PFLUG et al v. GREAT SOCIALIST PEOPLE'S LIBYAN ARAB JAMAHIRIYA et al Featured Case
Plaintiff: JACKIE NINK PFLUG, JIM OLSEN, RYLMA NINK, EUGENE NINK, GLORIA NINK, MARY NINK, SCOTT PFLUG, PATRICK SCOTT BAKER, JERRY BAKER, LOIS BAKER, CRAIG BAKER, STACIE BAKER, PATRICIA A. HENRY, VALERIE PETERSON, KATHARINE D. DORIS, PAUL G. PETERSON, MICHELLE Y. HOLBROOK and ALL PLAINTIFFS
Defendant: GREAT SOCIALIST PEOPLE'S LIBYAN ARAB JAMAHIRIYA, LIBYAN INTERNAL SECURITY, LIBYAN EXTERNAL SECURITY, MU AMMAR AL QADHDHAFI, ABDALLAH AL-SANUSI, IBRAHAIM AL-BISHARI, SYRIAN ARAB REPUBLIC, SYRIAN AIR FORCE INTELLIGENCE and MUHAMMED AL KHULI
Case Number: 1:2008cv00505
Filed: March 24, 2008
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Office: P.I.: Other Office
County: 88888
Presiding Judge: Gladys Kessler
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 28:1602 Foreign Sovreign Immunities Act
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 21, 2011. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER DISMISSING 1:08-cv-00505 Pflug et al v. Great Socialist People's Libyan Arab Lamahiriya et al with prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge John M. Facciola on 03/30/2011. (lcjmf1)
March 30, 2011 Filing 35 FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW/MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Magistrate Judge John M. Facciola on 03/30/11. (ldc, )
December 6, 2010 Filing 33 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS before Magistrate Judge John M. Facciola held on 05/07/10; Page Numbers: 1-74. Date of Issuance:12/6/10. Court Reporter/Transcriber Catalina Kerr, Telephone number 202.354.3258, Court Reporter Email Address : catykerr@msn.com.<P></P>For the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.<P>NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at ww.dcd.uscourts.gov.<P></P> Redaction Request due 12/27/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/6/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/6/2011.(Kerr, Catalina)
December 6, 2010 Filing 32 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS before Magistrate Judge John M. Facciola held on 05/05/10; Page Numbers: 1-206. Date of Issuance:12/6/10. Court Reporter/Transcriber Catalina Kerr, Telephone number 202.354.3258, Court Reporter Email Address : catykerr@msn.com.<P></P>For the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.<P>NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at ww.dcd.uscourts.gov.<P></P> Redaction Request due 12/27/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/6/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/6/2011.(Kerr, Catalina)
December 6, 2010 Filing 31 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS before Magistrate Judge John M. Facciola held on 05/04/10; Page Numbers: 1-239. Date of Issuance:12/6/10. Court Reporter/Transcriber Catalina Kerr, Telephone number 202.354.3258, Court Reporter Email Address : catykerr@msn.com.<P></P>For the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.<P>NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at ww.dcd.uscourts.gov.<P></P> Redaction Request due 12/27/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/6/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/6/2011.(Kerr, Catalina)
December 6, 2010 Filing 30 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS before Magistrate Judge John M. Facciola held on 05/03/10; Page Numbers: 1-138. Date of Issuance:12/6/10. Court Reporter/Transcriber Catalina Kerr, Telephone number 202.354.3258, Court Reporter Email Address : catykerr@msn.com.<P></P>For the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.<P>NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at ww.dcd.uscourts.gov.<P></P> Redaction Request due 12/27/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/6/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/6/2011.(Kerr, Catalina)
August 11, 2010 Filing 29 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS before Magistrate Judge John M. Facciola held on 5/6/10; Page Numbers: 1 - 195. Date of Issuance:08/09/10. Court Reporter/Transcriber Bryan A. Wayne, Telephone number 202-354-3186, Court Reporter Email Address : bryanawayne@yahoo.com.<P></P>For the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.<P>NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at ww.dcd.uscourts.gov.<P></P> Redaction Request due 9/1/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/13/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/9/2010.(Wayne, Bryan)
