ESTATE OF JOHN BUONOCORE III et al v. GREAT SOCIALIST PEOPLE'S LIBYAN ARAB JAMAHIRIYA, et al Featured Case
Case Number: 1:2006cv00727
Filed: April 21, 2006
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Office: P.I.: Other Office
Presiding Judge: Gladys Kessler
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 28:1602 Foreign Sovreign Immunities Act
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 17, 2013. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 10, 2012 Filing 99 Supplemental MOTION Further Supplement the Evidentiary Record re 98 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief by JULIET SWEIS (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Kalik, Tracy)
February 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER granting 93 Motion to Supplement the Evidentiary Record. Signed by Magistrate Judge John M. Facciola on 2/24/12. (lcjmf1)
January 9, 2012 Filing 97 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS before Magistrate Judge John M. Facciola held on 2/25/11; Page Numbers: 1-91. Date of Issuance:1/9/12. Court Reporter/Transcriber Catalina Kerr, Telephone number 202.354.3258, Court Reporter Email Address : catykerr@msn.com.<P></P>For the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.<P>NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at ww.dcd.uscourts.gov.<P></P> Redaction Request due 1/30/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/9/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/8/2012.(Kerr, Catalina)
October 11, 2011 Filing 96 REDACTED TRANSCRIPT re: Transcript 92 before Magistrate Judge John M. Facciola of proceedings held on 02-22-2011, Page Numbers: 1-110. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lisa Schwam, Telephone number 202-354-3238, Court Reporter Email Address : Lisa_Schwam@dcd.uscourts.gov.This transcript may be purchased from the Court Reporter referenced above. Other transcript formats are also available (multi-page, condensed,CD or ASCII)(Schwam, Lisa)
August 31, 2011 Filing 95 Proposed Findings of Fact by CECIL BUONOCORE, JOHN BUONOCORE, II, TODD BUONOCORE, ESTATE OF AIDA SWEIS, ESTATE OF CHARLES SHINN, ESTATE OF DON MALAND, ESTATE OF EINAR MALAND, ESTATE OF ELENA TOMMARELLO, ESTATE OF GRACE MALAND, ESTATE OF JEANNE SHINN, ESTATE OF JOHN BUONOCORE III, ESTATE OF MICHAEL SWEIS, ESTATE OF NATASHA SIMPSON, SALVATORE FERRIGNO, NANCY GAGE, ELLEN MALAND, JANE MALAND, MARK MALAND, TIM MALAND, ARMANDO PEPENELLA, BRUNO PEPENELLA, DANIELLA SIMPSON, MICHAEL SIMPSON, VICTOR SIMPSON, JEANETTE SWEIS, JULIET SWEIS, SACID SWEIS, SAYEL SWEIS, FRANCESCO ZERILLI. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Findings Part 2, # 2 Proposed Findings Part 3, # 3 Proposed Findings Part 4)(Kalik, Tracy)
August 30, 2011 Filing 94 NOTICE OF INTENT TO REQUEST REDACTION OF PERSONAL IDENTIFIERS by CECIL BUONOCORE, JOHN BUONOCORE, II, TODD BUONOCORE, ESTATE OF AIDA SWEIS, ESTATE OF CHARLES SHINN, ESTATE OF DON MALAND, ESTATE OF EINAR MALAND, ESTATE OF ELENA TOMMARELLO, ESTATE OF GRACE MALAND, ESTATE OF JEANNE SHINN, ESTATE OF JOHN BUONOCORE III, ESTATE OF MICHAEL SWEIS, ESTATE OF NATASHA SIMPSON, SALVATORE FERRIGNO, NANCY GAGE, ELLEN MALAND, JANE MALAND, MARK MALAND, TIM MALAND, ARMANDO PEPENELLA, BRUNO PEPENELLA, DANIELLA SIMPSON, MICHAEL SIMPSON, VICTOR SIMPSON, JEANETTE SWEIS, JULIET SWEIS, SACID SWEIS, SAYEL SWEIS, FRANCESCO ZERILLI re 92 Transcript,,,, (Apfel, Matthew)
August 18, 2011 Filing 93 MOTION to Supplement the Evidentiary Record by CECIL BUONOCORE, JOHN BUONOCORE, II, TODD BUONOCORE, ESTATE OF AIDA SWEIS, ESTATE OF CHARLES SHINN, ESTATE OF DON MALAND, ESTATE OF EINAR MALAND, ESTATE OF ELENA TOMMARELLO, ESTATE OF GRACE MALAND, ESTATE OF JEANNE SHINN, ESTATE OF JOHN BUONOCORE III, ESTATE OF MICHAEL SWEIS, ESTATE OF NATASHA SIMPSON, SALVATORE FERRIGNO, NANCY GAGE, ELLEN MALAND, JANE MALAND, MARK MALAND, TIM MALAND, ARMANDO PEPENELLA, BRUNO PEPENELLA, DANIELLA SIMPSON, MICHAEL SIMPSON, VICTOR SIMPSON, JEANETTE SWEIS, JULIET SWEIS, SACID SWEIS, SAYEL SWEIS, FRANCESCO ZERILLI (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Attachment A, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Apfel, Matthew)
August 12, 2011 Filing 92 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS before Magistrate Judge John M. Facciola held on 02-22-2011; Page Numbers: 1-110. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lisa Schwam, Telephone number 202-354-3238, Court Reporter Email Address : Lisa_Schwam@dcd.uscourts.gov.For the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at ww.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 9/2/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/12/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/10/2011.(Schwam, Lisa)
July 20, 2011 Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff's Proposed Findings of Fact due by 8/31/2011. (ldc, )
July 20, 2011 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting 91 Motion for Extension of Time to File Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law. Plaintiffs shall submit proposed findings of fact and conclusions of law by August 31, 2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge John M. Facciola on 07/20/2011. (lcjmf1, )
July 19, 2011 Filing 91 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law by CECIL BUONOCORE, JOHN BUONOCORE, II, TODD BUONOCORE, ESTATE OF AIDA SWEIS, ESTATE OF CHARLES SHINN, ESTATE OF DON MALAND, ESTATE OF EINAR MALAND, ESTATE OF ELENA TOMMARELLO, ESTATE OF GRACE MALAND, ESTATE OF JEANNE SHINN, ESTATE OF JOHN BUONOCORE III, ESTATE OF MICHAEL SWEIS, ESTATE OF NATASHA SIMPSON, SALVATORE FERRIGNO, NANCY GAGE, ELLEN MALAND, JANE MALAND, MARK MALAND, TIM MALAND, ARMANDO PEPENELLA, BRUNO PEPENELLA, DANIELLA SIMPSON, MICHAEL SIMPSON, VICTOR SIMPSON, JEANETTE SWEIS, JULIET SWEIS, SACID SWEIS, SAYEL SWEIS, FRANCESCO ZERILLI (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kalik, Tracy)
March 8, 2011 Filing 90 Case Directly Reassigned to Magistrate Judge John M. Facciola. Judge Gladys Kessler no longer assigned to the case. (ls, )
February 25, 2011 Filing 89 Exhibit List by Plaintiffs NANCY GAGE, ELLEN MALAND, JANE MALAND, MARK MALAND, TIM MALAND, ARMANDO PEPENELLA, BRUNO PEPENELLA, DANIELLA SIMPSON, MICHAEL SIMPSON, VICTOR SIMPSON, JEANETTE SWEIS, JULIET SWEIS, SACID SWEIS, SAYEL SWEIS, FRANCESCO ZERILLI. (ldc, )
February 25, 2011 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge John M. Facciola: Bench Trial held and concluded on 2/25/2011. (Court Reporter Catalina Kerr.) (ldc, )
February 24, 2011 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge John M. Facciola: Bench Trial held on 2/24/2011. Bench Trial set for 2/25/2011 09:30 AM in Courtroom 6 before Magistrate Judge John M. Facciola. (Court Reporter Patricia Kaneshiro-Miller.) (ldc, )
February 23, 2011 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge John M. Facciola: Bench Trial held on 2/23/2011. Bench Trial set for 2/24/2011 09:30 AM in Courtroom 6 before Magistrate Judge John M. Facciola. (Court Reporter Patricia Kaneshiro-Miller.) (ldc, )
