARBARA GALLAGHER, JULIANA RUDKOWSKI, JESS GARCIA, LEROY GHUMM, VALERIE GIBLIN, JUDY A. GORCHINSKI, ALICE GORDON, ROBERT B. ALLMAN, PATRICIA A. WRIGHT, JULIA HAIRSTON, RICHARD HASKELL, MARY ANN TUREK, DORIS P. HESTER, CYNTHIA D. HILDRETH, LEE HOLBERTON, HUDSON, HENRY HUKILL, JR, ELIZABETH IACOVINO, THOMAS C. BATES, SR, JOHN J. JACKOWSKI, SR, ELAINE M. JAMES, NATHALIE C. JENKINS, MARY L. BUCKNER, OLLIE JONES, MARY A. COBBLE, SHIRLEY MARTIN, FREAS KREISCHER, JR, WILLIAM LAISE, JAMES J. LANGON, THOMASINE BAYNARD, JOYCE HOUSTON, CHERYL A. COSSABOOM, MARLYS LEMNAH, BETTY LEWIS, ANNETTE LIVINGSTON, ALL PLAINTIFFS, PATRICIA CALLOWAY, LUDDIE BELMER, DEBBIE HORACE, ALICE W. BLOCKER (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Proof of Service)(Cook, David) Modified on 5/6/2008 (tg, ).
May 1, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 253 MOTION for Order For Payment of Special Master Kruger by ALL PLAINTIFFS (Attachments: #1 Supplement Voucher for Payment, #2 Supplement Receipts for Expenses, #3 Text of Proposed Order Order For Payment)(Fay, Thomas)
April 30, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 252 MOTION to Appoint Receiver by JOSEPH BOCCIA, EDNA BOHANNON, CATHERINE BONK, AVENELL CALLAHAN, BILLIE JEAN BOLINGER, CLARE CAMPUS, ROBBIE CEASAR, JAMES N. CONLEY, CHARLES S. COOK, BETTY COPELAND, DEBORAH D. PETERSON, LORRAINE MARY COULMAN, HAROLD L. COSNER, HEIDI LEGAULT, MARY M. MASON, B. CHRISTINE DEVLIN, EARLINE MILLER, MICHAEL ROBERT DUNNIGAN, DEBRA HORNER, JOHN R. BLOCKER, JOSEPH BOCCIA, SR, THOMAS FLUEGEL, PATRICIA WRIGHT, JEFFREY HASKELL, CYNTHIA D. LAKE, PATRICIA LEE HOLBERTON, LISA HUDSON, JAMES J. LANGON, SR, CHARLES F. COOK, ILA WALLACE, LEONA MAE VARGAS, BARBARA ESTES, MARILOU C. FLUEGEL, JAMES ABBOTT, RUBY A. FULCHER, BARBARA GALLAGHER, JULIANA RUDKOWSKI, JESS GARCIA, LEROY GHUMM, VALERIE GIBLIN, JUDY A. GORCHINSKI, ALICE GORDON, ROBERT B. ALLMAN, PATRICIA A. WRIGHT, JULIA HAIRSTON, RICHARD HASKELL, MARY ANN TUREK, DORIS P. HESTER, CYNTHIA D. HILDRETH, LEE HOLBERTON, HUDSON, HENRY HUKILL, JR, ELIZABETH IACOVINO, THOMAS C. BATES, SR, JOHN J. JACKOWSKI, SR, ELAINE M. JAMES, NATHALIE C. JENKINS, MARY L. BUCKNER, OLLIE JONES, MARY A. COBBLE, SHIRLEY MARTIN, FREAS KREISCHER, JR, WILLIAM LAISE, JAMES J. LANGON, THOMASINE BAYNARD, JOYCE HOUSTON, CHERYL A. COSSABOOM, MARLYS LEMNAH, BETTY LEWIS, ANNETTE LIVINGSTON, ALL PLAINTIFFS, PATRICIA CALLOWAY, LUDDIE BELMER, DEBBIE HORACE, ALICE W. BLOCKER (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Certificate of Service, #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Certificate of Service Additional)(Cook, David)
April 29, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 251 MOTION to Appoint Receiver [All U.S. Bank Accounts] by JOSEPH BOCCIA, EDNA BOHANNON, CATHERINE BONK, AVENELL CALLAHAN, BILLIE JEAN BOLINGER, CLARE CAMPUS, ROBBIE CEASAR, JAMES N. CONLEY, CHARLES S. COOK, BETTY COPELAND, DEBORAH D. PETERSON, LORRAINE MARY COULMAN, HAROLD L. COSNER, HEIDI LEGAULT, MARY M. MASON, B. CHRISTINE DEVLIN, EARLINE MILLER, MICHAEL ROBERT DUNNIGAN, DEBRA HORNER, JOHN R. BLOCKER, JOSEPH BOCCIA, SR, THOMAS FLUEGEL, PATRICIA WRIGHT, JEFFREY HASKELL, CYNTHIA D. LAKE, PATRICIA LEE HOLBERTON, LISA HUDSON, JAMES J. LANGON, SR, CHARLES F. COOK, ILA WALLACE, LEONA MAE VARGAS, BARBARA ESTES, MARILOU C. FLUEGEL, JAMES ABBOTT, RUBY A. FULCHER, BARBARA GALLAGHER, JULIANA RUDKOWSKI, JESS GARCIA, LEROY GHUMM, VALERIE GIBLIN, JUDY A. GORCHINSKI, ALICE GORDON, ROBERT B. ALLMAN, JULIA HAIRSTON, RICHARD HASKELL, MARY ANN TUREK, DORIS P. HESTER, CYNTHIA D. HILDRETH, LEE HOLBERTON, HUDSON, HENRY HUKILL, JR, ELIZABETH IACOVINO, THOMAS C. BATES, SR, JOHN J. JACKOWSKI, SR, ELAINE M. JAMES, NATHALIE C. JENKINS, MARY L. BUCKNER, OLLIE JONES, MARY A. COBBLE, SHIRLEY MARTIN, FREAS KREISCHER, JR, WILLIAM LAISE, JAMES J. LANGON, THOMASINE BAYNARD, JOYCE HOUSTON, CHERYL A. COSSABOOM, MARLYS LEMNAH, BETTY LEWIS, ANNETTE LIVINGSTON, ALL PLAINTIFFS, PATRICIA CALLOWAY, LUDDIE BELMER, DEBBIE HORACE, ALICE W. BLOCKER (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Declaration, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B - Part 1 of 2, #5 Exhibit B - Part 2 of 2, #6 Exhibit C, #7 Exhibit D, #8 Text of Proposed Order, #9 Certificate of Service)(Cook, David)
April 29, 2008 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: re #250 MOTION to Appoint Receiver Proposed Order , #249 MOTION to Appoint Receiver Proof of Service were entered in error as separate motions and counsel is instructed to refiled said pleadings as part of the Motion to Appoint Receiver when it is refiled.(nmw, )
April 28, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 250 ENTERED IN ERROR..... MOTION to Appoint Receiver Proposed Order (with service list) by JOSEPH BOCCIA, EDNA BOHANNON, CATHERINE BONK, AVENELL CALLAHAN, BILLIE JEAN BOLINGER, CLARE CAMPUS, ROBBIE CEASAR, JAMES N. CONLEY, CHARLES S. COOK, BETTY COPELAND, DEBORAH D. PETERSON, LORRAINE MARY COULMAN, HAROLD L. COSNER, HEIDI LEGAULT, MARY M. MASON, B. CHRISTINE DEVLIN, EARLINE MILLER, MICHAEL ROBERT DUNNIGAN, DEBRA HORNER, JOHN R. BLOCKER, JOSEPH BOCCIA, SR, THOMAS FLUEGEL, PATRICIA WRIGHT, JEFFREY HASKELL, CYNTHIA D. LAKE, PATRICIA LEE HOLBERTON, LISA HUDSON, JAMES J. LANGON, SR, CHARLES F. COOK, ILA WALLACE, LEONA MAE VARGAS, BARBARA ESTES, MARILOU C. FLUEGEL, JAMES ABBOTT, RUBY A. FULCHER, BARBARA GALLAGHER, JULIANA RUDKOWSKI, JESS GARCIA, LEROY GHUMM, VALERIE GIBLIN, JUDY A. GORCHINSKI, ALICE GORDON, ROBERT B. ALLMAN, PATRICIA A. WRIGHT, JULIA HAIRSTON, RICHARD HASKELL, MARY ANN TUREK, DORIS P. HESTER, CYNTHIA D. HILDRETH, LEE HOLBERTON, HUDSON, HENRY HUKILL, JR, ELIZABETH IACOVINO, THOMAS C. BATES, SR, JOHN J. JACKOWSKI, SR, ELAINE M. JAMES, NATHALIE C. JENKINS, MARY L. BUCKNER, OLLIE JONES, MARY A. COBBLE, SHIRLEY MARTIN, FREAS KREISCHER, JR, WILLIAM LAISE, JAMES J. LANGON, THOMASINE BAYNARD, JOYCE HOUSTON, CHERYL A. COSSABOOM, MARLYS LEMNAH, BETTY LEWIS, ANNETTE LIVINGSTON, ALL PLAINTIFFS, PATRICIA CALLOWAY, LUDDIE BELMER, DEBBIE HORACE, ALICE W. BLOCKER (Cook, David) Modified on 4/29/2008 (nmw, ).
April 28, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 249 ENTERED IN ERROR..... MOTION to Appoint Receiver Proof of Service by JOSEPH BOCCIA, EDNA BOHANNON, CATHERINE BONK, AVENELL CALLAHAN, BILLIE JEAN BOLINGER, CLARE CAMPUS, ROBBIE CEASAR, JAMES N. CONLEY, CHARLES S. COOK, BETTY COPELAND, DEBORAH D. PETERSON, LORRAINE MARY COULMAN, HAROLD L. COSNER, HEIDI LEGAULT, MARY M. MASON, B. CHRISTINE DEVLIN, EARLINE MILLER, MICHAEL ROBERT DUNNIGAN, DEBRA HORNER, JOHN R. BLOCKER, JOSEPH BOCCIA, SR, THOMAS FLUEGEL, PATRICIA WRIGHT, JEFFREY HASKELL, CYNTHIA D. LAKE, PATRICIA LEE HOLBERTON, LISA HUDSON, JAMES J. LANGON, SR, CHARLES F. COOK, ILA WALLACE, LEONA MAE VARGAS, BARBARA ESTES, MARILOU C. FLUEGEL, JAMES ABBOTT, RUBY A. FULCHER, BARBARA GALLAGHER, JULIANA RUDKOWSKI, JESS GARCIA, LEROY GHUMM, VALERIE GIBLIN, JUDY A. GORCHINSKI, ALICE GORDON, ROBERT B. ALLMAN, PATRICIA A. WRIGHT, JULIA HAIRSTON, RICHARD HASKELL, MARY ANN TUREK, DORIS P. HESTER, CYNTHIA D. HILDRETH, LEE HOLBERTON, HUDSON, HENRY HUKILL, JR, ELIZABETH IACOVINO, THOMAS C. BATES, SR, JOHN J. JACKOWSKI, SR, ELAINE M. JAMES, NATHALIE C. JENKINS, MARY L. BUCKNER, OLLIE JONES, MARY A. COBBLE, SHIRLEY MARTIN, FREAS KREISCHER, JR, WILLIAM LAISE, JAMES J. LANGON, THOMASINE BAYNARD, JOYCE HOUSTON, CHERYL A. COSSABOOM, MARLYS LEMNAH, BETTY LEWIS, ANNETTE LIVINGSTON, ALL PLAINTIFFS, PATRICIA CALLOWAY, LUDDIE BELMER, DEBBIE HORACE, ALICE W. BLOCKER (Cook, David) Modified on 4/29/2008 (nmw, ).
April 28, 2008 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRIES: re #248 MOTION to Appoint Receiver Exhibits M - AA, #246 MOTION to Appoint Receiver Exhibits D - I, #244 MOTION to Appoint Receiver, #247 MOTION to Appoint Receiver Exhibits J - L, #245 MOTION to Appoint Receiver Declaration of David J. Cook, Esq. MOTION to Appoint Receiver Declaration of David J. Cook, Esq. MOTION to Appoint Receiver Declaration of David J. Cook, Esq. MOTION to Appoint Receiver, MOTION to Appoint Receiver Declaration of David J. Cook, Esq., MOTION to Appoint Receiver, and MOTION to Appoint Receiver Declaration of David J. Cook, Esq. were entered in error. Counsel erroneously utilized the ECF Motion event to docket attachments to a motion. Counsel was instructed to properly refile one Motion with attachments under one entry.(tg, )
April 27, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 248 ENTERED IN ERROR.....MOTION to Appoint Receiver Exhibits M - AA to Declaration of David J. Cook by JOSEPH BOCCIA, EDNA BOHANNON, CATHERINE BONK, AVENELL CALLAHAN, BILLIE JEAN BOLINGER, CLARE CAMPUS, ROBBIE CEASAR, JAMES N. CONLEY, CHARLES S. COOK, BETTY COPELAND, DEBORAH D. PETERSON, LORRAINE MARY COULMAN, HAROLD L. COSNER, HEIDI LEGAULT, MARY M. MASON, B. CHRISTINE DEVLIN, EARLINE MILLER, MICHAEL ROBERT DUNNIGAN, DEBRA HORNER, JOHN R. BLOCKER, JOSEPH BOCCIA, SR, THOMAS FLUEGEL, PATRICIA WRIGHT, JEFFREY HASKELL, CYNTHIA D. LAKE, PATRICIA LEE HOLBERTON, LISA HUDSON, JAMES J. LANGON, SR, CHARLES F. COOK, ILA WALLACE, LEONA MAE VARGAS, BARBARA ESTES, MARILOU C. FLUEGEL, JAMES ABBOTT, RUBY A. FULCHER, BARBARA GALLAGHER, JULIANA RUDKOWSKI, JESS GARCIA, LEROY GHUMM, VALERIE GIBLIN, JUDY A. GORCHINSKI, ALICE GORDON, ROBERT B. ALLMAN, PATRICIA A. WRIGHT, JULIA HAIRSTON, RICHARD HASKELL, MARY ANN TUREK, DORIS P. HESTER, CYNTHIA D. HILDRETH, LEE HOLBERTON, HUDSON, HENRY HUKILL, JR, ELIZABETH IACOVINO, THOMAS C. BATES, SR, JOHN J. JACKOWSKI, SR, ELAINE M. JAMES, NATHALIE C. JENKINS, MARY L. BUCKNER, OLLIE JONES, MARY A. COBBLE, SHIRLEY MARTIN, FREAS KREISCHER, JR, WILLIAM LAISE, JAMES J. LANGON, THOMASINE BAYNARD, JOYCE HOUSTON, CHERYL A. COSSABOOM, MARLYS LEMNAH, BETTY LEWIS, ANNETTE LIVINGSTON, ALL PLAINTIFFS, PATRICIA CALLOWAY, LUDDIE BELMER, DEBBIE HORACE, ALICE W. BLOCKER (Attachments: #1 Exhibit S-U, #2 Exhibit V - AA)(Cook, David) Modified on 4/28/2008 (tg, ).
April 27, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 247 ENTERED IN ERROR.....MOTION to Appoint Receiver Exhibits J - L to Declaration of David J. Cook by JOSEPH BOCCIA, EDNA BOHANNON, CATHERINE BONK, AVENELL CALLAHAN, BILLIE JEAN BOLINGER, CLARE CAMPUS, ROBBIE CEASAR, JAMES N. CONLEY, CHARLES S. COOK, BETTY COPELAND, DEBORAH D. PETERSON, LORRAINE MARY COULMAN, HAROLD L. COSNER, HEIDI LEGAULT, MARY M. MASON, B. CHRISTINE DEVLIN, EARLINE MILLER, MICHAEL ROBERT DUNNIGAN, DEBRA HORNER, JOHN R. BLOCKER, JOSEPH BOCCIA, SR, THOMAS FLUEGEL, PATRICIA WRIGHT, JEFFREY HASKELL, CYNTHIA D. LAKE, PATRICIA LEE HOLBERTON, LISA HUDSON, JAMES J. LANGON, SR, CHARLES F. COOK, ILA WALLACE, LEONA MAE VARGAS, BARBARA ESTES, MARILOU C. FLUEGEL, JAMES ABBOTT, RUBY A. FULCHER, BARBARA GALLAGHER, JULIANA RUDKOWSKI, JESS GARCIA, LEROY GHUMM, VALERIE GIBLIN, JUDY A. GORCHINSKI, ALICE GORDON, ROBERT B. ALLMAN, PATRICIA A. WRIGHT, JULIA HAIRSTON, RICHARD HASKELL, MARY ANN TUREK, DORIS P. HESTER, CYNTHIA D. HILDRETH, LEE HOLBERTON, HUDSON, HENRY HUKILL, JR, ELIZABETH IACOVINO, THOMAS C. BATES, SR, JOHN J. JACKOWSKI, SR, ELAINE M. JAMES, NATHALIE C. JENKINS, MARY L. BUCKNER, OLLIE JONES, MARY A. COBBLE, SHIRLEY MARTIN, FREAS KREISCHER, JR, WILLIAM LAISE, JAMES J. LANGON, THOMASINE BAYNARD, JOYCE HOUSTON, CHERYL A. COSSABOOM, MARLYS LEMNAH, BETTY LEWIS, ANNETTE LIVINGSTON, ALL PLAINTIFFS, PATRICIA CALLOWAY, LUDDIE BELMER, DEBBIE HORACE, ALICE W. BLOCKER (Attachments: #1 Exhibit K, #2 Exhibit L - Part 1 of 3, #3 Exhibit L - Part 2 of 3, #4 Exhibit L - Part 3 of 3)(Cook, David) Modified on 4/28/2008 (tg, ).
