YOUSSEF v. FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION et al
Plaintiff: BASSEM YOUSSEF
Defendant: FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, ERIC HOLDER and ROBERT MUELLER
Case Number: 1:2011cv01362
Filed: July 25, 2011
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Office: Washington, DC Office
County: 11001
Presiding Judge: Colleen Kollar-Kotelly
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 180 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part Defendant's 170 Motion to Revise Court's April 29, 2016 Ruling. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 5/12/2016. (lcckk1)
May 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 178 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER regarding Plaintiff's 164 Notice in Response to the Court's April 29, 2016 Order Regarding Question #25 in the Draft Voir Dire and Defendant's 168 Response thereto; Plaintiff's 165 Supplemental M emorandum to Object to Mr. Heimbach's Rule 701 Testimony and Defendant's 167 Response thereto. For the reasons described herein, it is hereby ORDERED that: (1) Question #25 in the Draft Voir Dire shall be revised to read as follows: " ;Do you have opinions as to whether federal government employees should or should not publicly criticize the United States government in the press?" and (2) The Court shall not, on the present record, preclude Defendant from introducing Rule 701 testimony by Mr. Heimbach as to the effect that a denial of the Assistant Section Chief position would have on the reputation of an FBI agent serving as a Unit Chief. However, at trial, Defendant will have to make a showing that Mr. Heimbach has a sufficient basis to testify on this issue before his testimony on the issue will be admitted under Rule 701. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 5/11/2016. (lcckk1)
January 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 118 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 1/14/2016.(lcckk1)
November 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 106 MEMORANDUM AND OPINION. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 11/13/2015.(lcckk1)
August 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 62 MEMORANDUM AND OPINION. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 8/1/2014.(lcckk3)
January 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 53 MEMORANDUM AND OPINION. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 1/28/2014.(lcckk3)
August 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 28 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. For the reasons set forth herein, the Attorney General's 21 Motion for Summary Judgment is DENIED. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on August 7, 2012. (lcckk3)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: YOUSSEF v. FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BASSEM YOUSSEF
Represented By: Stephen M. Kohn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ERIC HOLDER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROBERT MUELLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?