BREEN et al v. MINETA et al
Case Number: 1:2005cv00654
Filed: March 31, 2005
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Office: Washington, DC Office
Presiding Judge: Richard W. Roberts
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 29:621 Job Discrimination (Age)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 499 MEMORANDUM AND OPINION granting the motion of plaintiffs' counsel to withdraw as counsel for plaintiff Varic Ellefson and dismissing plaintiff Varic Ellefson's claim without prejudice. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on December 24, 2020. (lcan)
November 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 459 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER that David Almaguer is dismissed as a plaintiff in this case without prejudice. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on November 27, 2019. (MA)
March 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 422 OPINION granting in part and denying in part 400 plaintiffs' motion to reinstate all individuals who have expressed their intention to participate in this case; and granting prior motions 383 385 which have been incorporated into plaintiffs' instant motion 400 . An Order consistent with this Opinion shall issue this same day. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on March 21, 2019.(MA)
July 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 397 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 391 plaintiffs' motion to reopen discovery. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on July 17, 2018. (MA)
March 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 380 OPINION granting 316 the prospective plaintiffs' motion to reconsider the Court's prior orders denying them leave to join or, in the alternative, intervene and permit the prospective plaintiffs to join this case. An Order consistent with this Opinion shall issue this same day. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on March 27, 2018. (MA)
December 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 373 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting plaintiffs' motions for substitution of estates [352, 353, 354, 355, 356, 357, 358, 359, 360 and 361]. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on December 13, 2017. (MA)
October 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 367 MEMORANDUM OPINION directing plaintiffs' counsel to supplement motions to substitute [352, 353, 354, 355, 356, 357, 358, 359, 360, 361] on or before October 30, 2017. An Order consistent with this Opinion shall issue this same day. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on October 16, 2017. (MA)
May 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 344 OPINION granting defendants' motion with respect to plaintiffs' disparate impact claim and denying defendants' motion with respect to plaintiffs' disparate treatment claim. An Order consistent with this Opinion shall issue this same day. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on May 26, 2017. (MA)
December 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 334 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying defendants' motion for partial reconsideration of order granting Gebhardt's motion to withdraw from representation; and plaintiffs' new counsel shall submit a status report on or before January 4, 2017. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on December 14, 2016. (MA)
February 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 247 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying motions [203, 213, 234] for reconsideration. Signed by Judge Richard W. Roberts on 2/17/2009. (DCL)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BREEN et al v. MINETA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?