JAMES MADISON PROJECT v. CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY Featured Case

Plaintiff The James Madison Project alleges that the defendant Central Intelligence Agency denied plaintiff's FOIA request for internal CIA regulations concerning (1) personnel issues; (2) the granting or revocation of security clearances; (3) grievance procedures; (4) disciplinary procedures; (5) the Prepublication Review Board (6) declassification of information; (7) the Historical Advisory Board; and (8) the implementation of the Freedom of Information and Privacy Acts.

Plaintiff: JAMES MADISON PROJECT
Defendant: CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY
Case Number: 1:2007cv01154
Filed: June 27, 2007
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Office: Washington, DC Office
County: 11001
Presiding Judge: Ricardo M. Urbina
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 552 Freedom of Information Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Ricardo M. Urbina on 03/19/2009. (lcrmu1)
September 24, 2007 Filing 8
STATUS REPORT (Joint) by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Mei, Vesper)
August 24, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 7
STANDING ORDER Signed by Judge Ricardo M. Urbina on August 24, 2007. (jwd)
August 2, 2007 Filing 4
NOTICE of Appearance by Marina Utgoff Braswell on behalf of CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY (Braswell, Marina)
June 27, 2007 Filing 2
LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by JAMES MADISON PROJECT (jf, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: JAMES MADISON PROJECT v. CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMES MADISON PROJECT
Represented By: Mark S. Zaid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY
Represented By: Vesper Mei
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?