FOX TELEVISION STATIONS, INC., et al v. AEREOKILLER LLC, et al Featured Case
Plaintiff: FOX TELEVISION STATIONS, INC., TWENTIETH CENTURY FOX FILM CORPORATION, FOX BROADCASTING COMPANY, INC., NBC SUBSIDIARY (WRC-TV), LLC, NBC STUDIOS LLC, UNIVERSAL NETWORK TELEVISION LLC, OPEN 4 BUSINESS PRODUCTIONS LLC, TELEMUNDO NETWORK GROUP LLC,, AMERICAN BROADCASTING COMPANIES, INC., DISNEY ENTERPRISES, INC., ALLBRITTON COMMUNICATIONS COMPANY, GANNETT CO., INC., CBS BROADCASTING, INC., and CBS STUDIOS
Defendant: AEREOKILLER LLC,, FILMON.TV NETWORKS, INC.,, FILMON.TV, INC. and FILMON.COM, INC,
Case Number: 1:2013cv00758
Filed: May 23, 2013
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Office: Washington, DC Office
County: 88888
Presiding Judge: Rosemary M. Collyer
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 2, 2015. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER regarding Defendants' Contempt and 55 Motion for Reconsideration. It is hereby ordered that Defendants shall be fined for any future violation of the Injunction; it is further ordered that the Court's 54 Order to Show Cause is discharged; and it is further ordered that Defendants' 55 Motion for Reconsideration is denied. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 11/26/2013. (lcrmc1)
November 25, 2013 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Rosemary M. Collyer: Oral Argument held on 11/25/2013. (Court Reporter: Crystal Pilgrim) (cdw)
November 5, 2013 Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Oral Argument set for 11/25/2013 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8 before Judge Rosemary M. Collyer. (cdw)
October 30, 2013 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting 59 Defendant FilmOn X's request for oral argument regarding the 54 ORDER to Show Cause Why Defendants Should Not Be Held in Contempt. The Deputy Clerk will schedule the oral argument date. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 10/30/2013. (lcrmc1)
October 25, 2013 Filing 60 RESPONSE re 57 Response to Order of the Court,, EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS TO THE DECLARATIONS OF JOHN C. ULIN AND JULIE A. SHEPARD IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS RESPONSE TO THE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE CONTEMPT filed by FILMON X, LLC, FILMON.COM, INC,, FILMON.TV NETWORKS, INC.,, FILMON.TV, INC.. (Baker, Ryan)
October 25, 2013 Filing 59 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by FILMON X, LLC, FILMON.COM, INC,, FILMON.TV NETWORKS, INC.,, FILMON.TV, INC. re 54 Order on Motion to Modify DEFENDANT FILMON XS REQUEST FOR ORAL ARGUMENT RE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY DEFENDANT SHOULD NOT BE HELD IN CONTEMPT OF THE SEPTEMBER 5, 2013 PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION. (Baker, Ryan)
October 25, 2013 Filing 58 DEFENDANT FILMON XS REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY DEFENDANT SHOULD NOT BE HELD IN CONTEMPT OF THE SEPTEMBER 5, 2013 PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION filed by FILMON X, LLC, FILMON.COM, INC, FILMON.TV NETWORKS, INC., FILMON.TV, INC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Ryan G. Baker)(Baker, Ryan) Modified on 10/25/2013 to correct event and linkage (rdj).
