ELECTRONIC PRIVACY INFORMATION CENTER v. THE UNITED STATES DEPTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY Featured Case
Plaintiff: ELECTRONIC PRIVACY INFORMATION CENTER
Defendant: UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
Case Number: 1:2009cv02084
Filed: November 5, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Office: Washington, DC Office
County: 11001
Presiding Judge: Ricardo M. Urbina
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 552 Freedom of Information Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 12, 2011. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MEMORANDUM OPINION granting 18 the defendant's motion for summary judgment and denying the plaintiff's motion for summary judgment 20 . SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Ricardo M. Urbina on 1/12/11.(lcrmu1)
January 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting 18 the defendant's motion for summary judgment and denying the plaintiff's motion for summary judgment 20 . SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Ricardo M. Urbina on 1/12/11.(lcrmu1)
January 12, 2011 Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff's motion for attorney's fees due by 1/21/2011. Opposition due by 1/28/2011. Reply to opposition due by 2/4/2011. (tg, )
January 12, 2011 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. It is hereby ORDERED that the plaintiff's motion for attorney's fees, if any, shall be due by January 21, 2011; any opposition shall be due on January 28, 2011; and replies shall be due by February 4, 2011. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Ricardo M. Urbina on 1/12/11.(lcrmu1)
August 10, 2010 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. Good cause having been shown, it is hereby ORDERED that the defendant's 9 motion for extension of time to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint is GRANTED. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Ricardo M. Urbina on 08/10/2010. (lcrmu1)
July 26, 2010 Filing 23 REPLY to opposition to motion re 20 MOTION for Summary Judgment MOTION for Hearing filed by ELECTRONIC PRIVACY INFORMATION CENTER. (Verdi, John)
July 12, 2010 Filing 22 Memorandum in opposition to re 20 MOTION for Summary Judgment MOTION for Hearing filed by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Grauman, Jesse)
July 12, 2010 Filing 21 REPLY to opposition to motion re 18 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Grauman, Jesse)
June 28, 2010 Filing 20 MOTION for Summary Judgment, MOTION for Hearing by ELECTRONIC PRIVACY INFORMATION CENTER. (See Docket Entry 19 to view document. Counsel is reminded to file the motion as a separate docket entry in future). (znmw, )
June 28, 2010 Filing 19 Memorandum in opposition to re (18 in 1:09-cv-02084-RMU) MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by ELECTRONIC PRIVACY INFORMATION CENTER, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Statement of Facts, # 3 Statement of Facts)Associated Cases: 1:09-cv-02084-RMU, 1:10-cv-00063-RMU(Verdi, John)
May 27, 2010 Filing 18 MOTION for Summary Judgment by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Declaration of Kevin J. Janet and Exhibits, # 2 Declaration Declaration of Mark Roberts, # 3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Grauman, Jesse)
March 17, 2010 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting 16 the parties' joint motion to consolidate. It is hereby ORDERED that EPIC v. Dep't of Homeland Security, Civil Action No. 10-0063 (CKK) is consolidated with Civil Action No. 09-2084 (RMU); and it is FURTHER ORDERED that all submissions shall be filed in Civil Action No. 09-2084 (RMU); and it is ORDERED that this court's February 24, 2010 scheduling order in EPIC v. Dep't of Homeland Security, Civil Action No. 09-2084 (RMU), shall govern both consolidated actions. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Ricardo M. Urbina on 03/17/2010. (lcrmu1)
March 11, 2010 Filing 17 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by ELECTRONIC PRIVACY INFORMATION CENTER, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY. Case related to Case No. 1:10cv63. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Grauman, Jesse)
March 11, 2010 Filing 16 Joint MOTION to Consolidate Cases by ELECTRONIC PRIVACY INFORMATION CENTER, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Grauman, Jesse)
February 25, 2010 Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant's Production of Documents due on or before 3/2/2010, 3/15/2010 and 4/15/2010. Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment due on or before 5/27/2010. Plaintiff's Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment and Cross-Motion due by 6/28/2010. Defendant's Reply to Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment and Opposition to the Cross-Motion due on or before 7/12/2010. Plaintiff's Reply in Support of the Plaintiff's Cross-Motion due on or before 7/26/2010. (tg,)
