MOHAMMED et al v. BUSH et al
Case Number: 1:2005cv01347
Filed: July 6, 2005
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Office: Washington, DC Office
Presiding Judge: Gladys Kessler
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (federa
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 312 ORDER: Petitioner's Opposition to the Government's Emergency Motion for Reconsideration is due June 21, 2010, the Government's Reply, if any, is due on June 24, 2010; a Motions Hearing is hereby scheduled for June 29, 2010, at 10:00 a.m. (see Order for more details). Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 6/16/10. (CL, )
June 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 295 ORDER: A hearing on Petitioner's Emergency Motion to Compel Compliance will be held on June 21, 2010, at 10:00 a.m.; Special Envoy Daniel Fried is to be present in order to testify about the representations he has made under oath in declarations submitted to the Court. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 6/10/10. (CL, )
June 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 292 ORDER: The Court Orders an Administrative Stay until the Emergency Motion is decided. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 6/3/10. (CL, )
December 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 253 ORDER pursuant to Docket Number 252, this is the Court's unclassified Memorandum Opinion. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 12/16/09. (lcgk2, )
November 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 251 ORDER: For the reasons stated in this Court's Classified Memorandum Opinion, Petitioner Farhi Saeed Bin Mohammeds Petition for a Writ of Habeas Corpus is hereby GRANTED; the Government is directed to take all necessary and appropriate diplomatic steps to facilitate Petitioners release forthwith. Further, the Government is directed to comply with any reporting requirements mandated by the Department of Homeland Security Appropriations Act, 2010, Pub. L. No. 111-83, 123 Stat. 2142 (2009), if applicable, to facilitate Petitioners release, and to report back to the Court no later than December 17, 2009, as to the status of that release and what steps have been taken to secure that release. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 11/19/09. (lcgk2, )
August 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 235 ORDER: Pursuant to Dkt. No. 234, this is the Court's unclassified Order. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 8/24/09. (lcgk2, )
August 11, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 221 ORDER that Petitioners shall, from this date forward, file with this Court two copies of all classified submissions. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 8/11/09. (CL, )
August 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 220 PRETRIAL ORDER (setting out what the court expects prior to the Pretrial Conference). Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 8/10/09. (CL, )
July 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 205 ORDER: Motions for Judgment on the Record shall be submitted by August 4, 2009 and responses shall be submitted by August 24, 2009; a Pretrial Conference shall be held on August 20, 2009 at 2:00 p.m.; a two-day hearing on the Motions shall commence on September 3, 2009 at 10:00 a.m. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 7/14/09. (CL, )
June 26, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 196 ORDER, that on or before July 10, 2009, Respondents shall file with the Court ex parte and under seal a report detailing the current status of the Guantanamo Review Task Force review process with respect to each Petitioner (see Order for more details). Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 6/25/09. (CL, )
June 11, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 193 ORDER denying Petitioner's Motion for 30-Day Notice; denying without prejudice Petitioner's Emergency Motion; the parties shall file a Status Report by July 13, 2009 at 5:00 p.m.; the Government's oral Motion for a Stay is granted; this case is stayed until July 14, 2009; a Status Conference shall be held on July 14, 2009 at 10:00 a.m. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 6/11/09. (CL, )
May 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 170 ORDER pursuant to Docket Number 166, this is the Court's unclassified Order. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 5/5/09. (lcgk2, )
May 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 168 ORDER regarding exhibits for the Merits Hearing scheduled on May 27, 2009 (see Order for details). Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 5/4/09. (CL, )
March 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 154 ORDER after Status Conference held on March 18, 2009, upon consideration of the representations of the parties (see Order for details); a further Status Conference shall be held on April 6, 2009, at 10:30 a.m.; a Motions Hearing is hereby scheduled for May 28, 2009, at 10:00 a.m. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 3/18/09. (CL, )
February 25, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 151 ORDER: Respondents shall submit, no later than 5:00 p.m. on March 13, 2009, a Response containing the requested refinement of their position as to the definition of "enemy combatant.". Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 2/25/09. (lcgk2, )
January 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 130 ORDER on representations of the parties at the Status Conference held on January 15, 2009 (see Order for details). Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 1/15/09. (CL, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MOHAMMED et al v. BUSH et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?