FAROUKI v. PETRA INTERNATIONAL BANKING CORPORATION et al
Plaintiff: A. HUDA FAROUKI
Defendant: PETRA BANK, RANDOLPH B. OLD and PETRA INTERNATIONAL BANKING CORPORATION
Case Number: 1:2008cv02137
Filed: December 9, 2008
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Office: Contract: Other Office
County: 88888
Presiding Judge: Royce C Lamberth
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 28, 2015. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 28, 2015 Filing 105 MANDATE of USCA (certified copy) as to #103 Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit Court, filed by PETRA INTERNATIONAL BANKING CORPORATION, RANDOLPH B. OLD, PETRA BANK. ORDERED and ADJUDGED that the district court's order filed August 11, 2014, be affined. USCA Case Number 14-7136. (rd)
September 9, 2014 USCA Case Number 14-7136 for #103 Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit Court, filed by PETRA INTERNATIONAL BANKING CORPORATION, RANDOLPH B. OLD, PETRA BANK. (rldj)
September 5, 2014 Filing 104 Transmission of the Notice of Appeal, Order Appealed, and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals. The Court of Appeals fee was paid this date re #103 Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit Court. (rdj)
September 5, 2014 Filing 103 NOTICE OF APPEAL TO DC CIRCUIT COURT as to #101 Order on Motion for Reconsideration, #102 Memorandum & Opinion by PETRA INTERNATIONAL BANKING CORPORATION, PETRA BANK, RANDOLPH B. OLD. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number 0090-3829131. Fee Status: Fee Paid. Parties have been notified. (Fornaciari, John)
August 11, 2014 Filing 102 MEMORANDUM AND OPINION. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on August 11, 2014. (lcrcl4)
August 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER denying #95 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on August 11, 2014. (lcrcl4)
December 6, 2013 Filing 100 REPLY to opposition to motion re #95 MOTION for Reconsideration re #91 Memorandum & Opinion, #90 Order on Motion to Dismiss REPLY TO PLAINTIFF'S MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF THE ENTRY OF SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION filed by PETRA BANK, PETRA INTERNATIONAL BANKING CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Fornaciari, John)
November 22, 2013 Filing 99 RESPONSE TO ORDER OF THE COURT re #90 Order on Motion to Dismiss, #98 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply, #94 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to, and BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT PIBC'S MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION filed by A. HUDA FAROUKI. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Stratton, Grayson)
November 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER Granting #97 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #95 MOTION for Reconsideration re #91 Memorandum & Opinion, #90 Order on Motion to Dismiss . Plaintiff shall have up to and including 11/22/2013 to file response.. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 11/8/13. (mpt, )
November 4, 2013 Filing 97 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to PIBC's Motion for Reconsideration by A. HUDA FAROUKI (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Stratton, Grayson)
October 24, 2013 Filing 96 MEMORANDUM re #95 MOTION for Reconsideration by PETRA INTERNATIONAL BANKING CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Statement of Facts, #2 Declaration of Randolph B. Old and Exhibits, #3 Declaration Richard K. Hollowell, #4 Text of Proposed Order, #5 Certificate of Service)(Fornaciari, John) Modified on 10/25/2013 to correct linkage (rdj).
October 24, 2013 Filing 95 MOTION for Reconsideration re #91 Memorandum & Opinion, #90 Order on Motion to Dismiss by PETRA INTERNATIONAL BANKING CORPORATION (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Declaration of Randolph B. Old and Exhibits, #3 Declaration of Richard K. Hollowell, #4 Text of Proposed Order, #5 Certificate of Service)(Fornaciari, John)
September 27, 2013 Set/Reset Deadlines: Response to Court's Rule 56(f) due no later than 10/24/2013. Opposition due by 11/22/2013, Reply due by 12/6/2013. (mpt, )
September 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER Granting #93 Motion for Extension of Time to File any response to the Court's Rule 56(f) notification no later than October 24, 2013, with any opposition filed by November 22, 2013, and any reply by December 6, 2013. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 9/25/13. (mpt, )
September 25, 2013 Filing 93 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to the Briefing Schedule for the Responses to the Court's Rule 56(f) Notification by PETRA INTERNATIONAL BANKING CORPORATION (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Disch, Robert)
September 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER denying #84 Motion to Compel without prejudice. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on September 24, 2013. (lcrcl4)
September 17, 2013 Filing 91 MEMORANDUM AND OPINION gratinng #85 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on September 17, 2013. (lcrcl4)
September 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER granting #85 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on September 17, 2013. (lcrcl4)
July 25, 2013 Filing 89 REPLY to opposition to motion re #85 MOTION to Dismiss The Defendant's Second Amended Complaint -- Reply Memorandum in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss Defendant's Second Amended Counterclaim filed by A. HUDA FAROUKI. (Clarke, David) Modified on 7/26/2013 to correct event (rdj).
