DICKERSON et al v. DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA et al
Plaintiff: KENNETH DICKERSON, WILMA GAINS, JANETTE JOHNS-GIBSON, MARY Q. GRANT and CHARLES HARDEN, JR.
Defendant: DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, ADRIAN FENTY and MICHELLE RHEE
Case Number: 1:2009cv02213
Filed: November 20, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Office: Washington, DC Office
County: 11001
Presiding Judge: Richard W. Roberts
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question: Fair Labor Standards
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 135 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying 128 plaintiff's motion to compel 30(b)(6) deposition witness to disclose DCPS documents upon which she relied and to produce a suitable 30(b)(6) witness on the LSRT report and recommendations. The parties shall file a joint status report on or before May 21, 2021 proposing next steps. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on May 7, 2021. (lcan)
December 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 113 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 99 the District's motion to compel, where it seeks a supplemental response to Interrogatory No. 22; and denying Mr. Dickerson's request for attorneys' fees in his opposition to the defendant's supplemental motion to compel discovery 110 . Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on December 19, 2019. (MA)
November 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 107 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and holding in abeyance in part 99 defendant's motion to compel discovery; defendant shall file a brief on or before November 11, 2019 re plaintiff's compensatory damages calculation; and plaintiff's response thereto shall be filed on or before November 18, 2019. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on November 6, 2019. (MA)
July 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 84 OPINION denying defendant District of Columbia's motion 75 to dismiss plaintiff Kenneth Dickerson's fourth amended complaint. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 7/26/18. (lcplf2)
December 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 66 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER scheduling a status conference at 9:30 a.m. on January 22, 2018. Each remaining plaintiff who would like to remain a party to this case, or their representative, should appear at the scheduled status conference or notify the Court of their unavailability. The Court cautions that it may dismiss the claims of any party who fails to do so. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 12/8/17. (lcplf2) (Entered: 12/8/17) (lcplf2, )
September 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 46 OPINION granting in part and denying in part 25 the defendants' motion to dismiss the plaintiffs' Third Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on September 30, 2014. (lcplf2)
November 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 41 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER that the District shall file a supplemental memorandum addressing viability of plaintiffs' state law claims on or before December 2, 2013; alternatively, the District may file a notice stating that it rests on the ar guments made in its Motion to Dismiss the Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint [#5]; plaintiffs shall file a supplemental memorandum addressing these issues on or before January 13, 2014; and the oral argument scheduled for November 21, 2013 is vacated. The Court will reschedule oral argument after supplemental briefing on these issues has been completed. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on November 7, 2013. (MA)
August 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MEMORANDUM ORDER granting the plaintiffs' motion 4 for leave to file an amended complaint, denying the defendants' motion 5 to dismiss, and granting the plaintiffs' motion 13 for an extension of the deadline to move for class certification. Signed by Judge Richard W. Roberts on 08/24/2011. (DCL)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DICKERSON et al v. DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KENNETH DICKERSON
Represented By: John F. Mercer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WILMA GAINS
Represented By: John F. Mercer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JANETTE JOHNS-GIBSON
Represented By: John F. Mercer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARY Q. GRANT
Represented By: John F. Mercer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHARLES HARDEN, JR.
Represented By: John F. Mercer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA
Represented By: Leah Brownlee Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ADRIAN FENTY
Represented By: Leah Brownlee Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHELLE RHEE
Represented By: Leah Brownlee Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?