UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. SUM OF $70,990,605 et al
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Defendant: SUM OF $70,990,605, SUM OF $6,930,000 and ALL DEFENDANTS
Claimant: HIKMATULLAH SHADMAN, NAJIBULLAH, FAIZY ELHAM BROTHERS, LTD., ROHULLAH, EVEREST FAIZY LOGISTICS SERVICES, HIKMAT SHADMAN LOGISTICS SERVICES COMPANY, HEKMAT SHADMAN GENERAL TRADING, LLC and AFGHANISTAN INTERNATIONAL BANK
Case Number: 1:2012cv01905
Filed: November 26, 2012
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Office: Washington, DC Office
County: 11001
Presiding Judge: Richard W. Roberts
Nature of Suit: Other
Cause of Action: 18:981
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 322 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that NHB's motion to intervene, Dkt. 296 , is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that the Shadman claimants' motion for sanctions, Dkt. 305 , is DENIED. See document for details. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 9/25/2018. (lcrdm2, )
February 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 287 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: The motion of the United States to strike all of the Shadman Claimants' claims relating to assets held in U.S. interbank accounts on behalf of AIB and Bank Alfalah, 234 , is hereby GRANTED. The motion of the Unite d States to strike Najibullah as a straw owner, 182 , is hereby DENIED without prejudice, and the motion of the United States to strike the other claims of the Shadman brothers and their companies is hereby DENIED as moot. The Shadman Claimants' motion to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction, 274 , and for summary judgment, 138 , are hereby DENIED. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 2/13/2017. (lcrdm2, )
September 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 236 MEMORANDUM OPINION: See Opinion for details. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on September 14, 2015. (lcrdm3, )
March 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 174 MEMORANDUM AND OPINION re 29 , 107 , 117 , 127 , 146 , 166 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Alan Kay on 3/6/15. (lcak1)
February 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 171 ORDER denying 150 Motion to Stay without prejudice. The parties shall appear for a telephonic status conference on May 4, 2015 at 2:00 p.m. See attached order for details. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on February 20, 2015. (lcrdm3, )
February 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 167 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alan Kay on 2/13/15. (lcak1)
April 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 90 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying government's motion 56 to stay, denying AIB's motion 64 for leave to file a surreply, and denying Shadman claimants' motion 65 to file a surreply; ordering the United States to consult the claimants and submit a proposed protective order within 30 days. Signed by Chief Judge Richard W. Roberts on 4/17/14. (lcrwr2)
March 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 86 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying claimants' motion 28 to dismiss, denying United States' motion 72 to strike as moot, and denying claimants' motion 78 for leave to file a surreply as moot. Signed by Chief Judge Richard W. Roberts on 3/4/14. (lcrwr2)
November 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 61 MEMORANDUM ORDER AND OPINION denying claimants' motion 42 for preliminary injunctive relief. Signed by Chief Judge Richard W. Roberts on 11/25/2013. (lcrwr2)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. SUM OF $70,990,605 et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Elizabeth Ann Aloi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SUM OF $70,990,605
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SUM OF $6,930,000
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALL DEFENDANTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: HIKMATULLAH SHADMAN
Represented By: Bryant S. Banes
Represented By: James Wallace Porter, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: NAJIBULLAH
Represented By: Bryant S. Banes
Represented By: James Wallace Porter, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: FAIZY ELHAM BROTHERS, LTD.
Represented By: Bryant S. Banes
Represented By: James Wallace Porter, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: ROHULLAH
Represented By: Bryant S. Banes
Represented By: James Wallace Porter, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: EVEREST FAIZY LOGISTICS SERVICES
Represented By: Bryant S. Banes
Represented By: James Wallace Porter, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: HIKMAT SHADMAN LOGISTICS SERVICES COMPANY
Represented By: Bryant S. Banes
Represented By: James Wallace Porter, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: HEKMAT SHADMAN GENERAL TRADING, LLC
Represented By: Bryant S. Banes
Represented By: James Wallace Porter, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: AFGHANISTAN INTERNATIONAL BANK
Represented By: Andrew C. Bernasconi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?