AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION et al v. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE et al
Plaintiff: AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION and AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION FOUNDATION
Defendant: DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE and CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY
Case Number: 1:2008cv00437
Filed: March 13, 2008
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Office: Washington, DC Office
County: 88888
Presiding Judge: Royce C. Lamberth
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 552 Freedom of Information Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting defendants' Motion 21 for Summary Judgment. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 10/16/2009. (lcrcl2, )
August 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting 19 Motion for Extension of Time to file Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 8/17/09. (lcrcl2, )
June 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting unopposed oral motion to vacate this Courts Memorandum Opinion and Order of October 29, 2008 and setting briefing schedule for summary judgment. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 6/26/2009. (lcrcl2, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION et al v. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION
Represented By: Arthur B. Spitzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION FOUNDATION
Represented By: Arthur B. Spitzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?