March 28, 2014 |
Filing
648
ORDER granting 647 Petitioner's Motion to Vacate Scheduling Order and for a New Schedule Regarding Petitioner's Motion to Reopen the Case and for Judgment; the Court's February 20, 2014 [Dkt. No. 643] is hereby vacated; the Petitioner may file a Reply Brief no later than April 30, 2014; the Motions Hearing now set for April 1, 2014, is hereby rescheduled for May 15, 2014, at 10:00 a.m. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 3/28/14. (CL, )
|
February 20, 2014 |
Filing
643
ORDER granting 642 Motion to Vacate Scheduling Order and for a New Schedule Regarding Petitioner's Motion to Reopen Case and for Judgment; Respondents shall file their Response to Petitioner's Motion no later than March 26, 2014; the Motions Hearing now set for February 25, 2014, is hereby rescheduled for April 1, 2014, at 10:00 a.m. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 2/20/14. (CL, )
|
February 18, 2014 |
Filing
641
ORDER that the Government shall file its Opposition to Petitioner's Motion to Reopen the Case and for Judgment on Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus no later than February 21, 2014, at 5:00 p.m.; a Motions Hearing is hereby scheduled for February 25, 2014, at 10:00 a.m. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 2/18/14. (CL, )
|
October 21, 2010 |
Filing
584
ORDER denying Petitioner's Request to Hold Final Action in Abeyance Pending a Ruling on Petition for Certiorari. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 10/21/10. (CL, )
|
September 14, 2010 |
Filing
575
The Court of Appeals issued its Mandate in this case on September 3, 2010, reversing and remanding this Court's Opinion of August 21, 2009, with instructions to deny Appellant's Petition for a Writ of Habeas Corpus; it is hereby ORDERED, that if any party has any objection to this Court dismissing the Petition for Habeas Corpus, such objection shall be filed no later than September 25, 2010. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 9/14/10. (CL, )
|
June 2, 2010 |
Filing
567
ENTERED IN ERROR.....ORDER: Please see attached Scheduling Order setting forth deadlines in advance of Merits Hearing. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 6/2/10. (lcgk3, ) Modified on 6/2/2010 (tth, ).
|
March 24, 2010 |
Filing
556
ORDER dismissing without prejudice Petitioner's Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 3/24/10. (CL, )
|
March 10, 2010 |
Filing
555
ORDER: Pursuant to Docket Number 549, this is the Court's unclassified Order. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 3/10/10. (lcgk3, )
|
February 24, 2010 |
Filing
551
ORDER: For the reasons set forth in this Court's Classified Memorandum Opinion of February 24, 2010, which is undergoing classified review, Petitioner Fahmi Salem Al-Assani's petition for a writ of habeas corpus is denied. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 2/24/10. (CL, )
|
February 18, 2010 |
Filing
547
ORDER: Petitioner Zahir Omar Khamis Bin Hamdoun shall show cause no later than February 25, 2010, as to why his petition for a writ of habeas corpus should not be dismissed; the Government shall file its response by March 4, 2010. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 2/18/10. (CL, )
|
February 5, 2010 |
Filing
546
ORDER denying 522 Petitioner's Motion to Reconsider the Grant of Motion to Stay. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 2/4/10. (CL, )
|
January 6, 2010 |
Filing
531
ORDER: The Parties shall file supplemental briefs no later than January 20, 2010; the Government may file a response to Petitioners' Motion for Leave to File a Supplemental Brief Concerning the Effect of Cleared Status no later than January 20, 2010 (see Order for more details). Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 1/5/10. (CL, )
|
December 22, 2009 |
Filing
526
ORDER: Petitioner Bawazir's Merits Hearing is canceled. His petition is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 12/22/09. (lcgk2, )
|
December 16, 2009 |
Filing
514
ORDER setting schedule for the Merits Hearings scheduled for January 4-8, 2010 (see Order for more detail). Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 12/15/09. (CL, )
|
December 10, 2009 |
Filing
509
MEMORANDUM ORDER granting in part and denying in part 447 Petitioner's Motion for Sanctions; the United States Department of Defense is hereby adjudged and decreed to be in civil contempt of court for failing to comply with this Court's O rder of June 19, 2009; the Clerk of Court shall post a transcript of Petitioner's testimony on the United States District Court Public Information Page for Guantanamo Bay Cases; Respondents shall submit, within 30 days of the date of this Order, a detailed explanation of all steps taken to ensure that such errors not occur in the future. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 12/10/09. (CL, )
|
December 9, 2009 |
Filing
507
MEMORANDUM ORDER granting 466 the Government's Motion to Stay Pending Appellate Review. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 12/9/09. (CL, )
|
November 16, 2009 |
Filing
495
ORDER denying 491 Respondents' Sealed Motion for a Stay of Proceedings; Petitioner's Oral Motion for a Continuance is granted; Petitioner Bawazir's Merits Hearing is rescheduled to begin on January 4, 2010; Petitioner Bawazir's Pretrial Conference is scheduled for December 22, 2010. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 11/16/09. (CL, )
|
October 8, 2009 |
Filing
477
ORDER setting forth what is required by the parties in advance of the Pretrial Conference set for December 22, 2009 (see Order for details). Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 10/8/09. (CL, )
|
October 7, 2009 |
Filing
476
ORDER: Petitioner Hamdoun's case is stayed for 120 days; a Merits Hearing on Petitioner Bawazir's petition shall be held November 23-25, 2009; a pre-trial conference will be held on November 16, 2009 at 10:00 a.m.; a Merits Hearing on Petit ioner Al-Nahdi and Petitioner Al-Assani shall be held January 4-8, 2010, the parties' Motions for Judgment on the Record are due on November 16, 2009, oppositions due December 4, 2009 and a pre-trial conference regarding Al-Nahdi and Al-Assani will be held on December 22, 2009, at 10:00 a.m. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 10/7/09. (CL, )