February 23, 2011 NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: The entry to admit Attorney Floyd R. Jenkins as Pro Hac Vice on 02/22/11 was entered in error. The entry has been corrected. Attorney Floyd R. Jenkins is not the attorney for defendants SYRIAN ARAB REPUBLIC and SYRIAN AIR FORCE INTELLIGENCE. (ldc, )
February 22, 2011 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge John M. Facciola: Bench Trial held on 2/22/2011. Bench Trial set for 2/23/2011 09:30 AM in Courtroom 6 before Magistrate Judge John M. Facciola. (Court Reporter Lisa Schwam - AM; Patricia Kaneshiro-Miller - PM.) (ldc, )
February 22, 2011 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting 87 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge John M. Facciola on 02/22/2011. (lcjmf1)
February 15, 2011 Filing 88 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew S. Apfel on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Apfel, Matthew)
February 14, 2011 Filing 87 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Floyd Ronald Jenkins, Jr., :Firm- Meridian 361 International Group, PLLC, :Address- 97A Exchange Street, Suite, 202. Phone No. - 202-361-4944. Fax No. - 202-315-3894 by CECIL BUONOCORE, JOHN BUONOCORE, II, TODD BUONOCORE, ESTATE OF AIDA SWEIS, ESTATE OF CHARLES SHINN, ESTATE OF DON MALAND, ESTATE OF EINAR MALAND, ESTATE OF ELENA TOMMARELLO, ESTATE OF GRACE MALAND, ESTATE OF JEANNE SHINN, ESTATE OF JOHN BUONOCORE III, ESTATE OF MICHAEL SWEIS, ESTATE OF NATASHA SIMPSON, SALVATORE FERRIGNO, NANCY GAGE, ELLEN MALAND, JANE MALAND, MARK MALAND, TIM MALAND, ARMANDO PEPENELLA, BRUNO PEPENELLA, DANIELLA SIMPSON, MICHAEL SIMPSON, VICTOR SIMPSON, JEANETTE SWEIS, JULIET SWEIS, SACID SWEIS, SAYEL SWEIS, FRANCESCO ZERILLI (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit In support of Pro Hac Vice Admission, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Kalik, Tracy)
January 11, 2011 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge John M. Facciola: Final Pretrial Conference held on 1/11/2011. (Court Reporter Bowles Reporting Services,.) (ldc, )
August 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER re referral to Judge Facciola for an evidentiary hearing. Signed by Magistrate Judge John M. Facciola on 8/2/10. (SP, )
July 30, 2010 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge John M. Facciola: Status Conference held on 7/30/2010. Bench Trial set for 2/22/2011 - 02/25/11 09:30 AM in Courtroom 6 before Magistrate Judge John M. Facciola. Pretrial Conference set for 1/11/2011 09:30 AM in Courtroom 6 before Magistrate Judge John M. Facciola. (Court Reporter Bowles Reporting Services,.) (ldc, )
July 27, 2010 Filing 85 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge John M. Facciola for evidentiary hearing. (kb)
July 27, 2010 Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 7/30/2010 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6 before Magistrate Judge John M. Facciola. (lcjmf1)
July 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Facciola because of his extensive knowledge of the facts at issue in this case. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 7/27/10. (CL, )
July 20, 2010 Filing 83 STATUS REPORT Regarding Status of Further Proceedings Before this Court by CECIL BUONOCORE, JOHN BUONOCORE, II, TODD BUONOCORE, ESTATE OF AIDA SWEIS, ESTATE OF CHARLES SHINN, ESTATE OF DON MALAND, ESTATE OF EINAR MALAND, ESTATE OF ELENA TOMMARELLO, ESTATE OF GRACE MALAND, ESTATE OF JEANNE SHINN, ESTATE OF JOHN BUONOCORE III, ESTATE OF MICHAEL SWEIS, ESTATE OF NATASHA SIMPSON, SALVATORE FERRIGNO, NANCY GAGE, ELLEN MALAND, JANE MALAND, MARK MALAND, TIM MALAND, ARMANDO PEPENELLA, BRUNO PEPENELLA, DANIELLA SIMPSON, MICHAEL SIMPSON, VICTOR SIMPSON, JEANETTE SWEIS, JULIET SWEIS, SACID SWEIS, SAYEL SWEIS, FRANCESCO ZERILLI. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kalik, Tracy)
April 2, 2010 Filing 82 Second AMENDED COMPLAINT against MUHAMMED AL KHULI, IBRAHAIM AL-BISHARI, MU'AMMAR AL-QADHAFI, ABDALLAH AL-SANUSI, SYRIAN AIR FORCE INTELLIGENCE, SYRIAN ARAB REPUBLIC filed by JULIET SWEIS.(dr) (Filed Nunc pro tunc to 4/21/06 pursuant to Order filed 4/2/10). Modified on 4/6/10 to change Nunc pro tunc date.(ks).
April 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER granting 80 Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaints nunc pro tunc. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 4/2/2010. (lcgk3, )
March 1, 2010 Filing 80 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaints, Nunc Pro Tunc, Limited to the Allegations of Juliet Sweis Only by JULIET SWEIS (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Kalik, Tracy)
January 15, 2009 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Gladys Kessler: Status Conference held on 1/15/2009. (Court Reporter Susan Tyner.) (tth)
December 30, 2008 Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 1/15/2009 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 26A before Judge Gladys Kessler. (tth)
December 30, 2008 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting 79 Motion to Continue the Status Conference currently set for 1/12/09 at 10:30 a.m. The Status Conference in this matter shall be continued until 1/15/09 at 10:00 a.m. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 12/30/08. (tth)
December 30, 2008 Filing 79 MOTION to Continue Status Conference by SALVATORE FERRIGNO, ESTATE OF GRACE MALAND, TIM MALAND, ESTATE OF CHARLES SHINN, ESTATE OF JEANNE SHINN, JEANETTE SWEIS, ESTATE OF MICHAEL SWEIS, ESTATE OF AIDA SWEIS, ESTATE OF ELENA TOMMARELLO, ARMANDO PEPENELLA, ESTATE OF JOHN BUONOCORE III, BRUNO PEPENELLA, SAYEL SWEIS, FRANCESCO ZERILLI, SACID SWEIS, JULIET SWEIS, ESTATE OF NATASHA SIMPSON, VICTOR SIMPSON, DANIELLA SIMPSON, MICHAEL SIMPSON, NANCY GAGE, CECIL BUONOCORE, ESTATE OF DON MALAND, ELLEN MALAND, JANE MALAND, MARK MALAND, ESTATE OF EINAR MALAND, JOHN BUONOCORE, II, TODD BUONOCORE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kalik, Tracy)
December 29, 2008 Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 1/12/2009 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 26A before Judge Gladys Kessler. (tth)
December 24, 2008 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: A Status Conference shall be held in this case on January 12, 2009 at 10:30 a.m., in Courtroom 26A. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 12/24/08. (lcgk1, )
December 24, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER granting Libyan Defendants' Supplemental Motions to Dismiss and dismissing with prejudice the Buonocore Complaint and the Simpson Complaint in their entirety only as against the Libyan Defendants. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 12/24/08. (lcgk1, )
December 3, 2008 Filing 77 NOTICE of Proposed Order by SALVATORE FERRIGNO, ESTATE OF GRACE MALAND, TIM MALAND, ESTATE OF CHARLES SHINN, ESTATE OF JEANNE SHINN, JEANETTE SWEIS, ESTATE OF MICHAEL SWEIS, ESTATE OF AIDA SWEIS, ESTATE OF ELENA TOMMARELLO, ARMANDO PEPENELLA, ESTATE OF JOHN BUONOCORE III, BRUNO PEPENELLA, SAYEL SWEIS, FRANCESCO ZERILLI, SACID SWEIS, JULIET SWEIS, ESTATE OF NATASHA SIMPSON, VICTOR SIMPSON, DANIELLA SIMPSON, MICHAEL SIMPSON, NANCY GAGE, CECIL BUONOCORE, ESTATE OF DON MALAND, ELLEN MALAND, JANE MALAND, MARK MALAND, ESTATE OF EINAR MALAND, JOHN BUONOCORE, II, TODD BUONOCORE re 76 Order, (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kalik, Tracy)