July 18, 2013 Filing 88 REPLY to opposition to motion re #84 MOTION to Compel Plaintff Farouki to Appear for a Deposition filed by PETRA INTERNATIONAL BANKING CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Fornaciari, John)
July 15, 2013 Filing 87 Memorandum in opposition to re #85 MOTION to Dismiss The Defendant's Second Amended Complaint filed by PETRA INTERNATIONAL BANKING CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(Fornaciari, John)
July 8, 2013 Filing 86 Memorandum in opposition to re #84 MOTION to Compel Plaintff Farouki to Appear for a Deposition filed by A. HUDA FAROUKI. (Clarke, David)
June 27, 2013 Filing 85 MOTION to Dismiss The Defendant's Second Amended Complaint by A. HUDA FAROUKI (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss The Defendant's Second Amended Complaint, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Clarke, David)
June 21, 2013 Filing 84 MOTION to Compel Plaintff Farouki to Appear for a Deposition by PETRA INTERNATIONAL BANKING CORPORATION (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to C, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(Fornaciari, John)
June 12, 2013 Filing 83 Second Amended COUNTERCLAIM against A. HUDA FAROUKI filed by PETRA INTERNATIONAL BANKING CORPORATION.(rdj)
June 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 82 MEMORANDUM ORDER granting #79 Motion for Leave to File. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 06/12/2013. (lcrcl4)
May 2, 2013 Filing 81 REPLY to opposition to motion re #79 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Counterclaim filed by PETRA INTERNATIONAL BANKING CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Certificate of Service)(Fornaciari, John)
April 22, 2013 Filing 80 RESPONSE re #79 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Counterclaim filed by A. HUDA FAROUKI. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Stratton, Grayson)
April 5, 2013 Filing 79 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Counterclaim by PETRA INTERNATIONAL BANKING CORPORATION (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Certificate of Service)(Fornaciari, John)
March 12, 2013 Filing 78 MANDATE of USCA (certified copy) as to #76 Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit Court, filed by PETRA INTERNATIONAL BANKING CORPORATION, RANDOLPH B. OLD, PETRA BANK ; ORDERED and ADJUDGED that the grant of summary judgement by the District Court appealed from in this cause be vacated and the cause be remanded for further proceedings, in accordance with the opinion of the court filed herein this date. USCA Case Number 11-7121. (md, )
October 21, 2011 USCA Case Number 11-7121 for #76 Notice of Appeal, filed by PETRA INTERNATIONAL BANKING CORPORATION, RANDOLPH B. OLD, PETRA BANK. (kb)
October 20, 2011 Filing 77 Transmission of the Notice of Appeal, Order Appealed, and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals. The Court of Appeals fee was paid this date re #76 Notice of Appeal. (rdj)
October 19, 2011 Filing 76 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #75 Memorandum & Opinion, #74 Order on Motion to Dismiss, by PETRA INTERNATIONAL BANKING CORPORATION, PETRA BANK, RANDOLPH B. OLD. Filing fee $ 455, receipt number 0090-2703627. Fee Status: Fee Paid. Parties have been notified. (Fornaciari, John)
September 20, 2011 Filing 75 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on September 20, 2011. (lcrcl3)
September 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER granting in part and denying in part defendants' #66 Motion to Dismiss; granting plaintiff's #69 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on September 20, 2011. (lcrcl3)
May 4, 2011 Filing 73 Case reassigned by consent to Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth. Judge Henry H. Kennedy no longer assigned to the case. (gt, )
May 4, 2011 NOTICE: Status conference currently scheduled for 5/13/2011 @10:00am before Judge Henry H. Kennedy,Jr. is hereby CANCELED.(tj)
May 4, 2011 Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 5/13/2011 @ 10:00 AM in Courtroom 27A before Judge Henry H. Kennedy. (tj)
October 18, 2010 Filing 72 REPLY to opposition to motion re #69 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Counterclaim filed by A. HUDA FAROUKI. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Stratton, Grayson)