February 24, 2010 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. Pursuant to the parties' joint status report and proposed schedule, the following schedule shall govern these proceedings: the defendant's production of documents shall be completed on or before March 2, 2010, March 15, 2010 and April 15, 2010; the defendant's motion for summary judgment shall be filed on or before May 27, 2010; the plaintiff's opposition to the defendant's motion for summary judgment and cross-motion for summary judgment shall be filed on or before June 28, 2010; the defendant's reply in support of the defendant's motion for summary judgment and opposition to the plaintiff's cross-motion for summary judgment shall be filed on or before July 12, 2010; and the plaintiff's reply in support of the plaintiff's cross-motion for summary judgment shall be filed on or before July 26, 2010. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Ricardo M. Urbina on 02/24/2010. (lcrmu1)
February 16, 2010 Filing 15 STATUS REPORT and Proposed Schedule by ELECTRONIC PRIVACY INFORMATION CENTER, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY. (Grauman, Jesse)
February 3, 2010 Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Joint Status Report due on or before 2/16/2010. (tg, )
February 2, 2010 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. The parties shall file a joint status report on or before 02/16/2010 setting forth a proposed schedule to govern these proceedings. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Ricardo M. Urbina on 02/02/2010. (lcrmu1)
January 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 14 STANDING ORDER Signed by Judge Ricardo M. Urbina on 1/21/2010. Read the Standing Order carefully, it will govern this case. Failure to follow the Standing Order will result in sanctions.(tg, )
January 15, 2010 Filing 13 RESPONSE re 4 Affidavit for Default filed by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY. (See Docket Entry 11 to view document). (znmw, )
January 15, 2010 Filing 12 ANSWER to 1 Complaint by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY.(Grauman, Jesse)
January 15, 2010 Filing 11 REPLY to opposition to motion re 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint and Notice in Opposition to Entry of Default filed by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY. (Grauman, Jesse)
January 14, 2010 Filing 10 Memorandum in opposition to re 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint and Notice in Opposition to Entry of Default filed by ELECTRONIC PRIVACY INFORMATION CENTER. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit 2)(Verdi, John)
January 12, 2010 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint and Notice in Opposition to Entry of Default by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Grauman, Jesse)
January 12, 2010 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Jesse Z. Grauman on behalf of UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY (Grauman, Jesse)
January 12, 2010 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by ELECTRONIC PRIVACY INFORMATION CENTER. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Verdi, John)
January 12, 2010 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by ELECTRONIC PRIVACY INFORMATION CENTER. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Verdi, John)
January 12, 2010 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by ELECTRONIC PRIVACY INFORMATION CENTER. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY served on 11/12/2009, answer due 12/12/2009. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Verdi, John)
January 11, 2010 NOTICE OF ERROR re 4 Affidavit for Default; emailed to verdi@epic.org, cc'd 2 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Proof of service is required before default can be entered; please file proof of service. (znmw, )
January 8, 2010 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT FOR DEFAULT by ELECTRONIC PRIVACY INFORMATION CENTER. (Verdi, John)
January 6, 2010 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Marc Rotenberg on behalf of ELECTRONIC PRIVACY INFORMATION CENTER (Rotenberg, Marc)
November 5, 2009 Filing 2 LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by ELECTRONIC PRIVACY INFORMATION CENTER (dr)
November 5, 2009 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against THE UNITED STATES DEPTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 4616025213) filed by ELECTRONIC PRIVACY INFORMATION CENTER. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(dr)
November 5, 2009 SUMMONS (3) Issued as to THE UNITED STATES DEPTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (dr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ELECTRONIC PRIVACY INFORMATION CENTER v. THE UNITED STATES DEPTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ELECTRONIC PRIVACY INFORMATION CENTER
Represented By: John Arthur Verdi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?