HARDY et al v. SHUREN et al Featured Case

Defendant: DONALD J. ST. PIERRE, MICHAEL O'HARA, JANINE MORRIS, MARY PASTEL, GREGORY CAMPBELL, ALBERTO GUTIERREZ, KIMBERLY A. HOLDEN, RUTH MCKEE, WILLIAM MAISEL, NELSON CABRERA, JAMES E. SIMPSON, JOHN AND JANE DOE, MARGARET A. HAMBURG, KATHLEEN G. SEBELIUS, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA and JEFFREY E. SHUREN
Plaintiff: PAUL T. HARDY, EWA M. CZERSKA, ROBERT C. SMITH, JULIAN J. NICHOLAS and R. LAKSHMI VISHNUVAJJALA
 
Case Number: 1:2011cv01739
Filed: September 28, 2011
 
Court: District Of Columbia District Court
Office: Washington, DC Office
County: 88888
Presiding Judge: Robert L. Wilkins
 
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1391
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case
Date Filed#Document Text
February 11, 2013 39 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas David Zimpleman on behalf of All Defendants (Zimpleman, Thomas)
January 31, 2013 38 REPLY to opposition to motion re 31 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by REGINA M. BENJAMIN, MARGARET A. HAMBURG, KATHLEEN G. SEBELIUS, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, UNITED STATES FOOD & DRUG ADMINISTRATION, UNITED STATES PUBLIC HEALTH SERVICE COMMISSIONED CORPS. (Simpson, W.)
January 2, 2013 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER denying without prejudice 11 Motion for Leave to File. Currently before the Court is the Motion for Leave of the Natural Resources Defense Council to Participate as Amicus Curiae in Support of Plaintiffs. The Natural Resources Defense Council seeks to file a brief addressing the merits of the certain issues raised in the plaintiffs' complaint. In light of the fact that the defendants have filed a motion seeking dismissal of this action on jurisdictional grounds under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(1) 31 , the Natural Resources Defense Council's motion is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. In the event that the Court denies the defendants' 12(b)(1) motion and this matter proceeds on the merits, the Natural Resources Defense Council may file a new motion seeking leave to participate in this matter as amicus curiae. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on 1/2/2013. (lcrbw2)
January 2, 2013 Set/Reset Deadline: The defendants shall file their reply in support of their motion to dismiss 31 on or before 1/31/2013. (ad)
December 28, 2012 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER granting 35 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. For good cause shown, and in light of the parties' consent, the plaintiffs' motion is GRANTED nunc pro tunc to December 19, 2012. The plaintiffs' opposition 36 to the defendants' motion to dismiss 31 is deemed timely filed. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on 12/28/2012. (lcrbw2)
December 28, 2012 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER granting in part and denying in part 37 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. For good cause shown, and in light of the parties' consent, the defendants' motion is granted in part and denied in part. The defendants shall file their reply in support of their motion to dismiss 31 on or before January 31, 2013. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on 12/28/2012. (lcrbw2)
December 21, 2012 37 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 31 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by REGINA M. BENJAMIN, MARGARET A. HAMBURG, KATHLEEN G. SEBELIUS, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, UNITED STATES FOOD & DRUG ADMINISTRATION, UNITED STATES PUBLIC HEALTH SERVICE COMMISSIONED CORPS (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Simpson, W.)