April 27, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 246 ENTERED IN ERROR.....MOTION to Appoint Receiver Exhibits D - I to Declaration of David J. Cook by JOSEPH BOCCIA, EDNA BOHANNON, CATHERINE BONK, AVENELL CALLAHAN, BILLIE JEAN BOLINGER, CLARE CAMPUS, ROBBIE CEASAR, JAMES N. CONLEY, CHARLES S. COOK, BETTY COPELAND, DEBORAH D. PETERSON, LORRAINE MARY COULMAN, HAROLD L. COSNER, HEIDI LEGAULT, MARY M. MASON, B. CHRISTINE DEVLIN, EARLINE MILLER, MICHAEL ROBERT DUNNIGAN, DEBRA HORNER, JOHN R. BLOCKER, JOSEPH BOCCIA, SR, THOMAS FLUEGEL, PATRICIA WRIGHT, JEFFREY HASKELL, CYNTHIA D. LAKE, PATRICIA LEE HOLBERTON, LISA HUDSON, JAMES J. LANGON, SR, CHARLES F. COOK, ILA WALLACE, LEONA MAE VARGAS, BARBARA ESTES, MARILOU C. FLUEGEL, JAMES ABBOTT, RUBY A. FULCHER, BARBARA GALLAGHER, JULIANA RUDKOWSKI, JESS GARCIA, LEROY GHUMM, VALERIE GIBLIN, JUDY A. GORCHINSKI, ALICE GORDON, ROBERT B. ALLMAN, PATRICIA A. WRIGHT, JULIA HAIRSTON, RICHARD HASKELL, MARY ANN TUREK, DORIS P. HESTER, CYNTHIA D. HILDRETH, LEE HOLBERTON, HUDSON, HENRY HUKILL, JR, ELIZABETH IACOVINO, THOMAS C. BATES, SR, JOHN J. JACKOWSKI, SR, ELAINE M. JAMES, NATHALIE C. JENKINS, MARY L. BUCKNER, OLLIE JONES, MARY A. COBBLE, SHIRLEY MARTIN, FREAS KREISCHER, JR, WILLIAM LAISE, JAMES J. LANGON, THOMASINE BAYNARD, JOYCE HOUSTON, CHERYL A. COSSABOOM, MARLYS LEMNAH, BETTY LEWIS, ANNETTE LIVINGSTON, ALL PLAINTIFFS, PATRICIA CALLOWAY, LUDDIE BELMER, DEBBIE HORACE, ALICE W. BLOCKER (Attachments: #1 Exhibit E, #2 Exhibit F, #3 Exhibit G, #4 Exhibit H, #5 Exhibit I)(Cook, David) Modified on 4/28/2008 (tg, ).
April 27, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 245 ENTERED IN ERROR.....MOTION to Appoint Receiver Declaration of David J. Cook, Esq. in Support of (Exhibits cont'd under separate docket number) by JOSEPH BOCCIA, EDNA BOHANNON, CATHERINE BONK, AVENELL CALLAHAN, BILLIE JEAN BOLINGER, CLARE CAMPUS, ROBBIE CEASAR, JAMES N. CONLEY, CHARLES S. COOK, BETTY COPELAND, DEBORAH D. PETERSON, LORRAINE MARY COULMAN, HAROLD L. COSNER, HEIDI LEGAULT, MARY M. MASON, B. CHRISTINE DEVLIN, EARLINE MILLER, MICHAEL ROBERT DUNNIGAN, DEBRA HORNER, JOHN R. BLOCKER, JOSEPH BOCCIA, SR, THOMAS FLUEGEL, PATRICIA WRIGHT, JEFFREY HASKELL, CYNTHIA D. LAKE, PATRICIA LEE HOLBERTON, LISA HUDSON, JAMES J. LANGON, SR, CHARLES F. COOK, ILA WALLACE, LEONA MAE VARGAS, BARBARA ESTES, MARILOU C. FLUEGEL, JAMES ABBOTT, RUBY A. FULCHER, BARBARA GALLAGHER, JULIANA RUDKOWSKI, JESS GARCIA, LEROY GHUMM, VALERIE GIBLIN, JUDY A. GORCHINSKI, ALICE GORDON, ROBERT B. ALLMAN, PATRICIA A. WRIGHT, JULIA HAIRSTON, RICHARD HASKELL, MARY ANN TUREK, DORIS P. HESTER, CYNTHIA D. HILDRETH, LEE HOLBERTON, HUDSON, HENRY HUKILL, JR, ELIZABETH IACOVINO, THOMAS C. BATES, SR, JOHN J. JACKOWSKI, SR, ELAINE M. JAMES, NATHALIE C. JENKINS, MARY L. BUCKNER, OLLIE JONES, MARY A. COBBLE, SHIRLEY MARTIN, FREAS KREISCHER, JR, WILLIAM LAISE, JAMES J. LANGON, THOMASINE BAYNARD, JOYCE HOUSTON, CHERYL A. COSSABOOM, MARLYS LEMNAH, BETTY LEWIS, ANNETTE LIVINGSTON, ALL PLAINTIFFS, PATRICIA CALLOWAY, LUDDIE BELMER, DEBBIE HORACE, ALICE W. BLOCKER (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B - Part 1 of 2, #3 Exhibit B - Part 2 of 2, #4 Exhibit C)(Cook, David) Modified on 4/28/2008 (tg, ).
April 27, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 244 ENTERED IN ERROR.....MOTION to Appoint Receiver by JOSEPH BOCCIA, EDNA BOHANNON, CATHERINE BONK, AVENELL CALLAHAN, BILLIE JEAN BOLINGER, CLARE CAMPUS, ROBBIE CEASAR, JAMES N. CONLEY, CHARLES S. COOK, BETTY COPELAND, DEBORAH D. PETERSON, LORRAINE MARY COULMAN, HAROLD L. COSNER, HEIDI LEGAULT, MARY M. MASON, B. CHRISTINE DEVLIN, EARLINE MILLER, MICHAEL ROBERT DUNNIGAN, DEBRA HORNER, JOHN R. BLOCKER, JOSEPH BOCCIA, SR, THOMAS FLUEGEL, PATRICIA WRIGHT, JEFFREY HASKELL, CYNTHIA D. LAKE, PATRICIA LEE HOLBERTON, LISA HUDSON, JAMES J. LANGON, SR, CHARLES F. COOK, ILA WALLACE, LEONA MAE VARGAS, BARBARA ESTES, MARILOU C. FLUEGEL, JAMES ABBOTT, RUBY A. FULCHER, BARBARA GALLAGHER, JULIANA RUDKOWSKI, JESS GARCIA, LEROY GHUMM, VALERIE GIBLIN, JUDY A. GORCHINSKI, ALICE GORDON, ROBERT B. ALLMAN, PATRICIA A. WRIGHT, JULIA HAIRSTON, RICHARD HASKELL, MARY ANN TUREK, DORIS P. HESTER, CYNTHIA D. HILDRETH, LEE HOLBERTON, HUDSON, HENRY HUKILL, JR, ELIZABETH IACOVINO, THOMAS C. BATES, SR, JOHN J. JACKOWSKI, SR, ELAINE M. JAMES, NATHALIE C. JENKINS, MARY L. BUCKNER, OLLIE JONES, MARY A. COBBLE, SHIRLEY MARTIN, FREAS KREISCHER, JR, WILLIAM LAISE, JAMES J. LANGON, THOMASINE BAYNARD, JOYCE HOUSTON, CHERYL A. COSSABOOM, MARLYS LEMNAH, BETTY LEWIS, ANNETTE LIVINGSTON, ALL PLAINTIFFS, PATRICIA CALLOWAY, LUDDIE BELMER, DEBBIE HORACE, ALICE W. BLOCKER (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(Cook, David) Modified on 4/28/2008 (tg, ).
April 23, 2008 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: re #241 MOTION for Disbursement of Funds To Special Master Swanson was entered in error at the request of counsel. Counsel refiled said pleading under docket entry number #243 . (tg, )
April 22, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 243 MOTION for Disbursement of Funds To Special Master Swanson(Corrected) by ALL PLAINTIFFS (Attachments: #1 Supplement Voucher For Payment, #2 Text of Proposed Order Order For Payment)(Fay, Thomas)
April 22, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 242 MOTION for Disbursement of Funds To Special Master Ray by ALL PLAINTIFFS (Attachments: #1 Supplement Voucher For Payment, #2 Text of Proposed Order Order For Payment)(Fay, Thomas)
April 22, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 241 ENTERED IN ERROR.....MOTION for Disbursement of Funds To Special Master Swanson by ALL PLAINTIFFS (Attachments: #1 Supplement Voucher of Special Master, #2 Text of Proposed Order For Payment)(Fay, Thomas) Modified on 4/23/2008 (tg, ).
April 22, 2008 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: re #240 Notice (Other) was entered in error and counsel was instructed to refile said pleading using the proper ECF event to file a Motion. (tg, )
April 21, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 240 ENTERED IN ERROR.....NOTICE by ALL PLAINTIFFS (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order For Payment)(Fay, Thomas) Modified on 4/22/2008 (tg, ).
April 2, 2008 Opinion or Order Writ of Attachment on Judgment Issued to Siemens Corporation, Garnishee, re Judgment Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 9/7/2007. (tg, )
April 2, 2008 Opinion or Order Writ of Attachment on Judgment Issued to Abu Dhabi International Bank, Garnishee, re Judgment Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 9/7/2007. (tg, )
April 2, 2008 Opinion or Order Writ of Attachment on Judgment Issued to BASF Corporation, Garnishee, re Judgment Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 9/7/2007. (tg, )
April 2, 2008 Opinion or Order Writ of Attachment on Judgment Issued to Export Import Bank of Korea, Garnishee, re Judgment Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 9/7/2007. (tg, )
April 2, 2008 Opinion or Order Writ of Attachment on Judgment Issued to Bank of Tokyo-Mitsubishi UFJ, Garnishee, re Judgment Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 9/7/2007. (tg, )
April 2, 2008 Opinion or Order Writ of Attachment on Judgment Issued to Export Import Bank of India, Garnishee, re Judgment Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 9/7/2007. (tg, )
April 2, 2008 Opinion or Order Writ of Attachment on Judgment Issued to Asian Development Bank, Garnishee, re Judgment Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 9/7/2007. (tg, )
April 2, 2008 Opinion or Order Writ of Attachment on Judgment Issued to Deutsche Bank, Garnishee, re Judgment Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 9/7/2007. (tg, )
March 28, 2008 Opinion or Order Writ of Attachment on Judgment Issued to AB Amro, Garnishee, re Judgment Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 9/7/2007. (tg, )
March 28, 2008 Opinion or Order Writ of Attachment on Judgment Issued to Mitsubishi International Corporation, Garnishee, re Judgment Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 9/7/2007. (tg, )
March 28, 2008 Opinion or Order Writ of Attachment on Judgment Issued to Bayer Corporation, Garnishee, re Judgment Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 9/7/2007. (tg, )
March 28, 2008 Opinion or Order Writ of Attachment on Judgment Issued to Saudi Arabian Oil Company a/k/a Saudi Aramco, Garnishee, re Judgment Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 9/7/2007.(tg, )
March 28, 2008 Opinion or Order Writ of Attachment on Judgment Issued to Aramco Services Co., Garnishee, re Judgment Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 9/7/2007. (tg, )
March 28, 2008 Opinion or Order Writ of Attachment on Judgment Issued to Marathon Oil Company, Garnishee, re Judgment Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 9/7/2007.(tg, )
March 28, 2008 Opinion or Order Writ of Attachment on Judgment Issued to Bank of Japan, Garnishee, re Judgment Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 9/7/2007.(tg, )
March 28, 2008 Opinion or Order Writ of Attachment on Judgment Issued to Occidental International Corporation, Garnishee, re Judgment Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 9/7/2007. (tg, )
March 28, 2008 Opinion or Order Writ of Attachment on Judgment Issued to State Bank of India, Garnishee, re Judgment Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 9/7/2007.(tg, )
March 28, 2008 Opinion or Order Writ of Attachment on Judgment Issued to Kerr Mcgee Corporation, Garnishee, re Judgment Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 9/7/2007. (tg, )
March 28, 2008 Opinion or Order Writ of Attachment on Judgment Issued to Valero Energy, Garnishee, re Judgment Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 9/7/2007. (tg, )
March 27, 2008 Opinion or Order Writ of Attachment on Judgment Issued to BP Amoco Corporation, Garnishee, re Judgment Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 9/7/2007. (tg, )
March 27, 2008 Opinion or Order Writ of Attachment Issued to Caterpillar Inc, Garnishee, re Judgment signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 9/7/2007. (tg, )
March 27, 2008 Opinion or Order Writ of Attachment Issued to Exxon Mobil Corporation, Garnishee, re Judgment signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 8/10/2006. (tg, )
March 27, 2008 Opinion or Order Writ of Attachment on Judgment Issued to Occidental Petroleum Corporation, Garnishee, re Judgment Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 9/7/2007. (tg, )
March 25, 2008 Opinion or Order Writ of Attachment on Judgment Issued to HSBC, Garnishee, re Judgment Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 9/7/2007. (tg, )
March 25, 2008 Opinion or Order Writ of Attachment on Judgment Issued to International Monetary Fund, Garnishee, re Judgment Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 9/7/2007. (tg, )
March 25, 2008 Opinion or Order Writ of Attachment on Judgment Issued to Bank of Tokyo, Garnishee, re Judgment Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 9/7/2007. (tg, )
March 25, 2008 Opinion or Order Writ of Attachment on Judgment Issued to Credit Suisse Bank (or Group), Garnishee, re Judgment Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 9/7/2007. (tg, )
March 25, 2008 Opinion or Order Writ of Attachment on Judgment Issued to The Industrial Bank of Japan, Garnishee, re Judgment Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 9/7/2007. (tg, )
March 25, 2008 Opinion or Order Writ of Attachment on Judgment Issued to UBS AG, Garnishee, re Judgment Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 9/7/2007. (tg, )
March 25, 2008 Opinion or Order Writ of Attachment on Judgment Issued to Kuwait Petroleum Corporation, Garnishee, re Judgment signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 9/7/2007. (tg, )
March 25, 2008 Opinion or Order Writ of Attachment on Judgment Issued to Japan National Oil Corporation, Garnishee, re Judgment Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 9/7/2007. (tg, )
March 25, 2008 Opinion or Order Writ of Attachment on Judgment Issued to Robobank International, Garnishee, re Judgment Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 9/7/2007. (tg, )
March 25, 2008 Opinion or Order Writ of Attachment on Judgment Issued to The World Bank, Garnishee, re Judgment Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 9/7/2007. (tg, )
March 25, 2008 Opinion or Order Writ of Attachment on Judgment Issued to European Aeronautic Defense and Space Company, Garnishee, re Judgment Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 9/7/2007. (tg, )
March 25, 2008 Opinion or Order Writ of Attachment on Judgment Issued to International Finance Corporation, Garnishee, re Judgment Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 9/7/2007. (tg, )
March 25, 2008 Opinion or Order Writ of Attachment on Judgment Issued to Japan Bank for International Cooperation, Garnishee, re Judgment Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 9/7/2007. (tg, )
March 25, 2008 Opinion or Order Writ of Attachment on Judgment Issued to ABN AMRO, Garnishee, re Judgment Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 9/7/2007. (tg, )
March 25, 2008 Opinion or Order Writ of Attachment on Judgment Issued to Development Bank of Japan, Garnishee, re Judgment Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 9/7/2007. (tg, )
March 25, 2008 Opinion or Order Writ of Attachment on Judgment Issued to Royal Dutch Shell, Garnishee, re Judgment Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 9/7/2007. (tg, )
March 17, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 239 MOTION Appointment of Special Process Servers by ALL PLAINTIFFS (Attachments: #1 Supplement Memo In Support of Motion, #2 Text of Proposed Order Order Appointing Special Process Servers)(Fay, Thomas)
March 13, 2008 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #238 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 03/13/2008. (lcrcl2, )
March 12, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 238 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- David J. Cook, :Firm- Cook Collection Attorneys, :Address- 165 Fell Street, San Francisco, CA 94102. Phone No. - 877-989-4730. Fax No. - 866-989-0491 by ALL PLAINTIFFS (Attachments: #1 Affidavit In Support Mtn AdmissionPro Hac Vice, #2 Text of Proposed Order For Admission Pro Hac Vice)(Fay, Thomas)
March 11, 2008 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: re #237 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Thomas Fortune Fay, :Firm- Fay Law, PA, :Address- 700 Fifth Street, NW, Washington, DC 20001. Phone No. - 202-589-1300. Fax No. - 202-589-1721 was entered in error. Counsel listed his own information rather than the information of the attorney he is sponsoring. Counsel was instructed to refile said pleading. (tg, )
March 10, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 237 ENTERED IN ERROR.....MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Thomas Fortune Fay, :Firm- Fay Law, PA, :Address- 700 Fifth Street, NW, Washington, DC 20001. Phone No. - 202-589-1300. Fax No. - 202-589-1721 by ALL PLAINTIFFS (Attachments: #1 Affidavit In Support of Motion Pro Hac Vice, #2 Text of Proposed Order For Admission Pro Hav Vice)(Fay, Thomas) Modified on 3/11/2008 (tg, ).
