KUCINICH et al v. OBAMA et al Featured Case

Ten members of Congress sued President Barack Obama and Secretary of Defense Robert Gates, alleging that the United States illegally went to war against Libya without first obtaining congressional authorization as required under the U.S. Constitution.

Plaintiff: DENNIS KUCINICH, WALTER B. JONES, JOHN CONYERS, JR., ROSCOE BARTLETT, MICHAEL E. CAPUANO, DAN BURTON, HOWARD COBLE, JOHN J. DUNCAN, JR., TIMOTHY V. JOHNSON and RON PAUL
Defendant: BARACK OBAMA and ROBERT GATES
Case Number: 1:2011cv01096
Filed: June 15, 2011
Court: District Of Columbia District Court
Office: Washington, DC Office
County: 11001
Presiding Judge: Reggie B. Walton
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 21, 2012. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
October 20, 2011 14 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND OPINION. This Memorandum Opinion accompanies the Court's Order of this same date. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on 10/20/2011. (lcrbw2)
October 20, 2011 13 Featured Case ORDER granting 8 Motion to Dismiss. For the reasons explained in the Court's Memorandum Opinion of this same date, it is hereby ORDERED that the defendants' motion to dismiss is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that this case is CLOSED. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on 10/20/2011. (lcrbw2)
September 19, 2011 12 REPLY to opposition to motion re 8 MOTION to Dismiss filed by ROBERT GATES, BARACK OBAMA. (Womack, Eric)
September 12, 2011 NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: re 10 Memorandum in Opposition, was entered in error because it is an incorrect duplicate to Docket Entry 11 (dr)
September 9, 2011 11 Memorandum in opposition to re 8 MOTION to Dismiss filed by ROSCOE BARTLETT, DAN BURTON, MICHAEL E. CAPUANO, HOWARD COBLE, JOHN CONYERS, JR, JOHN J. DUNCAN, JR, TIMOTHY V. JOHNSON, WALTER B. JONES, DENNIS KUCINICH, RON PAUL. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Turley, Jonathan)
September 9, 2011 10 ENTERED IN ERROR.....Memorandum in opposition to re 8 MOTION to Dismiss filed by ROSCOE BARTLETT, DAN BURTON, MICHAEL E. CAPUANO, HOWARD COBLE, JOHN CONYERS, JR, JOHN J. DUNCAN, JR, TIMOTHY V. JOHNSON, WALTER B. JONES, DENNIS KUCINICH, RON PAUL. (Turley, Jonathan) Modified on 9/12/2011 (dr).
August 31, 2011 Set/Reset Deadlines: Response to motion to dismiss due by 9/9/2011 (mpt, )
August 30, 2011 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER granting 9 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. In light of the parties' consent, the motion is GRANTED. Accordingly, it is hereby ORDERED that the plaintiffs shall respond to the defendants' motion to dismiss on or before September 9, 2011. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on 8/30/2011. (lcrbw2)
August 29, 2011 9 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 8 MOTION to Dismiss by ROSCOE BARTLETT, DAN BURTON, MICHAEL E. CAPUANO, HOWARD COBLE, JOHN CONYERS, JR, JOHN J. DUNCAN, JR, TIMOTHY V. JOHNSON, WALTER B. JONES, DENNIS KUCINICH, RON PAUL (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Turley, Jonathan)
August 19, 2011 8 MOTION to Dismiss by ROBERT GATES, BARACK OBAMA (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Womack, Eric)
August 12, 2011 7 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by All Defendants. Case related to Case No. 11-1409. (Womack, Eric)
August 12, 2011 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric R. Womack on behalf of All Defendants (Womack, Eric)
July 1, 2011 5 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. ROBERT GATES served on 6/24/2011 (Turley, Jonathan)
July 1, 2011 4 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. BARACK OBAMA served on 6/20/2011 (Turley, Jonathan)
July 1, 2011 3 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 6/21/2011. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 8/20/2011. (Turley, Jonathan)
July 1, 2011 2 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 6/21/2011. (Turley, Jonathan)
June 15, 2011 1 COMPLAINT against ROBERT GATES, BARACK OBAMA ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 4616039707) filed by DAN BURTON, WALTER B. JONES, ROSCOE BARTLETT, MICHAEL E. CAPUANO, TIMOTHY V. JOHNSON, JOHN J. DUNCAN, JR, DENNIS KUCINICH, RON PAUL, HOWARD COBLE, JOHN CONYERS, JR. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(td, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: KUCINICH et al v. OBAMA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DENNIS KUCINICH
Represented By: Jonathan Turley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WALTER B. JONES
Represented By: Jonathan Turley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN CONYERS, JR.
Represented By: Jonathan Turley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROSCOE BARTLETT
Represented By: Jonathan Turley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHAEL E. CAPUANO
Represented By: Jonathan Turley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAN BURTON
Represented By: Jonathan Turley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HOWARD COBLE
Represented By: Jonathan Turley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN J. DUNCAN, JR.
Represented By: Jonathan Turley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TIMOTHY V. JOHNSON
Represented By: Jonathan Turley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RON PAUL
Represented By: Jonathan Turley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BARACK OBAMA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROBERT GATES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?