August 5, 2010 Filing 28 Proposed Findings of Fact by ALL PLAINTIFFS. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Findings.Part 2, # 2 Proposed Findings.Part 3)(Kalik, Tracy)
May 7, 2010 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge John M. Facciola: Evidentiary Hearing held on 5/7/2010. Evidentiary Hearing concluded. (Court Reporter Catalina Kerr.) (ldc, )
May 6, 2010 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge John M. Facciola: Evidentiary Hearing held on 5/6/2010. Evidentiary Hearing set for 5/7/2010 09:30 AM in Courtroom 5 before Magistrate Judge John M. Facciola. Witnesses: Robert Oakley, James A.Olsen (Jim), Eugene Joseph Nink, Mary Ellen Nink O'Donnell, Gloria Joan Nink, Dr. James Markham (Court Reporter Bryan Wayne.) (ldc, )
May 5, 2010 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge John M. Facciola: Evidentiary Hearing held on 5/5/2010. Evidentiary Hearing set for 5/6/2010 09:30 AM in Courtroom 5 before Magistrate Judge John M. Facciola. Witnesses: Dr. Jack Spector, Scott Vincent Pflug, Craig Carnagan Baker, Lois Elaine Baker, Jerry Brian Baker, Stacie Ann Baker (Court Reporter Catalina Kerr.) (ldc, )
May 4, 2010 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge John M. Facciola: Evidentiary Hearing held on 5/4/2010. Evidentiary Hearing set for 5/5/2010 09:30 AM in Courtroom 5 before Magistrate Judge John M. Facciola. Witnesses: Michelle Yvonne Holbrook, Valerie Peterson, Patrick Scott Baker, Walter Patrick Lang, Jr., Dr. Marius Deeb (Court Reporter Catalina Kerr.) (ldc, )
May 4, 2010 Set/Reset Hearings: Evidentiary Hearing set for 5/5/2010, 05/06/10, 05/07/10 09:30 AM in Courtroom 5 before Magistrate Judge John M. Facciola. (ldc, )
May 3, 2010 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge John M. Facciola: Evidentiary Hearing held on 5/3/2010. Evidentiary Hearing set for 5/4/2010 09:30 AM in Courtroom 6 before Magistrate Judge John M. Facciola. Witnesses: Jackie Nink Pflug; Patricia Henry (Court Reporter Catalina Kerr.) (ldc, ) .
April 26, 2010 Set/Reset Hearings: Evidentiary Hearing set for 5/3/2010 will begin at 01:45 PM in Courtroom 6 before Magistrate Judge John M. Facciola. PLEASE NOTE THE TIME CHANGE. Evidentiary Hearing set for 5/4/2010 9:30 AM in Courtroom 6 before Magistrate Judge John M. Facciola. Evidentiary Hearing set for 5/5/2010, 5/6/2010, 5/7/2010 9:30 AM in Courtroom 5 before Magistrate Judge John M. Facciola. PLEASE NOTE THE LOCATION CHANGE.(lcjmf1)
April 26, 2010 Set/Reset Hearings: Evidentiary Hearing set for 5/3/2010 will begin at 01:45 PM in Courtroom 6 before Magistrate Judge John M. Facciola. PLEASE NOTE THE TIME CHANGE. Evidentiary Hearing set for 5/4/2010 9:30 AM in Courtroom 6 before Magistrate Judge John M. Facciola. Evidentiary Hearing set for 5/5/2010, 5/6/2010, 5/7/2010 9:30 AM in Courtroom 5 before Magistrate Judge John M. Facciola. PLEASE NOTE THE LOCATION CHANGE. (lcjmf1)
April 21, 2010 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting 27 Motion to File Certain Trial Exhibits Under Seal: At the trial to be held in this matter, Plaintiffs, by and through their counsel, may designate certain trial exhibits containing medical and financial information of the Plaintiffs as "Confidential", and upon their introduction and admission as evidence they are to be deemed filed "UNDER SEAL", available only to Court personnel and Counsel of Record in this matter. SO ORDEREd. Signed by Magistrate Judge John M. Facciola on 04/21/2010. (lcjmf1)
April 19, 2010 Filing 27 MOTION To File Certain Trial Exhibits Under Seal by ALL PLAINTIFFS (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kalik, Tracy)
April 1, 2010 Set/Reset Hearings: Due to the Court's calendar, it is necessary to change the time of the Pretrial Conference set for 4/6/2010, which is now set at 03:30 PM in Courtroom 6 before Magistrate Judge John M. Facciola. Please note this change in time. (lcjmf1)
March 11, 2010 Set/Reset Hearings: Pretrial Conference set for 4/6/2010 02:00 PM in Courtroom 6 before Magistrate Judge John M. Facciola. (lcjmf1)
