FANNING et al v. MIDWEST UNDERGROUND, INC.
Plaintiff: BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF THE INTERNATIONAL UNION OF OPERATING ENGINEERS AND PIPE LINE CONTRACTORS ASSOCIATION NATIONAL PIPE LINE TRAINING FUND, MICHAEL R. FANNING and BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF THE INTERNATIONAL UNION OF OPERATING ENGINEERS AND PIPE LINE EMPLOYERS HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND
Defendant: MIDWEST UNDERGROUND, INC.
Case Number: 1:2012cv00189
Filed: February 6, 2012
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Office: Washington, DC Office
County: 11001
Presiding Judge: Rosemary M Collyer
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1145
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 14, 2012. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 14, 2012 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER approving #11 stipulation of dismissal with prejudice. This case is closed. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 11/14/2012. (lcrmc3)
November 13, 2012 Filing 11 STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice and to Close Case by BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF THE INTERNATIONAL UNION OF OPERATING ENGINEERS AND PIPE LINE CONTRACTORS ASSOCIATION NATIONAL PIPE LINE TRAINING FUND, BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF THE INTERNATIONAL UNION OF OPERATING ENGINEERS AND PIPE LINE EMPLOYERS HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND, MICHAEL R. FANNING. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service)(Hopp, R.)
May 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCHEDULING ORDER. Discovery shall be completed no later than September 28, 2012. Dispositive motions shall be filed no later than October 31, 2012; oppositions shall be filed no later November 30, 2012; and replies shall be filed no later than December 14, 2012. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 5/8/2012. (lcrmc1)
May 8, 2012 Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Motions to join or amend due by 5/31/2012. Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1) Disclosures due by 5/11/2012. Plaintiff's Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(2) Reports due by 7/1/2012. Defendant's Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(2) Reports due by 8/1/2012. Discovery closes 9/28/2012. Dispositive Motions due by 10/31/2012. Responses to Dispositive Motions due by 11/30/2012. Replies to Dispositive Motions due by 12/14/2012. (cdw)
May 8, 2012 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Rosemary M. Collyer: Initial Scheduling Conference held on 5/8/2012. A Scheduling Order will be issued by the Court. (Court Reporter: Crystal Pilgrim) (cdw)
May 2, 2012 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by John R. Harney on behalf of BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF THE INTERNATIONAL UNION OF OPERATING ENGINEERS AND PIPE LINE CONTRACTORS ASSOCIATION NATIONAL PIPE LINE TRAINING FUND, BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF THE INTERNATIONAL UNION OF OPERATING ENGINEERS AND PIPE LINE EMPLOYERS HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND, MICHAEL R. FANNING (Harney, John)
April 19, 2012 Filing 8 MEET AND CONFER STATEMENT. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Hopp, R.)
April 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER setting initial scheduling conference for May 8, 2012 at 10:00 a.m. See attached Order for further details. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 4/5/2012. (lcrmc1)
April 5, 2012 Set/Reset Hearings: Initial Scheduling Conference set for 5/8/2012, at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8 before Judge Rosemary M. Collyer. (tth)
March 30, 2012 Filing 6 LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by MIDWEST UNDERGROUND, INC. (Scully, Elizabeth)
March 30, 2012 Filing 5 Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint by MIDWEST UNDERGROUND, INC..(Scully, Elizabeth)
March 12, 2012 Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 3/30/2012. (tth)
March 12, 2012 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint no later than March 30, 2012. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 3/12/12. (lcrmc1)
March 8, 2012 Filing 4 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Move, Plead, Answer or Otherwise Respond to The Complaint by MIDWEST UNDERGROUND, INC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Scully, Elizabeth)
February 29, 2012 Filing 3 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. MIDWEST UNDERGROUND, INC. served on 2/20/2012, answer due 3/12/2012 (Hopp, R.)
February 7, 2012 Filing 2 Electronic Summons (1) Issued as to MIDWEST UNDERGROUND, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Notice to proceed before Magistrate, #2 Consent form)(mmh)
February 6, 2012 Case Assigned to Judge Rosemary M. Collyer. (mmh)
February 6, 2012 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against MIDWEST UNDERGROUND, INC. ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0090-2819283) filed by MICHAEL R. FANNING, BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF THE INTERNATIONAL UNION OF OPERATING ENGINEERS AND PIPE LINE EMPLOYERS HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND, BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF THE INTERNATIONAL UNION OF OPERATING ENGINEERS AND PIPE LINE CONTRACTORS ASSOCIATION NATIONAL PIPE LINE TRAINING FUND. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Hopp, R.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: FANNING et al v. MIDWEST UNDERGROUND, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MIDWEST UNDERGROUND, INC.
Represented By: Elizabeth Anne Scully
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF THE INTERNATIONAL UNION OF OPERATING ENGINEERS AND PIPE LINE CONTRACTORS ASSOCIATION NATIONAL PIPE LINE TRAINING FUND
Represented By: R. Richard Hopp
Represented By: John R. Harney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHAEL R. FANNING
Represented By: R. Richard Hopp
Represented By: John R. Harney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF THE INTERNATIONAL UNION OF OPERATING ENGINEERS AND PIPE LINE EMPLOYERS HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND
Represented By: R. Richard Hopp
Represented By: John R. Harney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?