CUMIS INSURANCE SOCIETY INC v. CLARK et al
Case Number: 1:2005cv01277
Filed: June 27, 2005
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Office: Washington, DC Office
Presiding Judge: Paul L. Friedman
Presiding Judge: Deborah A. Robinson
Nature of Suit: Fraud or Truth-In-Lending
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Fraud
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 188 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER that the matter as to CUMIS and Mr. Clark is stayed until December 13, 2019; the parties are instructed to file a joint status report on or before December 13, 2019; and, after conferring with Tonia Shuler, the parties will file a motion that complies with Local Civil Rule 7(m) requesting that Ms. Shuler's matter also be stayed. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on November 21, 2019. (MA) (Main Document 188 replaced on 11/21/2019) (ztnr).
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 186 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER directing the parties to confer and submit a joint status report on or before December 13, 2019 proposing dates for an evidentiary hearing. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on November 12, 2019. (MA)
July 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 170 OPINION denying Mr. Clark's motion to dismiss 70 , 164 and denying without prejudice CUMIS' motion for summary judgment 62 , 163 . An order consistent with this Opinion shall issue this same day. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on July 19, 2018. (MA)
December 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 155 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER that the plaintiff file a status report advising the Court how it wishes to proceed in this case. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on December 20, 2016. (lcplf1)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CUMIS INSURANCE SOCIETY INC v. CLARK et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?