|
August 21, 2009 |
Filing
459
ORDER pursuant to Docket Number 456, this is the Court's unclassified Order. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 8/21/09. (lcgk2, )
|
August 17, 2009 |
Filing
457
ORDER: For the reasons stated in this Court's Classified Memorandum Opinion, Petitioner Mohammed Al-Adahi's Petition for a Writ of Habeas Corpus is hereby GRANTED; the Government is directed to take all necessary and appropriate diplomatic steps to facilitate Petitioners release forthwith. Further, the Government is directed to comply with any reporting requirements mandated by the Supplemental Appropriations Act, Pub. L. No. 111-32, 123 Stat. 1859 (2009), if applicable, to facilitate Petitioners release, and to report back to the Court no later than September 18, 2009, as to the status of that release and what steps have been taken to secure that release. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 8/17/09. (lcgk2, )
|
August 11, 2009 |
Filing
455
ORDER that Petitioners shall, from this date forward, file with this Court two copies of all classified submissions. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 8/11/09. (CL, )
|
July 8, 2009 |
Filing
438
ORDER that on or before July 20, 2009, Respondents shall file with the Court ex parte and under seal a report detailing the current status of the Guantanamo Review Task Force review process with respect to each Petitioner. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 7/8/09. (CL, )
|
June 25, 2009 |
Filing
430
ORDER: Petitioner Bawazir's and Petitioner Hamdoun's cases are hereby stayed until October 1, 2009; the parties shall file a Joint Praecipe with the Court by July 15, 2009 (see Order for details); a Status Conference shall be held in this case on October 6, 2009, at 2:00 p.m. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 6/25/09. (CL, )
|
June 19, 2009 |
Filing
426
ORDER pursuant to Docket Number 425, this is the Court's unclassified Order. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 6/19/09. (CL, )
|
June 18, 2009 |
Filing
422
AMENDED ORDER granting Petitioner's Motion to Compel Production of videotapes: This Order amends the sentence beginning "One of the forced extractions..." to read "One of the forced extractions occurred approximately 15 days before Petitioner Al Adahi gave a very inculpatory statement to Government interrogators." The change in this sentence is the word "before." Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 6/18/09. (CL, )
|
June 10, 2009 |
Filing
392
ORDER granting 390 Respondents' Consent Motion to Modify Order in Advance of Merits Hearing (see Order for details); a Pretrial Conference is scheduled for June 17, 2009 at 2:00 p.m. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 6/10/09. (CL, )
|
May 27, 2009 |
Filing
364
ORDER on matters discussed at the Telephone Status Conference on May 27, 2009 (see Order for Details). Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 5/27/09. (CL, )
|
May 18, 2009 |
Filing
353
ORDER pursuant to Docket Number 350, this is the Court's unclassified Order. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 5/18/09. (lcgk2, )
|
May 4, 2009 |
Filing
344
ORDER in advance of Merits Hearing (see Order for details); a Pretrial Conference shall be held on June 16, 2009 at 10:00 a.m. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 5/4/09. (CL, )
|
April 7, 2009 |
Filing
328
ORDER pursuant to Docket Number 324, this is the Court's unclassified Order. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 4/7/09. (CL, )
|
April 6, 2009 |
Filing
326
ORDER pursuant to Docket Number 323, this is the Court's unclassified Order. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 4/6/09. (CL, )
|
March 31, 2009 |
Filing
320
ORDER pursuant to Docket Number 318, this is the Court's unclassified Order. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 3/31/09. (CL, )
|
March 26, 2009 |
Filing
317
ORDER granting in part and denying in part 290 Petitioner Bawazir's Motion for Discovery (see Order for details); a further Status Conference will be held on April 1, 2009, at 10:30 a.m. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 3/26/09. (CL, )
|
March 9, 2009 |
Filing
299
ORDER on representations of the parties at a Status Conference held on March 5, 2009; the Motions Hearing now set for March 25, 2009 is cancelled and the parties shall appear, instead, for a Status Conference on that date at 10:00 a.m.; the parties will submit by March 23, 2009, by 4:00 p.m., a Status Report informing the Court about the progress of discovery (see Order for more details and dates). Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 3/9/09. (CL, )
|
February 25, 2009 |
Filing
291
ORDER: Respondents shall submit, no later than 5:00 p.m. on March 13, 2009, a Response containing the requested refinement of their position as to the definition of "enemy combatant." See Order for more details. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 2/25/09. (CL, )
|
February 10, 2009 |
Filing
280
MEMORANDUM OPINION to the Order denying Petitioners' Renewed Emergency Motion for Injunction Against Further Torture. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 2/10/09. (CL, )
|
January 27, 2009 |
Filing
265
ORDER that the parties' motions on the admission of hearsay evidence are due no later than 10 days prior to the date on which initial briefs for judgment are due, pursuant to Section II.C of this Court's Case Management Order #1. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 1/27/09. (CL, )
|
January 14, 2009 |
Filing
243
ORDER on representations of the parties at the Status Conference held on January 13, 2009 (see Order for details). Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 1/14/09. (CL, )
|