November 25, 2008 Set/Reset Deadlines: Proposed Order due 12/3/2008 (CL, )
November 25, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER that Plaintiffs are to submit, no later than December 3, 2008, another set of Proposed Orders which they believe will appropriately and accurately embody the agreement of the parties and accurately indicate whether any claims are remaining and, if so, against which Defendants. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 11/25/08. (CL, )
November 25, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER granting 73 Defendants' Supplemental Motion to Dismiss; the Amended Complaint is dismissed in its entirety with prejudice. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 11/25/08. (lcgk1, )
November 21, 2008 Filing 74 Memorandum in opposition to re 73 Supplemental MOTION to Dismiss filed by SALVATORE FERRIGNO, ESTATE OF GRACE MALAND, TIM MALAND, ESTATE OF CHARLES SHINN, ESTATE OF JEANNE SHINN, JEANETTE SWEIS, ESTATE OF MICHAEL SWEIS, ESTATE OF AIDA SWEIS, ESTATE OF ELENA TOMMARELLO, ARMANDO PEPENELLA, ESTATE OF JOHN BUONOCORE III, BRUNO PEPENELLA, SAYEL SWEIS, FRANCESCO ZERILLI, SACID SWEIS, JULIET SWEIS, ESTATE OF NATASHA SIMPSON, VICTOR SIMPSON, DANIELLA SIMPSON, MICHAEL SIMPSON, NANCY GAGE, CECIL BUONOCORE, ESTATE OF DON MALAND, ELLEN MALAND, JANE MALAND, MARK MALAND, ESTATE OF EINAR MALAND, JOHN BUONOCORE, II, TODD BUONOCORE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kalik, Tracy)
November 20, 2008 Filing 73 Supplemental MOTION to Dismiss by GREAT SOCIALIST PEOPLE'S LIBYAN ARAB JAMAHIRIYA, LIBYAN INTERNAL SECURITY, LIBYAN EXTERNAL SECURITY, MU'AMMAR AL-QADHAFI, ABDALLAH AL-SANUSI, IBRAHAIM AL-BISHARI (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Text of Proposed Order)(Johnston, Mark)
November 3, 2008 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER setting Settlement Conference for 11/4/2008, at 03:00 PM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge Alan Kay. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alan Kay on 11/03/08. (DM)
October 31, 2008 Filing 72 STATUS REPORT by GREAT SOCIALIST PEOPLE'S LIBYAN ARAB JAMAHIRIYA, LIBYAN INTERNAL SECURITY, LIBYAN EXTERNAL SECURITY, MU'AMMAR AL-QADHAFI, ABDALLAH AL-SANUSI, IBRAHAIM AL-BISHARI. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Johnston, Mark)
September 2, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER granting 70 the Joint Motion to Stay (see Order for details); this case is hereby stayed for 60 days; after 60 days, if the case, is not closed, the parties are to file a status report. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 9/1/08. (CL, ). Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 9/1/08. (CL, )
August 27, 2008 Filing 70 Joint MOTION to Stay All Proceedings as to the Libyan Defendants by GREAT SOCIALIST PEOPLE'S LIBYAN ARAB JAMAHIRIYA, LIBYAN INTERNAL SECURITY, LIBYAN EXTERNAL SECURITY, MU'AMMAR AL-QADHAFI, ABDALLAH AL-SANUSI, IBRAHAIM AL-BISHARI (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Johnston, Mark)
August 14, 2008 Filing 69 Memorandum in opposition to re 67 MOTION to Dismiss Duplicative Complaint filed by CECIL BUONOCORE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Perles, Steven)
August 12, 2008 Filing 68 NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY by GREAT SOCIALIST PEOPLE'S LIBYAN ARAB JAMAHIRIYA, LIBYAN INTERNAL SECURITY, LIBYAN EXTERNAL SECURITY, MU'AMMAR AL-QADHAFI, ABDALLAH AL-SANUSI, IBRAHAIM AL-BISHARI (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E)(Whalen, Thomas)
July 25, 2008 Filing 67 MOTION to Dismiss Duplicative Complaint by GREAT SOCIALIST PEOPLE'S LIBYAN ARAB JAMAHIRIYA, LIBYAN INTERNAL SECURITY, LIBYAN EXTERNAL SECURITY, MU'AMMAR AL-QADHAFI, ABDALLAH AL-SANUSI, IBRAHAIM AL-BISHARI (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Johnston, Mark)
July 24, 2008 Set/Reset Hearings : Settlement Conference set for 7/28/08 at 10:00 AM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge Alan Kay. (kk)
July 15, 2008 Set/Reset Deadlines: Dispositive Motions due by 7/25/2008. Response to Dispositive Motions due by 8/26/2008. Reply to Dispositive Motions due by 9/10/2008. (CL, )
July 15, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER granting 65 the Parties' Motion to Amend Briefing Schedule (see Order for details). Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 7/15/08. (CL, )
July 14, 2008 Settlement Conference set for 7/18/2008, at 10:00 AM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge Alan Kay. (DM)
July 14, 2008 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER cancelling mediation set for July 14, and setting mediation for July 18, 2008, at 10:00 a.m, in chambers. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alan Kay on 07/14/08. (DM)
July 11, 2008 Filing 65 Joint MOTION for Amended Briefing Schedule by GREAT SOCIALIST PEOPLE'S LIBYAN ARAB JAMAHIRIYA, LIBYAN INTERNAL SECURITY, LIBYAN EXTERNAL SECURITY, MU'AMMAR AL-QADHAFI, ABDALLAH AL-SANUSI, IBRAHAIM AL-BISHARI (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Johnston, Mark)
July 8, 2008 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER- mediation on this case will reconvene on July 14, 2008, at 4 pm, in chambers - room 2333. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alan Kay on 07/08/08. (DM)
July 2, 2008 Filing 64 STATUS REPORT Parties Joint Praecipe by SALVATORE FERRIGNO, ESTATE OF GRACE MALAND, TIM MALAND, ESTATE OF CHARLES SHINN, ESTATE OF JEANNE SHINN, JEANETTE SWEIS, ESTATE OF MICHAEL SWEIS, ESTATE OF AIDA SWEIS, ESTATE OF ELENA TOMMARELLO, ARMANDO PEPENELLA, ESTATE OF JOHN BUONOCORE III, BRUNO PEPENELLA, SAYEL SWEIS, FRANCESCO ZERILLI, SACID SWEIS, JULIET SWEIS, ESTATE OF NATASHA SIMPSON, VICTOR SIMPSON, DANIELLA SIMPSON, MICHAEL SIMPSON, GREAT SOCIALIST PEOPLE'S LIBYAN ARAB JAMAHIRIYA, LIBYAN INTERNAL SECURITY, LIBYAN EXTERNAL SECURITY, MU'AMMAR AL-QADHAFI, ABDALLAH AL-SANUSI, IBRAHAIM AL-BISHARI, NANCY GAGE, CECIL BUONOCORE, ESTATE OF DON MALAND, ELLEN MALAND, JANE MALAND, MARK MALAND, ESTATE OF EINAR MALAND, JOHN BUONOCORE, II, TODD BUONOCORE. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Kalik, Tracy)
June 26, 2008 Set/Reset Hearings : Settlement Conference set for 7/8/08 at 10:00 AM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge Alan Kay. (kk)
June 26, 2008 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER setting a mediation session for July 8, 2008, at 10:00 a.m., in chambers - room 2333. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alan Kay on 06/26/08. (DM)
June 26, 2008 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Alan Kay: Settlement Conference held on 6/10/2008. (DM)
June 5, 2008 Set/Reset Hearings : Settlement Conference set for 6/10/08 at 1:00 PM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge Alan Kay. (kk)