October 24, 2013 Filing 57 RESPONSE TO ORDER OF THE COURT re Order, to Show Casue Why Defendants Should Not be Held in Contempt of the September 5, 2013 Preliminary Injunction filed by ALLBRITTON COMMUNICATIONS COMPANY, AMERICAN BROADCASTING COMPANIES, INC., CBS BROADCASTING, INC.,, CBS STUDIOS, DISNEY ENTERPRISES, INC., FOX BROADCASTING COMPANY, INC., FOX TELEVISION STATIONS, INC., GANNETT CO., INC., NBC STUDIOS LLC, NBC SUBSIDIARY (WRC-TV), LLC, OPEN 4 BUSINESS PRODUCTIONS LLC, TELEMUNDO NETWORK GROUP LLC,, TWENTIETH CENTURY FOX FILM CORPORATION, UNIVERSAL NETWORK TELEVISION LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration John Ulin)(Garrett, Robert)
October 21, 2013 Filing 56 RESPONSE TO ORDER OF THE COURT re 54 Order on Motion to Modify DEFENDANT FILMON XS SUPPLEMENTAL RESPONSE TO COURTS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE REGARDING CONTEMPT filed by FILMON X, LLC, FILMON.COM, INC,, FILMON.TV NETWORKS, INC.,, FILMON.TV, INC.. (Baker, Ryan)
October 18, 2013 Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Response to 55 due by 10/24/2013. (cdw)
October 18, 2013 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER accepting 55 Defendants' Emergency Motion for Reconsideration as a response to the 54 ORDER requiring Defendants to show cause why they should not be held in contempt; Plaintiffs shall file any response to 55 no later than 10/24/13 at 5:00 p.m. Eastern Time. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 10/18/13. (lcrmc1)
October 17, 2013 Filing 55 Emergency MOTION for Reconsideration re 54 Order on Motion to Modify DEFENDANTS EMERGENCY MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION OF THE MOTION TO MODIFY THE PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION IN LIGHT OF THE HEARST DECISION by FILMON X, LLC, FILMON.COM, INC,, FILMON.TV NETWORKS, INC.,, FILMON.TV, INC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Ryan G. Baker, # 2 Declaration of Alkiviades David, # 3 Proposed Order, # 4 Certificate of Service)(Baker, Ryan)
October 15, 2013 Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Response to Show Cause Order due by 10/21/2013. (cdw)
October 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER denying 52 Defendants' Motion to Modify preliminary injunction and requiring Defendants to show cause by October 21, 2013 why they should not be held in contempt. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 10/15/2013. (KD)
October 15, 2013 Filing 53 Memorandum in opposition to re 52 Emergency MOTION to Modify THE SCOPE OF THE INJUNCTION filed by ALLBRITTON COMMUNICATIONS COMPANY, AMERICAN BROADCASTING COMPANIES, INC., CBS BROADCASTING, INC.,, CBS STUDIOS, DISNEY ENTERPRISES, INC., FOX BROADCASTING COMPANY, INC., FOX TELEVISION STATIONS, INC., GANNETT CO., INC., NBC STUDIOS LLC, NBC SUBSIDIARY (WRC-TV), LLC, OPEN 4 BUSINESS PRODUCTIONS LLC, TELEMUNDO NETWORK GROUP LLC,, TWENTIETH CENTURY FOX FILM CORPORATION, UNIVERSAL NETWORK TELEVISION LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Julie A. Shepard, # 2 Exhibit 1 of 3, # 3 Exhibit 2 of 3, # 4 Exhibit 3 of 3)(Smith, Paul)
October 11, 2013 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER directing Plaintiffs to respond to Defendants' 52 Emergency Motion to Modify the Scope of the Injunction no later than October 15, 2013, at 1:00 p.m. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on October 11, 2013. (lcrmc3)
October 10, 2013 Filing 52 Emergency MOTION to Modify THE SCOPE OF THE INJUNCTION by FILMON X, LLC, FILMON.COM, INC,, FILMON.TV NETWORKS, INC.,, FILMON.TV, INC. (Attachments: # 1 Request for Judicial Notice, # 2 Declaration of Ryan Baker, # 3 Exhibit to Baker Declaration)(Baker, Ryan)
September 30, 2013 Case Stayed. (cdw)
September 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER granting as unopposed 50 Motion to Stay. The case is stayed pending Defendants' appeals to the D.C. Circuit. The 34 Preliminary Injunction REMAINS IN EFFECT. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 9/30/2013. (lcrmc2)
September 27, 2013 Filing 50 Joint MOTION to Stay THE LITIGATION PENDING APPEAL by FILMON X, LLC, FILMON.COM, INC,, FILMON.TV NETWORKS, INC.,, FILMON.TV, INC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Baker, Ryan)
September 23, 2013 USCA Case Number 13-7146 for 47 Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit Court, filed by FILMON X, LLC, FILMON.COM, INC, FILMON.TV NETWORKS, INC., FILMON.TV, INC. (zrdj)
September 23, 2013 USCA Case Number 13-7145 for 46 Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit Court, filed by FILMON X, LLC, FILMON.COM, INC, FILMON.TV NETWORKS, INC., FILMON.TV, INC. (rdj)
