ANDREWS v. MV TRANSPORTATION INC.

Plaintiff: RONNIE ANDREWS
Defendant: WASHINGTON METROPOLITAN AREA TRANSIT AUTHORITY and MV TRANSPORTATION INC.
Case Number: 1:2011cv01089
Filed: June 14, 2011
Court: District Of Columbia District Court
Office: Washington, DC Office
County: 88888
Presiding Judge: Ellen S. Huvelle
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 1, 2015 63 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION re 52 defendant's Amended Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on September 1, 2015. (lcesh2)
April 30, 2013 57 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION granting in part and denying in part 51 plaintiffs' Motion to Remand or in the Alternative to Stay Proceedings. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on April 30, 2013. (lcesh2)
October 18, 2011 22 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION regarding defendant WMATA's Motion to Dismiss 7 . Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on October 18, 2010. (lcesh2)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ANDREWS v. MV TRANSPORTATION INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RONNIE ANDREWS
Represented By: Alfred Long Scanlan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WASHINGTON METROPOLITAN AREA TRANSIT AUTHORITY
Represented By: Tamara B. Goorevitz
Represented By: David J. Shaffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MV TRANSPORTATION INC.
Represented By: Tamara B. Goorevitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?