RUZATULLAH v. RUMSFELD et al Featured Case

The United States has detained petitioners Ruzatullah and Haji Ruhullah at the United States Bagram Air Base in Afghanistan. The Next Friend of the detainees challenge the detention of the petitioners under President Bush\'s military order authorizing indefinite detention without due process of law.

Petitioner: RUZATULLAH, INAVATULLAH, HAJI ROHULLAH and BAZ MOHAMMAD
Respondent: JOHN DOE, JOHN DOE 2 and ROBERT GATES
Case Number: 1:2006cv01707
Filed: October 2, 2006
Court: District Of Columbia District Court
Office: Habeas Corpus (General) Office
County: 99999
Presiding Judge: Gladys Kessler
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: U.S. Government Defendant
Jury Demanded By: 28:2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (federa

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 3, 2007 38
NOTICE OF APPEAL as to 32 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief by ROBERT GATES, JOHN DOE, JOHN DOE 2. Fee Status: No Fee Paid. Parties have been notified. (Lin, Jean)
October 30, 2007 37 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER denying 33 Petitioner's Motion for a Report by the United States Concerning His Status and Potential Execution. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 10/30/07. (CL, )
October 24, 2007 36
REPLY to opposition to motion re 33 MOTION Motion for a Report by the US concerning Petitioner's status and potential execution filed by RUZATULLAH. (Toomey, Anne)
October 17, 2007 34 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER: The Government shall file its response to Petitioner's Motion for a Report by the United States Concerning His Status and Potential Execution no later than October 22, 2007. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 10/17/07. (CL, )
October 2, 2007 32 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER granting 26 Petitioner's Motion for Order Requiring Respondents to Provide 30-Days' Advance Notice of Any Proposed Transfer of Petitioner Rohullah from Bagram, Afghanistan. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 10/2/07. (CL, )
September 13, 2007 31 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER denying without prejudice until the Supreme Court has ruled definitively on the issue of the District Court's jurisdiction 15 Respondents' Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 9/13/07. (CL, )
March 29, 2007 18
NOTICE of Appearance by Anne Katherine Toomey on behalf of RUZATULLAH (Toomey, Anne)
February 13, 2007 17
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 15 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Response to Order to Show Cause by RUZATULLAH. (Foster, Tina)
December 28, 2006 12 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER that Respondents are to file their response to Petitioners' Amended Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by January 29, 2007; the opposition is due no later than February 29, 2007 and any reply is due no later than March 10, 2007 . Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 12/28/06. (CS, )
December 22, 2006 9
NOTICE of Filing of Amended Petition by RUZATULLAH re 8 Application for Writ, 6 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Response to Order to Show Cause (also filed as docket #5), Set/Reset Deadlines, Order on Motion for Extension of Time to, (Foster, Tina)
November 2, 2006 4 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER granting 3 Motion for Extension of Time for respondents to respond to petitioners' Petition to and including 11/20/06. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 11/2/06. (tth, )
October 16, 2006 2 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER that Respondents shall show cause by November 6, 2006 why the Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Next Friends should not be granted . Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 10/16/06. (CS, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: RUZATULLAH v. RUMSFELD et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: RUZATULLAH
Represented By: Anne Katherine Toomey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: INAVATULLAH
Represented By: Anne Katherine Toomey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: HAJI ROHULLAH
Represented By: Anne Katherine Toomey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: BAZ MOHAMMAD
Represented By: Anne Katherine Toomey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: JOHN DOE
Represented By: Jean Lin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: JOHN DOE 2
Represented By: Jean Lin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: ROBERT GATES
Represented By: Jean Lin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?