May 22, 2008 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER cancelling mediation set for May 30, 2008, and rescheduling mediation for June 10, 2008, at 1:00 p.m., with consent of counsel. Mediation will be held in room 2333. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alan Kay on 05/22/08. (DM)
May 16, 2008 Filing 63 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS: Status Hearing before Judge Gladys Kessler held on April 24, 2008; For the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at ww.dcd.uscourts.gov.(tg, )
May 2, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER setting a settlement conference for May 30, 2008, at 3:30 p.m. in chambers - room 2333. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alan Kay on 05/02/08. (DM)
April 25, 2008 Filing 61 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Alan Kay for settlement. (mmh, )
April 24, 2008 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Gladys Kessler: Status Conference held on 4/24/2008. (Court Reporter Susan Tyner.) (tth,)
April 24, 2008 Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Praecipe due by 7/5/2008. Dispositive Motions due by 7/5/2008. Response to Dispositive Motions due by 8/20/2008. Reply to Dispositive Motions due by 8/30/2008. (CL, )
April 24, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Alan Kay for settlement purposes; the parties shall file a joint praecipe by June 5, 2008; Defendants shall file their Motion to Dismiss by July 5, 2008 with Plaintiffs' response due by August 20, 2008 and Defendants' reply to be filed by August 30, 2008. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 4/24/08. (CL, )
April 24, 2008 Filing 59 NOTICE of Lis Pendens by SALVATORE FERRIGNO, ESTATE OF GRACE MALAND, TIM MALAND, ESTATE OF CHARLES SHINN, ESTATE OF JEANNE SHINN, JEANETTE SWEIS, ESTATE OF MICHAEL SWEIS, ESTATE OF AIDA SWEIS, ESTATE OF ELENA TOMMARELLO, ARMANDO PEPENELLA, ESTATE OF JOHN BUONOCORE III, BRUNO PEPENELLA, SAYEL SWEIS, FRANCESCO ZERILLI, SACID SWEIS, JULIET SWEIS, ESTATE OF NATASHA SIMPSON, VICTOR SIMPSON, DANIELLA SIMPSON, MICHAEL SIMPSON, NANCY GAGE, CECIL BUONOCORE, ESTATE OF DON MALAND, ELLEN MALAND, JANE MALAND, MARK MALAND, ESTATE OF EINAR MALAND, JOHN BUONOCORE, II, TODD BUONOCORE (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Kalik, Tracy)
April 18, 2008 Filing 58 STATUS REPORT by GREAT SOCIALIST PEOPLE'S LIBYAN ARAB JAMAHIRIYA, LIBYAN INTERNAL SECURITY, LIBYAN EXTERNAL SECURITY, MU'AMMAR AL-QADHAFI, ABDALLAH AL-SANUSI, IBRAHAIM AL-BISHARI. (Whalen, Thomas)
April 18, 2008 Filing 57 STATUS REPORT Plaintiffs Praecipe Regarding Status of Further Proceedings Before This Court by SALVATORE FERRIGNO, ESTATE OF GRACE MALAND, TIM MALAND, ESTATE OF CHARLES SHINN, ESTATE OF JEANNE SHINN, JEANETTE SWEIS, ESTATE OF MICHAEL SWEIS, ESTATE OF AIDA SWEIS, ESTATE OF ELENA TOMMARELLO, ARMANDO PEPENELLA, ESTATE OF JOHN BUONOCORE III, BRUNO PEPENELLA, SAYEL SWEIS, FRANCESCO ZERILLI, SACID SWEIS, JULIET SWEIS, ESTATE OF NATASHA SIMPSON, VICTOR SIMPSON, DANIELLA SIMPSON, MICHAEL SIMPSON, NANCY GAGE, CECIL BUONOCORE, ESTATE OF DON MALAND, ELLEN MALAND, JANE MALAND, MARK MALAND, ESTATE OF EINAR MALAND, JOHN BUONOCORE, II, TODD BUONOCORE. (Kalik, Tracy)
April 14, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER denying without prejudice 43 Motion for Reconsideration. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 4/14/2008. (lcgk3, )
April 14, 2008 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting 54 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The Court shall set a date for the Libyan Defendants to file a responsive pleading to the Second Amended Complaint at the Status Conference to be held April 24, 2008. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 4/11/08. (lcgk3, )
April 11, 2008 Filing 55 Memorandum in opposition to re 54 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 53 Amended Complaint,,, MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 53 Amended Complaint,,, filed by CECIL BUONOCORE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Perles, Steven)
April 11, 2008 Filing 54 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 53 Amended Complaint,,, by GREAT SOCIALIST PEOPLE'S LIBYAN ARAB JAMAHIRIYA, LIBYAN INTERNAL SECURITY, LIBYAN EXTERNAL SECURITY, MU'AMMAR AL-QADHAFI, ABDALLAH AL-SANUSI, IBRAHAIM AL-BISHARI (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Whalen, Thomas)
March 31, 2008 Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 4/24/2008 10:15 AM in Courtroom 26A before Judge Gladys Kessler. (CL, )
March 31, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER: A Status Conference shall be held in this case on April 24, 2008 at 10:15 a.m.; the parties are to submit a Joint Praecipe five days before the Conference (see Order for details). Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 3/31/08. (CL, )
March 28, 2008 Filing 53 AMENDED COMPLAINT against GREAT SOCIALIST PEOPLE'S LIBYAN ARAB JAMAHIRIYA, LIBYAN INTERNAL SECURITY, LIBYAN EXTERNAL SECURITY, MU'AMMAR AL-QADHAFI, ABDALLAH AL-SANUSI, IBRAHAIM AL-BISHARI, SYRIAN ARAB REPUBLIC, SYRIAN AIR FORCE INTELLIGENCE, MUHAMMED AL KHULI filed by SALVATORE FERRIGNO, ESTATE OF GRACE MALAND, TIM MALAND, ESTATE OF CHARLES SHINN, ESTATE OF JEANNE SHINN, JEANETTE SWEIS, ESTATE OF MICHAEL SWEIS, ESTATE OF AIDA SWEIS, ESTATE OF ELENA TOMMARELLO, ARMANDO PEPENELLA, ESTATE OF JOHN BUONOCORE III, BRUNO PEPENELLA, SAYEL SWEIS, FRANCESCO ZERILLI, SACID SWEIS, JULIET SWEIS, ESTATE OF NATASHA SIMPSON, VICTOR SIMPSON, DANIELLA SIMPSON, MICHAEL SIMPSON, NANCY GAGE, CECIL BUONOCORE, ESTATE OF DON MALAND, ELLEN MALAND, JANE MALAND, MARK MALAND, ESTATE OF EINAR MALAND, JOHN BUONOCORE, II, TODD BUONOCORE.(tg, )
March 28, 2008 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER finding as moot 51 Defendants' Motion for Leave to File Surreply. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 3/28/08. (CL, )
March 28, 2008 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting 44 Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File an Amended Complaint; the Amended Complaint is deemed by the Court to be a re-filing of Plaintiffs' claims pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1605(A)(c); Plaintiffs are granted leave to file in their Amended Complaint additional claims on behalf of the Simpson Plaintiffs and the Additional Sweis Plaintiffs. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 3/28/08. (CL, )
March 27, 2008 Filing 51 MOTION for Leave to File Surreply by GREAT SOCIALIST PEOPLE'S LIBYAN ARAB JAMAHIRIYA, LIBYAN INTERNAL SECURITY, LIBYAN EXTERNAL SECURITY, MU'AMMAR AL-QADHAFI, ABDALLAH AL-SANUSI, IBRAHAIM AL-BISHARI (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Whalen, Thomas)
March 27, 2008 Filing 50 REPLY to opposition to motion re 43 MOTION for Reconsideration re 35 Memorandum & Opinion, 34 Order on Motion to Dismiss MOTION for Reconsideration re 35 Memorandum & Opinion, 34 Order on Motion to Dismiss MOTION for Reconsideration re 35 Memorandum & Opinion, 34 Order on Motion to Dismiss filed by CECIL BUONOCORE. (Perles, Steven)
