STEWART v. GATES et al
Plaintiff: LISA STEWART
Defendant: ROBERT M. GATES, PATRICK KEOUGH and WILLIAM DESAUTELS
Case Number: 1:2009cv01738
Filed: September 14, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Office: Washington, DC Office
County: 88888
Presiding Judge: Richard W. Roberts
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 30, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 49 MEMORANDUM OPINION regarding 44 motion for reconsideration. Signed by Judge Beryl A. Howell on 11/30/2011. (lcbah2)
October 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 42 MEMORANDUM OPINION regarding 26 motion for entry of final judgment pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 54(b). Signed by Judge Beryl A. Howell on 10/27/2011. (lcbah2)
May 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MEMORANDUM OPINION regarding 5 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss in Part or, in the Alternative, for Summary Judgment in Part and 10 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File First Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Beryl A. Howell on 5/16/2011. (lcbah2)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: STEWART v. GATES et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LISA STEWART
Represented By: Mark S. Zaid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROBERT M. GATES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PATRICK KEOUGH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WILLIAM DESAUTELS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?