December 19, 2012 36 Memorandum in opposition to re 31 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by EWA M. CZERSKA, PAUL T. HARDY, JULIAN J. NICHOLAS, ROBERT C. SMITH, R. LAKSHMI VISHNUVAJJALA, NANCY G. WERSTO. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibits 1-11, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Kohn, Stephen)
December 13, 2012 35 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 31 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Corrected Motion) by EWA M. CZERSKA, PAUL T. HARDY, JULIAN J. NICHOLAS, ROBERT C. SMITH, R. LAKSHMI VISHNUVAJJALA, NANCY G. WERSTO (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Colapinto, David)
December 13, 2012 34 ERRATA by EWA M. CZERSKA, PAUL T. HARDY, JULIAN J. NICHOLAS, ROBERT C. SMITH, R. LAKSHMI VISHNUVAJJALA, NANCY G. WERSTO 33 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 31 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by EWA M. CZERSKA, R. LAKSHMI VISHNUVAJJALA, PAUL T. HARDY, NANCY G. WERSTO, ROBERT C. SMITH, JULIAN J. NICHOLAS. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Corrected Proposed Order)(Colapinto, David)
December 13, 2012 NOTICE OF ERROR re 33 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply; emailed to dc@KKC.com, cc'd 9 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. FYI: The Judge's initals for this case are RBW. (td, )
December 12, 2012 33 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 31 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by EWA M. CZERSKA, PAUL T. HARDY, JULIAN J. NICHOLAS, ROBERT C. SMITH, R. LAKSHMI VISHNUVAJJALA, NANCY G. WERSTO (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Colapinto, David)
October 16, 2012 Set/Reset Deadlines: Opposition due by 12/14/2012 (mpt)
October 16, 2012 Featured Case ORDER granting 32 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. For good cause shown, and in light of the parties' consent, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. The plaintiffs shall file their opposition to the defendants' motion to dismiss on or before December 14, 2012. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on 10/16/2012. (lcrbw2)
October 12, 2012 32 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 31 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by EWA M. CZERSKA, PAUL T. HARDY, JULIAN J. NICHOLAS, ROBERT C. SMITH, R. LAKSHMI VISHNUVAJJALA, NANCY G. WERSTO (Kohn, Stephen)
October 1, 2012 31 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by REGINA M. BENJAMIN, MARGARET A. HAMBURG, KATHLEEN G. SEBELIUS, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, UNITED STATES FOOD & DRUG ADMINISTRATION, UNITED STATES PUBLIC HEALTH SERVICE COMMISSIONED CORPS (Attachments: # 1 CCPM 49.9.1, # 2 CCPM 26.1.5, # 3 NWC Staff, # 4 Halt Whistleblower Surveillance, # 5 OSC Letter to Grassley and Issa, # 6 OSC News Release, # 7 CCPM 23.4.1, # 8 Text of Proposed Order)(Simpson, W.)
August 30, 2012 Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer or otherwise respond due by 10/1/2012, (mpt)
August 22, 2012 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER granting 30 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. In light of the parties' consent, the motion is GRANTED. Accordingly, it is hereby ORDERED that the defendants shall answer or otherwise respond on or before October 1, 2012. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on 8/22/2012. (lcrbw2)
August 22, 2012 30 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond by REGINA M. BENJAMIN, MARGARET A. HAMBURG, KATHLEEN G. SEBELIUS, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, UNITED STATES FOOD & DRUG ADMINISTRATION, UNITED STATES PUBLIC HEALTH SERVICE COMMISSIONED CORPS (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Simpson, W.)
August 1, 2012 Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer or respond to second amended complaint by 8/31/2012, (mpt)
July 31, 2012 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER granting 29 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. In light of the parties' consent, the motion is GRANTED. Accordingly, it is hereby ORDERED that the defendants shall answer or otherwise respond to the plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint on or before August 31, 2012. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on 7/31/2012. (lcrbw2)
July 27, 2012 29 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 28 Amended Complaint, or Otherwise Respond by REGINA M. BENJAMIN, MARGARET A. HAMBURG, KATHLEEN G. SEBELIUS, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, UNITED STATES FOOD & DRUG ADMINISTRATION, UNITED STATES PUBLIC HEALTH SERVICE COMMISSIONED CORPS (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Simpson, W.)
