PINSON v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Plaintiff: JEREMY PINSON
Defendant: U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Case Number: 1:2012cv01872
Filed: November 15, 2012
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Office: Washington, DC Office
County: 88888
Presiding Judge: Rudolph Contreras
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petition: Civil Rights (Other)
Cause of Action: 05:552 Freedom of Information Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 470 MEMORANDUM OPINION denying 437 motion to vacate; granting 435 , 455 motions for summary judgment; denying 464 motion for sanctions and preliminary injunction. See document for details. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 8/30/19. (lcrc1)
May 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 429 MEMORANDUM OPINION denying 409 412 Defendants' Renewed Motions for Summary Judgment. See document for details. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 05/23/2018. (lcrc1)
August 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 396 MEMORANDUM OPINION granting in part and denying in part 332 Defendants' motion for summary judgment and denying 336 Plaintiff's motion to strike. See document for details. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 8/31/2017. (lcrc1)
August 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 393 MEMORANDUM OPINION denying 335 Plaintiff's motion to modify appointment of counsel, granting 338 Defendants' motion for leave to file under seal, denying 345 Plaintiff's motion to access the courts, denying 346 Plaintiff's motion to enjoin block to the courts, denying 347 Plaintiff's motion for legal actions, construing 369 as Plaintiff's motion for law library access and denying the motion, construing 371 as Plaintiff's motion for notice to the C ourt and denying the motion, denying 367 Plaintiff's motion regarding witness intimidation, denying 341 Plaintiff's motion for a protective order or temporary restraining order, denying 348 Plaintiff's motion for sanctions, and denying 375 Plaintiff's motion for leave to file supplemental complaint. See document for details. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 8/26/2017. (lcrc1)
March 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 366 MEMORANDUM OPINION denying 287 Defendants' motion to dismiss; granting in part and denying in part 287 Defendants' motion for summary judgment; denying 310 , construed as a motion to amend the complaint; denying as premature 317 Plaintiff's supplemental motion for discovery; and appointing pro bono counsel. See document for details. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 3/30/2017. (lcrc1)
March 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 364 MEMORANDUM OPINION granting in part and denying in part 300 Defendants' Second Motion for Summary Judgment. See document for details. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 3/29/2017. (lcrc2)
March 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 362 MEMORANDUM OPINION denying 316 Plaintiff's Motion to Vacate Order. See document for details. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 3/27/2017. (lcrc2)
March 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 360 MEMORANDUM OPINION granting 318 Defendants' Supplemental Motion for Summary Judgment. See document for details. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 3/22/2017. (lcrc1)
February 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 357 MEMORANDUM OPINION granting in part and denying in part 293 Defendants' third motion for summary judgment with respect to the Bureau of Prisons. See document for details. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 2/17/2017. (lcrc1)
August 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 309 MEMORANDUM OPINION granting in part 265 Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. See document for details. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 08/10/2016. (lcrc2)
July 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 306 MEMORANDUM OPINION granting in part and denying in part 239 Defendants' motion for partial summary judgment. See document for details. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 07/29/2016. (lcrc2)
June 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 291 MEMORANDUM OPINION granting in part and denying in part 254 Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. See document for details. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 06/01/2016. (lcrc2)
April 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 283 MEMORANDUM OPINION denying 249 Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction; denying as moot 257 Plaintiff's Motion for Order to Supplement. See document for details. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 04/08/2016. (lcrc2)
March 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 276 MEMORANDUM OPINION granting in part and denying in part 137 Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. See document for details. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 03/29/2016. (lcrc2)
February 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 268 MEMORANDUM OPINION granting in part and denying in part 131 Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. See document for details. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 02/16/2016. (lcrc2)
January 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 259 MEMORANDUM OPINION granting in part and denying in part 147 Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. See document for details. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 01/04/2016. (lcrc2)
November 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 246 MEMORANDUM OPINION granting in part and denying in part 170 Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. See document for details. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 11/10/2015. (lcrc2)
August 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 228 MEMORANDUM OPINION granting 187 Defendants' Renewed Motion for Summary Judgment. See document for details. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 08/17/2015. (lcrc2)
May 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 203 MEMORANDUM OPINION granting in part and denying in part 113 Plaintiff's Motion for Sanctions and Protective Order or Appointed Counsel; denying 125 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Production or Appoint Counsel; denying 136 Plaintiff' ;s Motion for Sanctions; denying 140 Plaintiff's Motion for Sanctions; denying 145 Plaintiff's Motion for Order to Show Cause; and denying 152 Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction. See document for details. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 05/15/2015. (lcrc2)
March 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 186 MEMORANDUM OPINION granting in part and denying in part 62 Defendant's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. See document for details. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 03/19/2015. (lcrc2)
February 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 169 MEMORANDUM OPINION granting in part and denying in part 55 Defendant's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. See document for details. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 02/23/2015. (lcrc2)
February 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 163 MEMORANDUM OPINION granting in part and denying in part 66 Defendant's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. See document for details. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 02/10/2015. (lcrc2)
November 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 142 MEMORANDUM OPINION granting 105 Defendants' request to sever 102 Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction; transferring 102 Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction to the U.S. District Court for the District of Colorado; and severing and transferring 32 Plaintiff's Privacy Act claim to the U.S. District Court for the District of Colorado. See document for details. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 11/21/2014. (lcrc2)
September 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 117 MEMORANDUM OPINION granting in part and denying in part 49 Defendant's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. See document for details. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 09/30/2014. (lcrc2)
September 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 112 MEMORANDUM OPINION granting in part and denying in part 48 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment. See document for details. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 09/24/2014. (lcrc2)
July 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 90 MEMORANDUM OPINION denying 30 Motion for Discovery; denying 30 Motion to Appoint Counsel; and denying 30 Motion for Leave to Supplement. See document for details. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 7/10/2014. (lcrc2)
September 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 26 MEMORANDUM OPINION denying 6 Motion for Joinder; granting 7 Motion to Dismiss; granting 8 Motion to Strike; granting 9 Motion to Strike; granting 10 Motion to Strike; granting 11 Motion for Leave to File; denying without prejudice [ 12] Motion for Preliminary Injunction; denying without prejudice 13 Motion for Hearing; denying without prejudice 13 Motion for Sanctions; denying without prejudice 15 Motion for Vaughn Index. See document for details. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 09/30/2013. (lcrc1)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PINSON v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JEREMY PINSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?