October 7, 2010 Filing 71 Memorandum in opposition to re #69 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Counterclaim filed by PETRA INTERNATIONAL BANKING CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A through G)(Fornaciari, John)
September 24, 2010 Filing 70 REPLY to opposition to motion re #66 MOTION to Dismiss Counts III, IV, VI and VII of the Amended Complaint and Motion by Randolph Old and Petra Bank to Dismiss the Amended Complaint in Its Entirety filed by RANDOLPH B. OLD, PETRA BANK, PETRA INTERNATIONAL BANKING CORPORATION. (Fornaciari, John)
September 20, 2010 Filing 69 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Counterclaim by A. HUDA FAROUKI (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Text of Proposed Order)(Stratton, Grayson)
September 14, 2010 Filing 68 Memorandum in opposition to re #66 MOTION to Dismiss Counts III, IV, VI and VII of the Amended Complaint and Motion by Randolph Old and Petra Bank to Dismiss the Amended Complaint in Its Entirety filed by A. HUDA FAROUKI. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Text of Proposed Order)(Stratton, Grayson)
September 13, 2010 Filing 67 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by RANDOLPH B. OLD, PETRA BANK, PETRA INTERNATIONAL BANKING CORPORATION. (Fornaciari, John)
August 27, 2010 Filing 66 MOTION to Dismiss Counts III, IV, VI and VII of the Amended Complaint and Motion by Randolph Old and Petra Bank to Dismiss the Amended Complaint in Its Entirety by RANDOLPH B. OLD, PETRA BANK, PETRA INTERNATIONAL BANKING CORPORATION (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7)(Fornaciari, John)
August 27, 2010 Filing 65 ANSWER to #62 Amended Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against A. HUDA FAROUKI by PETRA INTERNATIONAL BANKING CORPORATION. Related document: #62 Amended Complaint filed by A. HUDA FAROUKI. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Fornaciari, John)
August 27, 2010 Filing 64 STIPULATION Regarding Amended Counterclaim by RANDOLPH B. OLD, PETRA BANK, PETRA INTERNATIONAL BANKING CORPORATION. (Fornaciari, John)
August 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER granting #60 Joint Motion for Scheduling Order. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr. on August 17, 2010. (NP)
August 13, 2010 Filing 62 AMENDED COMPLAINT against RANDOLPH B. OLD, PETRA BANK, PETRA INTERNATIONAL BANKING CORPORATION filed by A. HUDA FAROUKI.(znmw, )
August 13, 2010 Filing 61 CONSENT (Stipulation) TO THE FILING OF AN AMENDED COMPLAINT. (znmw, )
August 13, 2010 Filing 60 Joint MOTION for Order Entering Scheduling Order by A. HUDA FAROUKI (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Stratton, Grayson)
May 25, 2010 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Deborah A. Robinson: Hearing on Motion of Defendant Petra International Banking Corporation ("PIBC") for a Protective Order (Document No. 51). MINUTE ORDER: Parties reached an agreement regarding the issues presented by the motion, Plaintiff's opposition thereto (Document No. 55) and PIBC's reply (Document No. 58). In accordance with their agreement, set forth by counsel on the record, (1) PIBC will make Nafeth A. Al Fattah available in Amman, Jordan for deposition with respect to both jurisdiction and the merits of this action; (2) PIBC withdraws its Motion for a Protective Order; (3) the deposition of Mr. Al Fattah will complete the jurisdictional discovery by Plaintiff in Amman, Jordan, and (4) the deposition will be concluded by July 2, 2010. It is SO ORDERED. (Court Reporter Bowles Reporting.) (EW)
May 14, 2010 Filing 59 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeremy M. Keim on behalf of RANDOLPH B. OLD, PETRA BANK, PETRA INTERNATIONAL BANKING CORPORATION (Keim, Jeremy)
May 13, 2010 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Deborah A. Robinson: Status hearing conducted; hearing on Motion of Defendant Petra International Banking Corp. for a Protective Order scheduled Tuesday, 5/25/2010 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4 before Magistrate Judge Deborah A. Robinson; any remaining issues regarding juridictional discovery will be determined at said hearing. Court Reporter Bowles Reporting.) (lm)
May 13, 2010 Filing 58 ERRATA by PETRA INTERNATIONAL BANKING CORPORATION #56 Reply to opposition to Motion filed by PETRA INTERNATIONAL BANKING CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Corrected Reply)(Disch, Robert)