March 6, 2008 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: re Leave to File Denied was entered in error in this case. (tg, )
March 6, 2008 Opinion or Order ENTERED IN ERROR.....Leave to File Denied. Final Request for Payment. (tg, ) ("Leave to file DENIED" by Judge R. M. Collyer). Modified on 3/6/2008 (tg, ).
February 27, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 236 ORDER of USCA (certified copy) as to #232 Notice of Appeal filed by CATHERINE BONK, IT IS ORDERED that the motion be granted, and these cases are hereby dismissed without prejudice to any further proceedings in the district court. (USCA No. 07-7140) (kb)
November 8, 2007 Opinion or Order USCA Case Number 07-7148 for #235 Notice of Appeal filed by ILA WALLACE. (tg, )
October 3, 2007 Opinion or Order Supplemental Record on Appeal transmitted to US Court of Appeals re #234 Amended Notice of Appeal (tg, )
October 3, 2007 Opinion or Order Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re #235 Notice of Appeal (tg, )
October 2, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 235 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #228 Judgment by ILA WALLACE. Filing fee $ 455, receipt number 1306751. Fee Status: Fee Paid. Parties have been notified. (Fay, Thomas)
October 2, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 234 Amended NOTICE OF APPEAL re appeal #232 , #233 by CATHERINE BONK. (Fay, Thomas)
October 1, 2007 Opinion or Order USCA Case Number 07-7140 for #232 Notice of Appeal filed by CATHERINE BONK. (tg, )
September 26, 2007 Opinion or Order Supplemental Record on Appeal transmitted to US Court of Appeals re #233 Amended Notice of Appeal (tg, )
September 25, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 233 Amended NOTICE OF APPEAL re appeal [], #232 by ALL PLAINTIFFS. (Fay, Thomas)
September 21, 2007 Opinion or Order Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re #232 Notice of Appeal (tg, )
September 20, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 232 NOTICE OF APPEAL by CATHERINE BONK. Filing fee $ 455, receipt number 1296748. Fee Status: Fee Paid. Parties have been notified. (Fay, Thomas)
September 15, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 231 MOTION to Alter Judgment by CATHERINE BONK (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Fay, Thomas)
September 7, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 230 AMENDED COMPLAINT against ISLAMIC REPUBLIC OF IRAN, IRANIAN MINISTRY OF INFORMATION AND SECURITY filed by EDNA BOHANNON, CATHERINE BONK, AVENELL CALLAHAN, BILLIE JEAN BOLINGER, CLARE CAMPUS, ROBBIE CEASAR, JAMES N. CONLEY, BETTY COPELAND, DEBORAH D. PETERSON, LORRAINE MARY COULMAN, HAROLD L. COSNER, HEIDI LEGAULT, MARY M. MASON, B. CHRISTINE DEVLIN, EARLINE MILLER, MICHAEL ROBERT DUNNIGAN, DEBRA HORNER, JOHN R. BLOCKER, JOSEPH BOCCIA, SR, THOMAS FLUEGEL, PATRICIA WRIGHT, JEFFREY HASKELL, CYNTHIA D. LAKE, PATRICIA LEE HOLBERTON, LISA HUDSON, JAMES J. LANGON, SR, CHARLES F. COOK, LEONA MAE VARGAS, BARBARA ESTES, MARILOU C. FLUEGEL, JAMES ABBOTT, RUBY A. FULCHER, BARBARA GALLAGHER, JULIANA RUDKOWSKI, JESS GARCIA, LEROY GHUMM, VALERIE GIBLIN, JUDY A. GORCHINSKI, ALICE GORDON, ROBERT B. ALLMAN, JULIA HAIRSTON, MARY ANN TUREK, DORIS P. HESTER, HENRY HUKILL, JR, ELIZABETH IACOVINO, THOMAS C. BATES, SR, JOHN J. JACKOWSKI, SR, ELAINE M. JAMES, NATHALIE C. JENKINS, MARY L. BUCKNER, OLLIE JONES, MARY A. COBBLE, SHIRLEY MARTIN, FREAS KREISCHER, JR, WILLIAM LAISE, THOMASINE BAYNARD, JOYCE HOUSTON, CHERYL A. COSSABOOM, MARLYS LEMNAH, ANNETTE LIVINGSTON, ALL PLAINTIFFS, PATRICIA CALLOWAY, LUDDIE BELMER.(tg, )
September 7, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 229 MEMORANDUM AND OPINION. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 09/07/2007. (lcrcl2, )
September 7, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 228 JUDGMENT in favor of plaintiffs and against defendants as described in the judgment. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 09/07/2007. (lcrcl2, )
September 7, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 227 ORDER granting #226 Motion to Amend/Correct. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 9/6/2007. (lcrcl1, )
September 7, 2007 Opinion or Order Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Judge Royce C. Lamberth : Omnibus Hearing held on 9/7/2007. Judgment for the plaintiffs entered. (Court Reporter Theresa Sorensen.) (rje) Modified on 9/7/2007 (rje, ).
September 6, 2007 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Hearings: Omnibus Hearing set for 9/7/2007 10:00 AM in Ceremonial Courtroom before Judge Royce C. Lamberth. (rje)
September 5, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 226 Second MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint by ALL PLAINTIFFS (Attachments: #1 Memorandum#2 Text of Proposed Order Order#3 Exhibit Amended Complaint#4 Exhibit Amended Complaint- Boulos)(Fay, Thomas)
April 25, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 225 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION pursuant to the Amended Special Master Report, signed April 25, 2007 by John C. Swanson, Esq., for decedent John Adam Williamson, Counts CDLXI-CDLXIV (461-464), with attachment of Economic Report for John Adam Williamson (original Report Docket #53).(Fay, Thomas)
March 28, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 224 MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER GRANTING Motion #39 to Amend the First Amended Complaint (filed in Boulos v. Islamic Republic of Iran 01-cv-2684, which is consolidated to this case), and finding that the Second Amended Complaint shall be deemed filed this date, and further finding that the Second Amended Complaint shall be deemed to relate back to the date the original complaint was filed, pursuant to Rule 15 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 3/28/07. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 3/28/07. (lcrcl2, )
March 22, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 223 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION pursuant to the Special Master Report, signed March 22, 2007 by Paul Griffin, Esq. for decedent Richard Lemnah, Counts CCXLI-CCXLIV (241-244), with attachment of Economic Report for decedent Richard Lemnah.(Fay, Thomas)
December 22, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 222 AMENDED REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of Special Master Fay regarding Samuel Maitland, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Economic Report)(jeb, )
December 6, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 221 ORDER granting #220 Motion for Order Appointing Alan L. Balaran Special Master by ALL PLAINTIFFS. See Order for details.. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 12/6/06. (rje)
December 5, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 220 MOTION for Order Appointing Alan L. Balaran Special Master by ALL PLAINTIFFS. (Attachments: #1 Errata #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Fay, Thomas)
November 15, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 219 TRIAL BRIEF Causes of Action & Damages by DEBORAH D. PETERSON. (Attachments: #1 #2 #3 #4 #5 #6 #7)(Fay, Thomas)
November 1, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 218 AMENDED REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re Special Master Jeffrey A. Manheimer, dated October 17, 2005 (previously identified as Document #107), pursuant to Order of Reference concerning Counts CCCLIII-CCCLVI (353-356) for Decedent Luis J. Rotondo with (Attachments: #1 Economic Report for Rotondo)(Fay, Thomas)
November 1, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 217 AMENDED REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re Special Master Susan Meek, signed 8/10/06 (previously identified as Document #204), pursuant to Order of Reference concerning Counts CCLXXIII-CCLXXVI (273-276) for Decedent James E. McDonough, with Attachment #1 of Economic Report. (Fay, Thomas)
November 1, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 216 SUPPLEMENTAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re Special Master Francis B. Fennessey, dated 10-24-06, (previously reported as Document #137, signed May 1, 2006) pursuant to Counts CXXXVII to CXL, for Decedent Timothy Giblin, with Attachment #1, Economic Report for Giblin (Fay, Thomas)
November 1, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 215 AMENDED REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION of Special Master Kenneth Trombly signed October 28, 2006 (previously identified as Documents 154 and 194), pursuant to Counts DXV-DXIX (515-519) for Survivor Truman Dale Garner. (Fay, Thomas)
October 30, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 214 AMENDED REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of Special Master Phlip M. Saeta, signed 4/7/05 (previously identified as Document #51) pursuant to Order of Reference concerning counts CDXL to CDXLIII of Decedent D.Vallone, Jr. (Attachments: # 1 Summary Key Facts and Assumptions.
October 30, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 212 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION pursuant to the Special Master Report on David Cosner (deceased), (previously identified as document #183) Counts LXXXI - LXXXIV (81-84) with attachment of Economic Report for David Cosner.(Fay, Thomas)
October 30, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 211 AMENDED REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION of Special Master (previously identified as Document #106) re: Ulysses Gregory Parker pursuant to Order of Reference concerning Counts CCCXVI-CCCXIX; (Attachments: # 1 Parker Economic Report.
October 30, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 210 AMENDED REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of Special Master dated 12/20/05 (previously identified as Document #102) re: Freas H. Kreischer pursuant to Order of Reference concerning Counts CCXXI-CLXXIV. (Attachments: # 1 Kreischer Economic Report)
October 30, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 209 AMENDED REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION of Special Master dated 4/18/06, previously filed as Document #124 pursuant to Order of Reference concerning Counts 89-92 re: Russell Cyzick (Attachments: # 1 economic report)(Fay, Thomas)
October 30, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 208 AMENDED REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of Special Master dated 2/6/06 (previously filed as document #95) re: Richard D. Blankenship pursuant to Order of Reference concerning XXIX-XXXII(29-32) (Attachments: # 1 Blankenship Economic Report).(jeb, )
October 30, 2006 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: Documents #152, (now 192), 156 (now 195), 155 (now 196), and 157 (now 197) were entered in error as duplicative. (jeb, )
October 30, 2006 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: DOCUMENTS 154, AND 194 (Reports of Trombly) were entered in error and the Special Master will be refiling said Document. (jeb, )
October 30, 2006 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: Document #183 was entered in error and the Special Master is refiling said document on this date. (jeb, )
October 30, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 213 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION of Special Master Jeffrey Manheimer,(previous identified as Documents 153, and 193) signed June 3, 2006, pursuant to Counts D-DIV (500-504) for Survivor Frank Comes, Jr.(Fay, Thomas) (Entered: 10/30/2006)
September 7, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 207 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION of Special Master Loraine A. Ray, Esq., dated August 10, 2006, pursuant to Counts CCCV-CCCVIII for Decedent John Arne Olson, with Attachment of Economic Report for Olson.(Fay, Thomas)
September 7, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 206 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION of Special Master Loraine A. Ray, Esq., dated August 3, 2006, pursuant to Counts CCCXXIX-CCCXXXII on Decedent John Arthur Phillips, Jr. with Attachment of Economic Report for Phillips. (Attachments: #1 Economic Report for Phillips)(Fay, Thomas)
September 7, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 205 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION of Special Master Loraine A. Ray, Esq., dated August 29, 2006, pursuant to Counts DXLIX-DLIII, for Survivor Lovelle "Darrell" Moore, with Attachment of Economic Report. (Attachments: #1 Economic Report for L. Moore)(Fay, Thomas)
September 7, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 204 ENTERED IN ERROR.....REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION of Special Master Susan Meek, MD/Esq., signed August 11, 2006, pursuant to Counts CCLXXIII-CCLXXVI, for Decedent James E. McDonough, with Attachment of Economic Report for McDonough. (Attachments: #1 Economic Report for McDonough)(Fay, Thomas) Modified on 10/30/2006 (jeb, ).
September 7, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 203 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION of Special Master Susan Meek, MD, Esq., dated 6/13/2006, pursuant to Counts CCLVII-CCLX, for Decedent Samuel Maitland, Jr., with Attachment of Economic Report for Maitland. (Attachments: #1 Economic Report for Maitland)(Fay, Thomas)
September 7, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 202 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION for Special Master Susan Meek, MD, Esq., dated 8/17/2006, pursuant to Counts CCLXI-CCLXIV, on Decedent John Macroglou with Attachment of Economic Report for Macroglou.. (Attachments: #1 Economic Report for Macroglou)(Fay, Thomas)
September 7, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 201 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION of Special Master Susan Meek, MD, Esq., dated August 18, 2006, pursuant to Counts CXIII-CXVI, for Decedent Richard Andrew Fluegel, with Attachment of Economic Report for Fluegel.. (Attachments: #1 Economic Report for Fluegel)(Fay, Thomas)
September 6, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 200 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION of Special Master Loraine A. Ray, dated August 11, 2006, pursuant to Counts DLXXXIV-DLXXXVIII (584-588) for Survivor Thomas D. Young. (Fay, Thomas)
September 6, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 199 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION of Special Master Loraine A. Ray, dated August 29, 2006, pursuant to Counts DLXXIX-DLXXXIII (579-583) for Survivor Danny Wheeler.(Fay, Thomas)
September 6, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 198 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION of Special Master Loraine A. Ray, dated August 21, 2006, pursuant to Counts DLXXIV-DLXXVIII (574-578) for Survivor Craig Joseph Swinson. (Fay, Thomas)
September 6, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 197 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION of Special Master Colin Dunham, signed 5/16/2006, pursuant to Counts DXCIX-DCIII (599-603) for Survivor Paul Rivers. (Fay, Thomas)
September 6, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 196 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION of Special Master Colin Dunham, signed 5/16/2006, pursuant to Counts DXXX-DXXXIV (530-534) for Survivor Orval Hunt.(Fay, Thomas)
September 6, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 195 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION of Special Master Jeffrey Manheimer, dated June 3, 2006, pursuant to Counts DXXV-DXXIX (525-529) for Survivor John Hlywiak. (Fay, Thomas)
September 6, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 194 ENTERED IN ERROR.....REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION of Special Master Kenneth Trombly, signed 5/25/2006, pursuant to Counts DXV-DXIX (515-519) on Survivor Truman Dale Garner. (Fay, Thomas)
September 6, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 193 ENTERED IN ERROR.....REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION of Special Master Jeffrey Manheimer, signed June 3, 2006, pursuant to Counts D-DIV (500-504) for Survivor Frank Comes, Jr.(Fay, Thomas)
September 6, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 192 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION of Special Master Jeffrey Manheimer, signed June 3, 2006, pursuant to Counts CDLXXXV-CDLXXXIX (485-489)for Decedent Marvin Albright..(Fay, Thomas)
August 17, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 191 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION pursuant to the Special Master Report for Joseph John Boccia, Jr., Counts XXXVII-XL (37-40), with attachment of Economic Report for Joseph John Boccia, Jr.(Fay, Thomas)
August 16, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 190 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION pursuant to the Special Master Report for Mecot Camara (deceased), Counts LIII-LVI (53-56), with attachment of Economic Report for Mecot Camara.(Fay, Thomas)
August 16, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 189 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION pursuant to the Special Master Report for Brian Kirkpatrick, Counts DXL-DXLIII (540-543) with no attachment.(Fay, Thomas)
August 16, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 188 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION pursuant to the Special Master Report for Craig Wyche (deceased), Counts CDLXXIII-CDLXXVI (473-476) with attachment of Economic Report for Craig Wyche.(Fay, Thomas)
August 16, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 187 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION pursuant to the Special Master Report for Jeffrey Nashton (survivor), Counts DLV-DLX (555-560), with attachment of Economic Report for Jeffrey Nashton. (Fay, Thomas)
August 16, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 186 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION pursuant to the Special Master Report for Edward Johnston (deceased), Counts CCI - CCIV (201-204) with attachment of Economic Report for Edward Johnston. (Fay, Thomas)
August 16, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 185 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION pursuant to the Special Master Report for Michael Gorchinski (deceased), Counts CXLI - CXLIV (141-144), with attachment of Economic Report for Michael Gorchinski..(Fay, Thomas)
August 16, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 184 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION pursuant to the Special Master Report for Timothy Dunnigan (deceased), Counts CI - CIV (101-104), with attachment of Economic Report for Timothy Dunnigan.(Fay, Thomas)
August 16, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 183 ENTERED IN ERROR.....REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION pursuant to the Special Master Report on David Cosner (deceased), Counts LXXXI - LXXXIV (81-84) with attachment of Economic Report for David Cosner.(Fay, Thomas) Modified on 10/30/2006 (jeb, ).