December 21, 2009 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting 26 Motion for Leave to Take de bene esse Deposition. Signed by Magistrate Judge John M. Facciola on 12/21/2009. (lcjmf1)
December 17, 2009 Filing 26 MOTION for Order for Leave to Take De Bene Esse Deposition by ALL PLAINTIFFS (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kalik, Tracy)
November 9, 2009 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge John M. Facciola: Status Conference held on 11/9/2009. Evidentiary Hearing set for 5/3/2010 - 05/07/2010 09:30 AM in Courtroom 6 before Magistrate Judge John M. Facciola. (Court Reporter Rebecca Stonestreet.) (ldc, )
October 16, 2009 Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 10/23/2009 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6 before Magistrate Judge John M. Facciola is reset for 11/9/2009 02:00 PM in Courtroom 6 before Magistrate Judge John M. Facciola. (lcjmf1)
October 15, 2009 Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 10/23/2009 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6 before Magistrate Judge John M. Facciola. (lcjmf1)
October 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER re referral to Judge Facciola for all purposes. Signed by Magistrate Judge John M. Facciola on 10/14/09. (SP, )
October 8, 2009 Filing 24 Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge John M. Facciola for all purposes. Judge Gladys Kessler no longer assigned to the case. (kb)
October 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Facciola for all purposes. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 10/8/09. (CL, )
October 6, 2009 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Gladys Kessler: Telephone Conference held on 10/6/2009. (tth)
October 6, 2009 Set/Reset Hearings: Damages and Liability Hearing set for 2/22/2010 10:00 AM in Courtroom 26A before Judge Gladys Kessler. (CL, )
October 6, 2009 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Upon representations made by the parties at the telephone conference held on October 6, 2009, it is hereby ORDERED that a hearing on liability and damages in this case, and the related case 03-749, will be held on February 22-25, 2010. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 10/6/09. (CL, )
September 29, 2009 Filing 22 STATUS REPORT Regarding Status of Further Proceedings Before This Court by ALL PLAINTIFFS. (Kalik, Tracy)
January 15, 2009 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Gladys Kessler: Status Conference held on 1/15/2009. (Court Reporter Susan Tyner.) (tth)
December 30, 2008 Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 1/15/2009 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 26A before Judge Gladys Kessler. (tth)
December 30, 2008 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting 21 Motion to Continue the Status Conference currently set for 1/12/09 at 10:30 a.m. The Status Conference in this matter shall be continued until 1/15/09 at 10:00 a.m. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 12/30/08. (tth)
December 30, 2008 Filing 21 MOTION to Continue Status Conference by ALL PLAINTIFFS (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kalik, Tracy)
December 29, 2008 Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 1/12/2009 10:30 AM in Courtroom 26A before Judge Gladys Kessler. (tth)
December 24, 2008 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: A Status Conference shall be held in this case on January 12, 2009 at 10:30 a.m., in Courtroom 26A. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 12/24/08. (lcgk1, )
December 24, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting Libyan Defendants' Supplemental Motions to Dismiss and dismissing with prejudice the Baker Second Amended Complaint and the Pflug Complaint in their entirety only as against the Libyan Defendants. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 12/24/08. (lcgk1, )
December 19, 2008 Filing 19 RESPONSE re 18 Notice of Proposed Order Statement Regarding Plaintiffs' Proposed Substitute Order filed by GREAT SOCIALIST PEOPLE'S LIBYAN ARAB JAMAHIRIYA, LIBYAN INTERNAL SECURITY, LIBYAN EXTERNAL SECURITY. (Curran, Christopher)
December 3, 2008 Filing 18 NOTICE of Proposed Order by ALL PLAINTIFFS re 17 Order, (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kalik, Tracy)