September 17, 2013 Filing 49 Transmission of the Notice of Appeal, Order Appealed, and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals. The Court of Appeals fee was paid this date re 47 Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit Court,. (jf, )
September 17, 2013 Filing 48 Transmission of the Notice of Appeal, Order Appealed, and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals. The Court of Appeals fee was paid this date re 46 Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit Court,. (jf, )
September 16, 2013 Filing 47 NOTICE OF APPEAL TO DC CIRCUIT COURT as to 34 Preliminary Injunction, by FILMON X, LLC, FILMON.COM, INC,, FILMON.TV, INC., FILMON.TV NETWORKS, INC.,. Filing fee $ 455, receipt number 0090-3468890. Fee Status: Fee Paid. Parties have been notified. (Baker, Ryan)
September 16, 2013 Filing 46 NOTICE OF APPEAL TO DC CIRCUIT COURT as to 42 Order on Motion to Stay, Order on Motion for Reconsideration by FILMON X, LLC, FILMON.COM, INC,, FILMON.TV, INC., FILMON.TV NETWORKS, INC.,. Filing fee $ 455, receipt number 0090-3468883. Fee Status: Fee Paid. Parties have been notified. (Baker, Ryan)
September 16, 2013 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. The parties' 45 Stipulation Regarding a Stay, which the Court construes as a joint motion to stay the case, is granted in part and denied without prejudice in part. The parties request that the case be stayed pending resolution of an appeal of 34 the Preliminary Injunction, but no appeal has been filed. The joint motion to stay is granted to the extent that the status conference scheduled for September 20, 2013, is vacated so that Defendants may evaluate the possibility of filing an appeal. The motion is denied without prejudice in all other respects. If a timely appeal is filed, the Court will consider an additional joint motion to stay. If no timely appeal is filed, a status conference will be scheduled. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 9/16/2013. (lcrmc2)
September 16, 2013 Filing 45 STIPULATION RE STAYING THE LITIGATION PENDING APPEAL by FOX BROADCASTING COMPANY, INC., FOX TELEVISION STATIONS, INC., TWENTIETH CENTURY FOX FILM CORPORATION. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Shepard, Julie)
September 13, 2013 Filing 44 MEET AND CONFER STATEMENT. (Shepard, Julie)
September 12, 2013 Filing 43 RESPONSE TO ORDER OF THE COURT re 42 Order on Motion to Stay, Order on Motion for Reconsideration Declaration re Compliance filed by AEREOKILLER LLC,, FILMON X, LLC, FILMON.COM, INC,, FILMON.TV NETWORKS, INC.,, FILMON.TV, INC.. (Baker, Ryan)
September 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER denying 36 Motion to Stay; denying 37 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 9/12/2013. (lcrmc2)
September 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 41 MEMORANDUM AND OPINION. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 9/12/2013. (lcrmc2)
September 12, 2013 Filing 40 Memorandum in opposition to re 37 Emergency MOTION for Reconsideration re 33 Memorandum & Opinion, 34 Preliminary Injunction, , 38 Emergency MOTION Judicial Notice re 37 Emergency MOTION for Reconsideration re 33 Memorandum & Opinion, 34 Preliminary Injunction, , 36 Emergency MOTION to Stay Preliminary Injunction filed by ALLBRITTON COMMUNICATIONS COMPANY, AMERICAN BROADCASTING COMPANIES, INC., CBS BROADCASTING, INC.,, CBS STUDIOS, DISNEY ENTERPRISES, INC., FOX BROADCASTING COMPANY, INC., FOX TELEVISION STATIONS, INC., GANNETT CO., INC., NBC STUDIOS LLC, NBC SUBSIDIARY (WRC-TV), LLC, OPEN 4 BUSINESS PRODUCTIONS LLC, TELEMUNDO NETWORK GROUP LLC,, TWENTIETH CENTURY FOX FILM CORPORATION, UNIVERSAL NETWORK TELEVISION LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Objections to Defendants' Supplemental Evidence, # 2 Objections to Defendants' Request for Judicial Notice, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Paul)
September 12, 2013 Filing 39 Memorandum in opposition to re 36 Emergency MOTION to Stay Preliminary Injunction, 38 Emergency MOTION Judicial Notice re 37 Emergency MOTION for Reconsideration re 33 Memorandum & Opinion, 34 Preliminary Injunction, , 36 Emergency MOTION to Stay Preliminary Injunction filed by ALLBRITTON COMMUNICATIONS COMPANY, AMERICAN BROADCASTING COMPANIES, INC., CBS BROADCASTING, INC.,, CBS STUDIOS, DISNEY ENTERPRISES, INC., FOX BROADCASTING COMPANY, INC., FOX TELEVISION STATIONS, INC., GANNETT CO., INC., NBC STUDIOS LLC, NBC SUBSIDIARY (WRC-TV), LLC, OPEN 4 BUSINESS PRODUCTIONS LLC, TELEMUNDO NETWORK GROUP LLC,, TWENTIETH CENTURY FOX FILM CORPORATION, UNIVERSAL NETWORK TELEVISION LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Julie A. Shepard, # 2 Objections to Defendants' Supplemental Evidence, # 3 Objections to Defendants' Request for Judicial Notice, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Paul)