August 16, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 182 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re pursuant to the Special Master Report on Terry Abbott (deceased), Counts V-VIII (5-8) with attachment of Economic Report for Terry Abbott.. Signed by Royce C. Lamberth on 8/16/2006. (Attachments: #1 Economic Report for Abbott)(Fay, Thomas)
July 28, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 181 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION pursuant to the Special Master Report for Jerryl Shropshire (deceased), Counts CCCLXXXI-CCCLXXXIV (381-384), with attachment of Economic Report for Jerryl Shropshire.(Fay, Thomas)
July 28, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 180 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION pursuant to the Special Master Report for Dana Spaulding (survivor), Counts DLXIX-DLXXIII (569-573), with attachment of Economic Report for Dana Spaulding.(Fay, Thomas)
July 28, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 179 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION pursuant to the Special Master Report for John McCall (deceased), Counts CCLXIX-CCLXXII (269-272), with attachment of Economic Report for John McCall.(Fay, Thomas)
July 28, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 178 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION pursuant to the Special Master Report for Keith Laise (deceased), Counts CCXXV-CCXXVIII (225-228) with attachment of Economic Report for Keith Laise. (Fay, Thomas)
July 28, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 177 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION pursuant to the Special Master Report for Randall Garcia (deceased), Counts CXXIX-CXXXII (129-132), with attachment of Economic Report for Randall Garcia. (Fay, Thomas)
July 28, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 176 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION pursuant to the Special Master Report for George Gangur (deceased), Counts CXXV-CXXVIII (125-128) with attachment of Economic Report for George Gangur. (Fay, Thomas)
July 28, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 175 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION pursuant to the Special Master Report for Bryan Earle (deceased), Counts CV-CVIII (105-108), with attachment of Economic Report for Bryan Earle. Fay, Thomas F.
July 28, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 174 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS pursuant to the Special Masters Report for Glenn Dolphin, Counts DV-DIX (505-509) with no attachment (Fay, Thomas)
July 28, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 173 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION pursuant to the Special Masters Report for Paul Callahan (deceased), Counts XLIX-LII (49-52) with attachment of Economic Report for Paul Callahan.(Fay, Thomas)
July 21, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 172 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION pursuant to the Special Masters Report for Donald Elberan Woollett (deceased), Counts CDLXIX-CDLXXII (469-472), with attachment of Economic Report for Donald Elberan Woollett.(Fay, Thomas)
July 20, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 171 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION pursuant to the Special Master Report for Joseph Moore (deceased), Counts CCXCIII-CCXCVI (293-296), with attachment of Economic Report for Joseph Moore.(Fay, Thomas)
July 20, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 170 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION pursuant to the Special Master Report for Thomas Paul Thorstad (deceased), Counts CDXXXVII-CDXL (437-440), with attachment of Economic Report for Thomas Paul Thorstad. (Fay, Thomas)
July 19, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 169 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION pursuant to Special Master Report for Scott Lee Schultz (deceased), Counts CCCLXV-CCCLXVIII (365-368) with attachment of Economic Report for Scott Lee Schultz.(Fay, Thomas)
July 19, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 168 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION pursuant to the Special Master Report for Craig Stockton (deceased), Counts CDXVII-CDXX (417-420) with attachment of Economic Report for Craig Stockton.(Fay, Thomas)
July 19, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 167 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION pursuant to the Special Master Report for Peter Scialabba (deceased), Counts CCCLXIX-CCCLXXII (369-372)with attachment of Economic Report for Peter Scialabba. (Fay, Thomas)
July 19, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 166 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION pursuant to the Special Master Report for Warren Richardson (deceased), Counts CCCXLIX-CCCLII (349-352) with attachment of Economic Report for Warren Richardson.(Fay, Thomas)
July 19, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 165 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION pursuant to the Special Master Report for Victor Prevatt (deceased)Counts CCCXXXVII-CCCXL (337-340) with attachment of Economic Report for Victor Prevatt.(Fay, Thomas)
July 17, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 164 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION pursuant to the Special Master Report for Richard Menkins, II (deceased) Counts CCLXXXI-CCLXXXIV (281-284) with attachment of Economic Report for Richard Menkins, II.(Fay, Thomas)
July 17, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 163 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION pursuant to the Special Master Report for James Jackowski (deceased), Counts CLXXXIX-CXCII (189-192) together with attachment of Economic Report for James Jackowski. (Fay, Thomas)
July 17, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 162 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION pursuant to the Special Master Report for Ronald Meurer (deceased), counts CCLXXXV-CCLXXXVIII (285-288), together with attached of Economic Report for Ronald Meurer ((Fay, Thomas)
July 17, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 161 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION pursuant to the Special Master Report for Stephen Jones (deceased), Counts CCV-CCVIII (205-208), with attachment of Economic Report for Stephen Jones. (Fay, Thomas)
July 17, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 160 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION pursuant to the Special Master Report for Kevin Coulman (deceased), Counts LXXVII-LXXX (77-80), together with Economic Report for Kevin Coulman.(Fay, Thomas)
July 17, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 159 Report and Recommendation pursuant to Special Master Report on Leon Bohannon (deceased), Counts XLI-XLIV (41-44), with attachment of Economic Report on Leon Bohannon.
July 3, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 158 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #119 Amended Complaint,,,,,,, filed by ALL PLAINTIFFS,, BARBARA GALLAGHER,, DEBORAH D. PETERSON,, JAMES ABBOTT,, ROBERT B. ALLMAN,, THOMAS C. BATES, SR., THOMASINE BAYNARD,, PATRICIA CALLOWAY,, LUDDIE BELMER,, EDNA BOHANNON,, CATHERINE BONK,, AVENELL CALLAHAN,, BILLIE JEAN BOLINGER,, CLARE CAMPUS,, ROBBIE CEASAR,, JAMES N. CONLEY,, BETTY COPELAND,, LORRAINE MARY COULMAN,, HAROLD L. COSNER,, HEIDI LEGAULT,, MARY M. MASON,, B. CHRISTINE DEVLIN,, EARLINE MILLER,, MICHAEL ROBERT DUNNIGAN,, LEONA MAE VARGAS,, BARBARA ESTES,, MARILOU C. FLUEGEL,, RUBY A. FULCHER,, JULIANA RUDKOWSKI,, JESS GARCIA,, LEROY GHUMM,, VALERIE GIBLIN,, JUDY A. GORCHINSKI,, ALICE GORDON,, JULIA HAIRSTON,, MARY ANN TUREK,, DORIS P. HESTER,, HENRY HUKILL, JR., ELIZABETH IACOVINO,, JOHN J. JACKOWSKI, SR., ELAINE M. JAMES,, PATRICIA WRIGHT,, DEBRA HORNER,, JOHN R. BLOCKER,, JOSEPH BOCCIA, SR., THOMAS FLUEGEL,, JEFFREY HASKELL,, CYNTHIA D. LAKE,, PATRICIA LEE HOLBERTON,, LISA HUDSON,, CHARLES F. COOK,, #3 Complaint filed by ALL PLAINTIFFS, . Signed by Royce C. Lamberth on 7/03/2006. (Attachments: #1 Economic Report for Mitchell Counts 594-598)(Fay, Thomas)
July 3, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 157 ENTERED IN ERROR.....REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #119 Amended Complaint,,,,,,, filed by ALL PLAINTIFFS,, BARBARA GALLAGHER,, DEBORAH D. PETERSON,, JAMES ABBOTT,, ROBERT B. ALLMAN,, THOMAS C. BATES, SR., THOMASINE BAYNARD,, PATRICIA CALLOWAY,, LUDDIE BELMER,, EDNA BOHANNON,, CATHERINE BONK,, AVENELL CALLAHAN,, BILLIE JEAN BOLINGER,, CLARE CAMPUS,, ROBBIE CEASAR,, JAMES N. CONLEY,, BETTY COPELAND,, LORRAINE MARY COULMAN,, HAROLD L. COSNER,, HEIDI LEGAULT,, MARY M. MASON,, B. CHRISTINE DEVLIN,, EARLINE MILLER,, MICHAEL ROBERT DUNNIGAN,, LEONA MAE VARGAS,, BARBARA ESTES,, MARILOU C. FLUEGEL,, RUBY A. FULCHER,, JULIANA RUDKOWSKI,, JESS GARCIA,, LEROY GHUMM,, VALERIE GIBLIN,, JUDY A. GORCHINSKI,, ALICE GORDON,, JULIA HAIRSTON,, MARY ANN TUREK,, DORIS P. HESTER,, HENRY HUKILL, JR., ELIZABETH IACOVINO,, JOHN J. JACKOWSKI, SR., ELAINE M. JAMES,, PATRICIA WRIGHT,, DEBRA HORNER,, JOHN R. BLOCKER,, JOSEPH BOCCIA, SR., THOMAS FLUEGEL,, JEFFREY HASKELL,, CYNTHIA D. LAKE,, PATRICIA LEE HOLBERTON,, LISA HUDSON,, CHARLES F. COOK,, #3 Complaint filed by ALL PLAINTIFFS, . Signed by Royce C. Lamberth on 7/03/2006. (Fay, Thomas) (Duplicative of Document #197)
July 3, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 156 ENTERED IN ERROR.....REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #119 Amended Complaint,,,,,,, filed by ALL PLAINTIFFS,, BARBARA GALLAGHER,, DEBORAH D. PETERSON,, JAMES ABBOTT,, ROBERT B. ALLMAN,, THOMAS C. BATES, SR., THOMASINE BAYNARD,, PATRICIA CALLOWAY,, LUDDIE BELMER,, EDNA BOHANNON,, CATHERINE BONK,, AVENELL CALLAHAN,, BILLIE JEAN BOLINGER,, CLARE CAMPUS,, ROBBIE CEASAR,, JAMES N. CONLEY,, BETTY COPELAND,, LORRAINE MARY COULMAN,, HAROLD L. COSNER,, HEIDI LEGAULT,, MARY M. MASON,, B. CHRISTINE DEVLIN,, EARLINE MILLER,, MICHAEL ROBERT DUNNIGAN,, LEONA MAE VARGAS,, BARBARA ESTES,, MARILOU C. FLUEGEL,, RUBY A. FULCHER,, JULIANA RUDKOWSKI,, JESS GARCIA,, LEROY GHUMM,, VALERIE GIBLIN,, JUDY A. GORCHINSKI,, ALICE GORDON,, JULIA HAIRSTON,, MARY ANN TUREK,, DORIS P. HESTER,, HENRY HUKILL, JR., ELIZABETH IACOVINO,, JOHN J. JACKOWSKI, SR., ELAINE M. JAMES,, PATRICIA WRIGHT,, DEBRA HORNER,, JOHN R. BLOCKER,, JOSEPH BOCCIA, SR., THOMAS FLUEGEL,, JEFFREY HASKELL,, CYNTHIA D. LAKE,, PATRICIA LEE HOLBERTON,, LISA HUDSON,, CHARLES F. COOK,, #3 Complaint filed by ALL PLAINTIFFS, . Signed by Royce C. Lamberth on 7/3/2006. (Fay, Thomas) (Duplicative of Document #195)
June 30, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 155 ENTERED IN ERROR.....REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #119 Amended Complaint,,,,,,, filed by ALL PLAINTIFFS,, BARBARA GALLAGHER,, DEBORAH D. PETERSON,, JAMES ABBOTT,, ROBERT B. ALLMAN,, THOMAS C. BATES, SR., THOMASINE BAYNARD,, PATRICIA CALLOWAY,, LUDDIE BELMER,, EDNA BOHANNON,, CATHERINE BONK,, AVENELL CALLAHAN,, BILLIE JEAN BOLINGER,, CLARE CAMPUS,, ROBBIE CEASAR,, JAMES N. CONLEY,, BETTY COPELAND,, LORRAINE MARY COULMAN,, HAROLD L. COSNER,, HEIDI LEGAULT,, MARY M. MASON,, B. CHRISTINE DEVLIN,, EARLINE MILLER,, MICHAEL ROBERT DUNNIGAN,, LEONA MAE VARGAS,, BARBARA ESTES,, MARILOU C. FLUEGEL,, RUBY A. FULCHER,, JULIANA RUDKOWSKI,, JESS GARCIA,, LEROY GHUMM,, VALERIE GIBLIN,, JUDY A. GORCHINSKI,, ALICE GORDON,, JULIA HAIRSTON,, MARY ANN TUREK,, DORIS P. HESTER,, HENRY HUKILL, JR., ELIZABETH IACOVINO,, JOHN J. JACKOWSKI, SR., ELAINE M. JAMES,, PATRICIA WRIGHT,, DEBRA HORNER,, JOHN R. BLOCKER,, JOSEPH BOCCIA, SR., THOMAS FLUEGEL,, JEFFREY HASKELL,, CYNTHIA D. LAKE,, PATRICIA LEE HOLBERTON,, LISA HUDSON,, CHARLES F. COOK,, #3 Complaint filed by ALL PLAINTIFFS, . Signed by Royce C. Lamberth on 06/30/2006. (Fay, Thomas)(Duplicative of Document #196)
June 30, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 154 ENTERED IN ERROR....REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #119 Amended Complaint,,,,,,, filed by ALL PLAINTIFFS,, BARBARA GALLAGHER,, DEBORAH D. PETERSON,, JAMES ABBOTT,, ROBERT B. ALLMAN,, THOMAS C. BATES, SR., THOMASINE BAYNARD,, PATRICIA CALLOWAY,, LUDDIE BELMER,, EDNA BOHANNON,, CATHERINE BONK,, AVENELL CALLAHAN,, BILLIE JEAN BOLINGER,, CLARE CAMPUS,, ROBBIE CEASAR,, JAMES N. CONLEY,, BETTY COPELAND,, LORRAINE MARY COULMAN,, HAROLD L. COSNER,, HEIDI LEGAULT,, MARY M. MASON,, B. CHRISTINE DEVLIN,, EARLINE MILLER,, MICHAEL ROBERT DUNNIGAN,, LEONA MAE VARGAS,, BARBARA ESTES,, MARILOU C. FLUEGEL,, RUBY A. FULCHER,, JULIANA RUDKOWSKI,, JESS GARCIA,, LEROY GHUMM,, VALERIE GIBLIN,, JUDY A. GORCHINSKI,, ALICE GORDON,, JULIA HAIRSTON,, MARY ANN TUREK,, DORIS P. HESTER,, HENRY HUKILL, JR., ELIZABETH IACOVINO,, JOHN J. JACKOWSKI, SR., ELAINE M. JAMES,, PATRICIA WRIGHT,, DEBRA HORNER,, JOHN R. BLOCKER,, JOSEPH BOCCIA, SR., THOMAS FLUEGEL,, JEFFREY HASKELL,, CYNTHIA D. LAKE,, PATRICIA LEE HOLBERTON,, LISA HUDSON,, CHARLES F. COOK,, #3 Complaint filed by ALL PLAINTIFFS, . Signed by Royce C. Lamberth on 06/30/2006. (Fay, Thomas)
