CENTER FOR SCIENCE IN THE PUBLIC INTEREST v. BURGER KING CORPORATION Featured Case
Plaintiff: CENTER FOR SCIENCE IN THE PUBLIC INTEREST
Defendant: BURGER KING CORPORATION
Case Number: 1:2007cv01092
Filed: June 18, 2007
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Office: Washington, DC Office
County: 11001
Presiding Judge: Richard J. Leon
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 30, 2010. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 5, 2008 Opinion or Order Case Remanded to Superior Court pursuant to order dated 02/21/08. (jf, )
February 26, 2008 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER finding as moot 14 Consent MOTION for Cross-Briefing Schedule on Plaintiff's Motion to Remand (filed 7/18/07) and Defendant's Motion to Dismiss (filed 7/20/07) by BURGER KING CORPORATION. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 2/26/08. (lcrjl2, )
February 21, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting 8 Plaintiff's motion to Remand; denying as moot 9 Defendant's motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 2/19/08. (whb)
February 21, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MEMORANDUM AND OPINION. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 2/19/08. (whb)
September 4, 2007 Opinion or Order Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Judge Richard J. Leon : Status Conference held on 9/4/2007. (Court Reporter Patty Gels.) (whb)
August 30, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MEET AND CONFER STATEMENT. (Grosz, Erich)
August 29, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 20 REPLY to opposition to motion re 9 MOTION to Dismiss together with Statement of Points and Authorities in Support filed by BURGER KING CORPORATION. (Podesta, Roger)
August 29, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 19 REPLY re 8 MOTION to Remand and Statement of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion to Remand filed by CENTER FOR SCIENCE IN THE PUBLIC INTEREST. (Berk, Steven)
August 20, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Memorandum in opposition to re 9 MOTION to Dismiss together with Statement of Points and Authorities in Support (Corrected Version) filed by CENTER FOR SCIENCE IN THE PUBLIC INTEREST. (Berk, Steven)
August 20, 2007 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: Document No. re 16 Memorandum in Opposition was entered in error by request of counsel and will be refiled with corrected version.(jf, )
August 17, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Memorandum in opposition to re 8 MOTION to Remand and Statement of Points and Authorities filed by BURGER KING CORPORATION. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Jonathan Muhtar# 2 Affidavit /Declaration of Roger E. Podesta, Esq.# 3 Exhibit (A) To Declaration of Roger E.Podesta, Esq.)(Podesta, Roger)
August 17, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ENTERED IN ERROR.....Memorandum in opposition to re 9 MOTION to Dismiss together with Statement of Points and Authorities in Support filed by CENTER FOR SCIENCE IN THE PUBLIC INTEREST. (Berk, Steven) Modified on 8/20/2007 (jf, ).
August 17, 2007 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER denying 15 Motion to Cancel Status Conference. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 8/17/07. (lcrjl2, )
August 14, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Joint MOTION Joint Motion to Set Aside and Cancel Status Conference by CENTER FOR SCIENCE IN THE PUBLIC INTEREST (Berk, Steven)
July 31, 2007 Opinion or Order SCHEDULING NOTICE. A Status Conference is set for 9/4/2007 at 03:30 PM in Courtroom 18 before Judge Richard J. Leon. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 7/31/07. (lcrjl2, )
July 26, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Consent MOTION for Cross-Briefing Schedule on Plaintiff's Motion to Remand (filed 7/18/07) and Defendant's Motion to Dismiss (filed 7/20/07) by BURGER KING CORPORATION (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Grosz, Erich)
July 24, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Erich O. Grosz on behalf of BURGER KING CORPORATION (Grosz, Erich)
July 24, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Roger E. Podesta on behalf of BURGER KING CORPORATION (Podesta, Roger)
July 20, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE OF FILING in hard copy the Burger King Nutritional Information Poster attached as Exhibit 9 to the Declaration of Erich O. Grosz (Doc #10) submitted in support of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss; Certificate of Service is attached, by BURGER KING CORPORATION re 9 MOTION to Dismiss together with Statement of Points and Authorities in Support, 10 Affidavit,,, (Johnson, Ada)
July 20, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT re 9 MOTION to Dismiss together with Statement of Points and Authorities in Support / DECLARATION of Erich O. Grosz in Support of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss by BURGER KING CORPORATION. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Erich O. Grosz# 2 Exhibit 2 to Declaration of Erich O. Grosz# 3 Exhibit 3 to Declaration of Erich O. Grosz# 4 Exhibit 4 to Declaration of Erich O. Grosz# 5 Exhibit 5 to Declaration of Erich O. Grosz# 6 Exhibit 6 to Declaration of Erich O. Grosz# 7 Exhibit 7 to Declaration of Erich O. Grosz# 8 Exhibit 8 to Declaration of Erich O. Grosz# 9 Exhibit 9 to Declaration of Erich O. Grosz# 10 Exhibit 10 to Declaration of Erich O. Grosz# 11 Exhibit 11 to Declaration of Erich O. Grosz)(Grosz, Erich)
July 20, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss together with Statement of Points and Authorities in Support by BURGER KING CORPORATION (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Podesta, Roger)
July 18, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MOTION to Remand and Statement of Points and Authorities by CENTER FOR SCIENCE IN THE PUBLIC INTEREST (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order CSPI Proposed Order)(Berk, Steven)
July 18, 2007 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting [5,6] Motions for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. It is hereby ORDERED that Erich O. Grosz and Roger E. Podesta are permitted to appear pro hac vice in the above captioned case. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 7/18/07. (lcrjl2, )
July 13, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE of Filing of Certificate of Service by BURGER KING CORPORATION re 2 LCvR 7.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Affiliations/Financial Interests, 1 Notice of Removal, (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Johnson, Ada)
July 13, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Erich O. Grosz, :Firm- Debevoise & Plimpton LLP, :Address- 919 Third Avenue - New York, NY 10022. Phone No. - (212) 909-6000. Fax No. - (212) 909-6836 by BURGER KING CORPORATION (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Erich O. Grosz# 2 Proposed Order# 3 Certificate of Service)(Johnson, Ada)
July 13, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Roger E. Podesta, :Firm- Debevoise & Plimpton LLP, :Address- 919 Third Avenue - New York, NY 10022. Phone No. - (212) 909-6000. Fax No. - (212) 909-6836 by BURGER KING CORPORATION (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Roger E. Podesta# 2 {Proposed} Order# 3 Certificate of Service)(Johnson, Ada)
June 25, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 6/25/2007. (CMcP, )
June 25, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Receipt on June 25, 2007 of ORIGINAL FILE, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet from Superior Court. Superior Court Number: 07ca3363. (jf, )
June 18, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 2 LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by BURGER KING CORPORATION (jf, )
June 18, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by BURGER KING CORPORATION from Superior Court for the District of Columbia, case number 07ca3363 B. (Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 4616005001) filed by BURGER KING CORPORATION. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Affidavit of Jonathan Muhtar)(jf, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CENTER FOR SCIENCE IN THE PUBLIC INTEREST v. BURGER KING CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CENTER FOR SCIENCE IN THE PUBLIC INTEREST
Represented By: Steven N. Berk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BURGER KING CORPORATION
Represented By: Ada Fernandez Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?