SKY ANGEL U.S., LLC v. NATIONAL CABLE SATELLITE CORPORATION

Defendant: NATIONAL CABLE SATELLITE CORPORATION
Plaintiff: SKY ANGEL U. S. LLC
Case Number: 1:2012cv01834
Filed: November 13, 2012
Court: District Of Columbia District Court
Office: Washington, DC Office
County: 11001
Presiding Judge: Rudolph Contreras
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:15 Antitrust Litigation
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 3, 2013 10 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION granting 5 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 6/3/13. (lcrc3)
July 24, 2013 17 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION denying 11 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Conduct Discovery. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 7/24/2013. (lcrc3)
March 28, 2014 26 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION denying 19 Motion for Discovery; granting 20 Motion to Dismiss: See document for details. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 3/28/2014. (lcrc3)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SKY ANGEL U.S., LLC v. NATIONAL CABLE SATELLITE CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NATIONAL CABLE SATELLITE CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SKY ANGEL U. S. LLC
Represented By: Jonathan Laurence Rubin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.