LOUMIET v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA et al
Plaintiff: CARLOS LOUMIET
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, MICHAEL RARDIN, LEE STRAUS, GERARD SEXTON and RONALD SCHNECK
Case Number: 1:2012cv01130
Filed: July 9, 2012
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Office: Washington, DC Office
County: 88888
Presiding Judge: Colleen Kollar-Kotelly
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1346 Tort Claim
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 94 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on June 5, 2018. (lcckk1)
November 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 82 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on November 28, 2017. (lcckk1)
June 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 71 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 6/13/2017. (lcckk1)
December 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 70 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting Defendants' 67 Motion to Stay Discovery. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 12/22/2016. (lcckk1)
May 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 54 MEMORANDUM AND OPINION. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 5/28/2015.(lcckk3)
August 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 45 MEMORANDUM AND OPINION. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 8/21/2014. (lcckk3)
September 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MEMORANDUM AND OPINION. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on September 12, 2013. (lcckk1)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LOUMIET v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHAEL RARDIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LEE STRAUS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GERARD SEXTON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RONALD SCHNECK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CARLOS LOUMIET
Represented By: Jorge Alejandro Mestre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?