May 13, 2010 Filing 57 Case randomly reassigned to Judge Henry H. Kennedy. Judge Richard J. Leon no longer assigned to the case. (gt, )
May 12, 2010 Filing 56 REPLY to opposition to motion re #51 MOTION for Protective Order filed by PETRA INTERNATIONAL BANKING CORPORATION. (Disch, Robert)
May 10, 2010 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard J. Leon.Status Conference held on 5/10/2010. (Court Reporter Patty Gels.) (kc )
May 7, 2010 Filing 55 Memorandum in opposition to re #51 MOTION for Protective Order filed by A. HUDA FAROUKI. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Stratton, Grayson)
May 6, 2010 Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 5/10/2010 at 04:30 PM in Courtroom 18 before Judge Richard J. Leon. (kc )
April 28, 2010 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Deborah A. Robinson on 4/28/10 granting #54 Consent Motion to reschedule the April 29, 2010 status conference;Status Conference reset for 5/13/2010 @ 02:00 PM in Courtroom 4 before Magistrate Judge Deborah A. Robinson. (EW)
April 27, 2010 Filing 54 Consent MOTION To Reschedule Status Conference to May 13, 2010 by RANDOLPH B. OLD, PETRA BANK, PETRA INTERNATIONAL BANKING CORPORATION (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Disch, Robert)
April 27, 2010 Filing 53 NOTICE of Change of Address by Robert Matthew Disch (Disch, Robert)
April 27, 2010 Filing 52 NOTICE of Change of Address by John Robert Fornaciari (Fornaciari, John)
April 23, 2010 Filing 51 WITHDRAWN 5/25/10.......MOTION for Protective Order by PETRA INTERNATIONAL BANKING CORPORATION (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits 1-3, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Fornaciari, John) Modified on 5/25/2010 (EW, ).
April 22, 2010 Status Conference (re paragraph 5 of the 4/15/10 Joint Status Report scheduled for 03:30 PM on Thursday, 4/29/2010 in Courtroom 4-2nd Floor, E. Barrett Prettyman Building before Magistrate Judge Deborah A. Robinson. (EW)
April 15, 2010 Filing 50 STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report Regarding Time to Complete Jurisdictonal Discovery by A. HUDA FAROUKI. (Stratton, Grayson)
March 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER, Ordered that the parties file a joint status report within 45 days of this Order to inform the Court how much time is needed to complete jurisdictional discovery, and it is further Ordered that the pending motions #9 , #13 , and #15 are hereby DISMISSED without prejudice pending the close of jurisdictional discovery. Based on the outcome of such discovery, the parties are free to supplement, amend, or refile these motions. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 3/1/10. (see order.) (kc )
February 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 48 Order by Magistrate Judge Deborah A. Robinson on 2/4/10: Defendant PIBCs Motion to Compel (Document No. 30) is DENIED; Plaintiffs Motion to Compel (Document No. 35) is GRANTED IN PART, and Defendant Petra International Banking Corporation shall produce all documents responsive to Plaintiffs Request for Production of Documents Nos. 1 (as modified), 5 (as modified), 11, 12 and 13 (as modified) by no later than February 25, 2010; In all other respects, Plaintiffs Motion to Compel is DENIED; PIBCs Motion for Protective Order (Document No. 39) is DENIED; Defendant Petra Banks and Olds Motion to Stay (Document No. 23) is GRANTED; Defendant Petra Banks and Olds Motion for a Protective Order (Document No. 24) is GRANTED. (lcdar3)
February 4, 2010 Filing 47 MEMORANDUM OPINION by Magistrate Judge Deborah A. Robinson on 2/4/10.(lcdar3)
November 5, 2009 Filing 46 REPLY re #45 Response to Document #44 Notice of Filing Supplemental Exhibit filed by A. HUDA FAROUKI. (Stratton, Grayson)
October 26, 2009 Filing 45 RESPONSE re #44 Notice (Other), Notice (Other) of Filing Supplemental Exhibit In Support of Plaintiff's Opposition to Motion to Dismiss filed by PETRA INTERNATIONAL BANKING CORPORATION. (Fornaciari, John)
October 19, 2009 MINUTE Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Deborah A. Robinson: Motion Hearing held on 10/19/2009. Motions taken under advisement. (Court Reporter Bowles.) (lcdar3)
October 15, 2009 Filing 44 NOTICE of Filing Supplemental Exhibit in Support of Plaintiff's Opposition to Motion to Dismiss by A. HUDA FAROUKI re #9 MOTION to Dismiss Counts III, IV, V, VI, and VII and Randolph Old and Petra Bank's Motion to Dismiss the Complaint in its Entirety, #12 Memorandum in Opposition, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Supplemental Exhibit)(Stratton, Grayson)