November 25, 2008 Set/Reset Deadlines: Proposed Order due 12/3/2008 (CL, )
November 25, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER that Plaintiffs are to submit, no later than December 3, 2008, another set of Proposed Orders which they believe will appropriately and accurately embody the agreement of the parties and accurately indicate whether any claims are remaining and, if so, against which Defendants. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 11/25/08. (CL, )
November 25, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting 14 Defendants' Supplemental Motion to Dismiss; the Complaint is dismissed in its entirety with prejudice. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 11/25/08. (lcgk1, )
November 21, 2008 Filing 15 Memorandum in opposition to re 14 Supplemental MOTION to Dismiss filed by ALL PLAINTIFFS. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kalik, Tracy)
November 20, 2008 Filing 14 Supplemental MOTION to Dismiss by GREAT SOCIALIST PEOPLE'S LIBYAN ARAB JAMAHIRIYA, LIBYAN INTERNAL SECURITY, LIBYAN EXTERNAL SECURITY, MU AMMAR AL QADHDHAFI, ABDALLAH AL-SANUSI, IBRAHAIM AL-BISHARI (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support of Supplemental Motion to Dismiss, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Text of Proposed Order)(Curran, Christopher)
November 3, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MINUTE ORDER setting Settlement Conference for 11/4/2008, at 03:00 PM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge Alan Kay. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alan Kay on 11/03/08. (DM)
October 31, 2008 Filing 12 STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report by GREAT SOCIALIST PEOPLE'S LIBYAN ARAB JAMAHIRIYA, LIBYAN INTERNAL SECURITY, LIBYAN EXTERNAL SECURITY, MU AMMAR AL QADHDHAFI, ABDALLAH AL-SANUSI, IBRAHAIM AL-BISHARI, ALL PLAINTIFFS. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Curran, Christopher)
September 2, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting 10 the Joint Motion to Stay (see Order for details); this case is hereby stayed for 60 days; after 60 days, if the case, is not closed, the parties are to file a status report. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 9/1/08. (CL, ). Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 9/1/08. (CL, )
August 27, 2008 Filing 10 Joint MOTION to Stay All Proceedings as to the Libyan Defendants by GREAT SOCIALIST PEOPLE'S LIBYAN ARAB JAMAHIRIYA, LIBYAN INTERNAL SECURITY, LIBYAN EXTERNAL SECURITY, MU AMMAR AL QADHDHAFI, ABDALLAH AL-SANUSI, IBRAHAIM AL-BISHARI, ALL PLAINTIFFS (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Erb, Nicole)
August 13, 2008 Filing 9 Memorandum in opposition to re 7 MOTION to Dismiss Duplicative Complaint filed by JACKIE NINK PFLUG. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Perles, Steven)
August 12, 2008 Filing 8 NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY by GREAT SOCIALIST PEOPLE'S LIBYAN ARAB JAMAHIRIYA, LIBYAN INTERNAL SECURITY, LIBYAN EXTERNAL SECURITY (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E)(Erb, Nicole)
July 24, 2008 Set/Reset Hearings : Settlement Conference set for 7/28/08 at 10:00 AM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge Alan Kay. (kk)
July 15, 2008 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss Duplicative Complaint by GREAT SOCIALIST PEOPLE'S LIBYAN ARAB JAMAHIRIYA, LIBYAN INTERNAL SECURITY, LIBYAN EXTERNAL SECURITY (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Curran, Christopher)
July 15, 2008 Filing 6 MOTION to Consolidate Cases by ALL PLAINTIFFS (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kalik, Tracy)
July 14, 2008 Settlement Conference set for 7/18/2008, at 10:00 AM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge Alan Kay. (DM)
July 14, 2008 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER cancelling the mediation set for July 14, 2008, and rescheduling the mediation for July 18, 2008, at 10:00 a.m., in chambers. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alan Kay on 07/14/08. (DM)
July 8, 2008 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER- mediation on this case will reconvene on July 14, 2008, at 4 pm, in chambers - room 2333. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alan Kay on 07/08/08. (DM)
