AMEZIANE v. BUSH et al
Case Number: 1:2005cv00392
Filed: February 24, 2005
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Office: Washington, DC Office
Presiding Judge: Ellen S. Huvelle
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (federa
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 365 ORDER denying 351 petitioner's motion for habeas relief, granting 358 respondents' motion to dismiss, and dismissing the case for the reasons stated in the accompanying 364 Memorandum Opinion. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on July 21, 2014. (lcesh1)
October 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 327 ORDER granting 325 Motion to Continue. Upon consideration of Respondents Motion for Continuance of the October 7, 2013 hearing, and considering the current furloughs of Justice Department attorneys, including those assigned to Guantanamo cases, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED, and that the hearing scheduled for October 7, 2013 is VACATED. The Court will, however, proceed to decide the motion for release expeditiously. (See order.) Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on October 2, 2013. (lcesh1)
August 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 310 ORDER directing respondents to file status report re seized legal and non-legal materials by September 12, 2013. See order for additional details. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on August 14, 2013. (AG)
June 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 300 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 285 Sealed Motion and petitioner's cross motion 289 . Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on June 27, 2013. (lcesh2)
April 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 198 ORDER denying petitioner's motion for summary judgment. The next hearing is scheduled for June 16, 2009 at 10:00 A.M. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on 04/30/2009. (lcesh1)
March 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 180 REDACTED VERSION OF CLASSIFIED ORDER filed on March 6, 2009. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on 03/13/2009. (lcesh1)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: AMEZIANE v. BUSH et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?