July 17, 2012 28 AMENDED COMPLAINT against REGINA M. BENJAMIN, MARGARET A. HAMBURG, KATHLEEN G. SEBELIUS, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, UNITED STATES FOOD & DRUG ADMINISTRATION, UNITED STATES PUBLIC HEALTH SERVICE COMMISSIONED CORPS filed by EWA M. CZERSKA, PAUL T. HARDY, ROBERT C. SMITH, NANCY G. WERSTO, JULIAN J. NICHOLAS, R. LAKSHMI VISHNUVAJJALA.(td, )
July 17, 2012 27 RESPONSE TO ORDER OF THE COURT re 26 Order on Motion to Strike,, filed by EWA M. CZERSKA, PAUL T. HARDY, JULIAN J. NICHOLAS, ROBERT C. SMITH, R. LAKSHMI VISHNUVAJJALA, NANCY G. WERSTO. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Second Amended Complaint)(Kohn, Stephen)
June 18, 2012 26 Featured Case ORDER granting in part and denying in part 10 Motion to Strike. For the reasons explained in the attached Order, it is hereby ORDERED that the plaintiffs shall file a Second Amended Complaint within 30 days of this Order. It is further ORDERED that the Second Amended Complaint shall explain clearly how each defendant is implicated in each of the plaintiffs' twelve causes of action. It is further ORDERED that the failure to comply with this Order may subject the plaintiffs to Rule 41 dismissal with prejudice. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on 6/18/2012. (lcrbw2)
June 13, 2012 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER. In light of the pending motion to strike, the status hearing currently scheduled for June 18, 2012, is hereby CANCELED. A hearing will be scheduled by Clerk of Court upon issuance of the Court's forthcoming ruling on the motion to strike. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on 6/13/2012. (lcrbw2)
May 2, 2012 Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference trset for 6/18/2012 09:30 AM in Courtroom 16 before Judge Reggie B. Walton. (mpt)
April 27, 2012 25 REPLY to opposition to motion re 10 MOTION to Strike 2 Amended Complaint,, MOTION to Strike 2 Amended Complaint,, MOTION to Strike 2 Amended Complaint,, filed by REGINA M. BENJAMIN, GREGORY CAMPBELL, ALBERTO GUTIERREZ, MARGARET A. HAMBURG, KIMBERLY A. HOLDEN, WILLIAM MAISEL, RUTH MCKEE, MARY PASTEL, KATHLEEN G. SEBELIUS, JEFFREY E. SHUREN, DONALD J. ST. PIERRE, GREGORY A. STEVENS, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, UNITED STATES FOOD & DRUG ADMINISTRATION, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, UNITED STATES PUBLIC HEALTH SERVICE COMMISSIONED CORPS. (Simpson, W.)
April 17, 2012 24 Case reassigned to Judge Reggie B. Walton. Judge Robert L. Wilkins no longer assigned to the case. (ds)
April 16, 2012 23 Featured Case ORDER: This matter is before the Court on the Order to Show Cause issued by this Court by Minute Order on March 30, 2012, directing Plaintiffs to show cause 1) Why this case is not related to 11-cv-1328 RBW pursuant to this Court's Local Rules, and 2) If this case is so related, why this Court should not impose sanctions upon Plaintiffs for failure to comply with the Local Rules requiring Plaintiffs to file a Notice of Related Case. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that this case, Civil Action No. 1:11-cv-01739-RLW, is hereby transferred to the Calendar and Case Management Committee for reassignment to Judge Walton, the judge who was randomly assigned the earlier case, Civil Action No. 1:11-cv-01328-RBW. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Order to Show Cause is hereby discharged. (SEE ORDER FOR FULL DETAILS). Signed by Judge Robert L. Wilkins on 4/16/2012. (tcb)
April 13, 2012 Set/Reset Deadlines: Response to Defendants Motion to Strike due by 4/13/2012; Reply to Plaintiffs Opposition due by 4/27/2012. (gdf)