June 30, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 153 ENTERED IN ERROR.....REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #119 Amended Complaint,,,,,,, filed by ALL PLAINTIFFS,, BARBARA GALLAGHER,, DEBORAH D. PETERSON,, JAMES ABBOTT,, ROBERT B. ALLMAN,, THOMAS C. BATES, SR., THOMASINE BAYNARD,, PATRICIA CALLOWAY,, LUDDIE BELMER,, EDNA BOHANNON,, CATHERINE BONK,, AVENELL CALLAHAN,, BILLIE JEAN BOLINGER,, CLARE CAMPUS,, ROBBIE CEASAR,, JAMES N. CONLEY,, BETTY COPELAND,, LORRAINE MARY COULMAN,, HAROLD L. COSNER,, HEIDI LEGAULT,, MARY M. MASON,, B. CHRISTINE DEVLIN,, EARLINE MILLER,, MICHAEL ROBERT DUNNIGAN,, LEONA MAE VARGAS,, BARBARA ESTES,, MARILOU C. FLUEGEL,, RUBY A. FULCHER,, JULIANA RUDKOWSKI,, JESS GARCIA,, LEROY GHUMM,, VALERIE GIBLIN,, JUDY A. GORCHINSKI,, ALICE GORDON,, JULIA HAIRSTON,, MARY ANN TUREK,, DORIS P. HESTER,, HENRY HUKILL, JR., ELIZABETH IACOVINO,, JOHN J. JACKOWSKI, SR., ELAINE M. JAMES,, PATRICIA WRIGHT,, DEBRA HORNER,, JOHN R. BLOCKER,, JOSEPH BOCCIA, SR., THOMAS FLUEGEL,, JEFFREY HASKELL,, CYNTHIA D. LAKE,, PATRICIA LEE HOLBERTON,, LISA HUDSON,, CHARLES F. COOK,, #3 Complaint filed by ALL PLAINTIFFS, . Signed by Royce C. Lamberth on 06/30/2006. (Fay, Thomas)
June 30, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 152 ENTERED IN ERROR.....REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #119 Amended Complaint,,,,,,, filed by ALL PLAINTIFFS,, BARBARA GALLAGHER,, DEBORAH D. PETERSON,, JAMES ABBOTT,, ROBERT B. ALLMAN,, THOMAS C. BATES, SR., THOMASINE BAYNARD,, PATRICIA CALLOWAY,, LUDDIE BELMER,, EDNA BOHANNON,, CATHERINE BONK,, AVENELL CALLAHAN,, BILLIE JEAN BOLINGER,, CLARE CAMPUS,, ROBBIE CEASAR,, JAMES N. CONLEY,, BETTY COPELAND,, LORRAINE MARY COULMAN,, HAROLD L. COSNER,, HEIDI LEGAULT,, MARY M. MASON,, B. CHRISTINE DEVLIN,, EARLINE MILLER,, MICHAEL ROBERT DUNNIGAN,, LEONA MAE VARGAS,, BARBARA ESTES,, MARILOU C. FLUEGEL,, RUBY A. FULCHER,, JULIANA RUDKOWSKI,, JESS GARCIA,, LEROY GHUMM,, VALERIE GIBLIN,, JUDY A. GORCHINSKI,, ALICE GORDON,, JULIA HAIRSTON,, MARY ANN TUREK,, DORIS P. HESTER,, HENRY HUKILL, JR., ELIZABETH IACOVINO,, JOHN J. JACKOWSKI, SR., ELAINE M. JAMES,, PATRICIA WRIGHT,, DEBRA HORNER,, JOHN R. BLOCKER,, JOSEPH BOCCIA, SR., THOMAS FLUEGEL,, JEFFREY HASKELL,, CYNTHIA D. LAKE,, PATRICIA LEE HOLBERTON,, LISA HUDSON,, CHARLES F. COOK,, #3 Complaint filed by ALL PLAINTIFFS, . Signed by Royce C. Lamberth on 06/30/2006. (Fay, Thomas) (duplicative filing of Document #192)
June 30, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 151 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #119 Amended Complaint,,,,,,, filed by ALL PLAINTIFFS,, BARBARA GALLAGHER,, DEBORAH D. PETERSON,, JAMES ABBOTT,, ROBERT B. ALLMAN,, THOMAS C. BATES, SR., THOMASINE BAYNARD,, PATRICIA CALLOWAY,, LUDDIE BELMER,, EDNA BOHANNON,, CATHERINE BONK,, AVENELL CALLAHAN,, BILLIE JEAN BOLINGER,, CLARE CAMPUS,, ROBBIE CEASAR,, JAMES N. CONLEY,, BETTY COPELAND,, LORRAINE MARY COULMAN,, HAROLD L. COSNER,, HEIDI LEGAULT,, MARY M. MASON,, B. CHRISTINE DEVLIN,, EARLINE MILLER,, MICHAEL ROBERT DUNNIGAN,, LEONA MAE VARGAS,, BARBARA ESTES,, MARILOU C. FLUEGEL,, RUBY A. FULCHER,, JULIANA RUDKOWSKI,, JESS GARCIA,, LEROY GHUMM,, VALERIE GIBLIN,, JUDY A. GORCHINSKI,, ALICE GORDON,, JULIA HAIRSTON,, MARY ANN TUREK,, DORIS P. HESTER,, HENRY HUKILL, JR., ELIZABETH IACOVINO,, JOHN J. JACKOWSKI, SR., ELAINE M. JAMES,, PATRICIA WRIGHT,, DEBRA HORNER,, JOHN R. BLOCKER,, JOSEPH BOCCIA, SR., THOMAS FLUEGEL,, JEFFREY HASKELL,, CYNTHIA D. LAKE,, PATRICIA LEE HOLBERTON,, LISA HUDSON,, CHARLES F. COOK,, #3 Complaint filed by ALL PLAINTIFFS, . Signed by Royce C. Lamberth on 06/30/2006. (Attachments: #1 Economic Report for Washington Counts 445-448)(Fay, Thomas)
June 30, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 150 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #119 Amended Complaint,,,,,,, filed by ALL PLAINTIFFS,, BARBARA GALLAGHER,, DEBORAH D. PETERSON,, JAMES ABBOTT,, ROBERT B. ALLMAN,, THOMAS C. BATES, SR., THOMASINE BAYNARD,, PATRICIA CALLOWAY,, LUDDIE BELMER,, EDNA BOHANNON,, CATHERINE BONK,, AVENELL CALLAHAN,, BILLIE JEAN BOLINGER,, CLARE CAMPUS,, ROBBIE CEASAR,, JAMES N. CONLEY,, BETTY COPELAND,, LORRAINE MARY COULMAN,, HAROLD L. COSNER,, HEIDI LEGAULT,, MARY M. MASON,, B. CHRISTINE DEVLIN,, EARLINE MILLER,, MICHAEL ROBERT DUNNIGAN,, LEONA MAE VARGAS,, BARBARA ESTES,, MARILOU C. FLUEGEL,, RUBY A. FULCHER,, JULIANA RUDKOWSKI,, JESS GARCIA,, LEROY GHUMM,, VALERIE GIBLIN,, JUDY A. GORCHINSKI,, ALICE GORDON,, JULIA HAIRSTON,, MARY ANN TUREK,, DORIS P. HESTER,, HENRY HUKILL, JR., ELIZABETH IACOVINO,, JOHN J. JACKOWSKI, SR., ELAINE M. JAMES,, PATRICIA WRIGHT,, DEBRA HORNER,, JOHN R. BLOCKER,, JOSEPH BOCCIA, SR., THOMAS FLUEGEL,, JEFFREY HASKELL,, CYNTHIA D. LAKE,, PATRICIA LEE HOLBERTON,, LISA HUDSON,, CHARLES F. COOK,, #3 Complaint filed by ALL PLAINTIFFS, . Signed by Royce C. Lamberth on 06/30/2006. (Attachments: #1 Economic Report for Sturghill Counts 425-428)(Fay, Thomas)
June 30, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 149 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #119 Amended Complaint,,,,,,, filed by ALL PLAINTIFFS,, BARBARA GALLAGHER,, DEBORAH D. PETERSON,, JAMES ABBOTT,, ROBERT B. ALLMAN,, THOMAS C. BATES, SR., THOMASINE BAYNARD,, PATRICIA CALLOWAY,, LUDDIE BELMER,, EDNA BOHANNON,, CATHERINE BONK,, AVENELL CALLAHAN,, BILLIE JEAN BOLINGER,, CLARE CAMPUS,, ROBBIE CEASAR,, JAMES N. CONLEY,, BETTY COPELAND,, LORRAINE MARY COULMAN,, HAROLD L. COSNER,, HEIDI LEGAULT,, MARY M. MASON,, B. CHRISTINE DEVLIN,, EARLINE MILLER,, MICHAEL ROBERT DUNNIGAN,, LEONA MAE VARGAS,, BARBARA ESTES,, MARILOU C. FLUEGEL,, RUBY A. FULCHER,, JULIANA RUDKOWSKI,, JESS GARCIA,, LEROY GHUMM,, VALERIE GIBLIN,, JUDY A. GORCHINSKI,, ALICE GORDON,, JULIA HAIRSTON,, MARY ANN TUREK,, DORIS P. HESTER,, HENRY HUKILL, JR., ELIZABETH IACOVINO,, JOHN J. JACKOWSKI, SR., ELAINE M. JAMES,, PATRICIA WRIGHT,, DEBRA HORNER,, JOHN R. BLOCKER,, JOSEPH BOCCIA, SR., THOMAS FLUEGEL,, JEFFREY HASKELL,, CYNTHIA D. LAKE,, PATRICIA LEE HOLBERTON,, LISA HUDSON,, CHARLES F. COOK,, #3 Complaint filed by ALL PLAINTIFFS, . Signed by Royce C. Lamberth on 06/30/2006. (Attachments: #1 Economic Report for Shipp Counts 377-380)(Fay, Thomas)
June 30, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 148 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #119 Amended Complaint,,,,,,, filed by ALL PLAINTIFFS,, BARBARA GALLAGHER,, DEBORAH D. PETERSON,, JAMES ABBOTT,, ROBERT B. ALLMAN,, THOMAS C. BATES, SR., THOMASINE BAYNARD,, PATRICIA CALLOWAY,, LUDDIE BELMER,, EDNA BOHANNON,, CATHERINE BONK,, AVENELL CALLAHAN,, BILLIE JEAN BOLINGER,, CLARE CAMPUS,, ROBBIE CEASAR,, JAMES N. CONLEY,, BETTY COPELAND,, LORRAINE MARY COULMAN,, HAROLD L. COSNER,, HEIDI LEGAULT,, MARY M. MASON,, B. CHRISTINE DEVLIN,, EARLINE MILLER,, MICHAEL ROBERT DUNNIGAN,, LEONA MAE VARGAS,, BARBARA ESTES,, MARILOU C. FLUEGEL,, RUBY A. FULCHER,, JULIANA RUDKOWSKI,, JESS GARCIA,, LEROY GHUMM,, VALERIE GIBLIN,, JUDY A. GORCHINSKI,, ALICE GORDON,, JULIA HAIRSTON,, MARY ANN TUREK,, DORIS P. HESTER,, HENRY HUKILL, JR., ELIZABETH IACOVINO,, JOHN J. JACKOWSKI, SR., ELAINE M. JAMES,, PATRICIA WRIGHT,, DEBRA HORNER,, JOHN R. BLOCKER,, JOSEPH BOCCIA, SR., THOMAS FLUEGEL,, JEFFREY HASKELL,, CYNTHIA D. LAKE,, PATRICIA LEE HOLBERTON,, LISA HUDSON,, CHARLES F. COOK,, #3 Complaint filed by ALL PLAINTIFFS, . Signed by Royce C. Lamberth on 06/30/2006. (Attachments: #1 Economic Report for Scott Counts 373-376)(Fay, Thomas)
June 29, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 147 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #119 Amended Complaint,,,,,,, filed by ALL PLAINTIFFS,, BARBARA GALLAGHER,, DEBORAH D. PETERSON,, JAMES ABBOTT,, ROBERT B. ALLMAN,, THOMAS C. BATES, SR., THOMASINE BAYNARD,, PATRICIA CALLOWAY,, LUDDIE BELMER,, EDNA BOHANNON,, CATHERINE BONK,, AVENELL CALLAHAN,, BILLIE JEAN BOLINGER,, CLARE CAMPUS,, ROBBIE CEASAR,, JAMES N. CONLEY,, BETTY COPELAND,, LORRAINE MARY COULMAN,, HAROLD L. COSNER,, HEIDI LEGAULT,, MARY M. MASON,, B. CHRISTINE DEVLIN,, EARLINE MILLER,, MICHAEL ROBERT DUNNIGAN,, LEONA MAE VARGAS,, BARBARA ESTES,, MARILOU C. FLUEGEL,, RUBY A. FULCHER,, JULIANA RUDKOWSKI,, JESS GARCIA,, LEROY GHUMM,, VALERIE GIBLIN,, JUDY A. GORCHINSKI,, ALICE GORDON,, JULIA HAIRSTON,, MARY ANN TUREK,, DORIS P. HESTER,, HENRY HUKILL, JR., ELIZABETH IACOVINO,, JOHN J. JACKOWSKI, SR., ELAINE M. JAMES,, PATRICIA WRIGHT,, DEBRA HORNER,, JOHN R. BLOCKER,, JOSEPH BOCCIA, SR., THOMAS FLUEGEL,, JEFFREY HASKELL,, CYNTHIA D. LAKE,, PATRICIA LEE HOLBERTON,, LISA HUDSON,, CHARLES F. COOK,, #3 Complaint filed by ALL PLAINTIFFS, . Signed by Royce C. Lamberth on 06/29/2006. (Attachments: #1 Economic Report for Langon#2 Langon Damage Report)(Fay, Thomas)
June 21, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 146 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #119 Amended Complaint,,,,,,, filed by ALL PLAINTIFFS,, BARBARA GALLAGHER,, DEBORAH D. PETERSON,, JAMES ABBOTT,, ROBERT B. ALLMAN,, THOMAS C. BATES, SR., THOMASINE BAYNARD,, PATRICIA CALLOWAY,, LUDDIE BELMER,, EDNA BOHANNON,, CATHERINE BONK,, AVENELL CALLAHAN,, BILLIE JEAN BOLINGER,, CLARE CAMPUS,, ROBBIE CEASAR,, JAMES N. CONLEY,, BETTY COPELAND,, LORRAINE MARY COULMAN,, HAROLD L. COSNER,, HEIDI LEGAULT,, MARY M. MASON,, B. CHRISTINE DEVLIN,, EARLINE MILLER,, MICHAEL ROBERT DUNNIGAN,, LEONA MAE VARGAS,, BARBARA ESTES,, MARILOU C. FLUEGEL,, RUBY A. FULCHER,, JULIANA RUDKOWSKI,, JESS GARCIA,, LEROY GHUMM,, VALERIE GIBLIN,, JUDY A. GORCHINSKI,, ALICE GORDON,, JULIA HAIRSTON,, MARY ANN TUREK,, DORIS P. HESTER,, HENRY HUKILL, JR., ELIZABETH IACOVINO,, JOHN J. JACKOWSKI, SR., ELAINE M. JAMES,, PATRICIA WRIGHT,, DEBRA HORNER,, JOHN R. BLOCKER,, JOSEPH BOCCIA, SR., THOMAS FLUEGEL,, JEFFREY HASKELL,, CYNTHIA D. LAKE,, PATRICIA LEE HOLBERTON,, LISA HUDSON,, CHARLES F. COOK,, #3 Complaint filed by ALL PLAINTIFFS, . Signed by Royce C. Lamberth on 6/21/2006. (Attachments: #1 Economic Report/Keown -Counts CCXIII-CCXVI (213-216))(Fay, Thomas)
June 21, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 145 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #119 Amended Complaint,,,,,,, filed by ALL PLAINTIFFS,, BARBARA GALLAGHER,, DEBORAH D. PETERSON,, JAMES ABBOTT,, ROBERT B. ALLMAN,, THOMAS C. BATES, SR., THOMASINE BAYNARD,, PATRICIA CALLOWAY,, LUDDIE BELMER,, EDNA BOHANNON,, CATHERINE BONK,, AVENELL CALLAHAN,, BILLIE JEAN BOLINGER,, CLARE CAMPUS,, ROBBIE CEASAR,, JAMES N. CONLEY,, BETTY COPELAND,, LORRAINE MARY COULMAN,, HAROLD L. COSNER,, HEIDI LEGAULT,, MARY M. MASON,, B. CHRISTINE DEVLIN,, EARLINE MILLER,, MICHAEL ROBERT DUNNIGAN,, LEONA MAE VARGAS,, BARBARA ESTES,, MARILOU C. FLUEGEL,, RUBY A. FULCHER,, JULIANA RUDKOWSKI,, JESS GARCIA,, LEROY GHUMM,, VALERIE GIBLIN,, JUDY A. GORCHINSKI,, ALICE GORDON,, JULIA HAIRSTON,, MARY ANN TUREK,, DORIS P. HESTER,, HENRY HUKILL, JR., ELIZABETH IACOVINO,, JOHN J. JACKOWSKI, SR., ELAINE M. JAMES,, PATRICIA WRIGHT,, DEBRA HORNER,, JOHN R. BLOCKER,, JOSEPH BOCCIA, SR., THOMAS FLUEGEL,, JEFFREY HASKELL,, CYNTHIA D. LAKE,, PATRICIA LEE HOLBERTON,, LISA HUDSON,, CHARLES F. COOK,, #3 Complaint filed by ALL PLAINTIFFS, . Signed by Royce C. Lamberth on 6/21/2006. (Attachments: #1 Economic Report-Belmer-Counts XXV-XXVIII (25-28))(Fay, Thomas)
June 16, 2006 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: Docket Entries 124-143 were modified for clarity; Document #127 was entered in Error as Duplicative.(jeb, )
May 26, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 144 ORDER appointing Annie Pennok Kaplan, Esq., as special Master of this Court in accordance with the Amended Administrative Plan Governing Special Masters and based on the qualifications as set forth in the atttached curriculum vitae and the Acceptance of Appointment As Special Master.. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 5/25/06. (mon, )
May 17, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 143 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION of Special Master dated 5/2/06 pursuant to Order of Reference concerning Counts DLXVII-DLXXI re: Stephen Russell. (Attachments: #1 economic report)(Fay, Thomas) Modified on 6/16/2006 (jeb, ).
