VAZQUEZ v. GROUPON, INC. et al Featured Case
Plaintiff: CARLOS VAZQUEZ
Defendant: GROUPON, INC., DOES and YMCA OF METROPOLITAN WASHINGTON
Case Number: 1:2011cv00495
Filed: March 8, 2011
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Office: Washington, DC Office
County: 11001
Presiding Judge: Emmet G. Sullivan
Nature of Suit: Commercial/ICC Rates/etc.
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 6, 2011. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 8, 2011 Receipt on 6/8/11 of Electronic Transfer; Other Court Number 3:11-cv-01253 sent by USDC for the Southern District of California. (ztnr, )
June 8, 2011 Filing 14 NOTICE of Extraction of case transferred to USDC for the Southern District of California. (ztnr, )
June 8, 2011 Case transferred out to the USDC for the Southern District of California, pursuant to Court Order entered 5/25/11. Sent to Court by extraction. (ztnr, )
June 3, 2011 Filing 13 EMAIL dated 6/3/11 from the U.S. District Court for the Southern District of California requesting the transfer of the original file to be sent using the extract civil case feature of CM/ECF. (ztnr, )
June 3, 2011 Filing 12 CERTIFIED COPY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER dated 5/25/11 from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation directing the transfer to the U.S. District Court for the Southern District of California with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Judge Dana M. Sabraw for coordinated pretrial proceedings pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407(MDL 2238.) (ztnr, )
May 16, 2011 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting 11 Groupon, Inc.'s Consent Motion for Extension of Time. Groupon, Inc. shall answer or otherwise respond to the amended complaint by no later than (i) 45 days after the filing of a Consolidated Amended Complaint or whatever other deadline is set by the transferee court, in the event the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation ("JPML") grants the Multidistrict Litigation Motion ("MDL Motion"), or (ii) 45 days after service of the JPML's decision on the MDL Motion in the event that the JPML denies the MDL Motion. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on May 16, 2011. (lcegs1)
May 11, 2011 Filing 11 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 10 Amended Complaint by GROUPON, INC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Moghadam, Sara)
April 28, 2011 Summons (1) Issued as to YMCA OF METROPOLITAN WASHINGTON. (jf, )
April 27, 2011 Filing 10 AMENDED COMPLAINT against DOES, GROUPON, INC., YMCA OF METROPOLITAN WASHINGTON filed by CARLOS VAZQUEZ.(znmw, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/28/2011: # 1 Certificate of Service) (znmw, ).
April 11, 2011 Filing 9 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. YMCA OF THE USA served on 3/17/2011, answer due 4/7/2011 (LaDuca, Charles)
April 11, 2011 Filing 8 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION by CARLOS VAZQUEZ re 7 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Interim Class Counsel (LaDuca, Charles)
April 7, 2011 Filing 7 WITHDRAWN, SEE DOCKET ENTRY 8 .....MOTION to Appoint Counsel Interim Class Counsel by CARLOS VAZQUEZ (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Declaration, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit, # 8 Exhibit, # 9 Exhibit, # 10 Exhibit)(LaDuca, Charles) Modified on 4/12/2011 (jf, ).
April 6, 2011 Filing 6 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. GROUPON, INC. served on 3/16/2011, answer due 4/6/2011 (LaDuca, Charles)
April 6, 2011 NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: Document No. re 5 Summons Returned Executed was entered in error and counsel was instructed to refile said pleading as to the correct party served. (jf, )
April 6, 2011 Filing 5 ENTERED IN ERROR.....RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. CARLOS VAZQUEZ served on 3/16/2011, answer due 4/6/2011 (LaDuca, Charles) Modified on 4/6/2011 (jf, ).
March 29, 2011 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting 4 the consent motion for extension of time of Defendants Groupon, Inc. and YMCA of the USA (collectively, "defendants"). Defendants shall answer or otherwise respond to the complaint by no later than May 6, 2011. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on March 29, 2011. (lcegs1)
March 29, 2011 Filing 4 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint by GROUPON, INC., YMCA OF THE USA (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Moghadam, Sara)
March 29, 2011 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Sara Z. Moghadam on behalf of GROUPON, INC., YMCA OF THE USA (Moghadam, Sara)
March 18, 2011 Filing 2 NOTICE of filing pleadings with the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation by ANTHONY FERREIRA and SARAH GOSLING. (Attachments: # 1 Motion to Transfer, # 2 Brief in Support of Motion to Transfer, # 3 Schedule of Actions, # 4 Jensen Declaration, # 5 Exhibit 1 to Declaration, # 6 Exhibit 2 to Declaration, # 7 Exhibit 3 to Declaration, # 8 Exhibit 4 to Declaration, # 9 Exhibit 5 to Declaration, # 10 Exhibit 6 to Declaration, # 11 Exhibit 7 to Declaration, # 12 Exhibit 8 to Declaration, # 13 Exhibit 9 to Declaration, # 14 Certificate of Service, # 15 Corrected Certificate of Service)(tnr, )
March 8, 2011 Summons (3) Issued as to DOES, GROUPON, INC., YMCA OF THE USA. (jf, )
March 8, 2011 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against DOES, GROUPON, INC., YMCA OF THE USA ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 4616037012) filed by CARLOS VAZQUEZ. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(jf, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: VAZQUEZ v. GROUPON, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CARLOS VAZQUEZ
Represented By: Charles J. LaDuca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GROUPON, INC.
Represented By: Sara Z. Moghadam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: YMCA OF METROPOLITAN WASHINGTON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?