September 11, 2013 Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Responses to 36 , 37 , and 38 due by 9/12/2013. (cdw)
September 11, 2013 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. Plaintiffs shall respond to 36 , 37 , and 38 FilmOn X's emergency motions no later than 9:00 a.m. Eastern time on September 12, 2013. Plaintiffs may respond in an omnibus filing or by seriatim responses. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 9/11/2013. (lcrmc2)
September 11, 2013 Filing 38 Emergency MOTION Judicial Notice re 37 Emergency MOTION for Reconsideration re 33 Memorandum & Opinion, 34 Preliminary Injunction, , 36 Emergency MOTION to Stay Preliminary Injunction by AEREOKILLER LLC,, FILMON X, LLC, FILMON.COM, INC,, FILMON.TV NETWORKS, INC.,, FILMON.TV, INC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Baker, Ryan)
September 11, 2013 Filing 37 Emergency MOTION for Reconsideration re 33 Memorandum & Opinion, 34 Preliminary Injunction, by AEREOKILLER LLC,, FILMON X, LLC, FILMON.COM, INC,, FILMON.TV NETWORKS, INC.,, FILMON.TV, INC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Declaration, # 3 Declaration, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Baker, Ryan)
September 11, 2013 Filing 36 Emergency MOTION to Stay Preliminary Injunction by AEREOKILLER LLC,, FILMON X, LLC, FILMON.COM, INC,, FILMON.TV NETWORKS, INC.,, FILMON.TV, INC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Declaration, # 3 Declaration, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Baker, Ryan)
September 9, 2013 Filing 35 Injunction BOND filed with the Clerk of the Court on September 9, 2013 pursuant to 34 in the amount of $ 250,000 posted by ALLBRITTON COMMUNICATIONS COMPANY, AMERICAN BROADCASTING COMPANIES, INC., CBS BROADCASTING, INC., CBS STUDIOS, DISNEY ENTERPRISES, INC., FOX BROADCASTING COMPANY, INC., FOX TELEVISION STATIONS, INC., GANNETT CO., INC., NBC STUDIOS LLC, NBC SUBSIDIARY (WRC-TV), LLC, OPEN 4 BUSINESS PRODUCTIONS LLC, TELEMUNDO NETWORK GROUP LLC,, TWENTIETH CENTURY FOX FILM CORPORATION, UNIVERSAL NETWORK TELEVISION LLC (rdj)
September 5, 2013 Filing 34 PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION. 27 Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction is granted. The hearing scheduled for September 20, 2013, is converted to a status conference. This preliminary injunction is effective immediately upon posting of $250,000 bond. See preliminary injunction for details Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 9/5/2013.(lcrmc2)
September 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 33 MEMORANDUM AND OPINION. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 9/5/2013. (lcrmc2)
August 23, 2013 Filing 32 REPLY to opposition to motion re 27 Joint MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Hearing filed by ALLBRITTON COMMUNICATIONS COMPANY, AMERICAN BROADCASTING COMPANIES, INC., CBS BROADCASTING, INC.,, CBS STUDIOS, DISNEY ENTERPRISES, INC., FOX BROADCASTING COMPANY, INC., FOX TELEVISION STATIONS, INC., GANNETT CO., INC., NBC STUDIOS LLC, NBC SUBSIDIARY (WRC-TV), LLC, OPEN 4 BUSINESS PRODUCTIONS LLC, TELEMUNDO NETWORK GROUP LLC,, TWENTIETH CENTURY FOX FILM CORPORATION, UNIVERSAL NETWORK TELEVISION LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Response to Evidentiary Objections, # 2 Objections to Request for Judicial Notice)(Smith, Paul)
August 19, 2013 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting 30 Motion to Amend Caption. Defendant/counter-plaintiff Aereokiller LLC has amended its certificate of formation to change its name to FilmOn X, LLC. The Deputy Clerk shall correct the case caption to replace every instance of "Aereokiller LLC" with "FilmOn X, LLC." Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 8/19/2013. (lcrmc2)
August 15, 2013 Filing 31 Memorandum in opposition to re 27 Joint MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Hearing filed by FILMON X, LLC,, FILMON.COM, INC,, FILMON.TV NETWORKS, INC.,, FILMON.TV, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Alkiviades David, # 2 Declaration of Mykola Kutovyy, # 3 Evidentiary Objections, # 4 Request for Judicial Notice, # 5 Certificate of Service)(Baker, Ryan) Modified on 8/20/2013 (rdj).
August 15, 2013 Filing 30 MOTION for name change by FILMON X, LLC,, FILMON.COM, INC,, FILMON.TV NETWORKS, INC.,, FILMON.TV, INC. (Baker, Ryan) Modified on 8/20/2013 (rdj).
August 15, 2013 jf, )
August 14, 2013 Filing 29 NOTICE of Defendant FILMON X, LLC Name Change by FILMON X, LLC,, FILMON.COM, INC,, FILMON.TV NETWORKS, INC.,, FILMON.TV, INC. (Baker, Ryan) Modified on 8/20/2013 (rdj).