May 17, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 142 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION of Special Master dated 5/2/06 pursuant to Order of Reference concerning Counts CCLII-CCLVI re: David Massa. (Attachments: #1 economic report)(Fay, Thomas) Modified on 6/16/2006 (jeb, ).
May 17, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 141 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION of Special Master dated 5/2/06 pursuant to Order of Reference concerning Counts CCXXXVII-CCXL re: Steven LaRiviere. (Attachments: #1 economic report)(Fay, Thomas) Modified on 6/16/2006 (jeb, ).
May 17, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 140 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION of Special Master dated 5/1/06 pursuant to Order of Reference concerning Counts CCIX- CCXII re: Thomas Adrian Julian. (Attachments: #1 economic report)(Fay, Thomas) Modified on 6/16/2006 (jeb, ).
May 17, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 139 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION of Special Master dated 5/2/06 pursuant to Order of Reference concerning Counts CLXXXV-CLXXXVIII re: Edward Iacovino, Jr. (Attachments: #1 economic report)(Fay, Thomas) Modified on 6/16/2006 (jeb, ).
May 17, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 138 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION of Special Master dated 5/2/06 pursuant to Order of Reference concerning Counts CXLV-CXLVIII re: Richard Gordon (Attachments: #1 economic report)(Fay, Thomas) Modified on 6/16/2006 (jeb, ).
May 17, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 137 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION of Special Master dated 5/1/06 pursuant to Order of Reference concerning Counts CXXXVII-CXL re: Timothy Giblin (Attachments: #1 economic report)(Fay, Thomas) Modified on 6/16/2006 (jeb, ).
May 17, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 136 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION of Special Master dated 5/1/06 pursuant to Order of Reference concerning Counts CXXI-CXXIV re: Sean Gallagher(Attachments: #1 economic report)(Fay, Thomas) Modified on 6/16/2006 (jeb, ).
May 17, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 135 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION of Special Master dated 5/2/06 pursuant to Order of Reference concerning Counts XCIII-XCVI re: Michael Devlin (Attachments: #1 economic report)(Fay, Thomas) Modified on 6/16/2006 (jeb, ).
May 17, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 134 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION of Special Master dated 5/1/06 pursuant to Order of Reference concerning Counts LXXXV-LXXXVIII re: Rick Crudale (Attachments: #1 economic report)(Fay, Thomas) Modified on 6/16/2006 (jeb, ).
May 17, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 133 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION of Special Master dated 5/1/06 pursuant to Order of Reference concerning Counts LVII-LX re: Bradley Campus.(Attachments: #1 economic report)(Fay, Thomas) Modified on 6/16/2006 (jeb, ).
May 10, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 132 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION of Special Master dated 4/18/06 pursuant to Order of Reference concerning Counts 488-491 re: Anthony Banks. (Fay, Thomas) modified by 6/16/2006 (jeb, ).
May 10, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 131 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION of Special Master dated 4/18/06 pursuant to Order of Reference concerning Counts 464-467 re: William Winter (Attachments: #1 economic report)(Fay, Thomas) Modified on 6/16/2006 (jeb, ).
May 10, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 130 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION of Special Master dated 4/18/06 pursuant to Order of Reference concerning Counts 408-411 re: William Stelpflug . (Attachments: #1 economic report)(Fay, Thomas) Modified on 6/16/2006 (jeb, ).
May 10, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 129 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION of Special Master dated 4/11/06 pursuant to Order of Reference Concerning Counts CCCXXXIV-CCCLXXXVII re: Larry H. Simpson, Jr. (Attachments: #1 economic report)(Fay, Thomas) Modified on 6/16/2006 (jeb, ).
May 10, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 128 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION of Special Master dated 4/18/06 pursuant to Order of Reference Concerning Counts 217-220 re: Daniel Kluck (Attachments: #1 economic report)(Fay, Thomas) Modified on 6/16/2006 (jeb, ).
May 10, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 127 ENTERED IN ERROR.....REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION (Attachments: #1 economic report)(Fay, Thomas) Modified on 6/16/2006 (jeb, ).(This is a duplicate copy of Document #126)
May 10, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 126 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION of Special Master dated 3/21/06 pursuant to Order of Reference Concerning Counts CLXXIII-CLXXVI re: Richard Holberton (Attachments: #1 economic report)(Fay, Thomas) Modified on 6/16/2006 (jeb, ). Modified on 6/16/2006 (jeb, ).
May 10, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 125 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION of Special Master signed 4/17/06 pursuant to Order of Reference concerning Counts CXXXIII-CXXXVI (133-136) re: Harold Ghumm (Attachments: #1 economic report)(Fay, Thomas) Modified on 6/16/2006 (jeb, ).
May 10, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 124 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION of Special Master dated 4/18/06 pursuant to Order of Reference concerning Counts 89-92 re: Russell Cyzick (Attachments: #1 economic report)(Fay, Thomas) Modified on 6/16/2006 (jeb, ).
May 9, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 123 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION pursuant to order of reference signed by special master Colin Dunham as to Ronnie Bates. (Attachments: #1 Economic Report)(Fay, Thomas)
April 28, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 122 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of Special Master dated 3/1/06 pursuant to Order of Reference concerning Counts CLIII-CLVI re: Thomas Hairston.(jeb, ) Additional attachment (Economic Report) added to entry on 5/3/2006 (jeb, ).
April 28, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 121 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of Special Master dated 3/1/06 pursuant to Order of Reference re: Counts CDXLVIII-CDLI re: Dwayne Wigglesworth. (Attachments: #1 Economic Report)(jeb, )
April 28, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 120 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of Special Master dated 2/6/06 pursuant to Order of Reference re: Counts CCCXX-CCCXXIII (320-323) as to Scipio Williams, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Economic Report)(jeb, )
April 27, 2006 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: re #118 MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint was entered in error as the filing was missing the motion. Counsel was instructed to refile said pleading. (tg, )
April 24, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 119 AMENDED COMPLAINT against ISLAMIC REPUBLIC OF IRAN, IRANIAN MINISTRY OF INFORMATION AND SECURITY filed by EDNA BOHANNON, CATHERINE BONK, AVENELL CALLAHAN, BILLIE JEAN BOLINGER, CLARE CAMPUS, ROBBIE CEASAR, JAMES N. CONLEY, BETTY COPELAND, DEBORAH D. PETERSON, LORRAINE MARY COULMAN, HAROLD L. COSNER, HEIDI LEGAULT, MARY M. MASON, B. CHRISTINE DEVLIN, EARLINE MILLER, MICHAEL ROBERT DUNNIGAN, DEBRA HORNER, JOHN R. BLOCKER, JOSEPH BOCCIA, SR, THOMAS FLUEGEL, PATRICIA WRIGHT, JEFFREY HASKELL, CYNTHIA D. LAKE, PATRICIA LEE HOLBERTON, LISA HUDSON, CHARLES F. COOK, LEONA MAE VARGAS, BARBARA ESTES, MARILOU C. FLUEGEL, JAMES ABBOTT, RUBY A. FULCHER, BARBARA GALLAGHER, JULIANA RUDKOWSKI, JESS GARCIA, LEROY GHUMM, VALERIE GIBLIN, JUDY A. GORCHINSKI, ALICE GORDON, ROBERT B. ALLMAN, JULIA HAIRSTON, MARY ANN TUREK, DORIS P. HESTER, HENRY HUKILL, JR, ELIZABETH IACOVINO, THOMAS C. BATES, SR, JOHN J. JACKOWSKI, SR, ELAINE M. JAMES, THOMASINE BAYNARD, ALL PLAINTIFFS, PATRICIA CALLOWAY, LUDDIE BELMER, EDNA BOHANNON, CATHERINE BONK, AVENELL CALLAHAN, BILLIE JEAN BOLINGER, CLARE CAMPUS, ROBBIE CEASAR, JAMES N. CONLEY, BETTY COPELAND, DEBORAH D. PETERSON, LORRAINE MARY COULMAN, HAROLD L. COSNER, HEIDI LEGAULT, MARY M. MASON, B. CHRISTINE DEVLIN, EARLINE MILLER, MICHAEL ROBERT DUNNIGAN, DEBRA HORNER, JOHN R. BLOCKER, JOSEPH BOCCIA, SR, THOMAS FLUEGEL, PATRICIA WRIGHT, JEFFREY HASKELL, CYNTHIA D. LAKE, PATRICIA LEE HOLBERTON, LISA HUDSON, CHARLES F. COOK, LEONA MAE VARGAS, BARBARA ESTES, MARILOU C. FLUEGEL, JAMES ABBOTT, RUBY A. FULCHER, BARBARA GALLAGHER, JULIANA RUDKOWSKI, JESS GARCIA, LEROY GHUMM, VALERIE GIBLIN, JUDY A. GORCHINSKI, ALICE GORDON, ROBERT B. ALLMAN, JULIA HAIRSTON, MARY ANN TUREK, DORIS P. HESTER, HENRY HUKILL, JR, ELIZABETH IACOVINO, THOMAS C. BATES, SR, JOHN J. JACKOWSKI, SR, ELAINE M. JAMES, THOMASINE BAYNARD, ALL PLAINTIFFS, PATRICIA CALLOWAY, LUDDIE BELMER.(tg, )
April 24, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ENTERED IN ERROR.....MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint by ALL PLAINTIFFS. (Fay, Thomas) Modified on 4/27/2006 (tg, ).
April 13, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 117 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of Special Master dated 2/06/06 pursuant to Order of Reference concerning Counts CCCXX-CCXXIII (320-323) re: John L. Pearson (Attachments: #1 Economic Report)(jeb, )
April 13, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 116 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of Special Master dated 2/6/06 pursuant to Order of Reference concerning Counts CDXX-CDXXIII re: Jeffrey Stokes (Attachments: #1 Economic Report)(jeb, )
April 10, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 115 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of Special Master pursuant to order of reference concerning Counts CCLXXXVIII-CCXCI re: Joseph Peter Milano. (Attachments: #1 Economic Report)(jeb, )
April 10, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 114 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of Special Master dated 2/19/06 pursuant to Order of Reference concerning Counts CCC-CCCIII re: David Nairn (Attachments: #1 Economic Report)(jeb, )
April 10, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 113 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of Special Master dated 3/17/06 pursuant to Order of Reference concerning Counts CLXXVII-CLXXX re: John Hudson (Attachments: #1 Economic Report)(jeb, )
April 10, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 112 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of Special Master pursuant to Order of Reference concerning Counts CLXXXI-CLXXXIV re: Maurice E. Hukill. (Attachments: #1 Economic Report)(jeb, ) Modified on 4/12/2006 (tg, ).
April 10, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 111 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of Special Master dated 3/18/06 pursuant to order of reference concerning Counts CLVII-CLX re: Michael Haskell (Attachments: #1 Economic Report)(jeb, )
April 10, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 110 AMENDED REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of Special Master pursuant to order of reference concerning CDLXXX-CDLXXXIII re: John Norman Boyett (signed 3/21/06) (jeb, )
March 27, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 109 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of Special Master dated 12/23/05 re: Vincent Smith pursuant to Order of Reference concerning Counts CCCXCVI to CCCXCIX. (Attachments: #1 Smith Economic Report)(jeb, )
March 27, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 108 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of Special Master dated 11-9-05 re: Charles Jeffrey Schnorf (Attachments: #1 Schnorf Economic Report)(jeb, )
March 27, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ENTERED IN ERROR.....REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of Special Master re: Luis J. Rotondo pursuant to Order of Refernce concerning Counts CCCLII-CCCLV (Attachments: #1 Rotondo Economic Report)(jeb, ) Modified on 3/27/2006 (jeb, ).
March 27, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 106 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of Special Master re: Ulysses Gregory Parker pursuant to Order of Reference concerning Counts CCCXVI-CCCXIX; (Attachments: #1 Parker Economic Report)(jeb, )
March 27, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 105 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of Special Master Karen J. Kruger dated 12-22-05 re: John Oliver pursuant to Order of Reference concerning Counts DXLIX-DLII. (Attachments: #1 Oliver Economic Report)(jeb, )
March 27, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 104 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of Special Master Karen J. Kruger dated 12/29/05 re: Timothy R. McMahon pursuant to Order of Reference Concerning Counts CCLXXVI-CCLXXIX. (Attachments: #1 McMahon Economic Report)(jeb, )
March 27, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 103 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of Special Master Loraine A. Ray dated 11-1-05 re: Joseph R.Livingston, III pursuant to Order of Reference concerning Counts CCXLV to CCXLVIII; (Attachments: #1 Livingston Economic Report)(jeb, )
March 27, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 102 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of Special Master dated 12/20/05 re: Freas H. Kreischer pursuant to Order of Reference concerning Counts CCXXI-CLXXIV. (Attachments: #1 Kreischer Economic Report)(jeb, )
March 27, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 101 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of Special Master Karen J. Kruger dated 12/28/05 re: James C. Knipple pursuant to Order of Reference concerning Counts 1 to IV. (Attachments: #1 Knipple Economic Report)(jeb, )
March 27, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 100 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of Special Master Karen J. Kruger dated 12/19/05 re: Larry Gerlach pursuant to Order of Reference concerning Counts DXIII -DXVII.(jeb, )
March 27, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 99 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of Special Master dated 12/20/05 re: Danny R. Estes pursuant to Order of Reference concerning Counts CIX-CXII. (Attachments: #1 Estes Economic Report)(jeb, )
March 27, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 98 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of Special Master dated 12/20/05 re: Johnnie Ceasar pursuant to Order of Reference concerning Counts LXI-LXIV. (Attachments: #1 Ceasar Economic Report)(jeb, )
March 27, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ENTERED IN ERROR.....REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of Special Master dated 3/21/06 re: John Norman Boyett pursuant to Order of Reference concerning Counts CDLXXX-CDLXXXIII; (Attachments: #1 Boyett Economic Report)(jeb, ) Modified on 10/30/2006 (jeb, ).
