AL GINCO v. BUSH et al
Case Number: 1:2005cv01310
Filed: June 30, 2005
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Office: Washington, DC Office
Presiding Judge: Richard J. Leon
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (federa
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 166 FINAL JUDGMENT, For the reasons set forth in the classified Memorandum Opinion entered this date and for the reasons set forth on the record at the hearing held on June 22, 2009, it is, this 17th, day of July 2009, hereby ORDERED that Petitioner Abdu lrahim Abdul Razak Al Ginco's petition for writ of habeas corpus is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that respondents are directed to take all necessary and appropriate diplomatic steps to facilitate the release of petitioner Janko forthwith. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 7/17/09. (kc)
June 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 162 MEMORANDUM ORDER granting petitioner Abdulrahim Abdul Razak Al Ginco's petition for writ of habeas corpus. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 6/22/09. (kc)
March 25, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 133 ORDER, that the relevant agencies provide expedited review and unclassified filing of the petitioner's Traverse and supporting exhibits filed on March 16, 2009. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 3/25/09. (see order.)(kc)
March 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 131 ORDER denying without prejudice Peitioner's Motions 37 for Partial Summary Judgment and Motion 38 for an Order to Show Cause. It is further ORDERED that petitioner shall be granted leave to file a supplemental Traverse. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 3/19/09. (see order.) (kc)
February 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 127 ORDER, that petitioner shall file no later than March 16, 2009 either a copy of the parties' agreed-upon Declaration of Abdul Rahim Abdul Razak Al Janko regarding continued representation by the Oregon Federal Public Defender's Office execu ted by petitioner, or a status report explaining why petitioner will not be doing so; and it is further ORDERED that contingent upon filing the aforementioned declaration on or before March 16, 2009, the following schedule will apply in this case: Pe titioner's Traverse due by 3/16/2009; Petitioner's Supplemental Traverse due by 3/26/2009; Prehearing Conference set for 4/6/2009 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 18 before Judge Richard J. Leon. Habeas Hearing set for 4/9/2009 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 18 before Judge Richard J. Leon. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 2/27/09. (see order.)(kc)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: AL GINCO v. BUSH et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?