October 15, 2009 Filing 43 REPLY to opposition to motion re #39 MOTION for Protective Order Staying Jurisdictional Discovery Pending Ruling on Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Venue filed by PETRA INTERNATIONAL BANKING CORPORATION. (Fornaciari, John)
October 9, 2009 Filing 42 NOTICE of Appearance by David Clarke, Jr on behalf of A. HUDA FAROUKI (Clarke, David)
October 8, 2009 Filing 41 Memorandum in opposition to re #39 MOTION for Protective Order Staying Jurisdictional Discovery Pending Ruling on Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Venue filed by A. HUDA FAROUKI. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Stratton, Grayson)
October 8, 2009 Set/Reset Hearing: Motion Hearing reset for Monday, 10/19/2009 @ 03:00 PM in Courtroom 4 before Magistrate Judge Deborah A. Robinson. (EW)
September 29, 2009 Filing 40 REPLY to opposition to motion re #35 MOTION to Compel Discovery from Petra International Banking Corp. filed by A. HUDA FAROUKI. (Stratton, Grayson)
September 22, 2009 Filing 39 MOTION for Protective Order Staying Jurisdictional Discovery Pending Ruling on Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Venue by PETRA INTERNATIONAL BANKING CORPORATION (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Fornaciari, John)
September 22, 2009 Filing 38 Memorandum in opposition to re #35 MOTION to Compel Discovery filed by PETRA INTERNATIONAL BANKING CORPORATION. (Fornaciari, John)
September 21, 2009 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Deborah A. Robinson on 9/21/09 granting #37 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Discovery; Response due by 9/22/09; Reply due by 9/29/09. (lcdar3)
September 18, 2009 Filing 37 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Discovery by PETRA INTERNATIONAL BANKING CORPORATION (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Disch, Robert)
September 8, 2009 Filing 36 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Deborah A. Robinson for #35 MOTION to Compel Discovery by A. HUDA FAROUKI. (zkb, )
September 8, 2009 Set/Reset Hearings: Hearing on Motion to Compel (Docket Nos. 30 & 35) set for Thursday, 10/8/2009 @ 09:30 AM in Courtroom 4-2nd Floor, E. Barrett Prettyman Building before Magistrate Judge Deborah A. Robinson. (EW)
September 4, 2009 Filing 35 MOTION to Compel Discovery by A. HUDA FAROUKI (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(Stratton, Grayson)
September 2, 2009 Filing 34 REPLY to opposition to motion re #30 MOTION to Compel Discovery filed by PETRA INTERNATIONAL BANKING CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Fornaciari, John)
September 1, 2009 MOTIONS #30 MOTION to Compel Discovery REFERRED to Judge Magistrate Judge Deborah Robinson. (jeb, )
September 1, 2009 Filing 33 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Deborah A. Robinson for #30 MOTION to Compel Discovery by PETRA INTERNATIONAL BANKING CORPORATION. (kb)
August 31, 2009 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #31 Consent Motion for an Order Referring Motions to Compel Discovery to a Magistrate. It is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. Motions to Compel Discovery between plaintiff and defendant PIBC, including PIBC's Motion to Compel #30 , are hereby referred to a Magistrate Judge. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 8/31/09. (lcrjl3)
August 27, 2009 Filing 32 Memorandum in opposition to re #30 MOTION to Compel Discovery filed by A. HUDA FAROUKI. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Declaration of A. Huda Farouki, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Stratton, Grayson)
August 25, 2009 Filing 31 Consent MOTION for Order Referring Motions to Compel Discovery to Magistrate by PETRA INTERNATIONAL BANKING CORPORATION (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Disch, Robert)
August 11, 2009 Filing 30 MOTION to Compel Discovery by PETRA INTERNATIONAL BANKING CORPORATION (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits A through D, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Fornaciari, John)
April 30, 2009 Filing 29 REPLY to opposition to motion re #24 MOTION for Protective Order filed by PETRA BANK, RANDOLPH B. OLD. (Fornaciari, John)