March 27, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 96 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of Special Master dated 10/17/05 re: John J. Bonk pursuant to Order of Reference concerning Counts XLV-XLVIII (Attachments: #1 Bonk Economic Report)(jeb, )
March 27, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 95 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of Special Master dated 2/6/06 re: Richard D. Blankenship pursuant to Order of Reference concerning XXIX-XXXII(29-32) (Attachments: #1 Blankenship Economic Report).(jeb, )
March 27, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 94 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of Special Master Karen J. Kruger dated 2/6/06 re: Pablo Arroyo pursuant to Order of Reference concerning Counts DXCII to DXCV.(jeb, )
March 27, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 93 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of Special Master Karen J. Kruger re: Horace Renardo Stephens, Jr. pursuant to Order of Reference concerning Counts CDXII-CDXV. (Attachments: #1 Stephens Economic Report) (signed by Special Master on 12/22/05)(jeb, )
March 27, 2006 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: re #107 Report and Recommendations - Special Master was entered in error in the wrong case. Accordingly, that entry has been refiled in the correct case.(jeb, )
November 16, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 92 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of Special Master Loraine A.Ray dated 8/8/05 re: M. Helms pursuant to Order of Reference concerning counts CLXI to CLXIV (Attachments: #1 Summary of Key Facts and Assumptions)(Inadvertently not entered on the docket on 11/16/05)(jeb, )
November 16, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 91 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of Special Master Howard P.Rives signed 2/14/05 re: decedent R. Conley pursuant to Order of Reference Concerning Counts 65-68 (Attachments: #1 Summary Key Facts and Assumptions)(jeb, )
November 16, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 90 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of Special Master signed 10/12/05 re: decedent R. Burnette pursuant to Order of Reference Concerning Counts CDXCII to CDXCVI
November 16, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 89 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of Special Master signed 10/12/05 re: decedent C.Cook pursuant to Order of Reference Concerning Counts LXIX to LXXII (Attachments: #1 Summary Key Facts and Assumptions)(jeb, )
November 16, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 88 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of Special Master Colin Dunham signed 4/28/04 re: decedent J. Copeland pursuant to Order of Reference Concerning Counts 73 to 76 (Attachments: #1 Summary Key Facts and Assumptions)(jeb, ) Modified on 11/16/2005 (jeb, ).
November 16, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 87 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of Special Master Karen J. Kruger signed 6/29/05 re: decedent N. Dorsey pursuant to Order of Reference Concerning Counts 97-100. (Attachments: #1 Summary Key Facts and Assumptions)(jeb, )
November 16, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 86 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of Special Master signed 10/12/05 re: decedent F. Eaves pursuant to Order of Reference Concerning Counts DLXXVI to DLXXIX
November 16, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 85 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of Special Master Philip M. Saeta signed 4/7/05 re: decedent Charles Frye pursuant to Order of Reference Concerning Counts DV to DVIII (Attachments: # 1 Summary Key Facts and Assumptions)(jeb, )
November 16, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 84 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of Special Master signed 1/30/04 re: decedent M. Fulcher pursuant to Order of Reference Concerning Counts CXVII to CXX (Attachments: #1 Summary Key Facts and Assumptions)(jeb, )
November 16, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 83 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of Special Master Howard P. Rives signed 1/17/05 re: decedent D. Green pursuant to Order of Reference Concerning Counts 149-152. (Attachments: #1 Summary Key Facts and Assumptions)(jeb, )
November 16, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 82 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of Special Master Colin Dunham signed on 4/18/05 re: decedent S. Hester pursuant to Order of Reference Concerning Counts 165-168 (Attachments: #1 Summary Key Facts and Assumptions)(jeb, )
November 16, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 81 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of Special Master Howard P. Rives signed 1/17/05 re: decedent D. Hildreth pursuant to Order of Reference Concerning Counts 169-172. (Attachments: #1 Summary Key Facts and Assumptions)(jeb, )
November 16, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 80 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of Special Master signed 7/26/05 re: decedent J. Jacobs pursuant to Order of Reference Concerning Counts 527-531.(jeb, )
November 16, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 79 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of Special Master Karen J. Kruger signed 6/29/05 re: decedent J. James pursuant to Order of Reference Concerning Counts 193-196 (Attachments: #1 Summary Key Facts and Assumptions)(jeb, )
November 16, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 78 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of Special Master Howard P. Rives signed 1/3/05 re: decedent N. Jenkins pursuant to Order of Reference Concerning Counts 197-200 (Attachments: #1 Summary Key Facts and Assumptions)(jeb, )
November 16, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 77 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of Special Master Howard P.Rives signed 2/14/04 re: decedent M. LaRiviere pursuant to Order of Reference Concerning Counts 233-236 (Attachments: #1 Summary Key Facts and Assumptions)(jeb, )
November 16, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 76 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of Special Master Howard P. Rives signed 1/17/05 re: decedent P. Lyon pursuant to Order of Reference Concerning Counts 249-252 (Attachments: #1 Summary Key Facts and Assumptions)(jeb, )
November 16, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 75 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of Special Master Howard P. Rives signed 9/9/04 re: decedent C. Martin pursuant to Order of Reference Concerning Counts 265-268 (Attachments: #1 Summary Key Facts and Assumptions)(jeb, )
November 16, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 74 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of Special Master signed 4/19/05 re: decedent B. Matthews pursuant to Order of Reference Concerning Counts 536-539 (jeb, )
November 16, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 73 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of Special Master Howard P.Rives signed 8/24/04 re: decedent H. Myers pursuant to Order of Reference Concerning Counts 296-299 (Attachments: #1 Summary Key Facts and Assumptions)(jeb, )
November 16, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 72 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of Special Master signed 10/12/05 re: decedent J. Owens pursuant to Order of Reference Concerning Counts CCCVIII to CCCXI (Attachments: #1 Summary Key Facts and Assumptions)(jeb, )
November 16, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 71 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of Special Master signed 10/12/05 re: decedent C.Page pursuant to Order of Reference Concerning Counts CCCXII to CCCXV (Attachments: #1 Summary Key Facts and Assumptions)(jeb, )
November 16, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 70 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of Special Master Howard P. Rives signed 2/14/04 re: decedent T. Perron pursuant to Order of Reference Concerning Counts 324-327 (Attachments: #1 Summary Key Facts and Assumptions)(jeb, )
November 16, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 69 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of Special Master signed 10/12/05 re: decedent W. Pollard pursuant to Order of Reference Concerning Counts CCCXXXII to CCCXXXV (Attachments: #1 Summary Key Facts and Assumptions)(jeb, )
November 16, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 68 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of Special Master Howard P. Rives signed 7/25/04 re: decedent P. Prindeville pursuant to Order of Reference Concerning Counts 340 to 343 (Attachments: #1 Summary Key Facts and Assumptions)(jeb, ) Modified on 11/16/2005 (jeb, ).
November 16, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 67 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of Special Master Philip M. Saeta signed 4/7/05 re: decedent D. Quirante pursuant to Order of Reference Concerning Counts CCCXLIV to CCCXLVII (Attachments: #1 Summary Key Facts and Assumptions)(jeb, )
November 16, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 66 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of Special Master signed 10/12/05 re: decedent M. Sauls pursuant to Order of Reference Concerning Counts CCCLVI to CCCLIX (Attachments: #1 Summary Key Facts and Assumptions)(jeb, )
November 16, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 65 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of Special Master Howard P. Rives signed 7/25/04 re: decedent T. Smith pursuant to Order of Reference Concerning Counts 392-395 (Attachments: #1 Summary Key Facts and Assumptions)(jeb, )
November 16, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 64 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of Special Master Howard P. Rives signed 7/24/04 re: decedent K. Smith pursuant to Order of Reference Concerning Counts 388-391 (Attachments: #1 Summary Key Facts and Assumptions)(jeb, )
November 16, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 63 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of Special Master Loraine A. Ray signed 7/26/05 re: decedent W. Sommerhof pursuant to Order of Reference Concerning Counts CD to CDIII(Attachments: #1 Summary Key Facts and Assumptions)(jeb, )
November 16, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 62 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of Special Master Howard P. Rives signed 2/28/04 re: decedent S. Spencer pursuant to Order of Reference Concerning Counts 404 -407(Attachments: #1 Summary Key Facts and Assumptions)(jeb, )
November 16, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 61 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of Special Master Jeffrey A. Manheimer signed 10/11/05 re: decedent D. Sundar pursuant to Order of Reference Concerning Counts CDXXVIII to CDXXXI (Attachments: #1 Summary Key Facts and Assumptions)(jeb, )
November 16, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 60 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of Special Master Howard P. Rives signed 2/20/04 re: decedent S. Tingley pursuant to Order of Reference Concerning Counts 432-435 (Attachments: #1 Summary Key Facts and Assumptions).(jeb, )
November 16, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 59 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of Special Master Howard P. Rives signed 1/20/05 re: decedent M. Toma pursuant to Order of Reference Concerning Counts 588-591. (jeb)
November 16, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 58 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of Special Master Howard P. Rives signed 2/20/04 re: decedent J. Beamon pursuant to Order of Reference Concerning Counts 21-24 (Attachments: # 1 Summary Key Facts and Assumptions)(jeb, )
November 16, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 57 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of Special Master Howard P.Rives signed 3/6/04 re: decedent J. Blocker pursuant to Order of Reference Concerning Counts 33-36 (Attachments: # 1 Summary Key Facts and Assumptions)(jeb, )
November 8, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 56 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of Special Master Karen J. Kruger signed 8/9/05 re: decedent J. Baynard pursuant to Order of Reference Concerning Counts XVII to XX (Attachments: #1 Summary Key Facts and Assumptions)(jeb, )
November 8, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 55 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of Special Master David L. Broom signed 8/18/05 re: decedent J. Allman pursuant to Orders of reference concerning counts IX through XII (Attachments: #1 Summary Key Facts and Assumptions)(jeb, )
November 8, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 54 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of Special Master Jeffrey A. Manheimer signed 10/11/05 re: decedent J. Young pursuant to Order of Reference concerning counts CDLXXVI to CDLXXIX. (Attachments: #1 Summary Key Facts and Assumptions)(jeb, )
November 8, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 53 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of Special Master signed 10/12/05 re: decedent J. Williamson pursuant to Order of Reference concerning counts CDLX to CDLXIII. (Attachments: #1 Summary Key Facts and Assumptions)(jeb, )
November 8, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 52 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of Special Master Howard P. Rives, signed 7/25/04 re: decedent R. Williams pursuant to Order of Reference Counts 452-455. (Attachments: #1 Summary Key Facts and Assumptions)(jeb, )
November 8, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 51 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of Special Master Phlip M. Saeta, signed 4/7/05 pursuant to Order of Reference concerning counts CDXL to CDXLIII of Decedent D.Vallone, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Summary Key Facts and Assumptions)(jeb, )
June 7, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER granting #48 MOTION for Appointment of Commissioner and Issuance of Letters Rogatory . Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 6/3/2005. (lcrcl1, )
May 3, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 49 NOTICE of Appearance by Tuna Mecit on behalf of ALL PLAINTIFFS (Mecit, Tuna)
February 21, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 48 MOTION Appointment of Commissioner and Issuance of Letters Rogatory by ALL PLAINTIFFS. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order Appointing Commissioner)(Fay, Thomas)
January 19, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 47 NOTICE of Change of Address by Steven R. Perles (Perles, Steven)
November 14, 2003 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER appointing Colin M. Dunham, Esq. as a Special Master of this Court.. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 11/13/03. (Attachments: #1)(mon, )
October 1, 2003 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER by Judge Royce C. Lamberth : advising that Philip M. Saeta,Esq. is appointed as Special Master. The Special Master shall hear, consider, and make recommended findings of fact and conclusions of law. The Special Master shall possess and exercise all powers conferred upon Special Masters. (attachments) (N) (mon)
September 24, 2003 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER by Judge Royce C. Lamberth : advising that Christopher A. Byrne, Esq. is appointed as a Special Master. The Special Master shall hear, consider, and make recommended findings of fact and conclusions of law. The Special Master shall possess and exercise all powers conferred upon Special Masters. .(attachments) (N) (mon)
September 16, 2003 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER by Judge Royce C. Lamberth : advising that Jeffrey A. Manheimer, Esq. is appointed as Special Master. The Special Master shall hear, consider, and make recommended findings of fact and conclusions of law. The Special Master shall possess and exercise all powers conferred upon Special Masters. (attachments) (N) (mon)
September 15, 2003 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER by Judge Royce C. Lamberth : advising that Kenneth M. Trombly, Esq. is appointed as Special Master. The Special Master shall hear, consider, and make recommended findings of fact and conclusions of law. The Special Master shall possess and exercise all powers conferred upon Special Masters.(attachment) (N) (mon)
September 11, 2003 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER by Judge Royce C. Lamberth : granting motion to appoint Richard L. Burka (10812 Outpost Dr. North Potomac, Maryland 21701) as a commissioner of this Court [40-1] by DEBORAH D. PETERSON , for the purpose of administering oaths and taking testimony. (N) (rew)
September 10, 2003 Opinion or Order Filing 40 MOTION filed by plaintiff to appoint Richard L. Burka as a commissioner (mpt)
August 27, 2003 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER by Judge Royce C. Lamberth : advising that Loraine A. Ray, Esq. is appointed as a Special Master. The Special Master shall hear, consider, and make recommended findings of fact and conclusions of law. The Special Master shall possess and exercise all powers conferred upon Special Masters.(attachments) (N) (mon)
August 25, 2003 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER by Judge Royce C. Lamberth : advising that David L. Broom, Esq. is appointed as Special Master. The Special Master shall hear, consider, and make recommended findings of fact and conclusions of law. The Special Master shall possess and exercise all powers conferred upon Special Masters.(attachment) (N) (mon)
August 15, 2003 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER by Judge Royce C. Lamberth : advising that Francis B. Fennessey, Esq. is appointed as a Special Master. The Special Master shall hear, consider, and make recommended findings of fact and conclusions of law. The Special Master shall possess and exercise all powers conferred upon Special Masters.(attachments) (N) (mon)
August 14, 2003 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER by Judge Royce C. Lamberth : advising that Howard P. Rives, Esq. is appointed as Special Master. The Special Master shall hear, consider, and make recommended findings of fact and conclusions of law. The Special Master shall possess and exercise all powers conferred upon Special Masters.(attachments) (N) (mon)
August 12, 2003 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER by Judge Royce C. Lamberth : advising that Susan Meek,MD,JD is appointed as a Special Master. The Special Master shall hear, consider, and make recommended findings of fact and conclusions of law. The Special Master shall possess and exercise all powers conferred upon Special Masters.(attachments) (N) (mon)
August 12, 2003 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER by Judge Royce C. Lamberth : advising that Paul G.Griffin, Esq. is appointed as a Special Master. The Special Master shall hear, consider, and make recommended findings of fact and conclusions of law. The Special Master shall possess and exercise all powers conferred upon Special Masters.(attachment) (N) (mon)
August 6, 2003 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER by Judge Royce C. Lamberth : appointing Karen J. Kruger, Esq. as a Special Master of the Court in this case.(attachments) (N) (mon)
August 6, 2003 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER by Judge Royce C. Lamberth : appointing Veta Carney, Esq. as a Special Master of the Court in this case(attachments). (N) (mon)
August 6, 2003 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER by Judge Royce C. Lamberth : appointing John Carney as a Special Master of this Court in this matter.(attachments) (N) (mon)
August 1, 2003 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER by Judge Royce C. Lamberth : appointing John Swanson, Esq. as Special Master of this Court. (N) (mon)
July 30, 2003 Opinion or Order Filing 29 AMENDED ADMINISTRATIVE PLAN GOVERING APPOINTED SPECIAL MASTERS AND ORDER by Judge Royce C. Lamberth . (N) (mon)
July 18, 2003 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ERRATA(N) (mon)
July 18, 2003 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER by Judge Royce C. Lamberth : granting motion to amend transcript of testimony of Patrick Clawson, PhD [23-1] [26-1] by DEBORAH D. PETERSON (N) (mon)
July 2, 2003 Opinion or Order Filing 26 MOTION filed by plaintiff DEBORAH D. PETERSON to amend transcript of testimony of Patrick Clawson, PhD [23-1] ; affidavit (1) (rje)
May 30, 2003 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER by Judge Royce C. Lamberth : Entering judgment on behalf of the plaintiffs, Deborah D. Peterson, et al, as to all issues of liability against the defendants, the Islamic Republic of Iran and the Iranian Ministry of Information and Security; directing that all claims for damages be submitted to Special Masters to be appointed by the Court; upon receipt of ruling from Special Masters, the Court will enter judgment as to each claim for compensatory damages; taking under advisement the issue of imposing punitive damages. (N) (mon)
May 30, 2003 Opinion or Order Filing 24 MEMORANDUM OPINION by Judge Royce C. Lamberth (N) (mon)
April 1, 2003 Opinion or Order Filing 23 TRANSCRIPT filed for date(s) of 3/17/03. Reporter: Santa Theresa Zizzo (mpt) (bj).
