LATHAM & WATKINS LLP v. EVERSON Featured Case
Plaintiff: LATHAM & WATKINS LLP
Defendant: MARK W. EVERSON
Case Number: 1:2007cv00642
Filed: April 6, 2007
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Office: Washington, DC Office
County: 11001
Presiding Judge: Colleen Kollar-Kotelly
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 552 Freedom of Information Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 27, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 14
SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge John M. Facciola on 8/27/07. (lcjf1, )
August 15, 2007 Filing 13
NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin Morris Jacobs on behalf of LATHAM & WATKINS LLP (Jacobs, Kevin)
July 12, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 12
ORDER re referral to Judge Facciola for all purposes including trial. Signed by Magistrate Judge John M. Facciola on 7/12/07. (SP, )
July 5, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 11
ORDER. Pursuant to the 10 Joint Statement of Parties, filed July 3, 2007, this case has been referred to Magistrate Judge John M. Facciola for all purposes, including trial, pursuant to Local Civil Rule 73.1. The parties are to promptly contact Magistrate Judge Facciola's chambers to schedule further proceedings and, at the first meeting with Magistrate Judge Facciola, are to complete a standard consent form agreeing to appear before a Magistrate Judge for all purposes that will be submitted to this Court for approval. Furthermore, the Initial Scheduling Conference previously scheduled before this Court on July 10, 2007 at 9:00 a.m., is vacated. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on July 5, 2007. (lcckk2)
July 3, 2007 Filing 10
MEET AND CONFER STATEMENT. (Seabrook, Susan)
June 14, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 9
SCHEDULING ORDER:Initial Scheduling Conference set for 7/10/2007 09:00 AM in Courtroom 28A before Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 6/14/07. (dot, )
June 4, 2007 Filing 8
ANSWER to Complaint by MARK W. EVERSON. Related document: 1 Complaint filed by LATHAM & WATKINS LLP.(LoCurto, John)
May 1, 2007 Filing 6
RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the US Attorney. MARK W. EVERSON served on 4/6/2007, answer due 6/5/2007 (nmw, )
April 30, 2007 Filing 3
ENTERED IN ERROR.....SUMMONS Returned Executed by LATHAM & WATKINS LLP. MARK W. EVERSON served on 4/6/2007, answer due 6/5/2007., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the US Attorney. MARK W. EVERSON served on 4/6/2007, answer due 6/5/2007, RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on Attorney General. Date of Service Upon Attorney General 4/6/07. (Seabrook, Susan) Modified on 5/1/2007 (nmw, ).
April 12, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 2
ORDER Establishing Procedures for Electronic Filing for Cases Assigned to Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly, signed by Judge Kollar-Kotelly on April 12, 2007. (SM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LATHAM & WATKINS LLP v. EVERSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LATHAM & WATKINS LLP
Represented By: Susan E. Seabrook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARK W. EVERSON
Represented By: John J. LoCurto, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?