August 13, 2013 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting 28 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Amy M. Gallegos may appear pro hac vice for the Fox plaintiffs. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 8/13/2013. (lcrmc2)
August 13, 2013 Filing 28 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Amy M. Gallegos, :Firm- Jenner & Block LLP, :Address- 633 W 5th Street, Suite 3600, Los Angeles, CA 90071. Phone No. - 213-239-5100. Fax No. - 213-239-5199 by FOX BROADCASTING COMPANY, INC., FOX TELEVISION STATIONS, INC., TWENTIETH CENTURY FOX FILM CORPORATION (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Amy Gallegos, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Paul)
August 6, 2013 Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Response to 27 due by 8/15/2013. Reply due by 8/23/2013. Evidentiary Hearing re 27 set for 9/20/2013 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 8 before Judge Rosemary M. Collyer. (cdw)
August 6, 2013 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. A hearing on 27 the Motion for Preliminary Injunction shall be held on September 20, 2013, at 2:00 p.m. The Initial Scheduling Conference presently scheduled for September 3, 2013, is hereby VACATED; scheduling matters will be addressed as necessary at the September 20, 2013 hearing. Defendants shall file a response to the Motion for Preliminary Injunction no later than August 15, 2013. Plaintiffs shall file their reply no later than August 23, 2013. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 8/6/2013.(lcrmc2)
August 2, 2013 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. In light of the recently filed 27 Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction, the parties are directed to the Court's standing order for civil cases, available at http://www.dcd.uscourts.gov/dcd/sites/dcd/files/rmc-civil-ECF-registration.pdf, particularly the provisions regarding courtesy copies of lengthy filings. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 8/2/2013. (lcrmc2)
August 1, 2013 Filing 27 Joint MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by ALLBRITTON COMMUNICATIONS COMPANY, AMERICAN BROADCASTING COMPANIES, INC., CBS BROADCASTING, INC., CBS STUDIOS, DISNEY ENTERPRISES, INC., FOX BROADCASTING COMPANY, INC., FOX TELEVISION STATIONS, INC., GANNETT CO., INC., NBC STUDIOS LLC, NBC SUBSIDIARY (WRC-TV), LLC, OPEN 4 BUSINESS PRODUCTIONS LLC, TELEMUNDO NETWORK GROUP LLC,, TWENTIETH CENTURY FOX FILM CORPORATION, UNIVERSAL NETWORK TELEVISION LLC (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Appendix, # 3 Declaration of Julie Shepard, # 4 Declaration of Sherry Brennan, # 5 Declaration of Samuel Bahun Part 1 of 5, # 6 Declaration of Samuel Bahun Part 2 of 5, # 7 Declaration of Samuel Bahun Part 3 of 5, # 8 Declaration of Samuel Bahun Part 4 of 5, # 9 Declaration of Samuel Bahun Part 5 of 5, # 10 Declaration of Barbara Wall, # 11 Declaration of Carly Seabrook, # 12 Declaration of Daniel Kummer, # 13 Declaration of Marsha Reed, # 14 Declaration of Rebecca Borden, # 15 Declaration of William Lord, # 16 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Paul). Added MOTION for Hearing on 8/2/2013 (rdj).
