2910 GEORGIA AVENUE LLC, v. DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA et al

Plaintiff: 2910 GEORGIA AVENUE LLC,
Defendant: DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, VINCENT C. GRAY and MICHAEL P. KELLY
Case Number: 1:2012cv01993
Filed: December 13, 2012
Court: District Of Columbia District Court
Office: Washington, DC Office
County: 88888
Presiding Judge: Colleen Kollar-Kotelly
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 29, 2015 57 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION and ORDER granting Plaintiff's 43 Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint; granting Plaintiff's 45 Motion to Reopen Discovery; denying without prejudice Defendants' 49 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying wi thout prejudice Plaintiff's 50 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting Plaintiff's 54 Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Memorandum Response. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the Court shall reopen discovery so that both parties may conduct limited discovery for the purposes set forth in this Memorandum Opinion and Order. The Court shall allow the parties 45 days from the date of this Memorandum Opinion and Order, until FEBRUARY 12, 2016, to complete this discovery. It is FURTHER ORDERE D that in order to ameliorate any prejudice faced by Defendants as a result of the granting of Plaintiff's motions, the Court shall require Plaintiff to pay for the costs of conducting the depositions to be taken in the new round of discovery. I t is FURTHER ORDERED that the Court shall permit the parties to file renewed motions for summary judgment after the parties have fully developed the factual record through the new round of discovery. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall file a Joint Status Report by FEBRUARY 19, 2016, proposing a schedule for filing and briefing the parties' renewed motions for summary judgment. The Court shall then issue an order setting a briefing schedule. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 12/29/2015. (lcckk1)
April 9, 2014 32 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND OPINION. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 4/9/2014. (lcckk3)
September 30, 2013 21 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 9/30/13. (lcckk2)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: 2910 GEORGIA AVENUE LLC, v. DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 2910 GEORGIA AVENUE LLC,
Represented By: James H. Hulme
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA
Represented By: Thomas Louis Koger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VINCENT C. GRAY
Represented By: Thomas Louis Koger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHAEL P. KELLY
Represented By: Thomas Louis Koger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?