March 27, 2008 Filing 49 REPLY to opposition to motion re 44 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint and Memorandum in Support Thereof filed by CECIL BUONOCORE. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Perles, Steven)
March 24, 2008 Filing 48 Memorandum in opposition to re 43 MOTION for Reconsideration re 35 Memorandum & Opinion, 34 Order on Motion to Dismiss MOTION for Reconsideration re 35 Memorandum & Opinion, 34 Order on Motion to Dismiss MOTION for Reconsideration re 35 Memorandum & Opinion, 34 Order on Motion to Dismiss filed by GREAT SOCIALIST PEOPLE'S LIBYAN ARAB JAMAHIRIYA, LIBYAN INTERNAL SECURITY, LIBYAN EXTERNAL SECURITY. (Whalen, Thomas)
March 24, 2008 Filing 47 Memorandum in opposition to re 44 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint and Memorandum in Support Thereof filed by GREAT SOCIALIST PEOPLE'S LIBYAN ARAB JAMAHIRIYA, LIBYAN INTERNAL SECURITY, LIBYAN EXTERNAL SECURITY, MU'AMMAR AL-QADHAFI, ABDALLAH AL-SANUSI, IBRAHAIM AL-BISHARI. (Whalen, Thomas)
February 28, 2008 Set/Reset Deadlines: Responses due by 3/24/2008 (CL, )
February 28, 2008 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting 45 Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time; Defendants shall have up to and including March 24, 2008 in which to file their Oppositions to Plaintiffs' Motion to Reconsider and Motion for Leave to File an Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 2/28/08. (CL, )
February 28, 2008 Filing 45 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 44 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint and Memorandum in Support Thereof, 43 MOTION for Reconsideration re 35 Memorandum & Opinion, 34 Order on Motion to Dismiss MOTION for Reconsideration re 35 Memorandum & Opinion, 34 Order on Motion to Dismiss MOTION for Reconsideration re 35 Memorandum & Opinion, 34 Order on Motion to Dismiss by GREAT SOCIALIST PEOPLE'S LIBYAN ARAB JAMAHIRIYA, LIBYAN INTERNAL SECURITY, LIBYAN EXTERNAL SECURITY, MU'AMMAR AL-QADHAFI, ABDALLAH AL-SANUSI, IBRAHAIM AL-BISHARI (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Johnston, Mark)
February 22, 2008 Filing 44 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint and Memorandum in Support Thereof by SALVATORE FERRIGNO, ESTATE OF GRACE MALAND, TIM MALAND, ESTATE OF CHARLES SHINN, ESTATE OF JEANNE SHINN, JEANETTE SWEIS, ESTATE OF MICHAEL SWEIS, ESTATE OF AIDA SWEIS, ESTATE OF ELENA TOMMARELLO, ARMANDO PEPENELLA, ESTATE OF JOHN BUONOCORE III, BRUNO PEPENELLA, FRANCESCO ZERILLI, NANCY GAGE, CECIL BUONOCORE, ESTATE OF DON MALAND, ELLEN MALAND, JANE MALAND, MARK MALAND, ESTATE OF EINAR MALAND, JOHN BUONOCORE, II, TODD BUONOCORE (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Kalik, Tracy)
February 22, 2008 Filing 43 MOTION for Reconsideration re 35 Memorandum & Opinion, 34 Order on Motion to Dismiss by SALVATORE FERRIGNO, ESTATE OF GRACE MALAND, TIM MALAND, ESTATE OF CHARLES SHINN, ESTATE OF JEANNE SHINN, JEANETTE SWEIS, ESTATE OF MICHAEL SWEIS, ESTATE OF AIDA SWEIS, ESTATE OF ELENA TOMMARELLO, ARMANDO PEPENELLA, ESTATE OF JOHN BUONOCORE III, BRUNO PEPENELLA, FRANCESCO ZERILLI, NANCY GAGE, CECIL BUONOCORE, ESTATE OF DON MALAND, ELLEN MALAND, JANE MALAND, MARK MALAND, ESTATE OF EINAR MALAND, JOHN BUONOCORE, II, TODD BUONOCORE (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support of Motion, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Kalik, Tracy)
February 15, 2008 Filing 42 STATUS REPORT by GREAT SOCIALIST PEOPLE'S LIBYAN ARAB JAMAHIRIYA, LIBYAN INTERNAL SECURITY, LIBYAN EXTERNAL SECURITY, MU'AMMAR AL-QADHAFI, ABDALLAH AL-SANUSI, IBRAHAIM AL-BISHARI. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Johnston, Mark)
February 13, 2008 Filing 46 MANDATE of USCA (certified copy) as to 36 Notice of Appeal,, filed by JANE MALAND, TODD BUONOCORE, FRANCESCO ZERILLI, ESTATE OF JOHN BUONOCORE III, ESTATE OF AIDA SWEIS, ESTATE OF CHARLES SHINN, ESTATE OF DON MALAND, NANCY GAGE, SALVATORE FERRIGNO, ARMANDO PEPENELLA, ELLEN MALAND, BRUNO PEPENELLA, ESTATE OF EINAR MALAND, MARK MALAND, ESTATE OF JEANNE SHINN, JEANETTE SWEIS, ESTATE OF GRACE MALAND, ESTATE OF ELENA TOMMARELLO, JOHN BUONOCORE, II, CECIL BUONOCORE, ESTATE OF MICHAEL SWEIS, TIM MALAND, it is ORDERED that the motion to dismiss be granted. (USCA No. 07-7125) (kb)
February 13, 2008 NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: re 38 Status Report was entered in error and counsel properly refiled said pleading under docket entry number 40 . (tg, )
February 12, 2008 Filing 41 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on June 12, 2007 Motions Hearing before Judge Gladys Kessler. Court Reporter: Susan P. Tyner. The public may view the document in the Clerk's Office between the hours of 9:00 a.m. and 4:00 p.m, Monday through Friday. (tg, )
February 12, 2008 Filing 40 STATUS REPORT , Plaintiffs Praecipe Regarding Status of Further Proceedings Before this Court by SALVATORE FERRIGNO, ESTATE OF GRACE MALAND, TIM MALAND, ESTATE OF CHARLES SHINN, ESTATE OF JEANNE SHINN, JEANETTE SWEIS, ESTATE OF MICHAEL SWEIS, ESTATE OF AIDA SWEIS, ESTATE OF ELENA TOMMARELLO, ARMANDO PEPENELLA, ESTATE OF JOHN BUONOCORE III, BRUNO PEPENELLA, FRANCESCO ZERILLI, NANCY GAGE, CECIL BUONOCORE, ESTATE OF DON MALAND, ELLEN MALAND, JANE MALAND, MARK MALAND, ESTATE OF EINAR MALAND, JOHN BUONOCORE, II, TODD BUONOCORE. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Kalik, Tracy)
February 12, 2008 Filing 39 ERRATA regarding the electronic filing of the Praecipe filed by Plaintiffs by SALVATORE FERRIGNO, ESTATE OF GRACE MALAND, TIM MALAND, ESTATE OF CHARLES SHINN, ESTATE OF JEANNE SHINN, JEANETTE SWEIS, ESTATE OF MICHAEL SWEIS, ESTATE OF AIDA SWEIS, ESTATE OF ELENA TOMMARELLO, ARMANDO PEPENELLA, ESTATE OF JOHN BUONOCORE III, BRUNO PEPENELLA, FRANCESCO ZERILLI, NANCY GAGE, CECIL BUONOCORE, ESTATE OF DON MALAND, ELLEN MALAND, JANE MALAND, MARK MALAND, ESTATE OF EINAR MALAND, JOHN BUONOCORE, II, TODD BUONOCORE 38 Status Report,, filed by JANE MALAND, TODD BUONOCORE, FRANCESCO ZERILLI, ESTATE OF JOHN BUONOCORE III, ESTATE OF AIDA SWEIS, ESTATE OF CHARLES SHINN, ESTATE OF DON MALAND, NANCY GAGE, SALVATORE FERRIGNO, ARMANDO PEPENELLA, ELLEN MALAND, BRUNO PEPENELLA, ESTATE OF EINAR MALAND, MARK MALAND, ESTATE OF JEANNE SHINN, JEANETTE SWEIS, ESTATE OF GRACE MALAND, ESTATE OF ELENA TOMMARELLO, JOHN BUONOCORE, II, CECIL BUONOCORE, ESTATE OF MICHAEL SWEIS, TIM MALAND. (Kalik, Tracy)
February 12, 2008 Filing 38 ENTERED IN ERROR.....STATUS REPORT , Plaintiffs Praecipe Regarding Status of Further Proceedings Before This Court by SALVATORE FERRIGNO, ESTATE OF GRACE MALAND, TIM MALAND, ESTATE OF CHARLES SHINN, ESTATE OF JEANNE SHINN, JEANETTE SWEIS, ESTATE OF MICHAEL SWEIS, ESTATE OF AIDA SWEIS, ESTATE OF ELENA TOMMARELLO, ARMANDO PEPENELLA, ESTATE OF JOHN BUONOCORE III, BRUNO PEPENELLA, FRANCESCO ZERILLI, NANCY GAGE, CECIL BUONOCORE, ESTATE OF DON MALAND, ELLEN MALAND, JANE MALAND, MARK MALAND, ESTATE OF EINAR MALAND, JOHN BUONOCORE, II, TODD BUONOCORE. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Kalik, Tracy) Modified on 2/13/2008 (tg, ).