April 30, 2009 Filing 28 REPLY to opposition to motion re #23 MOTION to Stay Defendants' Obligation to Provide Discovery Until Thirty Days After the Court's Ruling on Defendants' Motion for Protective Order filed by PETRA BANK, RANDOLPH B. OLD. (Fornaciari, John)
April 23, 2009 Filing 27 Memorandum in opposition to re #23 MOTION to Stay Defendants' Obligation to Provide Discovery Until Thirty Days After the Court's Ruling on Defendants' Motion for Protective Order filed by A. HUDA FAROUKI. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Stratton, Grayson)
April 23, 2009 Filing 26 Memorandum in opposition to re #24 MOTION for Protective Order filed by A. HUDA FAROUKI. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Stratton, Grayson)
April 10, 2009 Filing 25 REPLY to opposition to motion re #15 MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint, filed by A. HUDA FAROUKI. (Stratton, Grayson)
April 7, 2009 Set/Reset Hearings: Scheduling Conference set for 5/4/2009 02:30 PM in Courtroom 18 before Judge Richard J. Leon. (lcrjl3, )
April 7, 2009 Filing 24 MOTION for Protective Order by PETRA BANK, RANDOLPH B. OLD (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Text of Proposed Order)(Fornaciari, John)
April 7, 2009 Filing 23 MOTION to Stay Defendants' Obligation to Provide Discovery Until Thirty Days After the Court's Ruling on Defendants' Motion for Protective Order by PETRA BANK, RANDOLPH B. OLD (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Fornaciari, John)
April 6, 2009 Filing 22 REPLY to opposition to motion re #13 MOTION to Dismiss Counterclaim filed by A. HUDA FAROUKI. (Stratton, Grayson)
April 1, 2009 Filing 21 MEET AND CONFER STATEMENT. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A. Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit B. Text of Proposed Order)(Stratton, Grayson)
March 31, 2009 Filing 20 Memorandum in opposition to re #15 MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint, filed by PETRA INTERNATIONAL BANKING CORPORATION, PETRA BANK, RANDOLPH B. OLD. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Text of Proposed Order)(Fornaciari, John)
March 27, 2009 Filing 19 Memorandum in opposition to re #13 MOTION to Dismiss Counterclaim filed by PETRA INTERNATIONAL BANKING CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Fornaciari, John)
March 23, 2009 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #16 MOTION to Stay Briefing Schedule on Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Complaint. It is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED, and the briefing on the motion to dismiss the complaint is STAYED, pending the Court's ruling on plaintiff's motion for leave to file an amended complaint. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 3/23/2009. (lcrjl3)
March 20, 2009 Filing 18 REPLY to opposition to motion re #16 MOTION to Stay Briefing Schedule on Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Complaint filed by PETRA INTERNATIONAL BANKING CORPORATION, PETRA BANK, RANDOLPH B. OLD. (Fornaciari, John)
March 20, 2009 Filing 17 Memorandum in opposition to re #16 MOTION to Stay Briefing Schedule on Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Complaint filed by A. HUDA FAROUKI. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Stratton, Grayson)
March 18, 2009 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. It is hereby ORDERED that plaintiff has through and including 3/20/2009 to file an opposition, if any, to #16 MOTION to Stay. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 3/18/2009. (lcrjl3)
March 18, 2009 Filing 16 MOTION to Stay Briefing Schedule on Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Complaint by PETRA INTERNATIONAL BANKING CORPORATION, PETRA BANK, RANDOLPH B. OLD (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Fornaciari, John)
March 17, 2009 Filing 15 MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint, by A. HUDA FAROUKI (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Stratton, Grayson)
March 16, 2009 Filing 14 NOTICE of Intent to File Motion to Amend Complaint by A. HUDA FAROUKI (Stratton, Grayson)
March 13, 2009 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss Counterclaim by A. HUDA FAROUKI (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Text of Proposed Order)(Stratton, Grayson)
March 13, 2009 Filing 12 Memorandum in opposition to re #9 MOTION to Dismiss Counts III, IV, V, VI, and VII and Randolph Old and Petra Bank's Motion to Dismiss the Complaint in its Entirety filed by A. HUDA FAROUKI. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Amended Complaint, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Stratton, Grayson)