April 12, 2012 22 Featured Case ORDER granting 19 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 10 MOTION to Strike 2 Amended Complaint,, MOTION to Strike 2 Amended Complaint,, MOTION to Strike 2 Amended Complaint; and it is ORDERED that Plaintiffs Opposition to Defendants Motion to Strike First Amended Complaint be filed on or before April 13, 2012; and it is FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants Reply to Plaintiffs Opposition to DefendantsMotion to Strike be filed on or before April 27, 2012. Signed by Judge Robert L. Wilkins on 4/12/2012. (tcb)
April 12, 2012 21 Memorandum in opposition to re 10 MOTION to Strike 2 Amended Complaint,, MOTION to Strike 2 Amended Complaint,, MOTION to Strike 2 Amended Complaint,, filed by EWA M. CZERSKA, PAUL T. HARDY, JULIAN J. NICHOLAS, ROBERT C. SMITH, R. LAKSHMI VISHNUVAJJALA, NANCY G. WERSTO. (Kohn, Stephen)
April 11, 2012 20 NOTICE of Appearance by David K. Colapinto on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Colapinto, David)
April 11, 2012 19 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 10 MOTION to Strike 2 Amended Complaint,, MOTION to Strike 2 Amended Complaint,, MOTION to Strike 2 Amended Complaint,, by EWA M. CZERSKA, PAUL T. HARDY, JULIAN J. NICHOLAS, ROBERT C. SMITH, R. LAKSHMI VISHNUVAJJALA, NANCY G. WERSTO (Kohn, Stephen)
April 10, 2012 18 REPLY re 16 Notice of Related Case,, filed by REGINA M. BENJAMIN, GREGORY CAMPBELL, ALBERTO GUTIERREZ, MARGARET A. HAMBURG, KIMBERLY A. HOLDEN, WILLIAM MAISEL, RUTH MCKEE, MARY PASTEL, KATHLEEN G. SEBELIUS, JEFFREY E. SHUREN, DONALD J. ST. PIERRE, GREGORY A. STEVENS, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, UNITED STATES FOOD & DRUG ADMINISTRATION, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, UNITED STATES PUBLIC HEALTH SERVICE COMMISSIONED CORPS. (Simpson, W.)
April 4, 2012 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER: By close of business on Tuesday April 10, 2012, Defendants shall file a reply to 17 Plaintiffs' Response to Defendants' Notice of Related Case. Signed by Judge Robert L. Wilkins on 4/4/12. (lcrlw1)
April 3, 2012 17 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by EWA M. CZERSKA, PAUL T. HARDY, JULIAN J. NICHOLAS, ROBERT C. SMITH, R. LAKSHMI VISHNUVAJJALA, NANCY G. WERSTO re Order to Show Cause,. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Stephen Kohn)(Kohn, Stephen)
March 30, 2012 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER: Plaintiffs are hereby ordered to show cause by 5:00 PM on April 3, 2012: 1) Why this case is not related to 11-cv-1328 RBW pursuant to this Court's Local Rules, and 2) If this case is so related, why this Court should not impose sanctions for Plaintiffs failure to comply with the Local Rules requiring Plaintiff to file a Notice of Related Case. Signed by Judge Robert L. Wilkins on 3/30/2012. (tcb)
March 29, 2012 16 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by REGINA M. BENJAMIN, GREGORY CAMPBELL, ALBERTO GUTIERREZ, MARGARET A. HAMBURG, KIMBERLY A. HOLDEN, WILLIAM MAISEL, RUTH MCKEE, MARY PASTEL, KATHLEEN G. SEBELIUS, JEFFREY E. SHUREN, DONALD J. ST. PIERRE, GREGORY A. STEVENS, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, UNITED STATES FOOD & DRUG ADMINISTRATION, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, UNITED STATES PUBLIC HEALTH SERVICE COMMISSIONED CORPS. Case related to Case No. 1:11-cv-01328-RBW. (Attachments: # 1 Complaint, Case No. 1:11-cv-01328-RBW, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet, Case No. 1:11-cv-01739-RLW, # 3 Dismissal Notice, Case No. 1:11-cv-01328-RBW)(Simpson, W.)