August 1, 2013 Filing 26 STIPULATION by ALLBRITTON COMMUNICATIONS COMPANY, AMERICAN BROADCASTING COMPANIES, INC., CBS BROADCASTING, INC.,, CBS STUDIOS, DISNEY ENTERPRISES, INC., FOX BROADCASTING COMPANY, INC., FOX TELEVISION STATIONS, INC., GANNETT CO., INC., NBC STUDIOS LLC, NBC SUBSIDIARY (WRC-TV), LLC, OPEN 4 BUSINESS PRODUCTIONS LLC, TELEMUNDO NETWORK GROUP LLC,, TWENTIETH CENTURY FOX FILM CORPORATION, UNIVERSAL NETWORK TELEVISION LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Paul)
July 18, 2013 Filing 25 ANSWER to 13 COUNTERCLAIM by ALLBRITTON COMMUNICATIONS COMPANY, AMERICAN BROADCASTING COMPANIES, INC., CBS BROADCASTING, INC.,, CBS STUDIOS, DISNEY ENTERPRISES, INC., GANNETT CO., INC., NBC STUDIOS LLC, NBC SUBSIDIARY (WRC-TV), LLC, OPEN 4 BUSINESS PRODUCTIONS LLC, TELEMUNDO NETWORK GROUP LLC,, UNIVERSAL NETWORK TELEVISION LLC. Related document: 13 COUNTERCLAIM filed by FILMON.COM, INC,, FILMON.TV NETWORKS, INC.,, FILMON.TV, INC., AEREOKILLER LLC,.(Garrett, Robert)
July 18, 2013 Filing 24 ANSWER to 13 COUNTERCLAIM by FOX BROADCASTING COMPANY, INC., FOX TELEVISION STATIONS, INC., TWENTIETH CENTURY FOX FILM CORPORATION. Related document: 13 COUNTERCLAIM filed by FILMON.COM, INC,, FILMON.TV NETWORKS, INC.,, FILMON.TV, INC., AEREOKILLER LLC,.(Smith, Paul)
July 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER setting Initial Scheduling Conference for September 3, 2013, at 9:45 a.m. The parties are directed to meet and confer as outlined herein. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 7/17/2013. (lcrmc2)
July 17, 2013 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting 21 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting 22 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorneys Julie A. Shepard and Richard L. Stone are granted leave to appear pro hac vice in this matter. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 7/17/2013. (lcrmc2)
July 16, 2013 Filing 22 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Richard L. Stone, :Firm- Jenner & Block LLP, :Address- 633 W 5th Street, Suite 3600, Los Angeles, CA 90071. Phone No. - 213-239-5100. Fax No. - 213-239-5199 by FOX BROADCASTING COMPANY, INC., FOX TELEVISION STATIONS, INC., TWENTIETH CENTURY FOX FILM CORPORATION (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Richard L. Stone, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Paul)
July 16, 2013 Filing 21 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Julie A. Shepard, :Firm- Jenner & Block LLP, :Address- 633 W 5th Street, Suite 3600, Los Angeles, CA 90071. Phone No. - 213-239-5100. Fax No. - 213-239-5199 by FOX BROADCASTING COMPANY, INC., FOX TELEVISION STATIONS, INC., TWENTIETH CENTURY FOX FILM CORPORATION (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Julie A. Shepard, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Paul)
July 15, 2013 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Alan Garrett on behalf of ALLBRITTON COMMUNICATIONS COMPANY, AMERICAN BROADCASTING COMPANIES, INC., CBS BROADCASTING, INC.,, CBS STUDIOS, DISNEY ENTERPRISES, INC., GANNETT CO., INC., NBC STUDIOS LLC, NBC SUBSIDIARY (WRC-TV), LLC, OPEN 4 BUSINESS PRODUCTIONS LLC, TELEMUNDO NETWORK GROUP LLC,, UNIVERSAL NETWORK TELEVISION LLC (Garrett, Robert)
July 12, 2013 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting 18 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to attorney John C. Ulin; granting 19 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to attorney James S. Blackburn. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 7/12/2013. (lcrmc2)
July 11, 2013 Filing 19 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- James S. Blackburn, :Firm- Arnold & Porter LLP, :Address- 777 South Figueroa Street, 44th Floor, Los Angeles, CA 90017-5844. Phone No. - (213) 243-4000. Fax No. - (213) 243-4199 by ALLBRITTON COMMUNICATIONS COMPANY, AMERICAN BROADCASTING COMPANIES, INC., CBS BROADCASTING, INC.,, CBS STUDIOS, DISNEY ENTERPRISES, INC., GANNETT CO., INC., NBC STUDIOS LLC, NBC SUBSIDIARY (WRC-TV), LLC, OPEN 4 BUSINESS PRODUCTIONS LLC, TELEMUNDO NETWORK GROUP LLC,, UNIVERSAL NETWORK TELEVISION LLC (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Hussain, Murad)