June 27, 2008 Filing 5 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Alan Kay for settlement. (kb)
June 26, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Kay for settlement purposes only. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 6/26/08. (CL, )
June 18, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER on representations from the Status Conference held on June 18, 2008 (see Order and docket in 03-749 for more details). Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 6/18/08. (CL, )
March 24, 2008 Summons (9) Issued as to GREAT SOCIALIST PEOPLE'S LIBYAN ARAB JAMAHIRIYA, LIBYAN INTERNAL SECURITY, LIBYAN EXTERNAL SECURITY, MU AMMAR AL QADHDHAFI, ABDALLAH AL-SANUSI, IBRAHAIM AL-BISHARI, SYRIAN ARAB REPUBLIC, SYRIAN AIR FORCE INTELLIGENCE, MUHAMMED AL KHULI. (tg, ) Modified on 3/31/2008 (ks, ).
March 24, 2008 Filing 2 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by ALL PLAINTIFFS. Case related to Case No. 03-749. (tg, )
March 24, 2008 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against GREAT SOCIALIST PEOPLE'S LIBYAN ARAB JAMAHIRIYA, LIBYAN INTERNAL SECURITY, LIBYAN EXTERNAL SECURITY, MU AMMAR AL QADHDHAFI, ABDALLAH AL-SANUSI, IBRAHAIM AL-BISHARI, SYRIAN ARAB REPUBLIC, SYRIAN AIR FORCE INTELLIGENCE, MUHAMMED AL KHULI ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 4616011189) filed by ALL PLAINTIFFS, MARY NINK, SCOTT PFLUG, PATRICK SCOTT BAKER, JERRY BAKER, LOIS BAKER, JACKIE NINK PFLUG, CRAIG BAKER, STACIE BAKER, PATRICIA A. HENRY, VALERIE PETERSON, KATHARINE D. DORIS, PAUL G. PETERSON, MICHELLE Y. HOLBROOK, JIM OLSEN, RYLMA NINK, EUGENE NINK, GLORIA NINK. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(tg, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PFLUG et al v. GREAT SOCIALIST PEOPLE'S LIBYAN ARAB JAMAHIRIYA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JACKIE NINK PFLUG
Represented By: Richard D. Heideman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JIM OLSEN
Represented By: Richard D. Heideman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RYLMA NINK
Represented By: Richard D. Heideman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EUGENE NINK
Represented By: Richard D. Heideman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GLORIA NINK
Represented By: Richard D. Heideman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARY NINK
Represented By: Richard D. Heideman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SCOTT PFLUG
Represented By: Richard D. Heideman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PATRICK SCOTT BAKER
Represented By: Richard D. Heideman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JERRY BAKER
Represented By: Richard D. Heideman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LOIS BAKER
Represented By: Richard D. Heideman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CRAIG BAKER
Represented By: Richard D. Heideman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STACIE BAKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PATRICIA A. HENRY
Represented By: Richard D. Heideman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VALERIE PETERSON
Represented By: Richard D. Heideman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KATHARINE D. DORIS
Represented By: Richard D. Heideman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PAUL G. PETERSON
Represented By: Richard D. Heideman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHELLE Y. HOLBROOK
Represented By: Richard D. Heideman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALL PLAINTIFFS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GREAT SOCIALIST PEOPLE'S LIBYAN ARAB JAMAHIRIYA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LIBYAN INTERNAL SECURITY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LIBYAN EXTERNAL SECURITY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MU AMMAR AL QADHDHAFI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABDALLAH AL-SANUSI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IBRAHAIM AL-BISHARI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SYRIAN ARAB REPUBLIC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SYRIAN AIR FORCE INTELLIGENCE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MUHAMMED AL KHULI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?