ELLIS et al v. ISLAMIC REPUBLIC OF IRAN et al

Case Number: 1:2005cv00220
Filed: January 31, 2005
Court: District Of Columbia District Court
Office: Washington, DC Office
Presiding Judge: Ricardo M. Urbina
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1602 Foreign Sovreign Immunities Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 16, 2010 24 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Ricardo M. Urbina on 2/16/10. (lcrmu2)
March 25, 2011 28 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Ricardo M. Urbina on 3/25/11. (lcrmu2)
July 3, 2012 32 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 7/3/2012. (lcrcl5)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ELLIS et al v. ISLAMIC REPUBLIC OF IRAN et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.