March 18, 2003 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE for plaintiffs, by Robert Peter Feeney, Joseph Peter Drennan, Anthony J. LaSpada, Jane Carol Norman, Kay Maureen Clarke, Allen Louis Rothenberg, Ferris Ridgely Bond (mpt)
March 18, 2003 Opinion or Order NON-JURY TRIAL(evidentiary hearing on issue of liability) before Judge Royce C. Lamberth resumed and concluded; plaintiff to file proposed findings and conclusions within 30 days after receiving transcript of evidentiary hearing. reporter: Theresa Sorensen (mon)
March 17, 2003 Opinion or Order NON-JURY TRIAL(hearing to determine defendants' liability after default judgment) before Judge Royce C. Lamberth begun and continued to 10:00 3/18/03 . reporter: Santa Zizzo (mon)
January 7, 2003 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER by Judge Royce C. Lamberth : granting motion by plaintiff DEBORAH D. PETERSON for appointment of Victor Holm, Elizabeth Holm and Alan R. Bergsten as commissioners of this court [20-1] for the purposes of administering oaths and taking testimony in this matter (N) (kk)
January 3, 2003 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MOTION filed by plaintiff for appointment Victor Holm, Elizabeth Holm and Alan R. Bergsten as commissioners of this court (mpt) (bj).
December 18, 2002 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER by Judge Royce C. Lamberth : granting motion for scheduling order [16-1] by DEBORAH D. PETERSON, granting motion for an Ex Parte briefing schedule [14-2] by ALL PLAINTIFFS ; bench trial on all liability issues set for 10:00 3/17/03 ; authorizing plaintiff to submit application for assistance to DOJ Office of Justice Programs.authorizing Court Registry to accept for deposit all grants received from Office of Justice Programs. (N) (mon)
December 18, 2002 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MEMORANDUM OPINION by Judge Royce C. Lamberth (N) (mon)
December 18, 2002 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER by Judge Royce C. Lamberth : granting motion for entry of default as to ISLAMIC REPUBLIC, IRANIAN MINISTRY [14-1] by ALL PLAINTIFFS (N) (mon)
December 17, 2002 Opinion or Order STATUS HEARING before Judge Royce C. Lamberth : trial on liabliity on 3/17/03, 10:00am(2 days)Reporter: Theresa Sorensen (mon)
October 22, 2002 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MOTION filed by plaintiffs for scheduling order ; attachment (1) (mpt) (bj).
October 22, 2002 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MOTION filed by plaintiffs for appointment of Special Masters ; attachment (1) (mpt) (bj).
August 12, 2002 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ENTERED IN ERROR..... MOTION filed by ALL PLAINTIFFS for entry of default as to ISLAMIC REPUBLIC, IRANIAN MINISTRY , and for an Ex Parte briefing schedule , and for a status conference (mpt) Modified on 12/19/2002
August 7, 2002 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MOTION filed by ALL PLAINTIFFS for status conference (mpt) (bj).
July 12, 2002 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MOTION filed by plaintiff for entry of default , and for order of issuance of a memorandum opinion regarding, Inter Alia, military service members' right to recover damages under the State-Sponsored Terrorism exception to the Foreign Sovereign Immunities Act; ; appendix (3) (mpt) (bj).
June 3, 2002 Opinion or Order Filing 11 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of summons and complaint executed (and returned without comment) on 5/6/02 upon defendant ISLAMIC REPUBLIC, defendant IRANIAN MINISTRY (nmr)
March 7, 2002 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ***(ENTERED IN ERROR) ORDER by Judge Royce C. Lamberth : granting plaintiffs' motion to proceed with service through diplomatic channels. (N) (mon)
January 14, 2002 Opinion or Order Filing 9 REQUEST by plaintiffs for the Clerk, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1608(a)(4), to mail two copies of the summons and complaint and a notice of suit, together with a translation of each into the official language of the foreign state, by certified mail, return receipt requested, to the Director of Special Consular Services at the U.S. Department of State (nmr) Modified on 01/17/2002
December 26, 2001 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER by Judge Royce C. Lamberth : granting motion for order permitting plaintiffs to proceed with service through diplomatic channels [7-1] by DEBORAH D. PETERSON (N) (adc)
December 12, 2001 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MOTION filed by plaintiff DEBORAH D. PETERSON for order permitting plaintiffs to proceed with service through diplomatic channels ; Attachments (3) (nmr)
October 23, 2001 Opinion or Order Filing 6 RESPONSE by ALL PLAINTIFFS to order [2-1] filed 10/23/01; (FILED UNDER SEAL) (tth)
October 23, 2001 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER by Judge Royce C. Lamberth : directing Clerk of Court to file under seal the list containing the names and residence address of all plaintiff pursuant to Court's order of 10/3/01. (N) (mon)
October 3, 2001 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTIFICATION OF RELATED CASE: Case related to Case No(s): CA 00-549 (RCL) (bm)
October 3, 2001 Opinion or Order Filing 3 COMPLAINT filed by ALL PLAINTIFFS (bm) (bj).
October 3, 2001 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER by Chief Judge Thomas F. Hogan : granting motion for a waiver of Local Rule 5.1(e) [1-1] by ALL PLAINTIFFS; waiving the full residence address of the party be included on the caption of the initial pleading; the Plaintiffs file under seal a list containing the names and residence addresses of all plaintiffs within 30 days of the date of this Order; the Clerk of the Court accept the Complaint submitted and issue process directed to the Defendants. (N) (bm)
October 3, 2001 Opinion or Order Filing 1 MOTION filed by ALL PLAINTIFFS for a waiver of Local Rule 5.1(e) (bm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PETERSON, et al v. ISLAMIC REPUBLIC, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Garnishee: WORLD BANK
Represented By: Griffith L. Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Garnishee: BANK OF JAPAN
Represented By: Jared R. Clark
Represented By: Joshua Dorchak
Represented By: Paul Joseph Lambert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Garnishee: STATE BANK OF INDIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Garnishee: CATERPILLAR, INC.
Represented By: Jamie Elizabeth Knight
Represented By: Bradford A. Berenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Garnishee: HSBC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Garnishee: BANK OF TOKYO-MITSUBISHI UFJ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Garnishee: INTERNATIONAL TELECOMMUNICATIONS SATELLITE ORGANIZATION
Represented By: David I. Bledsoe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Garnishee: EXPORT-IMPORT BANK OF INDIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Garnishee: BANK OF TOKYO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Garnishee: OCCIDENTAL INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Garnishee: INTELSAT, S.A.
Represented By: David I. Bledsoe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Garnishee: DEUTSCHE BANK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Garnishee: INTERNATIONAL FINANCE CORPORATION
Represented By: Francis A. Vasquez, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Garnishee: ASIAN DEVELOPMENT BANK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Garnishee: HSBC Bank USA, N.A.
Represented By: Alexander J. Willscher
Represented By: Bruce Edward Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Garnishee: EXPORT-IMPORT BANK OF KOREA
Represented By: Alan I. Raylesberg
Represented By: Hwan Kim
Represented By: Karl H. Buch
Represented By: Jay R. Henneberry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Garnishee: SIEMENS CORPORATION
Represented By: Laura Nachowitz Steel
Represented By: Robert W. Littleton
Represented By: A. Daniel Ullman, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Garnishee: JAPAN BANK FOR INTERNATIONAL COOPERATION
Represented By: James H. Hulme
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Garnishee: MITSUBISHI INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION
Represented By: Alex Young K. Oh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Garnishee: INTERNATIONAL MONETARY FUND
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Garnishee: OCCIDENTAL PETROLEUM CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Garnishee: ABU DHABI INTERNATIONAL BANK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DEBORAH D. PETERSON
Represented By: William Coleman Dowden, III
Represented By: Anthony J. LaSpada
Represented By: David J. Cook
Represented By: Jamie Elizabeth Knight
Represented By: Annie P. Kaplan
Represented By: Robert Peter Feeney
Represented By: Molly Hoffman Wolfe
Represented By: Joseph Peter Drennan
Represented By: Thomas Fortune Fay
Represented By: Kay M. Clarke
Represented By: Jane Carol Norman, I
Represented By: Allen Louis Rothenberg
Represented By: Ferris Ridgely Bond, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALICE GORDON
Represented By: Anthony J. LaSpada
Represented By: David J. Cook
Represented By: Jamie Elizabeth Knight
Represented By: Robert Peter Feeney
Represented By: Molly Hoffman Wolfe
Represented By: Joseph Peter Drennan
Represented By: Thomas Fortune Fay
Represented By: Kay M. Clarke
Represented By: Jane Carol Norman, I
Represented By: Allen Louis Rothenberg
Represented By: Ferris Ridgely Bond, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN R. BLOCKER
Represented By: David J. Cook
Represented By: Jamie Elizabeth Knight
Represented By: Molly Hoffman Wolfe
Represented By: Steven Robert Perles
Represented By: Thomas Fortune Fay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LUDDIE BELMER
Represented By: Anthony J. LaSpada
Represented By: David J. Cook
Represented By: Jamie Elizabeth Knight
Represented By: Robert Peter Feeney
Represented By: Molly Hoffman Wolfe
Represented By: Joseph Peter Drennan
Represented By: Thomas Fortune Fay
Represented By: Kay M. Clarke
Represented By: Jane Carol Norman, I
Represented By: Allen Louis Rothenberg
Represented By: Ferris Ridgely Bond, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NATHALIE C. JENKINS
Represented By: Anthony J. LaSpada
Represented By: David J. Cook
Represented By: Jamie Elizabeth Knight
Represented By: Robert Peter Feeney
Represented By: Molly Hoffman Wolfe
Represented By: Joseph Peter Drennan
Represented By: Thomas Fortune Fay
Represented By: Kay M. Clarke
Represented By: Jane Carol Norman, I
Represented By: Allen Louis Rothenberg
Represented By: Ferris Ridgely Bond, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMES J. LANGON, SR.
Represented By: David J. Cook
Represented By: Jamie Elizabeth Knight
Represented By: Molly Hoffman Wolfe
Represented By: Steven Robert Perles
Represented By: Thomas Fortune Fay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RICHARD HASKELL
Represented By: Anthony J. LaSpada
Represented By: David J. Cook
Represented By: Jamie Elizabeth Knight
Represented By: Robert Peter Feeney
Represented By: Molly Hoffman Wolfe
Represented By: Joseph Peter Drennan
Represented By: Thomas Fortune Fay
Represented By: Kay M. Clarke
Represented By: Jane Carol Norman, I
Represented By: Allen Louis Rothenberg
Represented By: Ferris Ridgely Bond, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EARLINE MILLER
Represented By: Anthony J. LaSpada
Represented By: David J. Cook
Represented By: Jamie Elizabeth Knight
Represented By: Robert Peter Feeney
Represented By: Molly Hoffman Wolfe
Represented By: Joseph Peter Drennan
Represented By: Thomas Fortune Fay
Represented By: Kay M. Clarke
Represented By: Jane Carol Norman, I
Represented By: Allen Louis Rothenberg
Represented By: Ferris Ridgely Bond, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PATRICIA LEE HOLBERTON
Represented By: David J. Cook
Represented By: Jamie Elizabeth Knight
Represented By: Molly Hoffman Wolfe
Represented By: Steven Robert Perles
Represented By: Thomas Fortune Fay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JULIA HAIRSTON
Represented By: Anthony J. LaSpada
Represented By: David J. Cook
Represented By: Jamie Elizabeth Knight
Represented By: Robert Peter Feeney
Represented By: Molly Hoffman Wolfe
Represented By: Joseph Peter Drennan
Represented By: Thomas Fortune Fay
Represented By: Kay M. Clarke
Represented By: Jane Carol Norman, I
Represented By: Allen Louis Rothenberg
Represented By: Ferris Ridgely Bond, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALL PLAINTIFFS
Represented By: Caragh Fay Owens
Represented By: Anthony J. LaSpada
Represented By: David J. Cook
Represented By: Jamie Elizabeth Knight
Represented By: Robert Peter Feeney
Represented By: Molly Hoffman Wolfe
Represented By: Joseph Peter Drennan
Represented By: Steven Robert Perles
Represented By: Tuna Mecit
Represented By: Thomas Fortune Fay
Represented By: Kay M. Clarke
Represented By: Jane Carol Norman, I
Represented By: John Vail
Represented By: Allen Louis Rothenberg
Represented By: Ferris Ridgely Bond, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LISA HUDSON
Represented By: David J. Cook
Represented By: Jamie Elizabeth Knight
Represented By: Molly Hoffman Wolfe
Represented By: Steven Robert Perles
Represented By: Thomas Fortune Fay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARY ANN TUREK
Represented By: Anthony J. LaSpada
Represented By: David J. Cook
Represented By: Jamie Elizabeth Knight
Represented By: Robert Peter Feeney
Represented By: Molly Hoffman Wolfe
Represented By: Joseph Peter Drennan
Represented By: Thomas Fortune Fay
Represented By: Kay M. Clarke
Represented By: Jane Carol Norman, I
Represented By: Allen Louis Rothenberg
Represented By: Ferris Ridgely Bond, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARILOU C. FLUEGEL
Represented By: Anthony J. LaSpada
Represented By: David J. Cook
Represented By: Jamie Elizabeth Knight
Represented By: Robert Peter Feeney
Represented By: Molly Hoffman Wolfe
Represented By: Joseph Peter Drennan
Represented By: Thomas Fortune Fay
Represented By: Kay M. Clarke
Represented By: Jane Carol Norman, I
Represented By: Allen Louis Rothenberg
Represented By: Ferris Ridgely Bond, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JUDY A. GORCHINSKI
Represented By: Anthony J. LaSpada
Represented By: David J. Cook
Represented By: Jamie Elizabeth Knight
Represented By: Robert Peter Feeney
Represented By: Molly Hoffman Wolfe
Represented By: Joseph Peter Drennan
Represented By: Thomas Fortune Fay
Represented By: Kay M. Clarke
Represented By: Jane Carol Norman, I
Represented By: Allen Louis Rothenberg
Represented By: Ferris Ridgely Bond, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARY M. MASON
Represented By: Anthony J. LaSpada
Represented By: David J. Cook
Represented By: Jamie Elizabeth Knight
Represented By: Robert Peter Feeney
Represented By: Molly Hoffman Wolfe
Represented By: Joseph Peter Drennan
Represented By: Thomas Fortune Fay
Represented By: Kay M. Clarke
Represented By: Jane Carol Norman, I
Represented By: Allen Louis Rothenberg
Represented By: Ferris Ridgely Bond, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DEBRA HORNER
Represented By: David J. Cook
Represented By: Jamie Elizabeth Knight
Represented By: Molly Hoffman Wolfe
Represented By: Steven Robert Perles
Represented By: Thomas Fortune Fay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BILLIE JEAN BOLINGER
Represented By: Anthony J. LaSpada
Represented By: David J. Cook
Represented By: Jamie Elizabeth Knight
Represented By: Robert Peter Feeney
Represented By: Molly Hoffman Wolfe
Represented By: Joseph Peter Drennan
Represented By: Thomas Fortune Fay
Represented By: Kay M. Clarke
Represented By: Jane Carol Norman, I
Represented By: Allen Louis Rothenberg
Represented By: Ferris Ridgely Bond, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AVENELL CALLAHAN
Represented By: Anthony J. LaSpada
Represented By: David J. Cook
Represented By: Jamie Elizabeth Knight
Represented By: Robert Peter Feeney
Represented By: Molly Hoffman Wolfe
Represented By: Joseph Peter Drennan
Represented By: Thomas Fortune Fay
Represented By: Kay M. Clarke
Represented By: Jane Carol Norman, I
Represented By: Allen Louis Rothenberg
Represented By: Ferris Ridgely Bond, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THOMAS FLUEGEL
Represented By: David J. Cook
Represented By: Jamie Elizabeth Knight
Represented By: Molly Hoffman Wolfe
Represented By: Steven Robert Perles
Represented By: Thomas Fortune Fay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BETTY LEWIS
Represented By: Anthony J. LaSpada
Represented By: David J. Cook
Represented By: Jamie Elizabeth Knight
Represented By: Robert Peter Feeney
Represented By: Molly Hoffman Wolfe
Represented By: Joseph Peter Drennan
Represented By: Thomas Fortune Fay
Represented By: Kay M. Clarke
Represented By: Jane Carol Norman, I
Represented By: Allen Louis Rothenberg
Represented By: Ferris Ridgely Bond, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOSEPH BOCCIA, SR.
Represented By: David J. Cook
Represented By: Jamie Elizabeth Knight
Represented By: Molly Hoffman Wolfe
Represented By: Steven Robert Perles
Represented By: Thomas Fortune Fay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EDNA BOHAN