STATE OF TEXAS v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA et al
Plaintiff: STATE OF TEXAS
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA and ERIC H. HOLDER, JR.
Intervenor_defendant: WENDY DAVIS, MARC VEASEY, JOHN JENKINS, VICKI BARGAS and ROMEO MUNOZ
Movant: MEXICAN AMERICAN LEGISLATIVE CAUCUS, TEXAS HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES, GREG GONZALES, LISA AGUILAR, DANIEL LUCIO, VICTOR GARZA, BLANCA GARCIA, JOSEPHINE MARTINEZ, KATRINA TORRES and NINA JO BAKER
Case Number: 1:2011cv01303
Filed: July 19, 2011
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Office: Washington, DC Office
County: 88888
Presiding Judge: Rosemary M. Collyer
Referring Judge: Thomas B. Griffith
2 Judge: Beryl A. Howell
Nature of Suit: Voting
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 287 MEMORANDUM AND OPINION. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 3/30/2017. (lcrmc3) (Main Document 287 replaced on 3/30/2017) (zcdw).
June 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 265 MEMORANDUM AND OPINION. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on June 18, 2014. (lcrmc3)
August 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 230 THREE JUDGE COURT OPINION. Signed by Circuit Judge Griffith and District Judges Collyer and Howell on 8/28/2012. (KD)
January 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 128 MEMORANDUM AND OPINION on privilege claims. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 1/2/2012. (KD)
December 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 115 MEMORANDUM OPINION by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer in which Circuit Judge Thomas B. Griffith and District Judge Beryl A. Howell join. The accompanying 106 Order denying Plaintiff's 41 Motion for Summary Judgment was issued on November 8, 2011. (lcrmc1)
November 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER denying 41 Plaintiff State of Texas's Motion for Summary Judgment. See attached Order for further details. Signed by Judge Thomas B. Griffith, Judge Rosemary M. Collyer, and Judge Beryl A. Howell on 11/8/2011. (lcrmc1)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: STATE OF TEXAS v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STATE OF TEXAS
Represented By: David John Schenck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Daniel Joshua Freeman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ERIC H. HOLDER, JR.
Represented By: Daniel Joshua Freeman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_defendant: WENDY DAVIS
Represented By: Joseph Gerald Hebert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_defendant: MARC VEASEY
Represented By: Joseph Gerald Hebert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_defendant: JOHN JENKINS
Represented By: Joseph Gerald Hebert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_defendant: VICKI BARGAS
Represented By: Joseph Gerald Hebert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_defendant: ROMEO MUNOZ
Represented By: Joseph Gerald Hebert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: MEXICAN AMERICAN LEGISLATIVE CAUCUS, TEXAS HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES
Represented By: Mark A. Posner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: GREG GONZALES
Represented By: John M. Devaney
Represented By: Marc Erik Elias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: LISA AGUILAR
Represented By: John M. Devaney
Represented By: Marc Erik Elias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: DANIEL LUCIO
Represented By: John M. Devaney
Represented By: Marc Erik Elias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: VICTOR GARZA
Represented By: John M. Devaney
Represented By: Marc Erik Elias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: BLANCA GARCIA
Represented By: John M. Devaney
Represented By: Marc Erik Elias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: JOSEPHINE MARTINEZ
Represented By: John M. Devaney
Represented By: Marc Erik Elias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: KATRINA TORRES
Represented By: John M. Devaney
Represented By: Marc Erik Elias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: NINA JO BAKER
Represented By: John M. Devaney
Represented By: Marc Erik Elias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?