July 11, 2013 Filing 18 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- John C. Ulin, :Firm- Arnold & Porter LLP, :Address- 777 South Figueroa Street, 44th Floor, Los Angeles, CA 90017-5844. Phone No. - (213) 243-4000. Fax No. - (213) 243-4199 by ALLBRITTON COMMUNICATIONS COMPANY, AMERICAN BROADCASTING COMPANIES, INC., CBS BROADCASTING, INC.,, CBS STUDIOS, DISNEY ENTERPRISES, INC., GANNETT CO., INC., NBC STUDIOS LLC, NBC SUBSIDIARY (WRC-TV), LLC, OPEN 4 BUSINESS PRODUCTIONS LLC, TELEMUNDO NETWORK GROUP LLC,, UNIVERSAL NETWORK TELEVISION LLC (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Hussain, Murad)
July 11, 2013 Filing 17 ERRATA (NOTICE) by ALLBRITTON COMMUNICATIONS COMPANY, AMERICAN BROADCASTING COMPANIES, INC., CBS BROADCASTING, INC.,, CBS STUDIOS, DISNEY ENTERPRISES, INC., GANNETT CO., INC., NBC STUDIOS LLC, NBC SUBSIDIARY (WRC-TV), LLC, OPEN 4 BUSINESS PRODUCTIONS LLC, TELEMUNDO NETWORK GROUP LLC,, UNIVERSAL NETWORK TELEVISION LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Errata)(Hussain, Murad)
July 11, 2013 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Murad Hussain on behalf of ALLBRITTON COMMUNICATIONS COMPANY, AMERICAN BROADCASTING COMPANIES, INC., CBS BROADCASTING, INC.,, CBS STUDIOS, DISNEY ENTERPRISES, INC., GANNETT CO., INC., NBC STUDIOS LLC, NBC SUBSIDIARY (WRC-TV), LLC, OPEN 4 BUSINESS PRODUCTIONS LLC, TELEMUNDO NETWORK GROUP LLC,, UNIVERSAL NETWORK TELEVISION LLC (Hussain, Murad)
June 28, 2013 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul March Smith on behalf of FOX BROADCASTING COMPANY, INC., FOX TELEVISION STATIONS, INC., TWENTIETH CENTURY FOX FILM CORPORATION (Smith, Paul)
June 27, 2013 Filing 14 Amended ANSWER to Complaint (First Amended Version) by AEREOKILLER LLC,, FILMON.COM, INC,, FILMON.TV NETWORKS, INC.,, FILMON.TV, INC..(Davidson, Kerry)
June 27, 2013 Filing 13 Amended COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs filed by AEREOKILLER LLC,, FILMON.TV NETWORKS, INC.,, FILMON.COM, INC,, FILMON.TV, INC..(Davidson, Kerry)
June 27, 2013 Filing 12 ANSWER to 5 Amended Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against AEREOKILLER LLC,, FILMON.TV NETWORKS, INC.,, FILMON.COM, INC,, FILMON.TV, INC. by AEREOKILLER LLC,, FILMON.TV NETWORKS, INC.,, FILMON.COM, INC,, FILMON.TV, INC.. Related document: 5 Amended Complaint filed by CBS STUDIOS, CBS BROADCASTING, INC.,, GANNETT CO., INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Supplement Counterclaim)(Davidson, Kerry)
June 21, 2013 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting 10 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting 11 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorneys Ryan G. Baker and Jaime W. Marquart may appear pro hac vice on behalf of Defendants. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 6/21/13. (lcrmc2)
June 20, 2013 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Jaime W. Marquart, :Firm- Baker Marquart, :Address- 10990 Wilshire Boulevard, Suite 400, Los Angeles, CA 90024. Phone No. - 424-652-7800. Fax No. - 424-652-7850 by AEREOKILLER LLC,, FILMON.COM, INC,, FILMON.TV NETWORKS, INC.,, FILMON.TV, INC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit)(Davidson, Kerry)
June 20, 2013 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Ryan G. Baker, :Firm- Baker Marquart LLP, :Address- 10990 Wilshire Boulevard, Suite 400, Los Angeles, CA 90024. Phone No. - 424-642-7800. Fax No. - 424-642-7850 by AEREOKILLER LLC,, FILMON.COM, INC,, FILMON.TV NETWORKS, INC.,, FILMON.TV, INC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit)(Davidson, Kerry)
June 20, 2013 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Kerry J. Davidson on behalf of All Defendants (Davidson, Kerry)
May 24, 2013 Filing 8 LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests (AMENDED) by ALLBRITTON COMMUNICATIONS COMPANY, AMERICAN BROADCASTING COMPANIES, INC., CBS BROADCASTING, INC.,, CBS STUDIOS, DISNEY ENTERPRISES, INC.,, FOX BROADCASTING COMPANY, INC., FOX TELEVISION STATIONS, INC., GANNETT CO., INC., NBC STUDIOS LLC,, NBC SUBSIDIARY (WRC-TV) LLC,, OPEN 4 BUSINESS PRODUCTIONS LLC,, TELEMUNDO NETWORK GROUP LLC,, TWENTIETH CENTURY FOX FILM CORPORATION, UNIVERSAL NETWORK TELEVISION LLC, (Hussain, Murad)
May 24, 2013 Filing 7 NOTICE OF CORRECTED CIVIL COVER SHEET by ALLBRITTON COMMUNICATIONS COMPANY, AMERICAN BROADCASTING COMPANIES, INC., CBS BROADCASTING, INC.,, CBS STUDIOS, DISNEY ENTERPRISES, INC.,, FOX BROADCASTING COMPANY, INC., FOX TELEVISION STATIONS, INC., GANNETT CO., INC., NBC STUDIOS LLC,, NBC SUBSIDIARY (WRC-TV) LLC,, OPEN 4 BUSINESS PRODUCTIONS LLC,, TELEMUNDO NETWORK GROUP LLC,, TWENTIETH CENTURY FOX FILM CORPORATION, UNIVERSAL NETWORK TELEVISION LLC, re 1 Complaint,, (Hussain, Murad)