January 8, 2008 Set/Reset Deadlines: Praecipes due by 2/15/2008 (CL, )
January 8, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER: The parties shall submit praecipes by February 15, 2008 concerning how the parties wish to proceed in light of the Court of Appeals. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 1/8/08. (CL, )
September 5, 2007 USCA Case Number 07-7125 for 36 Notice of Appeal,, filed by JANE MALAND, TODD BUONOCORE, FRANCESCO ZERILLI, ESTATE OF JOHN BUONOCORE III, ESTATE OF AIDA SWEIS, ESTATE OF CHARLES SHINN, ESTATE OF DON MALAND, NANCY GAGE, SALVATORE FERRIGNO, ARMANDO PEPENELLA, ELLEN MALAND, BRUNO PEPENELLA, ESTATE OF EINAR MALAND, MARK MALAND, ESTATE OF JEANNE SHINN, JEANETTE SWEIS, ESTATE OF GRACE MALAND, ESTATE OF ELENA TOMMARELLO, JOHN BUONOCORE, II, CECIL BUONOCORE, ESTATE OF MICHAEL SWEIS, TIM MALAND. (jf, )
August 6, 2007 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re 36 Notice of Appeal, (tg, )
August 3, 2007 Filing 36 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to 35 Memorandum & Opinion, 34 Order on Motion to Dismiss by SALVATORE FERRIGNO, ESTATE OF GRACE MALAND, TIM MALAND, ESTATE OF CHARLES SHINN, ESTATE OF JEANNE SHINN, JEANETTE SWEIS, ESTATE OF MICHAEL SWEIS, ESTATE OF AIDA SWEIS, ESTATE OF ELENA TOMMARELLO, ARMANDO PEPENELLA, ESTATE OF JOHN BUONOCORE III, BRUNO PEPENELLA, FRANCESCO ZERILLI, NANCY GAGE, CECIL BUONOCORE, ESTATE OF DON MALAND, ELLEN MALAND, JANE MALAND, MARK MALAND, ESTATE OF EINAR MALAND, JOHN BUONOCORE, II, TODD BUONOCORE. Filing fee $ 455, receipt number 1261365. Fee Status: Fee Paid. Parties have been notified. (Nudelman, Noel)
July 9, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 35 MEMORANDUM OPINION to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 7/9/07. (CS, )
July 9, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER granting 17 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss; the Complaint is hereby dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 7/9/07. (CS, )
July 3, 2007 Filing 33 Plaintiff's Supplemental Brief in Response to a Question Raised by the Court During the June 12, 2007 Oral Argument. by SALVATORE FERRIGNO, ESTATE OF GRACE MALAND, TIM MALAND, ESTATE OF CHARLES SHINN, ESTATE OF JEANNE SHINN, JEANETTE SWEIS, ESTATE OF MICHAEL SWEIS, ESTATE OF AIDA SWEIS, ESTATE OF ELENA TOMMARELLO, ARMANDO PEPENELLA, ESTATE OF JOHN BUONOCORE III, BRUNO PEPENELLA, FRANCESCO ZERILLI, NANCY GAGE, CECIL BUONOCORE, ESTATE OF DON MALAND, ELLEN MALAND, JANE MALAND, MARK MALAND, ESTATE OF EINAR MALAND, JOHN BUONOCORE, II, TODD BUONOCORE. (tg, )
July 3, 2007 Set/Reset Deadlines: Responses due by 7/15/2007 (CS, )
July 3, 2007 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting 32 Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File; Plaintiffs' attached Supplemental Memorandum shall be deemed filed; Defendants shall have until July 15, 2007 in which to file any response to the Supplemental Memorandum. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 7/3/07. (CS, )
July 2, 2007 Filing 32 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Memorandum by SALVATORE FERRIGNO, ESTATE OF GRACE MALAND, TIM MALAND, ESTATE OF CHARLES SHINN, ESTATE OF JEANNE SHINN, JEANETTE SWEIS, ESTATE OF MICHAEL SWEIS, ESTATE OF AIDA SWEIS, ESTATE OF ELENA TOMMARELLO, ARMANDO PEPENELLA, ESTATE OF JOHN BUONOCORE III, BRUNO PEPENELLA, FRANCESCO ZERILLI, NANCY GAGE, CECIL BUONOCORE, ESTATE OF DON MALAND, ELLEN MALAND, JANE MALAND, MARK MALAND, ESTATE OF EINAR MALAND, JOHN BUONOCORE, II, TODD BUONOCORE (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support of Motion# 2 Exhibit A# 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Kalik, Tracy)
June 12, 2007 Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Judge Gladys Kessler: Motion Hearing held on 6/12/2007 re 17 MOTION to Dismiss filed by LIBYAN INTERNAL SECURITY, LIBYAN EXTERNAL SECURITY, GREAT SOCIALIST PEOPLE'S LIBYAN ARAB JAMAHIRIYA, MU'AMMAR AL-QADHAFI, IBRAHAIM AL-BISHARI, ABDALLAH AL-SANUSI; heard and taken under advisement. (Court Reporter Susan Tyner.) (tth,)
May 7, 2007 Set/Reset Hearings: Motion Hearing set for 6/12/2007 10:15 AM in Courtroom 26A before Judge Gladys Kessler. (CS, )
May 7, 2007 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting 31 Defendants' Motion to Continue Motions Hearing; the Motions Hearing is hereby rescheduled to June 12, 2007 at 10:15 a.m. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 5/7/07. (CS, )
May 4, 2007 Filing 31 Consent MOTION to Continue Oral Argument by GREAT SOCIALIST PEOPLE'S LIBYAN ARAB JAMAHIRIYA, LIBYAN INTERNAL SECURITY, LIBYAN EXTERNAL SECURITY, MU'AMMAR AL-QADHAFI, ABDALLAH AL-SANUSI, IBRAHAIM AL-BISHARI (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Johnston, Mark)
May 1, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER postponing Motions Hearing for May 17, 2007 at 10:00 a.m.; if this date is inconvenient, counsel may file a Motion for Continuance, including dates and times that are more convenient for all parties; the Court will hearing arguments in this case and in 06-731 on the same date, but will first hear arguments in this case (06-727). Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 5/1/07. (CS, )
April 10, 2007 Filing 29 SURREPLY re 17 MOTION to Dismiss filed by ALL PLAINTIFFS. (tg, )
April 10, 2007 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting 28 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Surreply. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 4/10/07. (CS, )
March 23, 2007 Filing 28 MOTION for Leave to File a Sur-Reply to Defendants' Reply to Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss by SALVATORE FERRIGNO, ESTATE OF GRACE MALAND, TIM MALAND, ESTATE OF CHARLES SHINN, ESTATE OF JEANNE SHINN, JEANETTE SWEIS, ESTATE OF MICHAEL SWEIS, ESTATE OF AIDA SWEIS, ESTATE OF ELENA TOMMARELLO, ARMANDO PEPENELLA, ESTATE OF JOHN BUONOCORE III, BRUNO PEPENELLA, FRANCESCO ZERILLI, NANCY GAGE, CECIL BUONOCORE, ESTATE OF DON MALAND, ELLEN MALAND, JANE MALAND, MARK MALAND, ESTATE OF EINAR MALAND, JOHN BUONOCORE, II, TODD BUONOCORE (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Sur-Reply)(Kalik, Tracy)
March 16, 2007 Filing 27 REPLY to opposition to motion re 17 MOTION to Dismiss filed by GREAT SOCIALIST PEOPLE'S LIBYAN ARAB JAMAHIRIYA, LIBYAN INTERNAL SECURITY, LIBYAN EXTERNAL SECURITY, MU'AMMAR AL-QADHAFI, ABDALLAH AL-SANUSI, IBRAHAIM AL-BISHARI. (Feinstein, Wendy)
March 1, 2007 Set/Reset Deadlines: Replies due by 3/16/2007. (CS, )
March 1, 2007 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting 26 Defendants' Consent Motion for Extension of Time; Defendants shall have up to and including March 16, 2007 in which to file their reply to Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss . Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 3/1/07. (CS, )