March 29, 2012 15 Featured Case ORDER granting 14 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 10 MOTION to Strike 2 Amended Complaint,, MOTION to Strike 2 Amended Complaint,, MOTION to Strike 2 Amended Complaint;and it is ORDERED that Plaintiffs Opposition to Defendants Motion to Strike First Amended Complaint be filed on or before April 12, 2012; and it isFURTHER ORDERED that Defendants Reply to Plaintiffs Opposition to DefendantsMotion to Strike be filed on or before April 26, 2012. Signed by Judge Robert L. Wilkins on 3/29/2012. (tcb)
March 28, 2012 14 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 10 MOTION to Strike 2 Amended Complaint,, MOTION to Strike 2 Amended Complaint,, MOTION to Strike 2 Amended Complaint,, by EWA M. CZERSKA, PAUL T. HARDY, JULIAN J. NICHOLAS, ROBERT C. SMITH, R. LAKSHMI VISHNUVAJJALA, NANCY G. WERSTO (Kohn, Stephen)
March 27, 2012 13 REPLY to opposition to motion re 11 MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Brief filed by NATURAL RESOURCES DEFENSE COUNCIL. (Colangelo, Aaron)
March 21, 2012 NOTICE of Hearing:A Motion Hearing is set for 5/7/2012 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 17 before Judge Robert L. Wilkins. (tcb)
March 20, 2012 12 RESPONSE re 11 MOTION for Leave to File filed by REGINA M. BENJAMIN, GREGORY CAMPBELL, ALBERTO GUTIERREZ, MARGARET A. HAMBURG, KIMBERLY A. HOLDEN, WILLIAM MAISEL, RUTH MCKEE, MARY PASTEL, KATHLEEN G. SEBELIUS, JEFFREY E. SHUREN, DONALD J. ST. PIERRE, GREGORY A. STEVENS, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, UNITED STATES FOOD & DRUG ADMINISTRATION, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, UNITED STATES PUBLIC HEALTH SERVICE COMMISSIONED CORPS. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Nolan, Andrew)
March 19, 2012 11 MOTION for Leave to Appear as Amicus Curiae by NATURAL RESOURCES DEFENSE COUNCIL (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement)(znmw, )
March 19, 2012 10 MOTION to Strike 2 Amended Complaint,, by REGINA M. BENJAMIN, GREGORY CAMPBELL, ALBERTO GUTIERREZ, MARGARET A. HAMBURG, KIMBERLY A. HOLDEN, WILLIAM MAISEL, RUTH MCKEE, MARY PASTEL, KATHLEEN G. SEBELIUS, JEFFREY E. SHUREN, DONALD J. ST. PIERRE, GREGORY A. STEVENS, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, UNITED STATES FOOD & DRUG ADMINISTRATION, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, UNITED STATES PUBLIC HEALTH SERVICE COMMISSIONED CORPS (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Simpson, W.)
February 15, 2012 9 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. GREGORY CAMPBELL served on 1/27/2012; KIMBERLY A. HOLDEN served on 1/27/2012; DONALD J. ST. PIERRE served on 1/27/2012 (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service Certificates of Service with return receipts and web confirmation)(Kohn, Stephen)
February 6, 2012 8 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 1/30/2012., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. WILLIAM MAISEL served on 1/27/2012; GREGORY A. STEVENS served on 1/27/2012 (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service Certificates with return receipts and web confirmation)(Kohn, Stephen)
February 6, 2012 7 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. MARY PASTEL served on 1/27/2012; JEFFREY E. SHUREN served on 1/27/2012; UNITED STATES FOOD & DRUG ADMINISTRATION served on 1/27/2012 (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service Certificates with return receipts and web confirmation)(Kohn, Stephen)
February 6, 2012 6 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. ALBERTO GUTIERREZ served on 1/27/2012; MARGARET A. HAMBURG served on 1/27/2012; RUTH MCKEE served on 1/27/2012 (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service Certificates with return receipts and web confirmation)(Kohn, Stephen)
February 6, 2012 5 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. REGINA M. BENJAMIN served on 1/30/2012; KATHLEEN G. SEBELIUS served on 1/30/2012; UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES served on 1/30/2012 (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service Certificates with return receipts and web confirmation)(Kohn, Stephen)
January 31, 2012 4 AFFIDAVIT of Mailing Summons and Complaint to UNITED STATES PUBLIC HEALTH SERVICE COMMISSIONED CORPS., mailed on 1/27/2012 (Kohn, Stephen) Modified on 2/1/2012 to correct event and enhance text(rdj).