May 24, 2013 Filing 6 Electronic Summons (4) Issued as to AEREOKILLER LLC, FILMON.COM, INC, FILMON.TV NETWORKS, INC., FILMON.TV, INC. (Attachments: # 1 consent form, # 2 notice of consent to trial)(rdj)
May 24, 2013 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT against AEREOKILLER LLC,, FILMON.COM, INC,, FILMON.TV NETWORKS, INC., FILMON.TV, INC. with Jury Demand filed by GANNETT CO., INC., CBS BROADCASTING INC., CBS STUDIOS. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(rdj)
May 23, 2013 Case Assigned to Judge Rosemary M. Collyer. (md, )
May 23, 2013 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by ALLBRITTON COMMUNICATIONS COMPANY, AMERICAN BROADCASTING COMPANIES, INC., DISNEY ENTERPRISES, INC.,, FOX BROADCASTING COMPANY, INC., FOX TELEVISION STATIONS, INC.,, NBC STUDIOS LLC,, NBC SUBSIDIARY (WRC-TV) LLC,, OPEN 4 BUSINESS PRODUCTIONS LLC,, TELEMUNDO NETWORK GROUP LLC,, TWENTIETH CENTURY FOX FILM CORPORATION, UNIVERSAL NETWORK TELEVISION LLC,. (Hussain, Murad)
May 23, 2013 Filing 3 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by All Plaintiffs. Case related to Case No. 2:12-CV-6921 (C.D. Cal.); 2:12-CV-6950 (C.D. Cal.). (Hussain, Murad)
May 23, 2013 Filing 2 REPORT on the Filing or Determination of an Action or Appeal Regarding a Copyright. (Hussain, Murad) Modified on 5/24/2013 (rdj).
May 23, 2013 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against AEREOKILLER LLC,, FILMON.COM, INC,, FILMON.TV NETWORKS, INC.,, FILMON.TV, INC. with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-3336993) filed by UNIVERSAL NETWORK TELEVISION LLC,, TWENTIETH CENTURY FOX FILM CORPORATION, NBC SUBSIDIARY (WRC-TV) LLC,, NBC STUDIOS LLC,, AMERICAN BROADCASTING COMPANIES, INC., TELEMUNDO NETWORK GROUP LLC,, ALLBRITTON COMMUNICATIONS COMPANY, FOX TELEVISION STATIONS, INC.,, DISNEY ENTERPRISES, INC.,, OPEN 4 BUSINESS PRODUCTIONS LLC,, FOX BROADCASTING COMPANY, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit B, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet, # 4 Summons)(Hussain, Murad)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: FOX TELEVISION STATIONS, INC., et al v. AEREOKILLER LLC, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FOX TELEVISION STATIONS, INC.
Represented By: Murad Hussain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TWENTIETH CENTURY FOX FILM CORPORATION
Represented By: Murad Hussain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FOX BROADCASTING COMPANY, INC.
Represented By: Murad Hussain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NBC SUBSIDIARY (WRC-TV), LLC
Represented By: Murad Hussain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NBC STUDIOS LLC
Represented By: Murad Hussain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNIVERSAL NETWORK TELEVISION LLC
Represented By: Murad Hussain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: OPEN 4 BUSINESS PRODUCTIONS LLC
Represented By: Murad Hussain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TELEMUNDO NETWORK GROUP LLC,
Represented By: Murad Hussain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AMERICAN BROADCASTING COMPANIES, INC.
Represented By: Murad Hussain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DISNEY ENTERPRISES, INC.
Represented By: Murad Hussain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALLBRITTON COMMUNICATIONS COMPANY
Represented By: Murad Hussain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GANNETT CO., INC.
Represented By: Murad Hussain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CBS BROADCASTING, INC.,
Represented By: Murad Hussain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CBS STUDIOS
Represented By: Murad Hussain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AEREOKILLER LLC,
Represented By: Ryan G. Baker
Represented By: Kerry J. Davidson
Represented By: Jaime W. Marquart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FILMON.TV NETWORKS, INC.,
Represented By: Ryan G. Baker
Represented By: Kerry J. Davidson
Represented By: Jaime W. Marquart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FILMON.TV, INC.
Represented By: Ryan G. Baker
Represented By: Kerry J. Davidson
Represented By: Jaime W. Marquart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FILMON.COM, INC,
Represented By: Ryan G. Baker
Represented By: Kerry J. Davidson
Represented By: Jaime W. Marquart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?