March 1, 2007 Filing 26 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 17 MOTION to Dismiss by GREAT SOCIALIST PEOPLE'S LIBYAN ARAB JAMAHIRIYA, LIBYAN INTERNAL SECURITY, LIBYAN EXTERNAL SECURITY, MU'AMMAR AL-QADHAFI, ABDALLAH AL-SANUSI, IBRAHAIM AL-BISHARI. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Johnston, Mark)
February 5, 2007 Set/Reset Deadlines: Replies due by 3/2/2007. (CS, )
February 5, 2007 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting 25 Defendants' Consent Motion for Extension of Time; Defendants shall have up to and including March 2, 2007 in which to file their Reply to Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss . Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 2/5/07. (CS, )
February 5, 2007 Filing 25 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by GREAT SOCIALIST PEOPLE'S LIBYAN ARAB JAMAHIRIYA, LIBYAN INTERNAL SECURITY, LIBYAN EXTERNAL SECURITY, MU'AMMAR AL-QADHAFI, ABDALLAH AL-SANUSI, IBRAHAIM AL-BISHARI. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Johnston, Mark)
January 31, 2007 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven R. Perles on behalf of all plaintiffs (Perles, Steven)
January 30, 2007 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Gladys Kessler: Meet and Confer Hearing held on 1/30/2007. Motion Hearing set for 5/10/2007 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 26A before Judge Gladys Kessler. (Court Reporter Susan Tyner.) (tth,)
January 25, 2007 Set/Reset Hearings: Initial Scheduling Conference set for 1/30/2007 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 26A before Judge Gladys Kessler. (tth, )
January 23, 2007 Filing 23 MEET AND CONFER STATEMENT. (Kalik, Tracy)
January 19, 2007 Filing 22 Memorandum in opposition to re 17 MOTION to Dismiss filed by SALVATORE FERRIGNO, ESTATE OF GRACE MALAND, TIM MALAND, ESTATE OF CHARLES SHINN, ESTATE OF JEANNE SHINN, JEANETTE SWEIS, ESTATE OF MICHAEL SWEIS, ESTATE OF AIDA SWEIS, ESTATE OF ELENA TOMMARELLO, ARMANDO PEPENELLA, ESTATE OF JOHN BUONOCORE III, BRUNO PEPENELLA, FRANCESCO ZERILLI, NANCY GAGE, CECIL BUONOCORE, ESTATE OF DON MALAND, ELLEN MALAND, JANE MALAND, MARK MALAND, ESTATE OF EINAR MALAND, JOHN BUONOCORE, II, TODD BUONOCORE. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2# 3 Exhibit 3# 4 Exhibit 4# 5 Exhibit 5# 6 Exhibit 6# 7 Exhibit 7# 8 Text of Proposed Order)(Kalik, Tracy)
January 18, 2007 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting 21 the Second Consent Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages; Plaintiffs may file an additional 15 pages in their Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss in excess of the Court's Rules on page number limitations . Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 1/18/07. (CS, )
January 18, 2007 Filing 21 Consent MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by SALVATORE FERRIGNO, ESTATE OF GRACE MALAND, TIM MALAND, ESTATE OF CHARLES SHINN, ESTATE OF JEANNE SHINN, JEANETTE SWEIS, ESTATE OF MICHAEL SWEIS, ESTATE OF AIDA SWEIS, ESTATE OF ELENA TOMMARELLO, ARMANDO PEPENELLA, ESTATE OF JOHN BUONOCORE III, BRUNO PEPENELLA, FRANCESCO ZERILLI, NANCY GAGE, CECIL BUONOCORE, ESTATE OF DON MALAND, ELLEN MALAND, JANE MALAND, MARK MALAND, ESTATE OF EINAR MALAND, JOHN BUONOCORE, II, TODD BUONOCORE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kalik, Tracy)
January 18, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER denying 19 the Consent Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages because Plaintiffs failed to indicate what page limits they believe are necessary . Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 1/18/07. (CS, )
January 17, 2007 Filing 19 Consent MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by SALVATORE FERRIGNO, ESTATE OF GRACE MALAND, TIM MALAND, ESTATE OF CHARLES SHINN, ESTATE OF JEANNE SHINN, JEANETTE SWEIS, ESTATE OF MICHAEL SWEIS, ESTATE OF AIDA SWEIS, ESTATE OF ELENA TOMMARELLO, ARMANDO PEPENELLA, ESTATE OF JOHN BUONOCORE III, BRUNO PEPENELLA, FRANCESCO ZERILLI, NANCY GAGE, CECIL BUONOCORE, ESTATE OF DON MALAND, ELLEN MALAND, JANE MALAND, MARK MALAND, ESTATE OF EINAR MALAND, JOHN BUONOCORE, II, TODD BUONOCORE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kalik, Tracy)
December 7, 2006 Set/Reset Deadlines: Responses due by 1/19/2007 Replies due by 2/16/2007. (CS, )
December 7, 2006 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting 18 the Joint Motion to Set a Briefing Scheduling to Respond to Libyan Defendants' Motion to Dismiss; Plaintiffs shall have up to and including January 19, 2007 to file their brief in opposition to Defendants' pending Motion to Dismiss; Defendants shall have until February 16, 2007 to file their reply to said opposition . Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 12/7/06. (CS, )
December 6, 2006 Filing 18 Joint MOTION to Set Briefing Schedule for Defendants Motion to Dismiss by SALVATORE FERRIGNO, ESTATE OF GRACE MALAND, TIM MALAND, ESTATE OF CHARLES SHINN, ESTATE OF JEANNE SHINN, JEANETTE SWEIS, ESTATE OF MICHAEL SWEIS, ESTATE OF AIDA SWEIS, ESTATE OF ELENA TOMMARELLO, ARMANDO PEPENELLA, ESTATE OF JOHN BUONOCORE III, BRUNO PEPENELLA, FRANCESCO ZERILLI, GREAT SOCIALIST PEOPLE'S LIBYAN ARAB JAMAHIRIYA, LIBYAN INTERNAL SECURITY, LIBYAN EXTERNAL SECURITY, MU'AMMAR AL-QADHAFI, ABDALLAH AL-SANUSI, IBRAHAIM AL-BISHARI, NANCY GAGE, CECIL BUONOCORE, ESTATE OF DON MALAND, ELLEN MALAND, JANE MALAND, MARK MALAND, ESTATE OF EINAR MALAND, JOHN BUONOCORE, II, TODD BUONOCORE. (Attachments: # 1)(Kalik, Tracy)
December 5, 2006 Filing 17 MOTION to Dismiss by GREAT SOCIALIST PEOPLE'S LIBYAN ARAB JAMAHIRIYA, LIBYAN INTERNAL SECURITY, LIBYAN EXTERNAL SECURITY, MU'AMMAR AL-QADHAFI, ABDALLAH AL-SANUSI, IBRAHAIM AL-BISHARI. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D# 5 Exhibit E# 6 Text of Proposed Order)(Johnston, Mark)
November 27, 2006 Set/Reset Hearings: Initial Conference set for 1/30/2006 10:00 AM in Courtroom 26A before Judge Gladys Kessler. (CS, )
November 27, 2006 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting Plaintiff's Consent Motion to Continue Initial Scheduling Conference; the Initial Scheduling Conference is hereby rescheduled for January 30, 2006 at 10:00 a.m . Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 11/27/06. (CS, )
November 27, 2006 ENTERED IN ERROR. . . . .Set/Reset Hearings: Initial Conference set for 1/29/2007 10:00 AM in Courtroom 26A before Judge Gladys Kessler. (CS, ) Modified on 11/27/2006 (CS, ).
November 27, 2006 Opinion or Order ENTERED IN ERROR. . . . .MINUTE ORDER granting 16 Plaintiffs' Consent Motion to Continue Initial Scheduling Conference; the Initial Scheduling Conference is hereby rescheduled to January 29, 2006 at 10:00 a.m . Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 11/27/06. (CS, ) Modified on 11/27/2006 (CS, ).