January 31, 2012 3 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 1/26/2012. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 3/26/2012. (Kohn, Stephen)
January 26, 2012 Summons (4) Issued as to REGINA M. BENJAMIN, GREGORY A. STEVENS, UNITED STATES FOOD & DRUG ADMINISTRATION, UNITED STATES PUBLIC HEALTH SERVICE COMMISSIONED CORPS. (ls, )
January 25, 2012 2 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against GREGORY CAMPBELL, JOHN AND JANE DOE, ALBERTO GUTIERREZ, MARGARET A. HAMBURG, KIMBERLY A. HOLDEN, WILLIAM MAISEL, RUTH MCKEE, MARY PASTEL, KATHLEEN G. SEBELIUS, JEFFREY E. SHUREN, DONALD J. ST. PIERRE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, GREGORY A. STEVENS, REGINA M. BENJAMIN, UNITED STATES FOOD & DRUG ADMINISTRATION, UNITED STATES PUBLIC HEALTH SERVICE COMMISSIONED CORPS filed by EWA M. CZERSKA, PAUL T. HARDY, ROBERT C. SMITH, JULIAN J. NICHOLAS, R. LAKSHMI VISHNUVAJJALA, NANCY G. WERSTO.(znmw, )
September 28, 2011 SUMMONS (17) Issued as to NELSON CABRERA, GREGORY CAMPBELL, JOHN AND JANE DOE, ALBERTO GUTIERREZ, MARGARET A. HAMBURG, KIMBERLY A. HOLDEN, WILLIAM MAISEL, RUTH MCKEE, JANINE MORRIS, MICHAEL O'HARA, MARY PASTEL, KATHLEEN SEBELIUS, JEFFREY E. SHUREN, JAMES E. SIMPSON, DONALD J. ST. PIERRE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (rdj)
September 28, 2011 1 COMPLAINT against NELSON CABRERA, GREGORY CAMPBELL, JOHN AND JANE DOE, ALBERTO GUTIERREZ, MARGARET A. HAMBURG, KIMBERLY A. HOLDEN, WILLIAM MAISEL, RUTH MCKEE, JANINE MORRIS, MICHAEL O'HARA, MARY PASTEL, KATHLEEN SEBELIUS, JEFFREY E. SHUREN, JAMES E. SIMPSON, DONALD J. ST. PIERRE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 4616042512) filed by EWA M. CZERSKA, PAUL T. HARDY, ROBERT C. SMITH, JULIAN J. NICHOLAS, R. LAKSHMI VISHNUVAJJALA. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(rdj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: HARDY et al v. SHUREN et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DONALD J. ST. PIERRE
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHAEL O'HARA
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JANINE MORRIS
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARY PASTEL
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GREGORY CAMPBELL
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALBERTO GUTIERREZ
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KIMBERLY A. HOLDEN
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RUTH MCKEE
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WILLIAM MAISEL
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NELSON CABRERA
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JAMES E. SIMPSON
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN AND JANE DOE
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARGARET A. HAMBURG
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KATHLEEN G. SEBELIUS
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JEFFREY E. SHUREN
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PAUL T. HARDY
Represented By: Stephen M. Kohn
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EWA M. CZERSKA
Represented By: Stephen M. Kohn
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROBERT C. SMITH
Represented By: Stephen M. Kohn
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JULIAN J. NICHOLAS
Represented By: Stephen M. Kohn
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: R. LAKSHMI VISHNUVAJJALA
Represented By: Stephen M. Kohn
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]