ALHAMI v. BUSH et al
Case Number: 1:2005cv00359
Filed: February 22, 2005
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Office: Washington, DC Office
Presiding Judge: Gladys Kessler
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (federa
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 224 ORDER: This case shall remain stayed for a further 60 days, or until December 1, 2009; the Protective Order in place in this action (Dkt. No. 93) shall remain in force during this stay. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 10/7/09. (CL, )
August 11, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 220 ORDER that Petitioners shall, from this date forward, file with this Court two copies of all classified submissions. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 8/11/09. (CL, )
June 26, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 208 ORDER, that on or before July 10, 2009, Respondents shall file with the Court ex parte and under seal a report detailing the current status of the Guantanamo Review Task Force review process with respect to each Petitioner (see Order for more details). Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 6/25/09. (CL, )
May 11, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 189 ORDER helping to narrow issues in this case and, hopefully, narrow any discovery disputes which may arise (see Order for details); the Government shall submit by June 15, 2009 a numbered statement of material facts upon which it intends to rely in making its case-in-chief (see Order for details). Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 5/11/09. (CL, )
April 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 186 ORDER: Petitioners shall file their Motions to Compel Discovery, if any, by June 2, 2009, Government's oppositions are due by June 11, 2009 and Petitioners' replies are due by June 16, 2009; deadline for Petitioners to submit their traverse is postponed; a Discovery Hearing shall be held, if necessary, on July 6, 2009 at 10:00 a.m. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 4/27/09. (CL, ) Modified on 4/27/2009 (tth).
March 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 176 ORDER denying Petitioners' Motion for Summary Judgment 74 ; this case shall proceed under the Court's Management Order; exculpatory evidence is due from the Government by April 10, 2009; a Joint Status Report shall be filed by the parties by April 23, 2009; a Status Conference shall be held on April 27, 2009 at 1:30 p.m. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 3/19/09. (CL, )
February 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 166 ORDER: If any party believes that their arguments at the hearing on Petitioners' Motion for Summary Judgment, or portions thereof, can be presented in open court, rather than closed session, they should inform the Court by March 5, 2009. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 2/24/09. (CL, )
January 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 148 ORDER on representations of the parties at the Status Conference held on January 14, 2009 (see Order for details). Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 1/15/09. (CL, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ALHAMI v. BUSH et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?