November 21, 2006 Filing 16 Consent MOTION to Continue Initial Scheduling Conference by SALVATORE FERRIGNO, ESTATE OF GRACE MALAND, TIM MALAND, ESTATE OF CHARLES SHINN, ESTATE OF JEANNE SHINN, JEANETTE SWEIS, ESTATE OF MICHAEL SWEIS, ESTATE OF AIDA SWEIS, ESTATE OF ELENA TOMMARELLO, ARMANDO PEPENELLA, ESTATE OF JOHN BUONOCORE III, BRUNO PEPENELLA, FRANCESCO ZERILLI, NANCY GAGE, CECIL BUONOCORE, ESTATE OF DON MALAND, ELLEN MALAND, JANE MALAND, MARK MALAND, ESTATE OF EINAR MALAND, JOHN BUONOCORE, II, TODD BUONOCORE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kalik, Tracy)
November 14, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting 14 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer MU'AMMAR AL-QADHAFI answer due 12/5/2006; ABDALLAH AL-SANUSI answer due 12/5/2006; IBRAHAIM AL-BISHARI answer due 12/5/2006; MUHAMMED AL KHULI answer due 12/5/2006. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 11/14/06. (tth, )
November 10, 2006 Filing 14 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by GREAT SOCIALIST PEOPLE'S LIBYAN ARAB JAMAHIRIYA, LIBYAN INTERNAL SECURITY, LIBYAN EXTERNAL SECURITY, MU'AMMAR AL-QADHAFI, ABDALLAH AL-SANUSI, IBRAHAIM AL-BISHARI. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Johnston, Mark)
October 31, 2006 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting 13 Defendants' Consent Motion for Leave of Wendy West Feinstein to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 10/31/06. (CS, )
October 24, 2006 Filing 13 Consent MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Wendy West Feinstein. :Address- 600 Grant Street - 44th Floor, Pittsburgh, PA 15219. Phone No. - 412-566-6000. Fax No. - 412-566-6099 by GREAT SOCIALIST PEOPLE'S LIBYAN ARAB JAMAHIRIYA. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration# 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Johnston, Mark)
October 24, 2006 NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: re 12 Consent MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Wendy West Feinstein. :Address- 600 Grant Street, 44th Floor, Pittsburgh, PA 15219. Phone No. - 412-566-1927. Fax No. - 412-566-6099 was entered in error as the filer loaded up the wrong PDF document instead of the motion. Counsel was instructed to refile said pleading. (tg, )
October 23, 2006 Filing 12 ENTERED IN ERROR.....Consent MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Wendy West Feinstein. :Address- 600 Grant Street, 44th Floor, Pittsburgh, PA 15219. Phone No. - 412-566-1927. Fax No. - 412-566-6099 by GREAT SOCIALIST PEOPLE'S LIBYAN ARAB JAMAHIRIYA. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration# 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Johnston, Mark) Modified on 10/24/2006 (tg, ).
October 4, 2006 Filing 11 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to MUHAMMED AL KHULI (tg, )
October 4, 2006 Filing 10 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to SYRIAN AIR FORCE INTELLIGENCE (tg, )
October 4, 2006 Filing 9 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to SYRIAN ARAB REPUBLIC (tg, )
October 3, 2006 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT FOR DEFAULT Against Certain Defendants by SALVATORE FERRIGNO, ESTATE OF GRACE MALAND, TIM MALAND, ESTATE OF CHARLES SHINN, ESTATE OF JEANNE SHINN, JEANETTE SWEIS, ESTATE OF MICHAEL SWEIS, ESTATE OF AIDA SWEIS, ESTATE OF ELENA TOMMARELLO, ARMANDO PEPENELLA, ESTATE OF JOHN BUONOCORE III, BRUNO PEPENELLA, FRANCESCO ZERILLI, NANCY GAGE, CECIL BUONOCORE, ESTATE OF DON MALAND, ELLEN MALAND, JANE MALAND, MARK MALAND, ESTATE OF EINAR MALAND, JOHN BUONOCORE, II, TODD BUONOCORE. (Kalik, Tracy)
September 29, 2006 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Answer due by 11/13/2006. Initial Scheduling Conference set for 12/18/2006 09:45 AM in Courtroom 26A before Judge Gladys Kessler. (CS, )
September 29, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER setting an Initial Scheduling Conference for December 18, 2006 at 9:45 a.m. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 9/29/06. (CS, )
September 29, 2006 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting 6 Defendants' Consent Motion for Extension of Time; Defendants shall have up to and including NOvember 13, 2006 in which to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint . Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 9/29/06. (CS, )
September 28, 2006 Filing 6 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Responsive Pleading by GREAT SOCIALIST PEOPLE'S LIBYAN ARAB JAMAHIRIYA, LIBYAN INTERNAL SECURITY, LIBYAN EXTERNAL SECURITY, MU'AMMAR AL-QADHAFI, ABDALLAH AL-SANUSI, IBRAHAIM AL-BISHARI. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Johnston, Mark)
August 17, 2006 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Tracy Reichman Kalik on behalf of all plaintiffs (Kalik, Tracy)
August 17, 2006 Filing 4 NOTICE of Proof of Service pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1608(a)(3) by SALVATORE FERRIGNO, ESTATE OF GRACE MALAND, TIM MALAND, ESTATE OF CHARLES SHINN, ESTATE OF JEANNE SHINN, JEANETTE SWEIS, ESTATE OF MICHAEL SWEIS, ESTATE OF AIDA SWEIS, ESTATE OF ELENA TOMMARELLO, ARMANDO PEPENELLA, ESTATE OF JOHN BUONOCORE III, BRUNO PEPENELLA, FRANCESCO ZERILLI, NANCY GAGE, CECIL BUONOCORE, ESTATE OF DON MALAND, ELLEN MALAND, JANE MALAND, MARK MALAND, ESTATE OF EINAR MALAND, JOHN BUONOCORE, II, TODD BUONOCORE (Attachments: # 1 Appendix of Exhibits)(Kalik, Tracy)
July 26, 2006 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF CLERK of mailing one copy of the summons and complaint, together with a translation of each into the official language of the foreign state on 7/26/06, by DHL, to the agency or instrumentality of the foreign state, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1608(a)(3). (tg, )
July 25, 2006 Filing 2 REQUEST from Plaintiff for the Clerk to effect service of one copy of the summons, complaint, and notice of suit, together with a translation of each into the official language of the foreign state, by DHL, to the head of the ministry of foreign affairs, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1608(a)(3). (tg, )
April 21, 2006 Summons (9) Issued as to GREAT SOCIALIST PEOPLE'S LIBYAN ARAB JAMAHIRIYA, LIBYAN INTERNAL SECURITY, LIBYAN EXTERNAL SECURITY, MU'AMMAR AL-QADHAFI, ABDALLAH AL-SANUSI, IBRAHAIM AL-BISHARI, SIRYAN ARAB REPUBLIC, SYRIAN AIR FORCE INTELLIGENCE, MUHAMMED AL KHULI. (tg, )
April 21, 2006 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against GREAT SOCIALIST PEOPLE'S LIBYAN ARAB JAMAHIRIYA, LIBYAN INTERNAL SECURITY, LIBYAN EXTERNAL SECURITY, MU'AMMAR AL-QADHAFI, ABDALLAH AL-SANUSI, IBRAHAIM AL-BISHARI, SIRYAN ARAB REPUBLIC, SYRIAN AIR FORCE INTELLIGENCE, MUHAMMED AL KHULI (Filing fee $ 350) filed by SALVATORE FERRIGNO, ESTATE OF GRACE MALAND, TIM MALAND, ESTATE OF CHARLES SHINN, ESTATE OF JEANNE SHINN, JEANETTE SWEIS, ESTATE OF MICHAEL SWEIS, ESTATE OF AIDA SWEIS, ESTATE OF ELENA TOMMARELLO, ARMANDO PEPENELLA, ESTATE OF JOHN BUONOCORE III, BRUNO PEPENELLA, FRANCESCO ZERILLI, NANCY GAGE, CECIL BUONOCORE, ESTATE OF DON MALAND, ELLEN MALAND, JANE MALAND, MARK MALAND, ESTATE OF EINAR MALAND, JOHN BUONOCORE, II, TODD BUONOCORE.(tg, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ESTATE OF JOHN BUONOCORE III et al v. GREAT SOCIALIST PEOPLE'S LIBYAN ARAB JAMAHIRIYA, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?