March 13, 2009 Filing 11 NOTICE of Filing Amended Complaint by A. HUDA FAROUKI (Stratton, Grayson)
March 4, 2009 Set/Reset Deadlines: plaintiff's response Responses due by 3/13/2009. (kc)
March 3, 2009 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #10 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Plaintiff's Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss and Plaintiff's Response to Defendant's Counterclaim. It is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED, and plaintiff has through and including 3/13/2009 to file a response. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 3/3/2009. (lcrjl3)
March 2, 2009 Filing 10 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Plaintiff's Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss and Plaintiff's Response to Defendant's Counterclaim by A. HUDA FAROUKI (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Stratton, Grayson)
February 17, 2009 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss Counts III, IV, V, VI, and VII and Randolph Old and Petra Bank's Motion to Dismiss the Complaint in its Entirety by PETRA INTERNATIONAL BANKING CORPORATION, PETRA BANK, RANDOLPH B. OLD (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Fornaciari, John)
February 17, 2009 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, COUNTERCLAIM against A. HUDA FAROUKI by PETRA INTERNATIONAL BANKING CORPORATION, PETRA BANK, RANDOLPH B. OLD. Related document: #1 Complaint, filed by A. HUDA FAROUKI.(Fornaciari, John)
February 9, 2009 Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendants Response to the complaint due by 2/19/2009. (kc)
February 9, 2009 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #7 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint. It is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED, and defendants have through and including 2/19/09 to respond to the complaint. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 2/9/2009. (lcrjl3)
February 4, 2009 Filing 7 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint by PETRA INTERNATIONAL BANKING CORPORATION, PETRA BANK, RANDOLPH B. OLD (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Fornaciari, John)
January 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 1/15/2009. (lcrjl3)
January 9, 2009 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Grayson D. Stratton on behalf of A. HUDA FAROUKI (Stratton, Grayson)
January 8, 2009 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE by A. HUDA FAROUKI. RANDOLPH B. OLD waiver sent on 12/9/2008, answer due 2/9/2009. (Stratton, Grayson)
January 8, 2009 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE by A. HUDA FAROUKI. PETRA BANK waiver sent on 12/9/2008, answer due 2/9/2009. (Stratton, Grayson)
January 8, 2009 Filing 2 WAIVER OF SERVICE by A. HUDA FAROUKI. PETRA INTERNATIONAL BANKING CORPORATION waiver sent on 12/9/2008, answer due 2/9/2009. (Stratton, Grayson)
December 9, 2008 Summons (3) Issued as to PETRA INTERNATIONAL BANKING CORPORATION, PETRA BANK, RANDOLPH B. OLD. (jf, )
December 9, 2008 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against PETRA INTERNATIONAL BANKING CORPORATION, PETRA BANK, RANDOLPH B. OLD ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 4616016901) filed by A. HUDA FAROUKI.(jf, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/11/2008: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jf, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: FAROUKI v. PETRA INTERNATIONAL BANKING CORPORATION et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PETRA BANK
Represented By: Jeremy M. Keim
Represented By: John Robert Fornaciari
Represented By: Robert Matthew Disch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RANDOLPH B. OLD
Represented By: Jeremy M. Keim
Represented By: John Robert Fornaciari
Represented By: Robert Matthew Disch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PETRA INTERNATIONAL BANKING CORPORATION
Represented By: Jeremy M. Keim
Represented By: John Robert Fornaciari
Represented By: Robert Matthew Disch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A. HUDA FAROUKI
Represented By: Robert J. Mathias
Represented By: Grayson D. Stratton
Represented By: David Clarke, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?